John Shek v. Leung & Associates et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 12 523403
Superior Court Judge Marla J. Miller, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge Marla J. Miller
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Shek, John, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 3, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 To 4, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 To 5, Defendant
No Logo Leung & Associates, Defendant
No Logo Attorney at Law, Defendant
Officially listed as "Leung, Hanna , D/b/a Leung & Associates"

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leung, Hanna +1 415 933 9988
No Logo Surmaitis, George, Defendant

Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leung, Hanna +1 415 933 9988
Attributes
Cause of Action Professional Negligence
Timeline
  Entries (118) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (17) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 118 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: 3/26/2013 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of Apr-10-2013 Is Off Calendar - Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
Blank 117 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013
Dept. 611: Plaintiff John Shek's Motion To Compel Is Off Calendar Per Dismissal Filed Feb-20-2013.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 116 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013
Dept. 611: Motion For An Order To Re-set Motion To Compel Hearing Back On 2/13/13, Motion To Affirm The Order Re-schedule The 1/31/13 Hearing To 2/22/13, Motion To Sanction Are Off Calendar Per Dismissal Filed Feb-20-2013.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 115 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013
Dept. 611: Motion To Compel And Request For Sanctions Is Off Calendar Per Dismissal Filed Feb-20-2013.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 114 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013
Dept. 611: Motion To Strike Amended Complaint Is Off Calendar Per Dismissal Filed Feb-20-2013.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 113 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013
Dept. 611: Motion To Strike Amended Complaint Is Off Calendar Per Dismissal Filed Feb-20-2013.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 112 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013
Dept. 611: Demurrer Off Calendar Per Dismissal Filed Feb-20-2013.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 111 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013
Dept. 611: Demurrer Off Calendar Per Dismissal Filed Feb-20-2013.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 110 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Court Filing
Discovery 302, No Appearances. Ruling: The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling. Plaintiff John Shek's Motion To Compel Will Be Heard On The Same Date At 9:00 Am In Department 611 Per The Ex Parte Order Issued On February 8, 2013. Judge Protem: Mark Schreiber, Clerk: Lesley Fiscella; Not Reported.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 109 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013
Mini Minutes For Feb-22-2013 09:00 Am For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 108 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013
Added To Calendar For Plaintiff John Shek Motion To Compel Hearing Set For Feb-22-2013 At 09:00 Am In Dept 611
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 Dismissal Of Entire Action
Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice
Request RequestSpace
Blank 106 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013
Mini Minutes For Feb-20-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 105 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 Court Filing
Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff John Shek Motion To Compel Is Continued To February 22, 2013 At 9:00 Am In Department 611 Per Ex Parte Order Filed On February 8, 2013. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Anthony C. Vaughn, Csr # 6185 = (302/pjb)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 104 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: 2/15/2013
Declaration Of John Shek Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: 2/14/2013 Ex Parte Application for Order
Ex Parte Application For Order To Set Motion To Compel On Feb-21-13 Due To Typo Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Blank 102 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Court Filing
Dept. 611: Motion To Request For An Order To Re-set Motion To Compel Hearing Back On 2/13/13, Motion To Affirm The Order Re-schedule The 1/31/13 Hearing To 2/22/13, Motion To Sanction Are Continued To Feb-22-2013 At 9:00 A.m. In Dept. 611 To Be Heard Concurrently With Other Matters. Parties Given Notice In Open Court On Jan-31-2013. Not Reported. Judge Lynn-omalley'taylor; Court Clerk: Jose Rios-merida. (611/jrm)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 101 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Court Filing
Dept. 611, Notice Of Motion To Compel And Request For Sanctions Is Continued To Feb-22-2013 At 9:00 A.m. In Dept. 611 To Be Heard Concurrently With Other Matters. Parties Given Notice In Open Court On Jan-31-2013. Not Reported. Judge Lynn-omalley'taylor; Court Clerk: Jose Rios-merida. (611/jrm)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 100 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Court Filing
Notice Of Motion To Recuse Presiding Judge Omalley Taylor Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Blank 99 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013
Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George
Request RequestSpace
Blank 98 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013
Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Oppos To Pltf's Motion To Compel Further Answers To Pltf's First Set Of Interrogatories And For Sanctions Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George
Request RequestSpace
Blank 97 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013
Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George
Request RequestSpace
Blank 96 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013
Declaration Of Hanna C. Leung Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 95 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
Case Management Conference Of Feb-27-2013 Continued To Apr-10-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application - Error Order Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013 Order
Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion & Motion To Compel Defendants
Request RequestSpace
Blank 92 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013
Added To Calendar For Plaintiff John Shek Motion To Compel Hearing Set For Feb-22-2013 At 09:00 Am In Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 91 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013
Ex Parte Application For Order To Compel On 2/21/13 Due To Typo Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Blank 90 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013
Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George Leung, Hanna , D/b/a Leung & Associates
Request RequestSpace
Blank 89 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013
Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Oppos To Pltf's Motion To Re-set Motion To Compel Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George Leung, Hanna , D/b/a Leung & Associates
Request RequestSpace
Blank 88 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013
Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George Leung, Hanna , D/b/a Leung & Associates
Request RequestSpace
Blank 87 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013
Declaration (amended) Of Hanna C. Leung Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George Leung, Hanna , D/b/a Leung & Associates
Request RequestSpace
Blank 86 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013
Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George
Request RequestSpace
Blank 85 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013
Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George
Request RequestSpace
Blank 84 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013
Declaration Of Hanna C. Leung Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George
Request RequestSpace
Blank 83 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013
Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 82 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Motion (civil Generic)
Motion To Compel, Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John Hearing Set For Feb-20-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 80 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Request For An Order To Re-set Motion To Compel Hearing Back On 2/13/13, Motion To Affirm The Order Re-schedule The 1/31/13 Hearing To 2/22/13, Motion To Sanction, Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John Hearing Set For Feb-13-2013 At 09:00 Am In Dept 611
Request RequestSpace
Blank 79 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Court Filing
Motion To Strike 2nd Amended Complaint Is Not Heard But Continued For Hearing On Feb-22-2013, 9:00 Am In Dept. 611 On The Court's Own Motion. Counsel For Moving Party Arrives Late And No Time To Hear Matter. Judge: Lynn O'malley-taylor; Court Clerk: Jose Rios-merida; Court Reptoer: None. (jrm/611)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 78 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Court Filing
Motion To Strike 2nd Amended Complaint Is Not Heard But Continued For Hearing On Feb-22-2013, 9:00 Am In Dept. 611 On The Court's Own Motion. Counsel For Moving Party Arrives Late And No Time To Hear Matter. Judge: Lynn O'malley-taylor; Court Clerk: Jose Rios-merida; Court Reptoer: None. (jrm/611)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 77 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Court Filing
Dept. 611: Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint Is Not Heard But Continued For Hearing On Feb-22-2013, 9:00 Am In Dept. 611 On The Court's Own Motion. Demurring Party Arrives Late And No Time To Hear Matter. Judge: Lynn O'malley-taylor; Court Clerk: Jose Rios-merida; Court Reptoer: None. (jrm/611)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 76 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Court Filing
Dept. 611: Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint Is Not Heard But Continued For Hearing On Feb-22-2013, 9:00 Am In Dept. 611 On The Court's Own Motion. Demurring Party Arrives Late And No Time To Hear Matter. Judge: Lynn O'malley-taylor; Court Clerk: Jose Rios-merida; Court Reptoer: None. (jrm/611)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 75 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Minutes
Minutes For Jan-31-2013 10:00 Am
Blank 74 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013
Amended Response To The Tentative Ruling Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Blank 73 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013
Response To Tentative Ruling Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Blank 72 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013
Notice Of Motion To Compel And Request For Sanctions Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John Hearing Set For Feb-13-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 611
Request RequestSpace
Blank 71 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/15/2013
Judicial Ntc #3 Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 70 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George Leung, Hanna , D/b/a Leung & Associates Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Days
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
Tentative Ruling On Demurrer To Second Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 68 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013
Dept. 611: Motions By Hanna Leung And George Surmaitis To 2nd Amended Complaint Previously Scheduled For Hearing On Jan-11-2013 Is Now Re-scheduled For Hearing On Jan-31-2013 At 10:00 A.m. In Dept. 611. Telephonic Notice By Court Clerk. Notice By Moving Party. Not Reported. Clerk: J. Rios-merida (611).
Request RequestSpace
Blank 67 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013
Dept. 611: Motions By Hanna Leung And George Surmaitis To 2nd Amended Complaint Previously Scheduled For Hearing On Jan-11-2013 Is Now Re-scheduled For Hearing On Jan-31-2013 At 10:00 A.m. In Dept. 611. Telephonic Notice By Court Clerk. Notice By Moving Party. Not Reported. Clerk: J. Rios-merida (611).
Request RequestSpace
Blank 66 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013
Dept. 611: Demurrer And Amended Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint Previously Scheduled For Hearing On Jan-11-2013 Is Now Re-scheduled For Hearing On Jan-31-2013 At 10:00 A.m. In Dept. 611. Telephonic Notice By Court Clerk. Notice By Moving Party. Not Reported. Clerk: J. Rios-merida (611).
