Dawn-shemain Weeks Et Al v. Cmea Development Company, Llc Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 13 528602
Superior Court Judge Marla J. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hines, Margaret, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furth Lehmann LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lebsock, Christopher L. +1 415 433 2070
No Logo Schlagenhauf, Shannon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furth Lehmann LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lebsock, Christopher L. +1 415 433 2070
No Logo Weeks, Dawn-shemain, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furth Lehmann LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lebsock, Christopher L. +1 415 433 2070
v.
No Logo Cmea Development Company, Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Villarreal Hutner & Todd PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hutner, Lara Villarreal +1 415 434 9100
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant
No Logo Haag, John, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcie Sarah Isom +1 415 986 5900 +1 415 986 8054 misom@gordonrees.com
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints (complaint And Demand For Jury Trial (other Employment))
  Entries (158) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (9) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 158 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 Case Ordered Off Calendar
Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Jan-06-2015 Is Off Calendar. Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
    Blank 157 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014
    Nov-12-2014 Pro Hac Vice Status Calendar As To Attorney Swathi Bojedla - Off Calendar, Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed On Oct-28-2014
      Legal Document 156 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
      Proof Of Service On Request For Dismissal Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
        Legal Document 155 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Dismissal Of Entire Action
        Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
          Legal Document 154 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
          Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For Nov-10-2014 - Case Settled Per Notice Of Settlement Filed On 9/9/14. Assigned To Dept. 610 On Jan-06-2015 At 10:30 Am For Dismissal Per Crc 3.1385. (206)
            Blank 153 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Court Filing
            Law And Motion 302, Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc's Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Against Plaintiff Margaret Hines Is Off Calendar Per Moving Party's Request. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Not Reported.(302/ehg)
              Blank 152 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Court Filing
              Law And Motion 302,defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc's Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Against Plaintiff Shannon Schlagenhauf Is Off Calendar Per Moving Party's Request. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Not Reported.(302/ehg)
                Blank 151 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Court Filing
                Law And Motion 302, Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc's Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Against Plaintiff Dawn-shemain Weeks Is Off Calendar Per Moving Party's Request. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Not Reported. (302/ehg)
                  Blank 150 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Court Filing
                  Law And Motion 302, Defendant John Haag's Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Is Off Calendar Per Moving Party's Request. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Not Reported. (302/ehg)
                    Blank 149 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014
                    Mini Minutes For Oct-08-2014 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                      Blank 148 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014
                      Mini Minutes For Oct-08-2014 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                        Blank 147 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014
                        Mini Minutes For Oct-08-2014 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                          Blank 146 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014
                          Mini Minutes For Oct-08-2014 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                            Blank 145 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014
                            Case Not Assigned For Mandatory Settlement Conference
                              Legal Document 144 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Notice of Settlement
                              Notice Of Settlement ; Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                Blank 143 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014
                                Proof Of Service Of Notice Of Errata To Declaration Of Ross Boughton; And Notice Of Errata To Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                  Blank 142 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014
                                  Notice Of Errata To Declaration Of Ross Boughton In Support Of Of Errata To Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc's Motion For Summary Judgment, Or Inthe Alternative, Summary Adjudication Against Plaintiff Shannon Schlagenhauf Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                    Blank 141 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014
                                    Notice Of Errata To Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc's Motion For Summary Judgment, Or Inthe Alternative, Summary Adjudication Against Plaintiff Margaret Hines Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                      Blank 140 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014
                                      Pos Of Ntc Of Errata In Index Of Evidence In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                        Blank 139 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014
                                        Pos Of Mtn For Summary Judgment; Memo Of P & A; Sep. Statement; Index Etc Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                          Blank 138 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014
                                          Notice Of Errata To Index Of Evidence In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative Summary Adjudication Against Pltff Margaret Hines Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                            Blank 137 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                              Blank 136 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                              Index Of Evidence In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Against Plaintiff Margaret Hines Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                Blank 135 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                  Blank 134 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                  Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment
                                                    Blank 133 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                      Blank 132 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                      Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative Summary Adjudication Against Plaintiff Margaret Hines Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Hearing Set For Oct-08-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                        Blank 131 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                          Blank 130 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                          Index Of Evidence In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative Summary Adjudication Against Plaintiff Shannon Schlagenhauf Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                            Blank 129 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                            Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                              Blank 128 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                              Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment
                                                                Blank 127 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                  Blank 126 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                  Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Against Plaintiff Shannon Schlagenhauf Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Hearing Set For Oct-08-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                    Blank 125 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                    Index Of Evidence In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Against Plaintiff Dawn-shemain Weeks Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                      Blank 124 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                      Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                        Blank 123 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                        Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                          Blank 122 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                          Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment
                                                                            Blank 121 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                              Blank 120 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                              Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Against Plaintiff Dawn-shemain Weeks Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Hearing Set For Oct-08-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                Blank 119 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                                Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Haag, John
