Ellen Pao v. Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 12 520719
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pao, Ellen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rudy, Exelrod, Zieff & Lowe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Bruce Exelrod +1 415 434 9800 +1 415 434 0513 abe@rezlaw.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 20, Defendant
No Logo Kleiner Perkins Caulfield & Byers, LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne C. Hermle +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 lchermle@orrick.com
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (387) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (9) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 387 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: 8/20/2015 Clerks Estimate Of Cost Of Appeal Record
Clerk's Estimate Of Cost Of Appeal Record Sent To Respondent, Estimated Cost $2,355.00 (appeal Filed 6/1/15)
    Legal Document 386 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: 8/20/2015 Clerks Estimate Of Cost Of Appeal Record
    Clerk's Estimate Of Cost Of Appeal Record Sent To Appellant, Estimated Cost $4,710.00 Less Deposit $100.00, Balance Due $4,610.00 (appeal Filed 6/1/15)
      Legal Document 385 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: 8/20/2015 Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript
      Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript -declaration Mary Ann Scanlan. (appeal Filed 8/10/15)
        Legal Document 384 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: 8/20/2015 Clerks Notice Of Filing Of Notice Of Appeal
        Clerk's Notice Of Filing Of Notice Of Appeal (appeal Filed 8/10/15)
          Legal Document 383 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: 8/20/2015 Appellants Notice Designating Record On Appeal
          Request For Clerk's/reporter's Transcript (transaction Id # 57741173) Filed By Appellant Pao, Ellen
            Legal Document 382 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
            Amended Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript (k. Shainline & M. Scanlan)[appeal Filed 6/1/15]
              Legal Document 381 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 Amended Appellants Notice Designating Record On Appeal
              [amended] Appellants Notice Designating Record On Appeal [appeal Filed 6/1/15](transaction Id # 57720233) Filed By Appellant Pao, Ellen
                Legal Document 380 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: 8/11/2015 Notice Of Payment Of Deposit
                Filing Fee For Court Of Appeal [appeal Filed 8/10/15](transaction Id # 15222013) Filed By Appellant Pao, Ellen
                  Legal Document 379 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Notice of Appeal
                  Notice Of Appeal (transaction Id # 15221067) Filed By Appellant Pao, Ellen
                    Legal Document 378 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                    Plaintiff's Production Of Documents Regarding Clerk's Notice To Counsel Re Missing Documents Filed By Appellant Pao, Ellen
                      Legal Document 377 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                      Clerk's Notice To Counsel Re Missing Documents As To Appellant Pao, Ellen
                        Legal Document 376 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Order
                        Order Granting In Part And Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion To Strike And Tax Costs
                          Blank 375 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Court Filing
                          Trial Motion Calendar On Jun-18-2015 In Dept. 613, Plaintiff's Motion To Strike And Tax Defendant's Costs Is Argued, Granted In Part And Denied In Part. The Court Will Issue An Order. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Mary Ann Scanlan, Csr No. 8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114. (613)
                            Legal Document 374 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Minutes
                            Minutes For Jun-18-2015 9:00 Am
                              Legal Document 373 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript
                              Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript (m. Scanlan)
                                Legal Document 372 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Clerks Notice Of Filing Of Notice Of Appeal
                                Clerk's Notice Of Filing Of Notice Of Appeal
                                  Legal Document 371 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Order
                                  Order Granting Plaintiff Ellen Pao's Motion To File Records Under Seal
                                    Legal Document 370 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Declaration
                                    Declaration Of Alan B. Exelrod In Support Of Plaintiffs Reply To Defendants Opposition To Motion To Strike And Tax Costs (transaction Id # 57393754) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                      Legal Document 369 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Plaintiff Ellen Paos Reply To Defendants Opposition To Motion To Strik
                                      Reply To Defendants Opposition To Motion To Strike And Tax Costs (transaction Id # 57393754) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                        Legal Document 368 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Appellants Notice Designating Record On Appeal
                                        Request For Clerk's/reporter's Transcript (transaction Id # 57393521) Filed By Appellant Pao, Ellen
                                          Blank 367 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Court Filing
                                          Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Ellen Pao's Motion To File Records Under Seal Is Granted. No Opposition Filed And The Motion Meets The Requirements Of Crc 2.551. Prevailing Party Shall Prepare Form Of Order That Complies With Crc 3.1312. Judge Ernest H. Goldsmith; Clerk Felicia Green; Dept. 302. (302/ehg)
                                            Blank 366 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015
                                            Mini Minutes For Jun-08-2015 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                              Legal Document 365 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Amended Proof Of Service
                                              Amended Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 57346196) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                Legal Document 364 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 Proof of Service
                                                Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 57345995) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                  Legal Document 363 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 Proof of Service
                                                  Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 57341833) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                    Legal Document 362 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 Declaration
                                                    Declaration Of Shannon B Seekao In Support Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield And Byers Llcs Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Strike Costs And Exhibits A Through D (transaction Id # 57341833) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                      Legal Document 361 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield And Byers Llcs Opposition To Plaint
                                                      Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Strike And Tax Defendants Costs (transaction Id # 57341833) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                        Legal Document 360 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Notice Of Payment Deposit
                                                        Filing Fee For Court Of Appeal (transaction Id # 57322193) Filed By Appellant Pao, Ellen
                                                          Legal Document 359 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 Notice of Appeal
                                                          Notice Of Appeal (transaction Id # 57317956) Filed By Appellant Pao, Ellen
                                                            Legal Document 358 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Order
                                                            Order And Stipulation To Seal Records Lodged With The Court On February 17, 2015 And April 9, 2015
                                                              Blank 357 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015
                                                              Fee Paid On Joint Stip And Order To Seal Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                Legal Document 356 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Proof Of Service By Email And First Class Mail
                                                                Proof Of Service By Email And First Class Mail (transaction Id # 57205886) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                  Legal Document 355 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Declaration
                                                                  Declaration Of Alan B. Exelrod In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion To Strike And Tax Defendants Costs (transaction Id # 57205886) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                    Legal Document 354 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Plaintiffs Motion To Strike And Tax Defendants Costs
                                                                    Notice Of Motion To Strike And Tax Defendants Costs (transaction Id # 57205886) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                      Legal Document 353 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Plaintiffs Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike And Tax Defendants Co
                                                                      Motion To Tax Costs (transaction Id # 57205886) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Hearing Set For Jun-18-2015 At 09:00 Am In Dept 613
                                                                        Legal Document 352 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Proof of Service
                                                                        Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 57123285) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                          Legal Document 351 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Declaration