Request RequestSpace
Blank 65 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013
Dept. 611: Demurrer And Amended Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint Previously Scheduled For Hearing On Jan-11-2013 Is Now Re-scheduled For Hearing On Jan-31-2013 At 10:00 A.m. In Dept. 611. Telephonic Notice By Court Clerk. Notice By Moving Party. Not Reported. Clerk: J. Rios-merida (611).
Request RequestSpace
Blank 64 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013
Dept. 611: Demurrer By Hanna Leung To 2nd Amended Complaint Off Calendar, Amended Demurrer Filed By Hanna Leung. Not Reported. Clerk: J. Rios-merida. (611)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 63 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013
Mini Minutes For Jan-09-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 62 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013
Mini Minutes For Jan-09-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 61 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013
Mini Minutes For Jan-09-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 60 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013
Mini Minutes For Jan-09-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 59 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013
Mini Minutes For Jan-09-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 58 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013 Court Filing
Law And Motion 302, Ruling - The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling. Defendant Hanna Leung's Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint - Judge Miller Has Recused Herself. Per Order Of The Presiding Judge, This Matter Is Transferred To Be Heard At January 11, 2013 At 9:00 A.m. In Department 611 Before Judge O'malley Taylor. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Lavenna Ward, Csr # 7077 = (302/mjm)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 57 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013 Court Filing
Law And Motion 302, Ruling - The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling. Defendant Hanna Leung's Motion To Strike 2nd Amended Complaint - Judge Miller Has Recused Herself. Per Order Of The Presiding Judge, This Matter Is Transferred To Be Heard At January 11, 2013 At 9:00 A.m. In Department 611 Before Judge O'malley Taylor. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Lavenna Ward, Csr # 7077 = (302/mjm)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 56 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013 Court Filing
Law And Motion 302, Ruling - The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling. Defendant George Sumaitis' Motion To Strike 2nd Amended Complaint - Judge Miller Has Recused Herself. Per Order Of The Presiding Judge, This Matter Is Transferred To Be Heard At January 11, 2013 At 9:00 A.m. In Department 611 Before Judge O'malley Taylor. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Lavenna Ward, Csr # 7077 = (302/mjm)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 55 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013 Court Filing
Law And Motion 302, Ruling - The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling. Defendant George Sumaitis' Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint - Judge Miller Has Recused Herself. Per Order Of The Presiding Judge, This Matter Is Transferred To Be Heard At January 11, 2013 At 9:00 A.m. In Department 611 Before Judge O'malley Taylor. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Lavenna Ward, Csr # 7077 = (302/mjm)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 54 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013 Court Filing
Law And Motion 302, Ruling - The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling. Defendant Hanna Leung's Amended Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint - Judge Miller Has Recused Herself. Per Order Of The Presiding Judge, This Matter Is Transferred To Be Heard At January 11, 2013 At 9:00 A.m. In Department 611 Before Judge O'malley Taylor. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Lavenna Ward, Csr # 7077 = (302/mjm)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 53 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013 Court Filing
Law And Motion 302, Defendant Hanna Leung's Amended Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint Is Continued To January 9, 2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 Per Order Dated December 7, 2012. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr # 5976
Request RequestSpace
Blank 52 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013
Mini Minutes For Jan-03-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 51 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013
Declaration (amended) Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: 1/2/2013 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
Case Management Conference Of Jan-16-2013 Continued To Feb-27-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 49 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012
Judicial Notice #2 Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Blank 48 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: 12/19/2012 Court Filing
Law And Motion 302, No Appearance On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Defendant George Sumaitis' Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint Is Continued, On The Court's Own Motion And Per The Presiding Judge's Department, To January 9, 2013 At 9:30 In Department 302 Due To The Recusal Of Judge Miller. Judge: Marla J. Miller; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Court Reporter: Lavena Ward, Csr # 7077.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 47 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: 12/19/2012 Court Filing
Law And Motion 302, No Appearance On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Defendant George Sumaitis' Motion To Strike 2nd Amended Complaint Is Continued, On The Court's Own Motion And Per The Presiding Judge's Department, To January 9, 2013 At 9:30 In Department 302 Due To The Recusal Of Judge Miller. Judge: Marla J. Miller; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Court Reporter: Lavena Ward, Csr # 7077.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: 12/19/2012 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
Request RequestSpace
Blank 45 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: 12/19/2012
Mini Minutes For Dec-19-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 44 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: 12/19/2012
Mini Minutes For Dec-19-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 43 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012
Declaration Of John Shek Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Blank 42 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012
Declaration Of John Shek Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Blank 41 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/17/2012
Supplemental Memo Of P&a In Oppos To Defts Demurrer And Motion To Strike Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Blank 40 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012
Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opos To Demurrer Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Blank 39 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012
Mini Minutes For Dec-12-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 38 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012
Mini Minutes For Dec-12-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 37 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Court Filing
