Erin Morrison Flynn v. Stitch Fix, Inc. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 12 524234
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Flynn, Erin Morrison, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kastner, Eric Christophe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Christopher Kastner +1 650 967 7854 +1 650 320 9640 eck@kastnerbanchero.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Defendant
No Logo Lake, Katrina, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth A. Rafkin +1 858 550 6078 +1 858 550 6420 srafkin@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor & Company Law Offices, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua R. Benson +1 415 788 8200
No Logo Stitch Fix, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth A. Rafkin +1 858 550 6078 +1 858 550 6420 srafkin@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor & Company Law Offices, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua R. Benson +1 415 788 8200
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (84) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (11) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 84 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Case Ordered Off Calendar
Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Apr-15-2014 Is Off Calendar. Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
    Legal Document 83 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Dismissal Of Entire Action
    Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
      Legal Document 82 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
      Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For Feb-10-2014 - Case Settled. Notice Of Settlement Filed 1/29/14. Assigned To Dept. 610 On Apr-15-2014 At 10:30 Am For Dismissal Per Crc 3.1385. (206)
        Legal Document 81 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Notice of Settlement
        Notice Of Settlement Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
          Blank 80 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014
          Mini Minutes For Jan-23-2014 09:30 Am For Dept 302
            Legal Document 79 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Order
            Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Defendant's Compliance With Discovery Requests
              Blank 78 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Court Filing
              Discovery 302, Plaintiff Erin Flynn's Motion To Compel Defendant Compliance With Discovery Requests Is Transferred To Be Heard In Department 302 At 9:30 A.m. On January 23, 2014. Judge Pro Tem Geoffrey Howard, Clerk K. Liu, Not Reported. (d302)
                Blank 77 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014
                Mini Minutes For Jan-23-2014 09:00 Am For Dept 302
                  Blank 76 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Court Filing
                  Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Erin Flynn'smotion To Compel Defendant Compliance With Discovery Requests Is Denied. (ccp § 2024.020(b). The Initial Trial Date Was Set For November 12, 2013. On July 23, 2013, The Court Continued The Trial Date To February 10, 2014 Based Upon The Stipulation Of The Parties. The Stipulation And Order Does Not Contemplate An Extension Of Discovery Cutoff. Plaintiff Failed To Move To Reopen Discovery Prior To Filing Her Instant Motion To Compel Compliance With Discovery Requests. (ccp § 2024.050(a).) It Would Be An Abuse Of Discretion For The Court To Simply Hear The Motion Comple Without First Deciding Whether Discovery Should Be Reopened. (pelton-shepherd Industries, Inc. V. Delta Packaging Products, Inc. (2008) 165 Cal.app.4th 1568, 1588.) Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Ernest Goldsmith, Clerk: Lesley Fiscella, Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr5976
                    Blank 75 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014
                    Added To Calendar For Plaintiff Erin Flynn's Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Defendant Compliance With Discovery Requests Hearing Set For Jan-23-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                      Blank 74 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014
                      Declaration Of Joshua R. Benson Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                        Blank 73 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014
                        Opposition To Pltf's Motion To Compel To Comply With Discovery Requests Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                          Legal Document 72 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed
                          Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Re: Defts' Motion For Summary Judgment And Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                            Blank 71 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014
                            Mini Minutes For Jan-17-2014 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                              Legal Document 70 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Order
                              Order Re: Defendants' Motion For Summaru Judgment And Motion For Summary Adjudication
                                Blank 69 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Court Filing
                                Law And Motion 302, Defendants Stitch Fix, Inc. & Katrina Lake's Motion For Summary Judgment Is Denied. The Motion For Summary Adjudication Is Granted And Denied In Part. The Motion For Summary Adjudication As To Cause Of Action 1 For Breach Of Contract Is Denied. The Parties Agree That The Amendment Is Ambiguous And There Is A Conflict In The Parole Evidence Regarding The Meaning Of The Amendment In Light Of Ms. Lake's Explanation Of What Double Trigger Meant. The Court Overrules Defendant's Objection Contending That Plaintiff's Deposition Contradicts Paragraph 8 Of Plaintiff's Declaration. Defendant Fails To Shift The Burden As To Causes Of Action 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, And 10. The Motion Is Granted As To Cause Of Action 6 [failure Of Consideration]. It Is Well Established That A Consideration For A Contract Is Equally Valuable Whether It Move To The Other Party Bound Or To A Third Party. Consideration Does Not Have To Move To A Promisor." Cechettini V. Consumer Assoc. Ltd. (1968) 260 Cal.app.2d 295, 298. The Court Further Notes That Defendant's Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts Does Not Comply With Crc 3.1350 Because Defendant Did Not Specifically Highlight The Issues For Summary Adjudication And Which Facts Support Those Distinct Issues. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Ernest Goldsmith, Clerk: Lesley Fiscella, Reporter: Tony Vaughn, Csr #6185
                                  Blank 68 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014
                                  Response To Evidentiary Objections Re Pltf's Decl Statements Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                    Blank 67 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014
                                    Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                      Blank 66 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014
                                      Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                        Blank 65 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014
                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                          Blank 64 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014
                                          Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Deft Compliance Wtih Discovery Requests Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison Hearing Set For Jan-23-2014 At 09:00 Am In Dept 302
                                            Blank 63 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014
                                            Proof Of Service Re: Defendants' Reply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Juddgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                              Blank 62 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014
                                              Reply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Juddgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                Blank 61 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014
                                                Reply Declaration Of Joshua R. Benson In Support Of Motion For Summary Juddgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014
                                                  Objections To Evidence Submitted In Opposition To Motion For Summary Juddgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014
                                                    Response To Objections To The Material Facts Submitted By Sticht Fix In Support Of Defendants' Motion For Summary Juddgmentor, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Order
                                                      Order Shortening For Hearing On Motion To Compel Discovery Pursuant To Stipulation (hearing - 1/23/14;opposition-1/21/14)
                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014
                                                        Fee Paid On Stip And Order Shortening Time For Hearing On Motion To Compel Discovery Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014
                                                          Declaration Of Eric C. Kastner Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014
                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Oppos To Mtn For Summ Judgmnt Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014
                                                              Opposition To Separate Statement Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014
                                                                Declaration Of J. Robert Shuman Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014
                                                                  Declaration Of Erin Morrison Flynn Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013
                                                                    Case Not Assigned For Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013
                                                                      Law And Motion 302, Defendants Stitch Fix, Inc., Katrina Lake's Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Continued From Jan-10-2014 To Jan-17-2014, 9:30 Am Per Stipulation And Order Filed On Nov-25-2013.
