IN RE: Rail Freight Fuel Surcharge Antitrust Litigation
Federal Court Proceeding Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case No. 1:07-mc-489
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 10:19 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Direct Purchaser Lead Counsel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur Nash Bailey, Jr. +1 415 633 1908 +1 415 358 4980 abailey@hausfeldllp.com
Space Michael David Hausfeld +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 MHausfeld@hausfeld.com
Space Brent W. Landau +1 215 985 3273 +1 215 985 3271 blandau@hausfeld.com
Space James Joseph Pizzirusso +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 jpizzirusso@hausfeldllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Lawrence Brockett +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 danbrockett@quinnemanuel.com
Space Alicia Kimberly Cobb +1 212 849 7267 +1+1+ 1+1 1+1 +1+1 aliciacobb@quinnemanuel.com
Space Marc Laurence Greenwald +1 212 849 7140 +1 212 849 7100 marcgreenwald@quinnemanuel.com
Space Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
Space Steig David Olson +1 212 849 7152 +1 212 849 7100 steigolson@quinnemanuel.com
Space John Mark Potter +1 415 875 6600 +4 158 756 7600 johnpotter@quinnemanuel.com
Space Sami Husayn Rashid +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 samirashid@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Indirect Purchaser Lead Counsel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Imtiaz A. Siddiqui +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Schaefer, Claus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHRISTOPHER LOVELL +1 212 608 1900
No Logo Liaison Counsel for Plaintiff, Plaintiff
No Logo Liaison Counsel for Plaintiff(s), Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Liaison Counsel for Defendant, Defendant
No Logo Liaison Counsel for Defendant(s), Defendant
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF TRANSFEREE COURT -- (COUNSEL ASSIGNMENT(S)) Assigning Arthur N. Bailey, Jr2020 for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Lead Counsel; James J. Pizzirusso for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Lead Counsel; Michael D Hausfeld for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Lead Counsel; Brent W Landau for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Lead Counsel Signed by Sr. District Judge Paul L Friedman and filed in the transferee court on 3/13/2009. (SM) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER OF TRANSFEREE COURT -- (COUNSEL ASSIGNMENT(S)) Assigning Christopher Lovell for, for Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Lead Counsel; Imtiaz A. Siddiqui for, for Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Lead Counsel Signed by Sr. District Judge Paul L Friedman and filed in the transferee court on 3/11/2008. (SM) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER OF TRANSFEREE COURT -- (COUNSEL ASSIGNMENT(S)) Assigning Steig D. Olson for, for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Lead Counsel; Marc Laurence Greenwald for, for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Lead Counsel; Stephen Randall Neuwirth for, for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Lead Counsel; Alicia Cobb for, for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Lead Counsel; Daniel Lawrence Brockett for, for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Lead Counsel; John Mark Potter for, for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Lead Counsel; Sami Rashid for, for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Lead Counsel Signed by Sr. District Judge Paul L Friedman and filed in the transferee court on 3/11/2008. (SM) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
        CTO FINAL TODAY -- (CTO-1) (re: pldg. 82 ) Sterling Steel Co., LLC, MOW 4:08-122 - Notified involved clerks & judges (dls) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 82 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
          CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY -- (CTO-1) Sterling Steel Co., LLC, MOW 4:08-122 - Notified involved counsel & judges (dls) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
            LREF
