Justin Lee Et Al v. Michael P Libera Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 13 532834
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Fong, Therese, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo Lee, Justin, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo Li, Lu Shan, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo To, Amy, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
v.
No Logo Boylan, William, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 To 25, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Libera, Michael, Defendant

Represented by Ota, Paul J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ota, Paul J. +1 925 977 1400
No Logo Libera, Michael P, Defendant
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of Dec-18-2013 Is Off Calendar - Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Dismissal Of Entire Action
    Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Amendment to Complaint
      Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Incorrectly As Bolin, William To Be Boylan, William
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
        Proof Of Hand Delivery Filed By Plaintiff Lee, Justin Fong, Therese Li, Lu Shan To, Amy
          Blank 6 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: 8/22/2013
          Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Libera, Michael
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: 8/22/2013 Judem
            Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Libera, Michael
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: 8/22/2013 Answer
              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Libera, Michael Boylan, William (erroneously Sued Herein As William Bolin)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Proof of Service of Summons
                Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Lee, Justin Fong, Therese Li, Lu Shan To, Amy Served Jul-21-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Libera, Michael P
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 Notice To Plaintiff
                  Notice To Plaintiff
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 Complaint
                    Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Lee, Justin Fong, Therese Li, Lu Shan To, Amy As To Defendant Libera, Michael P Boylan, William Does 1 To 25, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Dec-18-2013 Proof Of Service Due On Sep-13-2013 Case Management Statement Due On Dec-03-2013

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 76 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?