                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Order
                                                                        Order And Stipulation To Recalendar Date For Hearing On Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment (from 1/10/14 To 1/17/14; Opposition Due 1/03/14; Reply Due 1/10/14)
                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013
                                                                          Fee Paid For Stip And Order To Recalendar Date For Hearing On Defs' Mtn For Summ Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Answer
                                                                            Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Notice of Unavailability
                                                                              Notice Of Unavailability Of Kastner, Eric Christophe On Jan-08-2014 Through Jan-15-2014 Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013
                                                                                Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013
                                                                                  Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013
                                                                                    Declaration In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013
                                                                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013
                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013
                                                                                          Motion For Summary Judgment /adjudication Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina Hearing Set For Jan-10-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013
                                                                                            Pos Of Stipulation And Order Granting Pltf Leave To File First Amended Complaint; First Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                                                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Order
                                                                                              Order Granting Plaintiff Leave To File 1st Amended Complaint; Stipulation
                                                                                                Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison As To Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina Does 1 To 50
                                                                                                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Ex Parte Application for Order
                                                                                                  Ex Parte Application For Order For Leave To File First Amended Complaint By Stip Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013
                                                                                                    Case Not Assigned For Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013
                                                                                                      Msc Setting Review Continued
                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Court Filing
                                                                                                        Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Erin Flynn's Motion To Compel Production Of Documents Will Be Heard On The Discovery Calendar At 9:00 A.m. Judge: Marla J. Miller; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Court Reporter: Anthony C. Vaughn, Csr # 6185
                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Court Filing
                                                                                                          Discovery, 302, Plaintiff Erin Flynn's Motion To Compel Production Of Documents Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party. Judge Pro Tem: James P. Watson; Clerk L. Fong; Matter Not Reported. (302/jpt)
                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013
                                                                                                            Mini Minutes For Aug-26-2013 09:00 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013
                                                                                                              Mini Minutes For Aug-26-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013
                                                                                                                Added To Calendar For Plaintiff Erin Flynn's Motion To Compel Production Of Documents Hearing Set For Aug-26-2013 At 09:00 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013
                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Erin Flynn Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: 7/26/2013
                                                                                                                    Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: 7/26/2013
                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: 7/26/2013
                                                                                                                        Ntc Of Motion To Compel Production Of Documents Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison Hearing Set For Aug-26-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013
                                                                                                                          Master Jury Calendar Set For Nov-12-2013 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Feb-10-2014 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Per Stipulated Ex Parte Order Filed 7/23/13. (206)
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013 Order
                                                                                                                            Order - Stipulation And Order Continuing Trial Date
                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013
                                                                                                                              Ex Parte Application For Order Continuing Trial Date, Points And Authorities Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: 7/19/2013 Notice of Unavailability
                                                                                                                                Notice Of Unavailability Of Kastner, Eric Christophe On Jul-25-2013 Through Aug-02-2013 Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                  Substitution Of Attorney: Benson, Joshua R. Substituted For Rafkin, Seth A. As Attorney For Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013
                                                                                                                                    Review For Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013
                                                                                                                                      Review For Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: 4/8/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                        Order And Stipulation To Amend Answer (copy Of Order In Dept. 301 Outbox)
                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013
                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013
                                                                                                                                            Fee Paid On Stipulation And Order To Amend Answer Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013
                                                                                                                                              Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Lake, Katrina
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013
                                                                                                                                                  Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Nov-12-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Feb-13-2013 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: 1/29/2013 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                                        Order Re: Stipulated Protective Order (copy Of Order In Dept. 301 Outbox)
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                              Pos Of Stip And Order Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                                Fee For Stip And Protective Order Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: 10/25/2012 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Kastner, Eric Christophe
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: 10/22/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                        Contract/warranty, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Flynn, Erin Morrison As To Defendant Stitch Fix, Inc. Lake, Katrina Does 1 To 50 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Feb-13-2013 Proof Of Service Due On Nov-13-2012 Case Management Statement Due On Jan-29-2013

                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 5,329 times.

                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?