Law And Motion 302, Defendant Hanna Leung's Motion To Strike 2nd Amended Complaint Is Continued To January 9, 2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 Per The Amended Order Issued On December 7, 2012. Moving Party Shall Provide Courtesy Copies Of The Moving Papers And The Operative Complaint To Department 302, With A Cover Letter Stating The New Hearing Date, No Later Than December 13, 2012 At 4:00 Pm. Judge: Marla Miller; Clerk: Lesley Fiscella, Not Reported.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 36 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Court Filing
Law And Motion 302, Defendant Hanna Leung's Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint Is Continued To January 9, 2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 Per The Amended Order Issued On December 7, 2012. Moving Party Shall Provide Courtesy Copies Of The Moving Papers And The Operative Complaint To Department 302, With A Cover Letter Stating The New Hearing Date, No Later Than December 13, 2012 At 4:00 Pm. Judge: Marla Miller; Clerk: Lesley Fiscella, Not Reported.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: 12/7/2012 Order
Amended Order Continuing The Hearing Briefing Schedule
Request RequestSpace
Blank 34 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: 11/29/2012
Certification Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Blank 33 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012
Law And Motion 302, Defendant Hanna Leung Amended Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint Is Continued From Dec-19-2012 To Jan-03-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 Per 11/21/12 Ex Parte Order.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 Order
Order Continuing And Briefing Schedule (of Defendant Hanna Leung's Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 31 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012
Amended Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint ; Pos Filed By Defendant Leung, Hanna , D/b/a Leung & Associates Hearing Set For Dec-19-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 30 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012
Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George
Request RequestSpace
Blank 29 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012
Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George
Request RequestSpace
Blank 28 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012
Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Demurrer Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George
Request RequestSpace
Blank 27 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012
Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint ; Notice Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George Hearing Set For Dec-19-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 26 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012
Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Strike Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George
Request RequestSpace
Blank 25 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012
Motion To Strike 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Surmaitis, George Hearing Set For Dec-19-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012
Ex Parte Application For Order Extension Of Time To File Oppos To Defts Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Blank 23 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012
Judicial Notice Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Blank 22 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012
Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Leung, Hanna , D/b/a Leung & Associates
Request RequestSpace
Blank 21 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012
Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Strike Filed By Defendant Leung, Hanna , D/b/a Leung & Associates
Request RequestSpace
Blank 20 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012
Motion To Strike 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Leung, Hanna , D/b/a Leung & Associates Hearing Set For Dec-12-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 19 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012
Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Demurrer Filed By Defendant Leung, Hanna , D/b/a Leung & Associates
Request RequestSpace
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012
Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Leung, Hanna , D/b/a Leung & Associates Hearing Set For Dec-12-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: 11/6/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John Served Nov-01-2012, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Leung, Hanna
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: 11/6/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John Served Nov-02-2012, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Surmaitis, George
Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: 10/22/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John Served Oct-18-2012, Personal Service On Defendant Leung & Associates
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John Served Oct-17-2012, Personal Service On Defendant Leung & Associates
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 Summons Issued
Summons Issued To Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 Complaint
2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John As To Defendant Leung & Associates Leung, Hanna Surmaitis, George Does 1 To 5
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Invalid Check Order
Civil Complaint/petition/other First Paper Stricken By Court Order For Failure To Redeem Invalid Check For Transaction W3612817f031; No Further Filings On Part Of Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: 10/3/2012 Order
Order Granting Leave To File 2nd Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: 10/3/2012 Ex Parte Application for Order
Ex Parte Application For Order For Leve To File Second Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Summons Issued
Summons Issued To Plaintiff Shek, John
Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Ex Parte Application for Order
Ex Parte Application For Order To Vacate Striking Filing For Failure To Pay Court Fees; Alternative Leave To Amend The 1st Amended Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Order
Order Granting Leave To File A First Amended Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: 9/6/2012
Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68633, Crc 3.51, 8.26, And 8.818 (confidential) Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John Order For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Granted Pursuant To G.c. 68634 (e), Crc 3.52
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012 Invalid Check Notice
Invalid/returned Check For Transaction W3612817f031 For Civil Complaint/petition/other First Paper
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 Complaint
1st Amended Complaint (per Court Order Sept 21,2012 Nunc Pro Tunc ) Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John As To Defendant Leung & Associates Leung, Hanna Surmaitis, George Does 1 To 4
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 Notice To Plaintiff
Notice To Plaintiff
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 Complaint
Professional Negligence, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Shek, John As To Defendant Leung & Associates Does 1 To 3 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jan-16-2013 Proof Of Service Due On Oct-16-2012 Case Management Statement Due On Jan-02-2013
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 230 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?