                                                                                  Blank 118 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                                  Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Haag, John
                                                                                    Blank 117 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                                    Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment
                                                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Haag, John
                                                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Motion For Summary Judgment; Decl Filed By Defendant Haag, John
                                                                                          Blank 114 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014
                                                                                          Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summ Adj Filed By Defendant Haag, John Hearing Set For Oct-08-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                            Legal Document 113 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Dismissal
                                                                                            Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint The Second Cause Of Action Of The First Amended Complt
                                                                                              Blank 112 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014
                                                                                              Notice Of Withdrawal Of Claims Of Economic Loss Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                Legal Document 111 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                Proof Of Service Of Order Re: Ex Parte Application To Consolidate Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                  Legal Document 110 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014 Order
                                                                                                  Order Re: Defendant Cmea Development Company Llc's Ex Parte Application To Consolidate Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing Dates (to Oct-08-2014)
                                                                                                    Blank 109 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014
                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Re Ex Parte Order Re Consolidation Of Motions Of Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing Dates, Or Alternatively, For An Ost Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                      Blank 108 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014
                                                                                                      Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re Consolidation Of Motions Of Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing Dates, Or Alternatively, For An Ost Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                        Blank 107 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014
                                                                                                        Ex Parte Application For Order Re Consolidation Of Motions Of Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing Dates, Or Alternatively, For An Ost Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                          Blank 106 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: 4/2/2014
                                                                                                          Msc Setting Review Continued
                                                                                                            Legal Document 105 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                            Proof Of Service On Notice Of Firm Name Change Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                              Legal Document 104 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Notice Of Change Of Firm Name
                                                                                                              Notice Of Change Of Firm Name Filed By Attorney Hutner, Lara Villarreal
                                                                                                                Legal Document 103 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Order
                                                                                                                Order Granting Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc's Motion To Continue The Trial Date And Related Deadlines
                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014
                                                                                                                  Master Jury Calendar Set For May-19-2014 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Nov-10-2014 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. (206)
                                                                                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Master Motion Calendar On Jan-15-2014 In 206, Defendant Cmea Development Company Llc's Motion To Continue Jury Trial Is Granted. The Trial Date Of 5/19/14 Is Continued To 11/10/14 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. The New Trial Date Will Be Deemed To Be The Original Trial Date For Statutory Cut-off Purposes. Order Signed. Judge: Cynthia M. Lee; Clerk: Ebura; Matter Not Reported. (206)
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 100 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                      Notice Of Intent To Appear By Telephone Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Master Calendar Motion On Jan-07-2014 In Dept. 206, Defendant Cmea Development Company Llc's Motion To Continue Jury Trial Is Continued From Jan-07-2014 To Master Calendar Motion At Jan-15-2014, 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 To Give The Parties An Opportunity To Meet And Confer Regarding A New Trial Date And The Moving Party Is Required To Appear At The Hearing On Jan-15-2014. Judge: Cynthia M. Lee; Clerk: Ebura; Matter Not Reported. (206)
                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013
                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Reply; Declaration Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Served Dec-30-2013, Mail On Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013
                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Ross Boughton In Support Of Reply To Opposition To Motion To Continue The Trial Date And Related Deadlines Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013
                                                                                                                              Reply To Pltfs' Opposition To Deft's Motion To Continue Trial And All Related Deadlines Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013
                                                                                                                                Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013
                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013
                                                                                                                                    Master Calendar Motion On Jan-02-2014 In Dept. 206, Defendant Cmea Development Company Llc's Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference Continued From Jan-02-2014 To Master Calendar Motion At Jan-07-2014, 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Pursuant To Defendant's Faxed Letter Dated 12/23/13. (206)
                                                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: 12/18/2013
                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Christopher L Lebsock In Support Of Pltf's Opposition To Deft Cmea's Motion To Continue The Trial Date And Related Dates Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: 12/18/2013
                                                                                                                                        Opposition To Deft's Motion To Continue The Trial Date And Related Deadlines Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 90 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/12/2013 Order Granting Application To Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application To Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice For Attorney Swathi Bojedla Filed By Counsel For Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/12/2013
                                                                                                                                            Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/12/2013
                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte Application For Order To Continue Trial Date And Related Deadlines, Or Alternatively, For An Order Shortening Time To Hear Defts Moton To Continue Trial Date And Related Deadlines Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/12/2013
                                                                                                                                                Mini Minutes For Dec-12-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/12/2013 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Law And Motion 302, Plaintiffs Dawn-shemain Weeks', Margaret Hines', And Shannon Schlagenhauf's Motion To Admit Swathi Bojedla, Esq., As Counsel Pro Hac Vice Is Granted For Good Cause Shown. No Opposition Filed. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Marla J. Miller; Clerk: Lesley Fiscella, Court Reporter: Denise Doucette, Csr #5963.
