Karma Dewitt v. San Francisco Opera Association Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 13 534192
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Dewitt, Karma, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albert G. Stoll, Jr. |

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Haynes Iv, Walter +1 415 576 1590
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 100, Defendant
No Logo San Francisco Opera Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: 2/10/2015
Master Jury Calendar Set For Feb-23-2015 Vacated. Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed On 11/19/14. (206)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Dismissal Of Entire Action
    Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Notice of Settlement
      Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Dewitt, Karma
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 18 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014
        Master Jury Calendar Set For Oct-14-2014 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Feb-23-2015 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Pursuant To Ex Parte Order Filed On 8/22/14. (206)
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Order
          Order Continuing Trial Date And Continuing Discovery Cutoff Dates Pursuant To Stipulation
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 16 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014
            Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Filed By Defendant San Francisco Opera Association
              Blank 15 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014
              Ex Parte Application For Order To Present The Parties' Amended Stipulation And Proposed Order Continuing Trial Date And Continuing Discovery Cut Off Dates Filed By Defendant San Francisco Opera Association
                Blank 14 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014
                Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Filed By Defendant San Francisco Opera Association
                  Blank 13 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014
                  Ex Parte Application For Order For Hearing To Present The Parties' Stipulation And Proposed Order Continuing Trial Date And Continuing Discovery Cut Off Dates Filed By Defendant San Francisco Opera Association
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Stipulation
                    Stipulation To Mediate Filed By San Francisco Opera Association
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                      Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Oct-14-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Sent By Court.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 10 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Court Filing
                        Objection Hearing Feb-26-2014; Judge Cynthia M. Lee; Clerk Kcox; Proceedings Not Reported (610)
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 Order Rescheduling Hearing
                          The Feb-19-2014 Objection Hearing Is Continued To Feb-26-2014 At 10:30 Am In Department 610.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 8 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014
                            Added To Calendar For Objection Hearing Hearing Set For Feb-19-2014 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                              Objection To Order To Arbitrator Filed By Defendant San Francisco Opera Association
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 Order To Arbitration
                                Assigned To Arbitration For Apr-14-2014. Feb-19-2014 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Case Management Statement
                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant San Francisco Opera Association Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Answer
                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant San Francisco Opera Association
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013 Proof of Service of Summons
                                      Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Dewitt, Karma Served Oct-08-2013, Personal Service On Defendant San Francisco Opera Association
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 Notice To Plaintiff
                                        Notice To Plaintiff
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 Complaint
                                          Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Dewitt, Karma As To Defendant San Francisco Opera Association Does 1 To 100 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Feb-19-2014 Proof Of Service Due On Nov-12-2013 Case Management Statement Due On Jan-27-2014
                                            Request RequestSpace

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?