                                                                          Declaration Of Shannon B. Seekao In Support Of Memorandum Of Costs And Exhibits A And B (transaction Id # 57123285) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                            Legal Document 350 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Memorandum Of Costs
                                                                            Memorandum Of Costs And Disbursements, $972,814.50 Total Costs, Mature Date May-12-2015,, (transaction Id # 57123285) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                              Legal Document 349 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Declaration
                                                                              Declaration Of Michelle G. Lee In Support Of Plaintiff Ellen Paos Motion To File Records Under Seal (transaction Id # 57071537) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                Legal Document 348 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Plaintiff Ellen Pao
                                                                                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Plaintiff Ellen Paos Motion To File Records Under Seal (transaction Id # 57071537) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                  Legal Document 347 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Proof of Service
                                                                                  Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 57071537) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                    Legal Document 346 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Plaintiff Ellen Paos Notice Of Payment For Court Reporter Fee For Plai
                                                                                    Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 57071537) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                      Legal Document 345 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Plaintiffs Ellen Paos Notice Of Motion To File Records Under Seal
                                                                                      Plaintiffs Ellen Paos Notice Of Motion To File Records Under Seal (transaction Id # 57071537) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Hearing Set For Jun-08-2015 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                        Legal Document 344 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc’s Opposition To Plai
                                                                                        Oppos To Plaintiff Pao's Motion In Limine No. 12 To Exclude Improper Expert Opinion Of Michael Robbins (transaction Id # 57071392) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                          Legal Document 343 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc’s Opposition To Plai
                                                                                          Opposition To Plaintiff Pao's Motion In Limine No. 11 To Exclude Improper Expert Opinion Of Rhoma Young (transaction Id # 57071392) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                            Legal Document 342 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Opposition By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc’s To P
                                                                                            Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 10 To Exclude The Expert Report And Testimony Of Paul Gompers (transaction Id # 57071392) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                              Legal Document 341 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Opposition By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc’s To P
                                                                                              Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 9 To Exclude Evidence And Testimony Relating To Stephen Hirschfeld's Investigation Of Plaintiff's Workplace Complaint Pursuant To Cal. Bus. Prof. Code §§ 7521, 17200 (transaction Id # 57071392) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                Legal Document 340 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc’s Opposition To Plai
                                                                                                Opposition To Plaintiff Pao's Motion In Limine No. 8 To Exclude Documents And Information Regarding The Number Of Women In The Venture Capital, Technology, And Other Industries (transaction Id # 57071392) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                  Legal Document 339 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc’s Opposition To Plai
                                                                                                  Opposition To Plaintiff Pao's Motion In Limine No. 7 To Exclude Evidence Regarding Defendant's Subsequent Employment Practices And Conduct After Plaintiff's Termination (transaction Id # 57071392) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                    Legal Document 338 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc’s Opposition To Plai
                                                                                                    Opposition To Plaintiff Pao's Motion In Limine No. 6 To Exclude Certain Evidence Relating To Plaintiff's New Employer ' Reddit, Inc. (transaction Id # 57071392) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                      Legal Document 337 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc’s Opposition To Plai
                                                                                                      Opposition To Plaintiff Pao's Motion In Limine No. 5 To Exclude Any Documents Or Information Not Produced In Discovery (transaction Id # 57071392) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                        Legal Document 336 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc’s Opposition To Plai
                                                                                                        Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 4 To Exclude Information And Testimony Regarding Plaintiff's Address (transaction Id # 57071392) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                          Legal Document 335 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc’s Opposition To Plai
                                                                                                          Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 2 To Exclude Any Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Husband (transaction Id # 57071392) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                            Legal Document 334 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc’s Opposition To Plai
                                                                                                            Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 1 To Exclude Any Documents Or Information Related To Offers To Settle Or Settlement Discussions (transaction Id # 57071392) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 333 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015
                                                                                                              Plaintiff Ellen Pao's Motions In Limine, Served On February 11, 2015 (sealed Per Order Filed 05/28/2015.) (sealed Document)
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 332 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015
                                                                                                                Plaintiff Ellen Pao's Submissions To The Court Regarding Testimony Of Female Witness, Rhoma Young, And Allison West (sealed Per Order Filed 05/28/2015.) (sealed Document)
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 331 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015
                                                                                                                  Plaintiff Ellen Pao's Submissions To The Court Regarding Financial Motive Briefing (sealed Per Order Filed 05/28/2015.) (sealed Document)
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 330 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 57049748) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 329 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Plaintiff Ellen Paos (redacted) Motions In Limine, Served February 11,
                                                                                                                      (redacted) Motions In Limine, Served February 11, 2015 (transaction Id # 57049748) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 328 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Plaintiff Ellen Paos (redacted) Submissions To The Court Regarding Tes
                                                                                                                        (redacted) Submissions To The Court Regarding Testimony Of Female Witness, Rhoma Young, And Allison West (transaction Id # 57049748) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 327 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Plaintiff Ellen Paos (redacted) Submissions To The Court Regarding Fin
                                                                                                                          (redacted) Submissions To The Court Regarding Financial Motive Briefing (transaction Id # 57049748) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 326 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Plaintiff Ellen Paos Submissions To The Court In Opposition To Defenda
                                                                                                                            Submissions To The Court In Opposition To Defendants Motion For Nonsuit Regarding Carried Interest And Punitive Damages (transaction Id # 57049748) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 325 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Notice of Entry of Judgment
                                                                                                                              Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Filed By Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc (transaction Id # 57037955)
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 324 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 Judgment On Verdict
                                                                                                                                The Court Ordered The Following Judgment On Verdict Entered: It Is Adjudged That Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc Recover From Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Plaintiff Takes Nothing From Defendant. -- See Scanned Judgment On Special Verdict
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 323 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                  Order - Protective Order (re Reddit, Inc. / Endorsed Filed Copy Placed In Dept. 613's "out Box" For Pick Up.)