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: 12/11/2013
                                                                                                                                                    Opposition To Ex Parte Req For An Order Shortening Time Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 84 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                      Amended Pos Of Motion To Continue Trial Date; Memo Of P & A; Dec.'s And Proposed Order Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                        Declaration In Support Of Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                              Motion To Continue Jury Trial Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Hearing Set For Jan-02-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                                Mini Minutes For Dec-09-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 78 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Intent To Appear By Telephone Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                                    Added To Calendar For Plaintiffs Dawn-shemain Weeks', Margaret Hines', And Shannon Schlagenhauf's Motion To Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice Hearing Set For Dec-12-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion 302, Plaintiffs Dawn-shemain Weeks', Margaret Hines', And Shannon Schlagenhauf's Motion To Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice Is Continued To December 12, 2013 Per Parties' Agreement. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Anthony C. Vaughn, Csr # 6185
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Changed Hearing Date Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013
                                                                                                                                                                          Mini Minutes For Nov-14-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion 302, Plaintiffs Dawn-shemain Weeks', Margaret Hines', And Shannon Schlagenhauf's Motion To Compel Further Responses To Discovery. The Court Adopts The Reasoning And Analysis In Pro Tem Judge Rosenquist's Report In Its Entirety. The Motion To Compel Is Granted, Subject To The Terms Of The Parties' Previously Stipulated Protective Order Designating The Haag Separation Agreement And Documents And The Handelsman Separation Agreement As "attorney Eyes Only" - Restricting Disclosure Of The Documents Initially To Counsel For The Parties And Excluding The Parties Themselves Unless Subsequently Ordered Or Permitted By The Court. Defendants May Redact Payment Information Pertaining Solely To Amounts Paid To Haag And Handelsman To Buy Their Equity Or To The Identity Of Other Equity Owners Of Cmea. Defendants May Not Redact Payment Information Made To Haag Or Handelsman With Respect To Any Payment Made For Defense Costs Or Indemnity Of Haag Or Handelsman With Respect To The Case At Bar. If Defendants Make Other Redactions In The Documents, Each Such Redaction Must Be Supported By A Privilege Log Specifically Describing The Redaction, The Grounds For The Redaction, And Providing Sufficient Factual Information For The Court To Rule Upon Such A Redaction If Requested To Do So. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Marla J. Miller; Clerk: Lesley Fiscella, Court Reporter: Anthony Vaughn, Csr #6185
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 72 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Order Re Motion To Compel Further Responses To Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                Motion To Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, Proof Of Service, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon Hearing Set For Dec-09-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Intent To Appear By Telphone Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: 11/8/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulated Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                      Fee Paid On [proposed] Stipulated Protective Order Entered Into By Pltfs Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Discovery 302, There Is No Stipulation To Have This Matter Heard By The Jduge Pro Tem. Plaintiffs Dawn-shemain Weeks', Margaret Hines', And Shannon Schlagenhauf's Motion To Compel Further Responses To Discovery Is Continued To Nov-14-2013 At 9:30 A.m. In Dept. 302. Judge Pro Tem: Nils C. Rosenquest; Clerk L. Fong; Matter Not Reported. (302/jpt)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini Minutes For Oct-31-2013 09:00 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Brief In Support Of Motion To Compel Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joinder In Cmea Development Oppos. To Pltf's Mtn To Compel Further Responses To Discovery Filed By Defendant Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                Pos Of Oppos. To Mtn To Compel Further Responses To Discovery; Dec And Response Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Tracy S Todd In Support Of Oppos. To Pltf's Mtn To Compel Further Responses To Discovery Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response To Sep. Statement Of Disputed Discovery Responses Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition To Pltf's Mtn To Compel Further Responses To Discovery Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Discovery 302, Plaintiffs Dawn-shemain Weeks, Margaret Hines And Shannon Schlagenhauf's Motion To Compel Further Responses To Discovery Is Continued From Oct-24-2013 To Oct-31-2013 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 302 Per Agreement Of Parties.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Further Responses To Discovery Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon Hearing Set For Oct-24-2013 At 09:00 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Review For Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 53 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For May-19-2014 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection Hearing Jul-10-2013 (610)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: 7/5/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Added To Calendar For Objection Hearing Hearing Set For Jul-10-2013 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: 7/3/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: 7/3/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection To Trial Date Filed By Defendant Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: 7/2/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Resposne To Defts Notice Of Objection To Trial Date Filed By Plaintiff Hines, Margaret