            Blank 81 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            TRANSFER ORDER -- (re. pldg. 80 ) Transferring 7 actions to Judge Paul L. Friedman in D. District of Columbia - West Alabama Sand & Gravel, Inc., ALN 7:07-1191; Cedar Farms Co., Inc., FLM 3:07-557; Dad's Products Co., Inc., ILN 1:07-2954; Zinifex Taylor Chemicals, Inc., ILN 1:07-3274; Dust Pro, Inc., NJ 2:07-2251; Quality Refractories Installation, Inc., PAE 2:07-2657 & Nizhnekamskneftekhim USA, Inc., PAE 2:07-2809 - Notified involved counsel, judges, Panel judges, misc recipients & publishers and clerks (mst) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              CONSENT ORDER -- Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan in D. District of Columbia (dated 10/22/07) - Consenting to transfer of litigation to Judge Paul L. Friedman for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings (mst) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (re: pldgs 1 , 26 & 50 ) Signed by Adam C. Belsky, Esq. counsel for Stateline Bean Producers Cooperative (dated 10/5/07) - Stateline Bean Producers Cooperative, NJ 2:07-4221 - w/cert of svc (dls) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None
                  WAIVERS OF ORAL ARGUMENT -- (re: pldg. 69 ) (For hearing on September 27, 2007 in New York, New York) Kansas City Southern Railway Co.; Association of American Railroads; and Ferraro Foods of North Carolina, LLC (rh) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None
                    HEARING APPEARANCES -- (re: pldg. 69 ) (For hearing on September 27, 2007 in New York, New York) JOHN B. QUINN, ESQ. for Dust Pro, Inc.; ROBERT N. KAPLAN, ESQ. for Issac Industries, Inc.; RONALD J. ARANOFF, ESQ. for Somerset Industries, Inc.; VINCENT J. ESADES, ESQ. for Dakota Grantie Co.; BENJAMIN D. BROWN, ESQ. for Dad's Products Co., Inc.; EUGENE A. SPECTOR, ESQ. for Quality Refractories Installation, Inc.; CHRISTOPHER MCDONALD, ESQ. for Nizhnekamskneftekhim USA, Inc.; MARY J. FAIT, ESQ. for Zinifex Taylor Chemcials, Inc.; KENT A. GARDINER, ESQ. for CSX Transportation Inc.; RICHARD J. FAVRETTO, ESQ. for BNSF Railway Co.; ALAN M. WISEMAN, ESQ. for Union Pacific Railroad Co.; JOHN M. NANNES, ESQ. for Norfolk Southern Railway Co.; MARK R. ROSEN, ESQ. for Cedar Farms Co., Inc.; and JOE R. WHATLEY, JR., ESQ. for West Alabama Sand & Gravel, Inc. (rh) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by pltf. Zinifex Taylor Chemicals, Inc. - w/cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE (INTERESTED PARTY) -- (re: pldg. 50 ) Filed by pltf. in Agway Liquidating Trust, NJ 2:07-4261 - w/cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 50 ) Filed by Donnelly Commodities, Inc. (tb) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE (INTERESTED PARTY) -- (re: pldg. 50 ) Filed by pltf. Donnelly Commodities, Inc., DC 1:07-1515 - w/Notice of Related Action; Exhibit A; cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                              APPEARANCE -- (re: pldgs. 26 & 50 ) DAVID I. GELFAND, ESQ. for Association of American Railroads - w/cert of svc (dls) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                REQUEST -- (re: pldg. 69 ) Request of pltf. Dust pro, Inc., that the hearing scheduled for September 27, 2007 be rescheduled to September 26, 2007 -- DENIED - Notified involved counsel (acl) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
                                  LETTER (SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION) -- (re: pldg. 62 ) Filed by pltf. Dust Pro, Inc. -w/Exhibit A & svc (dls) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None
                                    HEARING ORDER -- (re: pldgs. 1 , 26 & 50 ) Setting motions to transfer for Panel hearing on September 27, 2007 in New York, New York - Notified involved counsel and judges (rh) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. 50 ) Filed by defts. BNSF Railway Co., CSX Transportation, Inc., The Kansas City Southern Railway Co., Norfolk Southern Railway Co., and Union Pacific Railroad Co. - w/cert of svc & disk (acl) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. 50 ) Filed by pltf. Cedar Farms Co., Inc. - w/cert of svc & disk (acl) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. 50 ) Filed by pltf. Somerset Industries, Inc. - w/cert of svc & disk (acl) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE -- (INTERESTED PARTY) (re: pldg. 50 ) Filed by pltf. in Carter Distributing Co., NJ 2:07-3006 - w/cert of svc & disk (acl) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE -- (re. pldg. 50 ) Filed by pltf. Issac Industries, Inc. - w/Exhibits A & B, cert. of serv. & disk (mst) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE, MEMORANDUM -- (re. pldg. 50 ) Filed by pltf. Blue Grass Tobacco, Inc. - w/cert. of serv. & disk (mst) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE, MEMORANDUM -- (re. pldg. 50 ) Filed by pltf Dust Pro. Inc. - w/Exhibits A-E, cert. of serv. & disk (mst) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldgs. 26 & 49 ) Filed by Carter Distributing Co. -w/cert of serv (tb) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 50 ) File by West Alabama Sand & Gravel, Inc. -w/cert of serv (tb) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 50 ) Filed by Quality Refractories Installation, Inc., d/b/a American Refractory Products -w/cert of serv (tb) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY -- (re: pldgs. 