                                                                                                                                    Blank 322 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Jury Trial [day 24] Held On Mar-27-2015 For Further Jury Deliberations (day 3). Jury Returns A Verdict. (see Verdict Form For Details.) The Jury Is Thanked And Discharged. Exhibits And Lodged Depositions Are Ordered Returned To The Offering Parties For Safekeeping. (prevailing Party To Submit A Form Of Judgment.) Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Mary Ann Scanlan, Csr No. 8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114. (613)
                                                                                                                                      Blank 321 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015
                                                                                                                                      Trial Concluded. In 24.0 Days
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 320 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                        Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 319 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                          Order And Stipulation To Return All Trial Exhibitis And Depositions To Respective Counsel For Safe-keeping
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 318 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                            Jury Instructions Given
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 317 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Jury Notes
                                                                                                                                              Jury Notes Received During Deliberation
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 316 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Jury Notes
                                                                                                                                                Jury Notes Received During Trial
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 315 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List For Defendants Filed
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 314 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List For Plaintiff Filed
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 313 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                      Witness List Filed
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 312 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015
                                                                                                                                                        Subsequent Jury Fee Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Fee Deposited By Law Offices Of Rudy,exelrod, Zieff & Lowe For Jury Fee For Mar-24-2015 Through Mar-27-2015 For Trial In Dept 613
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 311 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Defendant Kleiner Perkins, Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Seal March 1, 2015 Letter To Judge Kahn And Attachment
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 310 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                            Minutes For Mar-27-2015 9:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 309 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Jury Trial [day 23] In Progress On Mar-26-2015 For Jury Deliberations (day 2). Trial Continued To Mar-27-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) In Dept. 604 For Further Jury Deliberations. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Mary Ann Scanlan, Csr No. 8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 308 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                Minutes For Mar-26-2015 8:45 Am
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 307 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: 3/25/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Jury Trial [day 22] In Progress On Mar-25-2015 For Further Closing Arguments And Commencement Of Jury Deliberations. Trial Continued To Mar-26-2015 At 8:45 Am (assigned In Dept.613) In Dept. 604 For Further Jury Deliberations. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Mary Ann Scanlan, Csr No. 8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 306 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Jury Trial [day 21] In Progress On Mar-24-2015 For Jury Instructions And Closing Arguments. Trial Continued To Mar-25-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) In Dept. 604 For Further Closing Arguments. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Kelly Bryce Shainline, Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 305 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015
                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's March 1, 2015 Letter [filed Under Seal Pursuant To Order Granting Defendant Kleiner Perkins, Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Seal Filed On 03/27/2015] (sealed Document)
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 304 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 [redacted] Defendants March 1, 2015 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                        [redacted] Defendants March 1, 2015 Letter (transaction Id # 56967547) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 303 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 DeclarationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Jessica R. Perry In Support Of Defendants Motion To Seal March 1, 2015 Letter To Judge Kahn And Attachment (transaction Id # 56965641) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 302 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llcs Memorandum Of Points ACourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Its Motion To Seal March 1, 2015 Letter To Judge Kahn And Attachment (transaction Id # 56965641) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 301 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins, Caufield & Byers Llcs Notice Of Motion AndCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Fee Paid On Notice Of Motion And Motion To Seal March 1, 2015 Letter To Judge Kahn And Attachment (transaction Id # 56965641) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 300 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Judge Kahns Penultimate Draft Of Jury Instructions And Exhibit ACourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Kahns Penultimate Draft Of Jury Instructions And Exhibit A (transaction Id # 56962542) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 299 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Judge Kahns Rulings On Exhibit 1380, Kpcbs Unclean Hands Defense, KpcbCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Kahns Rulings On Exhibit 1380, Kpcbs Unclean Hands Defense, Kpcb Motion For Nonsuit Regarding Punitive Damages And Deferral Of Ruling On Kpcbs Motion For Nonsuit Regarding Carried Interest And Exhibit A (transaction Id # 56962542) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 298 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Authority Supporting Kpcbs Motion For Nonsuit On Carried Interest And
                                                                                                                                                                                    Authority Supporting Kpcbs Motion For Nonsuit On Carried Interest And Exhibit A (transaction Id # 56962542) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 297 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Authority Supporting Kpcbs Motion For Nonsuit On Punitive Damages And
                                                                                                                                                                                      Authority Supporting Kpcbs Motion For Nonsuit On Punitive Damages And Exhibit A (transaction Id # 56962542) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 296 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Judge Kahns First Draft Of Jury Instructions And Exhibit ACourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Kahns First Draft Of Jury Instructions And Exhibit A (transaction Id # 56962542) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 295 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Kpcbs Emails Regarding Jury Instructions And Exhibits A And B
                                                                                                                                                                                          Kpcbs Emails Regarding Jury Instructions And Exhibits A And B (transaction Id # 56962542) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 294 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Judge Kahns Ruling Regarding Financial Motive Evidence And Exhibits ACourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Kahns Ruling Regarding Financial Motive Evidence And Exhibits A And B (transaction Id # 56962542) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 293 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Stephen Hirschfeld (transaction Id # 56962542) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 292 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Letter To Judge Kahn Re Reconsideration Of Ruling On Kpcbs Motion In LCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter To Judge Kahn Re Reconsideration Of Ruling On Kpcbs Motion In Limine 2 And Exhibit A (transaction Id # 56962542) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 291 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Judge Kahns Ruling On Plaintiff And Defendants Motions In Limine And ECourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Kahns Ruling On Plaintiff And Defendants Motions In Limine And Exhibit A (transaction Id # 56962542) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 290 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Defendants Motion For Directed Verdict On Paos Second Cause Of Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Defendants Motion For Directed Verdict On Paos Second Cause Of Action For Retaliation Based On Failure To Promote (transaction Id # 56962332) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 289 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Jury Trial [day 20] In Progress On Mar-20-2015 For Defendant's Case-in-chief. Trial Continued To Mar-24-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) In Dept. 604 For Closing Arguments. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporters: Kelly Bryce Shainline, (am), Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404; Mary Ann Scanlan, (pm), Csr No. 8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 288 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Subsequent Jury Fee Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Fee Deposited By Law Offices Of Rudy Exelrod Zieff & Lowe For Jury Fee For Mar-16-2015 Through Mar-20-2015 For Trial In Dept 613
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 287 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Jury Trial [day 19] In Progress On Mar-19-2015 For Defendant's Case-in-chief. Trial Continued To Mar-20-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Mary Ann Scanlan, Csr No. 8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 286 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: 3/18/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Jury Trial [day 18] In Progress On Mar-18-2015 For Defendant's Case-in-chief. Trial Continued To Mar-19-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporters: Mary Ann Scanlan, (a.m.), Csr No. 8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114; Kelly Bryce Shainline, (p.m.), Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 285 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Jury Trial [day 17] In Progress On Mar-17-2015 For Defendant's Case-in-chief. Trial Continued To Mar-18-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Mary Ann Scanlan, Csr No. 8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 284 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Jury Trial [day 16] In Progress On Mar-16-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief And Defendant's Case-in-chief Held. Trial Continued To Mar-17-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Kelly Bryce Shainline, Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 283 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Jury Trial [day 15] In Progress On Mar-13-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Resumes. Trial Continued To Mar-16-2015 At 8:30 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Kelly Bryce Shainline, Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 282 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Subsequent Jury Fee Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Fee Deposited By Law Offices Of Rudy, Exelrod, Zieff & Lowe For Jury Fee For Mar-09-2015 Through Mar-13-2015 For Trial In Dept 613