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/1/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/1/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Objection To Trial Date Contained In Case Management Order Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Mar-17-2014 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Jul-10-2013 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Haag, John Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pos Of Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 42 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Estimated Time For Trial: 20.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Denying Defendants Cmea Development Company, Llc And John Haag's Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: 5/16/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Ex Parte Application To Seal Plaintiffs Compensation History In The Second Supplemental Declaration Of James Watson In Support Of Defendants Cmea Development Company Llc And John Haag's Motion To Compel Arbitration Proceedings Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: 5/14/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Ex Parte Application To Seal Plaintiffs Compensation History In The Second Supplemental Declaration Of James Watson In Support Of Defendants Cmea Development Company Llc And John Haag's Motion To Compel Arbitration Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte Application For Order To Seal Compensation History In The Secodn Supplemental Dec Of James Watson And Deft's Sur Reply Re Mtn To Compel Arbitration And Pos, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: 5/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini Minutes For May-09-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: 5/9/2013 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion, 302, Ruling: A R G U E D. At The Conclusion Of Argument, The Court Ruled As Follows: Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc's Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Is Denied For Reasons Stated On The Record. Prevailing Party To Prepare A Form Of Order. In Additon, The Court Granted Plaintiff's Request To Extend Time To Obtain An Order Sealing Certain Documents To May 16, 2013. Plaintiff May File An Ex Parte Application. Judge: Marla J. Miller; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Court Reporter: Anthony C. Vaughn, Csr # 6185
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Further Brief In Response To Def Cmea Development Company, Llc And John Haag's Sur-reply Re: Mtn To Compel Arbitration Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pos Of Sur Reply Brief In Support Of Their Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings [redacted](sealed); Supplemental Declaration Of Lara Villarreal Hutner; Second Supplemental Declaration Of James Watson (redacted)(sealed) Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second Supplemental Declaration Of James Waterson In Support Of Defts Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings [redacted] Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sur Reply Brief In Support Of Their Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings [redacted] Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Declaration Of Lara Villarreal Hutner In Support Of Deft's Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion 302, Notice Of Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Continued From May-02-2013 To Law And Motion At May-09-2013, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 Per Stipulation Of Counsel.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ruling - A R G U E D; Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc's Moti On To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Is Continued To May 2, 2013 For Hearing. Supplemental Papers To Be Filed By April 26, 2013 With The Response To Be Filed On April 30, 2013 Regarding The Newly Unpublished Decision Issued By The Court Of Appeals. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Anthony C. Vaughn, Csr # 6185
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini Minutes For Apr-22-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Dawn-shemain Weeks Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response To Objections To Pltf's Evidence Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection To Portions Of The Supplemental Declaration Of James Watson Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply Brief In Support Of Their Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pos Of Reply Brief In Support Of Their Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings; Supplemental Declaration Of James Watson; Request For Judicial Notice; Objections To Pltfs Evidence Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Declaration Of James Watson In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Their Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objections To Pltfs' Evidence Submitted In Support Of Their Opposition To Defts Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Shannon Twede Schlagenhauf In Oppos. To Mtn To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Margaret Hines In Oppos. To Mtn To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Dawn-shemain Weeks In Oppos. To Mtn To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Christopher L Lebsock In Oppos. To Mtn To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition To Deft's Mtn To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued To Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Appearance Fees Paid Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Haag, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings, Points And Authorities Filed By Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Haag, John Hearing Set For Apr-22-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Hutner, Lara Villarreal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon As To Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Haag, John Does 1 To 10
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon Served Feb-08-2013, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued To Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Other Non Exempt Complaints, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Weeks, Dawn-shemain Hines, Margaret Schlagenhauf, Shannon As To Defendant Cmea Development Company, Llc Haag, John Does 1 To 10 No Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jul-10-2013 Proof Of Service Due On Apr-08-2013 Case Management Statement Due On Jun-25-2013

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 686 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?