Jana Jamieson v. Alice Arce Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 12 522066
Superior Court Judge Katherine Feinstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Jamieson, Jana, Plaintiff

Represented by Winslow, Benjamin Robert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Winslow, Benjamin Robert +1 415 441 5943
v.
No Logo Arce, Alice, Defendant

Represented by Ota, Paul J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ota, Paul J. +1 925 977 1400
No Logo Does 1 To 20, Inclusive, Defendant
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/26/2013
Master Jury Calendar Set For Oct-28-2013 Vacated. Dismissal Filed 6/6/13. (206)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Notice
    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal Filed By Plaintiff Jamieson, Jana
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 Dismissal Of Entire Action
      Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 21 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: 3/26/2013
        Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Arce, Alice
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: 3/25/2013 Demand For Jury
          Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Arce, Alice
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
            Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Oct-28-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Sent By Court.
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 18 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013
              Objection Hearing Mar-13-2013 (610)
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 17 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013
                Stipulation To Continue Trial Date (amended) Filed By Jamieson, Jana
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 16 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013
                  Added To Calendar For Objection Hearing Hearing Set For Mar-13-2013 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Stipulation
                    Stipulation To Continue Trial Date Filed By Jamieson, Jana Arce, Alice
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: 2/21/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                      Notice Of Objection To Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial Filed By Plaintiff Jamieson, Jana
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: 2/15/2013 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                        Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Aug-12-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Is Removed From Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: 12/10/2012 Stipulation
                          Stipulation To Private Mediation Filed By Jamieson, Jana Arce, Alice
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 11 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012
                            Objection Hearing Dec-05-2012 - No Change; Parties To File Stipulation To Mediation (610)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 10 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012
                              Added To Calendar For Objection Hearing Hearing Set For Dec-05-2012 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 610
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: 11/29/2012 Notice
                                Notice Of Objection To Order To Arb Filed By Plaintiff Jamieson, Jana
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: 11/26/2012 Case Management Statement
                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Arce, Alice Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/20/2012 Order To Arbitration
                                    Assigned To Arbitration For Feb-04-2013. Dec-05-2012 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Case Management Statement
                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Jamieson, Jana Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: 11/2/2012
                                        Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Jamieson, Jana
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: 9/10/2012 Answer
                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Arce, Alice
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
                                            Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Jamieson, Jana Served Jul-05-2012, Personal Service On Defendant Arce, Alice
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: 7/3/2012 Notice To Plaintiff
                                              Notice To Plaintiff
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: 7/3/2012 Complaint
                                                Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Jamieson, Jana As To Defendant Arce, Alice Does 1 To 20, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Dec-05-2012 Proof Of Service Due On Sep-04-2012 Case Management Statement Due On Nov-20-2012
                                                  Request RequestSpace

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 110 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?