Frances Armanasco v. Rodney James Rodriguez Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 13 531097
Superior Court Judge Marla J. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Armanasco, Frances An Individual, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by O'neil & Rueppel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Michael O'neil +1 415 992 3123
v.
Citigroup Management Corporation Citigroup Management Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Citicorp Investment Services"

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Does 1 To 20, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Rodriguez, Rodney James An Individual, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of Sep-10-2014 Is Off Calendar - Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
    Blank 21 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014
    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
      Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
      Case Management Conference Of May-07-2014 Continued To Sep-10-2014 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Status Of Arbitration Stay. Notice Sent By Court.
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: 4/18/2014 Dismissal Of Entire Action
        Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Substitution of Attorney
          Substitution Of Attorney: Pro Per Substituted For O'neil, James Michael As Attorney For Armanasco, Frances An Individual
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
            Case Management Conference Of Oct-02-2013 Continued To May-07-2014 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Status Of Arbitration Stay. Notice Sent By Court.
              Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Case Management Statement
              Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Armanasco, Frances An Individual
                Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Case Management Statement
                Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Rodriguez, Rodney James An Individual Citigroup Global Markets Inc. Citicorp Investment Services
                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013
                  Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Filed By Defendant Rodriguez, Rodney James An Individual Citigroup Global Markets Inc. Citicorp Investment Services
                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: 8/22/2013 Order
                    Order Re Stipulation To Stay Case Pending Arbitration And To Remove Hearing On Motion To Compel Arbitration From Calendar
                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: 8/21/2013 Court Filing
                      Law And Motion, 302, Defendants Rodney Rodriguez, Citigroup Global Markets Inc. And Citicorp Investment Services' Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings. No Appearance On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling: Off Calendar Per Stipulation Of Parties. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Anthony Vaughn, Csr # 6185
                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: 8/21/2013
                        Mini Minutes For Aug-21-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                          Blank 10 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: 8/13/2013
                          Fee For Stip And Order To Stay Case Filed By Defendant Rodriguez, Rodney James An Individual Citigroup Global Markets Inc. Citicorp Investment Services
                            Blank 9 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013
                            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Rodriguez, Rodney James An Individual Citigroup Global Markets Inc. Citicorp Investment Services
                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Declaration
                              Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Defendant Rodriguez, Rodney James An Individual Citigroup Global Markets Inc. Citicorp Investment Services
                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion Filed By Defendant Rodriguez, Rodney James An Individual Citigroup Global Markets Inc. Citicorp Investment Services
                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Proof of Service
                                  Proof Of Service Of Motion Filed By Defendant Rodriguez, Rodney James An Individual Citigroup Global Markets Inc. Citicorp Investment Services
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Motion (civil Generic)
                                    Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Rodriguez, Rodney James An Individual Citigroup Global Markets Inc. Citicorp Investment Services Hearing Set For Aug-21-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: 5/30/2013 Proof of Service of Summons
                                      Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Armanasco, Frances An Individual Served May-14-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Rodriguez, Rodney James An Individual
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: 5/20/2013 Proof of Service of Summons
                                        Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Armanasco, Frances An Individual Served May-14-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/2/2013 Notice To Plaintiff
                                          Notice To Plaintiff
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/2/2013 Complaint
                                            Other Non Exempt Complaints, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Armanasco, Frances An Individual As To Defendant Rodriguez, Rodney James An Individual Citigroup Global Markets Inc. Citicorp Investment Services Does 1 To 20, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Oct-02-2013 Proof Of Service Due On Jul-01-2013 Case Management Statement Due On Sep-17-2013

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 323 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?