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 281 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Jury Trial [day 14] In Progress On Mar-12-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Resumes. Trial Continued To Mar-13-2015 At 10:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporters: Mary Ann Scanlan (am), Csr #8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114; Kelly Bryce Shainline (pm), Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 280 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: 3/11/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Jury Trial [day 13] In Progress On Mar-11-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Resumes. Trial Continued To Mar-12-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporters: Mary Ann Scanlan (am), Csr #8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114; Kelly Bryce Shainline (pm), Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 279 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 15068159) Filed By Other Reddit, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 278 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Dan Mccomas In Support Of Motion For Protective Order For Confidential Documents And Information (transaction Id # 15068159) Filed By Other Reddit, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 277 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Protecti
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Protective Order For Confidential Documents And Information (transaction Id # 15068159) Filed By Other Reddit, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 276 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Notice Of Motion And Motion For Protective Order For Confidential Docu
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Motion And Motion For Protective Order For Confidential Documents And Information (transaction Id # 15068159) Filed By Other Reddit, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 275 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes For Mar-10-2015 9:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 274 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Jury Trial [day 12] In Progress On Mar-10-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Resumes. Trial Continued To Mar-11-2015 At 8:30 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporters: Kelly Bryce Shainline (am), Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404; Mary Ann Scanlan (pm), Csr #8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 273 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Subsequent Jury Fee Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Fee Deposited By Law Offices Of Rudy, Exelrod, Zieff & Lowe, Llp For Jury Fee For Feb-27-2015 Through Mar-06-2015 For Trial In Dept 613
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 272 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Jury Trial [day 11] In Progress On Mar-09-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Resumes. Trial Continued To Mar-10-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporters: Mary Ann Scanlan (am), Csr #8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114; Kelly Bryce Shainline (pm), Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 271 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes For Mar-09-2015 9:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 270 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Jury Trial [day 10] In Progress On Mar-06-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Resumes. Trial Continued To Mar-09-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporters: Mary Ann Scanlan (am), Csr #8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114; Kelly Bryce Shainline (pm), Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 269 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minutes For Mar-06-2015 9:30 Am
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 268 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: 3/5/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Jury Trial [day 9] In Progress On Mar-05-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Resumes. Trial Continued To Mar-06-2015 At 9:30 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Kelly Bryce Shainline, Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 267 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: 3/5/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes For Mar-05-2015 9:30 Am
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 266 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minutes For Mar-04-2015 9:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 265 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Jury Trial [day 8] In Progress On Mar-04-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Resumes. Trial Continued To Mar-05-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Kelly Bryce Shainline, Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 264 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Jury Trial [day 7] In Progress On Mar-03-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Resumes. Trial Continued To Mar-04-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporters: Mary Ann Scanlan (p.m.), Csr No. 8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114; Kelly Bryce Shainline (a.m.), Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 263 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes For Mar-03-2015 9:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 262 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Subsequent Jury Fee Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Fee Deposited By Law Offices Of Rudy, Exelrod, Zief & Lowe For Jury Fee For Feb-23-2015 Through Feb-26-2015 For Trial In Dept 613
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 261 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Jury Trial [day 6] In Progress On Mar-02-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Resumes. Trial Continued To Mar-03-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Kelly Bryce Shainline, Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 260 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minutes For Mar-02-2015 9:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 259 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Jury Trial [day 5] In Progress On Feb-27-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Resumes. Trial Continued To Mar-02-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Mary Ann Scanlan, Csr No. 8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 258 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minutes For Feb-27-2015 9:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 257 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Jury Trial [day 4] In Progress On Feb-26-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Resumes. Trial Continued To Feb-27-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporters: Kelly Bryce Shainline (a.m.), Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 415.510.828.9404 And Mary Ann Scanlan (p.m.), Csr No. 8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 256 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minutes For Feb-26-2015 9:30 Am
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 255 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Jury Trial [day 3] In Progress On Feb-25-2015: Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Resumes. Trial Continued To Feb-26-2015 At 9:30 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporters: Mary Ann Scanlan (a.m.), Csr No. 8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114 And Vicki Haines (p.m.), Csr No. 5995, Tel.: 415.676.7416. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 254 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini Minutes For Feb-25-2015 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 253 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Law And Motion, 302, Motion To Seal Documents Filed In Support Of Defendant Kpcb Llcs Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Quash Defendants Subpoena Seeking Plaintiffs Employment Records From Prior Employer And To Modify Subpoena Seeking Records From Plaintiffs Current Employer Is Taken Off Calendar. Trial Began On February 19, 2015. Per Local Rule 8.2a2(e), A Motion May Not Be Noticed In The Law And Motion Department After The Date Set For Trial. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith, Clerk: Sean Kane, Not Reported; Dept. 302 (302/ehg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 252 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minutes For Feb-25-2015 9:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 251 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: 2/24/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Jury Trial [day 2] In Progress On Feb-24-2015: Opening Statements Presented. Plaintiff's Case-in-chief Commences. Trial Continued To Feb-25-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporters: Mary Ann Scanlan (a.m.), Csr No. 8875, Tel.: 415.834.1114 And Kelly Bryce Shainline (p.m.), Csr No. 13476, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 250 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: 2/24/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minutes For Feb-24-2015 9:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 249 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Jury Trial [day 1] In Progress On Feb-23-2015: Jury Selection Conducted. Twelve Jurors And Four Alternate Jurors Sworn. Trial Continued To Feb-24-2015 At 9:00 Am (assigned In Dept.613) Held In Dept. 604 For Opening Statements. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Kelly Bryce Shainline, Csr No. 13476, Bryce Reporting Services, Tel.: 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 248 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minutes For Feb-23-2015 9:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 247 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Trial Commenced.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 246 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: 2/20/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Jury Trial Set For Feb-20-2015: Jury Selection Discussed And Continued To Feb-23-2015 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 613. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Matter Not Reported. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 245 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: 2/19/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Jury Trial Set For Feb-19-2015: Jury Selection Held And Continued To Feb-20-2015 At 3:00 Pm In Dept. 613. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Matter Not Reported. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 244 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Jury Trial Set For Feb-18-2015: Motions In Limine Argued And Ruled Upon. Trial Continued To Feb-19-2015 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 613 For Jury Selection. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Kelly Bryce Shainline, Csr No. 13476, Bryce Reporting Services, Tel. 510.828.9404. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 243 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Defendant Kleiner Perkins, Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Seal Exhibits To The Declaration Of Shannon B. Seekao In Support Of Defendant's Motions In Limine And The Declaration Of Megan M. Lawson In Support Of Defendant's Oppositions To Plaintiff's Motions In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 242 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Jury Trial Set For Feb-17-2015: Pretrial Conference Held And Continued To Feb-18-2015 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 613. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk L. Fong; Reporter: Mary Ann Scanlan, Csr No. 8875, Tel. 415.834.1114. (613)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 241 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 15047155) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 240 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion To Conditionally File Records Under Seal (transaction Id # 15047155) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 239 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Lisa P. Mak In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion To Conditionally File Records Under Seal (transaction Id # 15047155) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 238 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Plaintiffs Notice O Fmotion And Motion To Conditionally File Records U
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Motion And Motion To Conditionally File Records Under Seal (transaction Id # 15047155) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 237 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Proof Of Service Re Redacted Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Re Redacted Trial Brief (transaction Id # 56786677) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 236 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 [redacted Version] Declaration Of Alan B. Exelrod In Support Of Plaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [redacted Version] Declaration Of Alan B. Exelrod In Support Of Plaintiffs Oppositions To Defendants Motions In Limine (transaction Id # 56786424) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 235 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 [redacted Version] Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limin
