Credit Acceptance Corporation v. Cassie Cannon Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 12 522093

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rory W Clark

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clark, Rory W +1 888 700 4774
v.
No Logo Cannon, Cassie, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 To X, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Taylor, Lakey, Defendant
Cause of Action Exempt Collections (rule 3.740)
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Execution For Money/possession/sale Return
Return Of Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County, Returned And Filed, Unsatisfied As To Defendant Cannon, Cassie Taylor, Lakey
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 22 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013
    Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County As To Defendant Cannon, Cassie Taylor, Lakey
      Blank 21 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013
      Cost Bill After Judgment, $.00 Credit Acknowledged, $388.66 Interest, $54.00 Costs Filed By Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation
        Blank 20 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013
        Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Filed By Pltf
          Blank 19 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: 7/19/2013
          Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation
            Blank 18 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013
            Crc 3.740 Review - Judgment On File
              Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Court Judgment - General
              The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation Recover From Defendant Cannon, Cassie Taylor, Lakey $6,971.43 Principal, $1,025.00 Attorney Fees, $5,139.25 Interest, $375.00 Costs, Total Judgment $13,510.68, See Scanned Doc
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Declaration
                Declaration Re: Ledger Filed By Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Declaration Re: Interest
                  Declaration Re: Interest
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Declaration
                    Declaration As To Monies Owing Pursuant To Ccp Section 585 In Lieu Of Personal Testimony Filed By Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered
                      Request For Entry Of Default/default Entered, Court Judgment Requested, Declaration Of Non-military Status, Cost Bill $375.00 Filed, Credit Acknowledged $.00 As To Defendant Cannon, Cassie Taylor, Lakey
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Dismissal
                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Does 1 To X, Inclusive
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/11/2013 Proof of Service of Summons
                          Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation Served Jul-10-2012, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Taylor, Lakey
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 10 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/11/2013
                            Received Request For Entry Of Default, Court Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation As To Defendant Cannon, Cassie Taylor, Lakey
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013 Entry Of Default Reject
                              Request For Default Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, Submitted By Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation As To Defendant Cannon, Cassie Taylor, Lakey
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 8 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013
                                Received Request For Entry Of Default, Court Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation As To Defendant Cannon, Cassie Taylor, Lakey
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Entry Of Default Reject
                                  Request For Default Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, Submitted By Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation As To Defendant Cannon, Cassie Taylor, Lakey
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013
                                    Crc 3.740 Review
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012
                                      Received Request For Entry Of Default/default Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation As To Defendant Cannon, Cassie Taylor, Lakey
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: 9/27/2012 Entry Of Default Reject
                                        Request For Default Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, Submitted By Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation As To Defendant Cannon, Cassie Taylor, Lakey
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: 9/10/2012
                                          Received Request For Entry Of Default/default Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation As To Defendant Cannon, Cassie Taylor, Lakey
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: 7/17/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
                                            Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation Served Jul-10-2012, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Cannon, Cassie
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012 Complaint
                                              Exempt Collections (rule 3.740), Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation As To Defendant Cannon, Cassie Taylor, Lakey Does 1 To X, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Proof Of Service Due On Jan-02-2013
                                                Request RequestSpace

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 202 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?