Alba Ingram v. Country Market Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 13 529410
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ingram, Alba, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brady, Steven J

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J Brady +1 415 456 3100
v.
No Logo Canyon Market, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Country Market, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 To 25 Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Tarlov, Janet, Defendant
No Logo Tarlov, Richard, Defendant
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014
Master Jury Calendar Set For Jun-30-2014 Vacated. Dismissal Of The Entire Action Filed On 12/10/13. (206)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Dismissal Of Entire Action
    Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Notice of Settlement
      Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Ingram, Alba
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
        Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jun-30-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Sep-25-2013 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Case Management Statement
          Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Canyon Market Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Case Management Statement
            Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Ingram, Alba Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 14 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: 8/19/2013
              Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Canyon Market
                Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/8/2013 Complaint
                1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Ingram, Alba As To Defendant Does 1 To 25 Inclusive Canyon Market
                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/8/2013
                  Stipulation For Leave To File A First Amended Complaint Filed By Ingram, Alba
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013 Answer
                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Canyon Market
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                      Case Management Conference Of Aug-14-2013 Continued To Sep-25-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Country Market. Notice Sent By Court.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Case Management Statement
                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Ingram, Alba Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Case Management Statement
                          Case Management Statement Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013 Dismissal
                            Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Tarlov, Richard Tarlov, Janet
                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013
                              Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Ingram, Alba
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Proof of Service of Summons
                                Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Ingram, Alba Served Mar-15-2013, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Tarlov, Janet
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Proof of Service of Summons
                                  Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Ingram, Alba Served Mar-15-2013, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Country Market
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Proof of Service of Summons
                                    Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Ingram, Alba Served Mar-15-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Tarlov, Richard
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: 3/11/2013 Notice To Plaintiff
                                      Notice To Plaintiff
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: 3/11/2013 Complaint
                                        Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Ingram, Alba As To Defendant Country Market Tarlov, Richard Tarlov, Janet Does 1 To 25 Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Aug-14-2013 Proof Of Service Due On May-10-2013 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-30-2013

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 203 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?