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [redacted Version] Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limine No 7. To Exclude Evidence Regarding Plaintiffs Emotional Distress Or Reaction To Any Of The Events In This Case (transaction Id # 56786424) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 234 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 [redacted Version] Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limin
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [redacted Version] Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limine No. 4 To Exclude The Testimony Of Allison West (transaction Id # 56786424) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 233 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 [redacted Version] Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limin
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [redacted Version] Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limine No. 2 To Exclude "her-too" Evidence Relating To Other Female Employees (transaction Id # 56786424) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 232 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Oppositions To Defendant's Motions In Limine (transaction Id # 56786424) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 231 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Therese M. Lawless In Support Of Opposition To Defendants Motions In Limine (transaction Id # 56786424) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 230 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 PlaintiffsÂ’memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defendant's Motion In Limine No. 10 To Exclude Spectators (transaction Id # 56786424) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 229 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limine No. 9 To Exclude Certain Evidence And Testimony Of Expert Carl Saba (transaction Id # 56786424) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 228 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limine No. 8 To Bifurcate Trial And To Exclude Testimony And Evidence Regarding Irrelevant Financial Matters (transaction Id # 56786424) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 227 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 PlaintiffsÂ’memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defendant's Motion In Limine No. 6 To Exclude Statement To Media (transaction Id # 56786424) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 226 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limine No. 5 To Exclude Evidence Re: Notes And Emails To Herself (transaction Id # 56786424) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 225 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 PlaintiffsÂ’memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defendant's Motion In Limine No. 3 To Exclude Evidence Regarding Carried Interest (transaction Id # 56786424) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 224 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence Re: Harassment Or Defendants Alleged Failure To Prevent Retaliation Or Harassment (transaction Id # 56786424) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 223 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Alan B. Exelrod In Support Of Plaintiff's Oppositions To Defendant's Motions In Limine (sealed Per Order Filed 05/28/2015.) (sealed Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 222 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant's Motion In Limine No. 2 T Exclude "her-too" Evidence Relating To Other Female Employees (sealed Per Order Filed 05/28/2015.) (sealed Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 221 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant's Motion In Limne No. 7 To Exclude Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Emotional Distress Or Reactions To Any Of The Events In This Case (sealed Per Order Filed 05/28/2015.) (sealed Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 220 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant's Motion In Limine No. 4 To Exclude The Testimony Of Allison West (sealed Per Order Filed 05/28/2015.) (sealed Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 219 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Proof Of Service Re Proposed Orders
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Re Proposed Orders (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 218 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Proof Of Service Re Motions In Limine - Lawless
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Re Motions In Limine - Lawless (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 217 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Proof Of Service Re Motions In Limine - Exelrod
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Re Motions In Limine - Exelrod (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 216 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 [redacted Version] Declaration Of Shannon B. Seekao In Support Of Defe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration [redacted Version] Of Shannon B. Seekao In Support Of Defendants Motion In Limine [volume 3 Of 3; Exhibits Dd-ww] (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 215 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 [redacted Version] Declaration Of Shannon B. Seekao In Support Of Defe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration [redacted Version] Of Shannon B. Seekao In Support Of Defendants Motion In Limine [volume 2 Of 3; Exhibits L-cc] (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 214 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 [redacted Version] Declaration Of Shannon B. Seekao In Support Of Defe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration [redacted Version] Of Shannon B. Seekao In Support Of Defendants Motion In Limine [volume 1 Of 3; Exhibits A-k] (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 213 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 11 Of Defendant Kleiner Perk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 11 Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc To Permit Kpcb To Conduct Direct Examination Of Defense Witnesses That Plaintiff Calls During Her Case-in-chief; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 212 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 10 Of Defendant Kleiner Perk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 10 Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc To Exclude Spectators; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 211 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 9 Of Defendant Kleiner Perki
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 9 Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc To Exclude Certain Testimony And Evidence Of Carl Saba; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 210 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 8 Of Defendant Kleiner Perki
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 8 Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc To Bifurcate Trial And To Exclude Testimony And Evidence Regarding Irrelevant Financial Matters; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 209 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 7 Of Defendant Kleiner Perki
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 7 Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc To Exclude Evidence Re: Plaintiff's Emotional Distress-reaction; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 208 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 6 Of Defendant Kleiner Perki
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 6 Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc To Preclude Ellen Pao From Introducing Discussions With Media; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 207 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 5 Of Defendant Kleiner Perki
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 5 Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc To Exclude Plaintiff's Notes And Emails To Herself; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 206 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 4 Of Defendant Kleiner Perki
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 4 Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc To Exclude The Testimony Of Allison West; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 205 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 3 Of Defendant Kleiner Perki
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 3 Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc To Exclude To Exclude Evidence Based On Carried Interest; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 204 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 2 Of Defendant Kleiner Perki
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 2 Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc To Exclude "her-too" Evidence Relating To Other Female Employees; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 203 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 1 Of Defendant Kleiner Perki
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Motion And Motion In Limine No. 1 Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc To Exclude Evidence Re: Harassment Or Defendant's Alleged Failure To Prevent Retaliation Or Harassment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 202 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Paul Vronsky In Support Of Motion To Seal Records Lodged With The Court In Support Of Deft's Motion To Compel Arbitration (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 201 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins, Caufield & Byers Llc’s Memorandum Of Poin
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Its Motion To Seal Exhibits To The Declaration Of Shannon B. Seekao In Support Of Defendant's Motions In Limine And The Declaration Of Megan M. Lawson In Support Of Defendant's Oppositions To Plaintiff's Motions In Limine (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 200 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins, Caufield & Byers Llc’s Notice Of Motion A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Motion And Motion To Seal Exhibits To The Declaration Of Shannon B. Seekao In Support Of Defendant's Motions In Limine And The Declaration Of Megan M. Lawson In Support Of Defendant's Oppositions To Plaintiff's Motions In Limine (transaction Id # 56786296) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 199 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, Llc's Opposition To Plaintiff Pao's Motion In Limine No. 3 To Exclude Evidence And Testimony Regarding Plaintiff's Medical Treatment (sealed Per Order Filed 05/28/2015.) (sealed Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 198 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Trial Brief Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc (sealed Per Order Filed 05/28/2015.) (sealed Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 197 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service - Personal (transaction Id # 56786244) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 196 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 [redacted] Trial Brief Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [redacted] Trial Brief Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers (transaction Id # 56786244) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 195 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Megan M. Lawson In Support Of Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motions In Limine [exhibits A, E, I, J, N, O, Q, U, V, Y, And Z] (sealed Document) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 194 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Shannon B. Seekao In Support Of Defendant's Motions In Limine [volume 3 Of 3; Exhibits Ll, Mm, Nn, And Oo] (sealed Document) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 193 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Shannon B. Seekao In Support Of Defendant's Motions In Limine [volume 2 Of 3; Exhibits M, N, O, And P] (sealed Document) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 192 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Shannon B. Seekao In Support Of Defendant's Motions In Limine [volume 1 Of 3; Exhibits E, F, And I] (sealed Document) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 191 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes For Feb-17-2015 9:30 Am
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 190 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Master Jury Calendar Of Feb-17-2015 Assigned To Jury Trial Calendar On Feb-17-2015 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 613, Judge Harold E Kahn. Judge: John K. Stewart; Clerk: Jiroque; Court Reporter: Matter Not Reported. (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 189 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: 2/11/2015 Joint Statement Re Trial Time Limits Pursuant To Local Rule 6.7
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Statement Re Trial Time Limits Pursuant To Local Rule 6.7 (transaction Id # 56762397) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 188 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: 2/6/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini Minutes For Feb-06-2015 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 187 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: 2/6/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion To Quash Defendant's Subpoena Seeking Plaintiff's Employment Records From Prior Employer And To Modify Subpoena Seeking Records From Plaintiff's Current Employer; Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 186 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: 2/6/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Law And Motion, 302, Motion To Quash Subpoenas Is Taken Off Calendar At The Request Of The Moving Party. The Court Has Signed The Stipulated Order Submitted By Parties. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith; Clerk: Sean Kane; Reporter: Melanie Dawn Gheno, Csr #7489; Dept. 302. (302/ehg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 185 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Discovery 302, Previously Taken Under Submission, Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion For A Protective Order Precluding The Depositions Of Christina Lee And Aileen Lee And For An Order Quashing The Subpoena To Amanda Duckworth Is Granted In Part And Denied In Part. Order Signed. (302/jpt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 184 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting In Part And Denying In Part Defendant's Motion For Protective Order Precluding Depositions And For An Order Quashing Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 183 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: 2/2/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Discovery 302, Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion For A Protective Order Precluding The Depositions Of Christina Lee And Aileen Lee And For An Order Quashing The Subpoena To Amanda Duckworth Is Taken Under Submission. Parties Are To Submit A Joint Proposed Order. Judge Pro Tem: Peter Catalanotti; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Not Reported. (302/jpt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 182 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: 2/2/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini Minutes For Feb-02-2015 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 181 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: 2/2/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mini Minutes For Feb-02-2015 09:00 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 180 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: 2/2/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order And Stipulation For Motion To Be Heard By A Member Of The California Bar Serving As A Temporary Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 179 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: 2/2/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Law And Motion 302, Motion To Quash Subpoenas Is Continued From Feb-02-2015 To Feb-06-2015, At 9:30 Am, In Dept. 302. Regarding Defendant's Request For Documents Regarding Future Changes In Plaintiff's Compensation Or Promotion, Reddit Has Agreed To Provide The Defendant With Its 409a Evaluation, But Is Objecting To Providing The Defendant With The Capitalization Table. Reddit Shall Submit The Briefing On Its Objection To The Court And Parties By 2/5/15. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith; Clerk: Sean Kane; Reporter: Melanie Dawn Gheno, Csr #7489; Dept. 302. (302/ehg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 178 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: 1/27/2015 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 56667582) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 177 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 56667232) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 176 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Lynne C. Hermle In Support Of Defendants Reply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Protective Order Precluding The Depositions Of Christina Lee And Aileen Lee And For An Order Quashing The Subpoena To Amanda Duckworth (transaction Id # 56667184) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 175 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Reply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Of Defendant Kleiner Perkin
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield Byers Llc In Support Of Motion For Protective Order Precluding The Depositions Of Christina Lee And Aileen Lee And For An Order Quashing The Subpoena To Amanda Duckworth (transaction Id # 56667184) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 174 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Discovery 302, Defendant's Counsel Did Not Stipulate To The Judge Pro Tem. Plaintiff Ellen Pao's Motion To Quash Subpoenas Is Continued To February 2, 2015 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 302. The Judge Pro Tem Shall Prepare A Report And Recommendation. Judge Pro Tem: Charles Geerhart; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Not Reported. (302/jpt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 173 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mini Minutes For Jan-21-2015 09:00 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 172 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 Proof Of Service By Email And Overnight Delivery Via Federal Express
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service By Email And Overnight Delivery Via Federal Express (transaction Id # 15019135) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 171 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Alan B. Exelrod In Support Of Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion For A Protective Order Precluding The Depositions Of Christina Lee And Aileen Lee And For An Order Quashing The Subpoena To Amanda Duckworth (transaction Id # 15019135) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 170 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Therese M. Lawless In Support Of Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion For A Protective Order Precluding The Depositions Of Christina Lee And Aileen Lee And For An Order Quashing The Subpoena To Amanda Duckworth (transaction Id # 15019135) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 169 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Plaintiffs Oppositi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion For A Protective Order Precluding The Depositions Of Christina Lee And Aileen Lee And For An Order Quashing The Subpoena To Amanda Duckworth (transaction Id # 15019135) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 168 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For Order Sealing Exhibits A Through C Of The Declaration Of Michelle G. Lee In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion To Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 167 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Proof Of Service By Email And First Class Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service By Email And First Class Mail (transaction Id # 15013036) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 166 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Plaintiffs Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Ex Parte
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Sealing Exhibits A Through C Of The Declaration Of Michelle G. Lee In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion To Quash (transaction Id # 15013036) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 165 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Michelle G. Lee In Support Of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For An Order Sealing Exhibits A Through C To Lee Declaration In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion To Quash (transaction Id # 15013036) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 164 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For Order Sealing Exhibits A Through C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte Application For Order For Order Sealing Exhibits A Through C Of The Declaration Of Michelle G. Lee In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion To Quash (transaction Id # 15013036) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 163 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Proof Of Service By Email And First Class Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service By Email And First Class Mail (transaction Id # 15013032) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 162 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Michelle G. Lee In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion To Quash Defendants Subpoena Seeking Plaintiffs Employment Records From Prior Employer And To Modify Subpoena Seeking Records From Plaintiffs Current Employer (transaction Id # 15013032) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 161 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Notice Of Corrected Filing Of The Declaration Of Michelle G. Lee (with
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Corrected Filing Of The Declaration Of Michelle G. Lee (with Correct Exhibits A Through C Attached) (transaction Id # 15013032) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 160 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: 1/13/2015 Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Motion To Quash Defendants Subpoena See
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply In Support Of Motion To Quash Defendants Subpoena Seeking Plaintiffs Employment Records From Prior Employer And To Modify Subpoena Seeking Records From Plaintiffs Current Employer (transaction Id # 15012137) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 159 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 56575742) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 158 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Megan M. Lawson In Support Of Defendants Motion For A Protective Order Precluding The Depositions Of Christina Lee And Aileen Lee And For An Order Quashing The Subpoena To Amanda Duckworth And Exhibits A-n (transaction Id # 56575619) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 157 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Defendants Motion F
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For A Protective Order Precluding The Depositions Of Christina Lee And Aileen Lee And For An Order Quashing The Subpoena To Amanda Duckworth (transaction Id # 56575619) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 156 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llcs Notice Of Motion And M
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Motion And Motion For A Protective Order Precluding The Depositions Of Christina Lee And Aileen Lee And For An Order Quashing The Subpoena To Amanda Duckworth (transaction Id # 56575619) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc Hearing Set For Feb-02-2015 At 09:00 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 155 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Megan M. Lawson In Support Of Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Quash Defendants Subpoena Seeking Plaintiffs Employment Records From Prior Employer And To Modify Subpoena Seeking Records From Plaintiffs Current Employer And Exhibits A-p (sealed Document) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 154 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Amended Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Proof Of Service Of Motion To Seal Documents (transaction Id # 56567158) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 153 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Motion To Seal Documents (transaction Id # 56567020) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 152 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Defendants Notice Of Payment For Court Reporter Fee For Defendants Mot
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 56566515) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 151 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 56566515) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 150 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Susan Biglieri In Support Of Defendants Motion To Seal Documents Filed In Support Of Defendant Kpcb Llcs Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Quash Defendants Subpoena Seeking Plaintiffs Employment Records From Prior Employer And To Modify Subpoena Seeking Records From Plaintiffs Current Employer (transaction Id # 56566515) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 149 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Defendants Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Defendan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Defendants Motion To Seal Documents Filed In Support Of Defendant Kpcb Llcs Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Quash Defendants Subpoena Seeking Plaintiffs Employment Records From Prior Employer And To Modify Subpoena Seeking Records From Plaintiffs Current Employer (transaction Id # 56566515) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 148 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Defendants Notice Of Motion And Motion To Seal Documents Filed In Supp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Motion And Motion To Seal Documents Filed In Support Of Defendant Kpcb Llcs Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Quash Defendants Subpoena Seeking Plaintiffs Employment Records From Prior Employer And To Modify Subpoena Seeking Records From Plaintiffs Current Employer (transaction Id # 56566515) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc Hearing Set For Feb-25-2015 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 147 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 [redacted] Declaration Of Megan M. Lawson In Support Of Opposition To
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [redacted] Declaration Of Megan M. Lawson In Support Of Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Quash Defendants Subpoena Seeking Plaintiffs Employment Records From Prior Employer And To Modify Subpoena Seeking Records From Plaintiffs Current Employer And Exhibits A-p (transaction Id # 56566515) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 146 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llcs Memorandum Of Points A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Quash Defendants Subpoena Seeking Plaintiffs Employment Records From Prior Employer And To Modify Subpoena Seeking Records From Plaintiffs Current Employer (transaction Id # 56566515) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 145 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Plaintiffs Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Quash (transaction Id # 14351049) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 144 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Proof Of Service By Email And First Class Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service By Email And First Class Mail (transaction Id # 14351048) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 143 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Michelle G. Lee In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion To Quash Defendants Subpoena Seeking Plaintiffs Employment Records From Prior Employer And To Modify Subpoena Seeking Records From Plaintiffs Current Employer (transaction Id # 14351048) (sealed Document) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 142 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Plaintiffs Notice Of Motion To Quash Defendants Subpoena Seeking Plain
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion To Quash Subpoenas (transaction Id # 14351048) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Hearing Set For Jan-21-2015 At 09:00 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 141 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Association Of Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Association Of Attorneys: Lawless, Therese M Added As Attorney For Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 140 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: 8/26/2014 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Seal The Supplemental Briefing Re Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Is Off Calendar At The Request Of The Moving Party. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert, Not Reported. (302)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 139 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: 8/26/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mini Minutes For Aug-26-2014 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 138 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Unopposed Mtn To Seal Filed May 28, 14; Granting Unopposed Mtn To Sal Filed Jul 17, 14 And Closing The Jul 23, 14 Hearing On Pltf's Mtn To Compel Discovery Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 137 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Denying In Part And Granting In Part Mtn To Compel Discovery Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 136 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Unopposed Motion To Seal Filed May 28, 2014; Granting Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Unopposed Motion To Seal Filed July 17, 2014; And Closing The July 23, 2014 Hearing On Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Discovery (see Scanned Order For Details)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 135 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Denying In Part And Granting In Part Plaintiff Ellen Pao's Motion To Compel Discovery (see Scanned Order For Details)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 134 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order And Stipulation For Motion To Be Heard By A Member Of The California Bar Serving As A Temporary Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 133 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Discovery 302, Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Seal Documents Filed In Support Of Oppos To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Further Discovery Responses To Plaintiff's First Request For Production Of Documents Is Granted Without Opposition. The Court Finds Facts Establishing An Overriding Interest That Overcomes The Right Of Public Access To The Record And A Substantial Probability That Interest Will Be Prejudiced If The Record Is Not Sealed. Defendant To Prepare Order Approved As To Form. Judge Pro Tem: Steven Stein, Clerk: M. Goodman, Not Reported. =(302/jpt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 132 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Discovery 302, Plaintiff Ellen Pao's Motion To Compel Further Discovery Responses To Plaintiff First Request For Production Of Documents Is Granted In Part And Denied In Part. Defendant To Prepare Order Approved As To Form. Judge Pro Tem: Steven Stein, Clerk: M. Goodman, Not Reported. =(302/jpt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 131 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mini Minutes For Jul-23-2014 09:00 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 130 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini Minutes For Jul-23-2014 09:00 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 129 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Alan B. Exelrod In Support Of Plaintiff's Supplemental Reply To Defendant's Supplemental Opposition (redacted) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 128 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Alan B. Exelrod In Support Of Plaintiff's Supplemental Reply To Defendant's Supplemental Opposition (redacted) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 127 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Response To Defendant's Notice Of Motion To Seal Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 126 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response To Defendant's Notice Of Motion To Seal Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 125 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Lodging Documents Conditionally Under Seal Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 124 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pos Of Supplemental Reply To Deft's Supplemental Opposition (conditionally Under Seal), Supplemental Reply To Deft's Supplemental Opposition (redacted), Dec Of Alan B. Exelrod (conditionally Under Seal), Notice Of Lodging Documents Conditionally Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 123 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Reply To Deft's Supplemental Opposition (redacted) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 122 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Supplemental Reply To Defendant's Supplemental Opposition (sealed Document) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 121 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Alan B. Exelrod In Support Of Plaintiff's Supplemental Reply To Defendant's Supplemental Opposition (sealed Document) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 120 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 119 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 118 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 117 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Motion Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 116 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Motion (civil Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mtn To Seal The Supplemental Briefing Re Pltf's Mtn To Compel Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc Hearing Set For Aug-26-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 115 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: 7/16/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Supplemental Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel; And Declaration Of M. Todd Scott In Support Of Supplemental Opposition Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 114 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: 7/8/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Re (conditionally Under Seal) Supplemental Brief On Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Discovery; Conditionally Under Seal) Declaration Of Alan Exelrod In Support Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 113 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: 7/8/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Lodging Documents Conditionally Under Seal Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 112 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: 7/8/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Alan B. Exelrod In Support Of The Supplemental Brief On Motion To Compel Discovery (sealed Document) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 111 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: 7/8/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Brief On Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Discovery (sealed Document) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion 302, Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Seal Documents Filed In Support Of Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Further Discovery Responses To Plaintiff's First Request For Production Of Documents Is Continued From Jul-02-2014 To Discovery On Jul-23-2014 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 302 On The Court's Own Motion And The Agreement Of Parties. (302)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: 6/10/2014 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Discovery 302, Plaintiff Ellen Pao's Motion To Compel Further Discovery Responses To Paintiff's First Request For Produdction Is Continued To July 23, 2014 At 9:00 Am For Further Hearing. Defendant's Motion To Seal Documents Currently Scheduled For July 2, 2014 Is Also Continued To July 23, 2014. Parties May File Supplemental Briefings. Judge Pro Tem: Steven Stein; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Not Reported. (302)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: 6/10/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini Minutes For Jun-10-2014 09:00 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 107 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Brief In Support Of Pltf's Motion Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 106 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Separate Statement Of Disputed Discovery In Support Of Motion To Compel Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 105 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 104 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 Appendix Of Non-california Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix Of Non-california Authority Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 103 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Matthew A. Tolve (redacted) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 102 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Oppos To Pltf's Motion To Compel (redacted) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 100 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 99 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Motion Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 98 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 Motion (civil Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Motion And Motion To Seal Documents Filed In Support Of Oppos To Pltf's Motion To Compel Further Discovery Responses To Ptf's First Request Fro Production Of Documents Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc Hearing Set For Jul-02-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 97 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: 5/12/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corrected Declaration Of John T. Mullan In Support Of Pltf's Motion To Compel Further Discvoery Responses Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 96 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration In Support Of Motion (sealed Document) Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 95 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 94 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Motion (civil Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Moiton And Moiton To Compel Further Discovery Responses To Pltf's First Reque3st For Produdction Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Hearing Set For Jun-10-2014 At 09:00 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 93 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Feb-17-2015 At 09:30 Am In Dept. 206.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 92 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection Hearing Jan-29-2014. Judge James Mcbride; Clerk Kcox; Proceedings Not Reported (610)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Added To Calendar For Objection Hearing Hearing Set For Jan-29-2014 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service By Hand Delivery Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 89 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Objection And Objection To Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Intent To Appear By Telephone Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 87 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Nov-10-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Jan-29-2014 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 86 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 15.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 85 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc Estimated Time For Trial: 16.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 84 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: 12/19/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation And Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Fee Pd For Stipulation And Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 82 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Costs And Disbursements, $1,344.00 Total Costs, Mature Date Nov-19-2013, Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 80 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Order Setting Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Removed From Master Jury Calendar On May-05-2014. Assigned To Case Management Department. 610 On Jan-29-2014 At 10:30 Am For Case Management Conference. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 79 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen As To Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc Does 1 To 20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 78 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 Order Rescheduling Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            The Oct-16-2013 Objection Hearing Is Rescheduled To Oct-23-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Added To Calendar For Objection Hearing Hearing Set For Oct-16-2013 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 76 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Re Stipulation To File First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 75 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Ntc Of Objection And Objection To Ntc Of Time And Place Of Trial And Req. To Continue Objection Hearing Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 74 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pos Of Stipulation For Leave To File First Amended Complaint And Order Thereon Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Fee Paid On Stip And Order For Leave To File First Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 72 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For May-05-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Oct-16-2013 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc Estimated Time For Trial: 16.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 70 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 15.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 69 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Remittitur
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Remittitur Affirmed (a136090 Div 5)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 67 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: 5/29/2013 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Conference Of Jun-12-2013 Continued To Oct-16-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Status Of Appeal. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 66 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 64 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 63 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Management Conference Of Feb-13-2013 Continued To Jun-12-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Status Of Appeal. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 62 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: 1/25/2013 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Jury Demanded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 60 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: 9/26/2012 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Of Oct-10-2012 Continued To Feb-13-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Status Of Appeal. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Jury Demanded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: 8/28/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: 8/28/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appeal Record Certified To The Court Of Appeal - 8.124, 1 Vol Rt (appeal Filed 7/24/12, A136090 #5)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: 8/2/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Directory Notice To Recporter To Prepare Transcript-deposit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: 8/2/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Clerk's Notice Of Filing Of Notice Of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reporters Costs Deposited By Appellant, Tran # W2812724a003, Tag # 030919
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 52 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Request For Clerks/reporter Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request For Clerk's/reporter's Transcript (8.124)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Denying Motion To Compel Arbitration Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion, 302, The Matter Was Argued. After Hearing, The Court Ruled As Follows: Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Compel Arbitration Is Denied. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn; Reporter: Sherry Sawyer Csr #5976
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mini Minutes For Jul-20-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Denying Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Compel Arbitration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix Of Non-california Authorities Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 45 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Brief On Equitable Estoppel Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition To Deft's Brief On Equitable Estoppel And Third Party Beneficiary Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Supplemental Brief And Dec In Support Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix Of Non Cal Auth In Support Of Supplemental Brief On Equitable Estoppel And Third Party Beneficiary Issues By Deft Kpcb Llc Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Brief On Equitable Estoppel And Third Party Beneficiary Issues By Deft Kpcb Llc Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini Minutes For Jul-10-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini Minutes For Jul-10-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mini Minutes For Jul-10-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Seal Records Lodged With The Court In Support Of Defendant's Reply In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Seal Records Lodged With The Court In Support Of Defendant's Motion To Compel Arbitration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Law And Motion 302, Ruling - The Matter Was Not Argued. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling. Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Seal Records Lodged With The Court In Support Of Defendant's Reply In Support Of Motion To Compel Is Granted. No Opposition Filed And Good Cause Shown. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn; Court Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr # 5976
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion 302, Ruling - The Matter Was Not Argued. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling. Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Seal Records Lodged With The Court Is Granted. No Opposition Filed And Good Cause Shown. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn; Court Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr # 5976
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion 302, Ruling - A R G U E D; Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Compel Arbitration Is Continued To July 20, 2012 Solely On The Issues Of Equitable Estoppel And 3rd Party Beneficiary. Supplemental Papers To Be Filed By July 13, 2012. Supplemental Opposition To Be Filed By July 18; Reply To Be Filed By July 19, 2012. Judge: Harold Kahn; Court Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr # 5976
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: 7/3/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Declaration Of Steven R Franklin In Support Of Deft's Motion To Compel Arbitration Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: 7/3/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Declaration Of Steven R. Franklin In Support Of Defendand Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Compel Arbitration (sealed Document) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Suppor Tpof Defts Motion To Seal Records Lodged With The Court In Support Of Deft's Reply In Support Of Motion To Compel Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Memo Of P And A In Support Of Defts Motion To Compel Arbitration Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Deft's Reply In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appedndix In Support Of Defts Reply In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix Of Non California Authorities In Support Of Reply Brief Iso Motion To Seal Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Paul Vronsky In Support Of Deft Motion To Seal Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Declaration Of Paul Vronsky Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Motion Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Motion (civil Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ntc Of Motion And Motion To Seal Records Lodged With The Court In Support Of Defts Reply In Support Of Motion To Compel Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc Hearing Set For Jul-10-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: 6/26/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: 6/26/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition To Motion To Compel Arbitration Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: 6/26/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration In Support Of Pltf's Oppos Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: 6/26/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix Of Non-california Authorities Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: 6/26/2012 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Pltf's Oppos To Motion To Compel Arbitration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix Of Non California Authorities In Support Of Motion To Seal Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service Of Motion Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Motion (civil Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Motion And Motion To Seal Records Lodged With The Court Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc Hearing Set For Jul-10-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix Of Non California Authorities In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Paul Vronsky In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration ----- Redacted Version Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Motion (civil Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Arbitration Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc Hearing Set For Jul-10-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Paul Vronsky In Support Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Compel Arbitration (sealed Document) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Paul Vronsky In Support Of Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc's Motion To Compel Arbitration (sealed Document) Filed By Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen Served May-14-2012, Personal Service On Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Other Non Exempt Complaints, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pao, Ellen As To Defendant Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers Llc Does 1 To 20 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Oct-10-2012 Proof Of Service Due On Jul-09-2012 Case Management Statement Due On Sep-25-2012

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 4,872 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?