44 , 46 , 47 , 48 , 49 ) Filed by pltfs. Dakota Granite Co. & McIntyre Group, Ltd - w/Exhibits A & B, cert of svc & disk ,[](acl,[]) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                            APPEARANCE -- (re. pldg. 50 ) RONALD J. ARANOFF, ESQ., for Somerset Industries, Inc.; EUGENE A. SPECTOR, ESQ., for Quality Refractories Installations, Inc., d/b/a American Refractory Products - Notified involved counsel (mst) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 46 ) Filed by Somerset Industries, Inc. (tb) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldgs. 40 & 51 ) Filed by Blue Grass Tobacco, Inc. (tb) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  LETTER (SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION) -- (re: pldgs. 39 & 47 ) Signed by Stephen R. Neuwirth, Esq., counsel for pltf. Dust Pro, Inc. (dated 7/23/07) w/Schedule of Actions & svc (bb) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- (re: pldg. 50 ) Filed by pltf. Quality Refractories Installation, Inc - w/cert of svc & Letter of Explanation (bb) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. 50 ) Filed by pltf. Nizhnekhamskneftekhim USA, Inc. - w/cert of svc & dIsk (dls) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        RESPONSE (INTERESTED PARTY) -- (re: pldg. 26 ) Filed by pltf. in Blue Grass Tobacco, Inc., NJ 2:07-3019 - w/cert of svc & disk (dls) Amended cert of svc recv'd 7/19/07 (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          THIRD MOTION -- BRIEF, SCHEDULE OF ACTIONS - (4 actions) Filed by pltf. Quality Refractories Installation, Inc. - SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE DISTRICT: E.D. Pennsylvania; SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE JUDGE: ? - w/cert of svc & disk (dls) Schedule and Revised cert of svc recv'd 7/18/09 (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            RESPONSE (INTERESTED PARTY) -- (re: pldg. 26 ) Filed by pltf. in Carter Distributing Co., NJ 2:07-3006 - w/cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. 26 ) Filed by defts. Union Pacific Railroad Co.; Norfolk Southern Railway Co.; BNSF Railway Co.; CSX Transportation, Inc.; The Kansas City Southern Railway Co. (collectively Railroad Defendants) - w/Exhibits 1-12; cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. 26 ) Filed by pltf. Dust Pro, Inc. - w/Exhibits 1 & 2; cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE (INTERESTED PARTY)-- (re: pldg. 26 ) Filed by pltf. in Somerset Industries, Inc., NJ 2:07-3280 - w/Notice of Related Action; cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. 26 ) Filed by pltf. Cedar Farms Co., Inc. - w/cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. 26 ) Filed by pltf. Isaac Industries, Inc. - w/Exhibits A-H; cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 26 ) Filed by Cedar Farm Co., Inc. (tb) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 26 ) Filed by Sublette Cooperative, Inc. (tb) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            APPEARANCE -- (re: pldg. 26 ) MICHAEL J. BONI, ESQ. for Strates Shows, Inc.; ISAAC L. DIEL, ESQ. for Sublette Cooperative, Inc.; GERALD J. RODOS, ESQ. for Cedar Farms Co., Inc. - Notified involved counsel (dls) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Signed by Stephen R. Neuwirth, Esq., counsel for pltf. Dust Pro, Inc. (dated 7/2/07) - Carter Distributing Co., NJ 2:07-3006; Blue Grass Tobacco Co., NJ 2:07-3019; Lancaster Foundry Supply Co., Inc., NJ 2:07-3037 - w/Exhibits A-C & cert of svc (acl) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY -- (re: pldgs. 19 , 20 , 21 , 22 , 23 , 24 , 25 , 35 & 40 ) Filed by pltf. Dust Pro, Inc. - w/Exhibits A & B, cert of svc & disk (acl) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE -- (INTERESTED PARTY) (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by pltf. West Alabama Sand & Gravel, Inc., ALN 7:07-1191 - w/Exhibits A & B, cert of svc & disk (acl) corrected cert of svc recv'd 7/3/07 (acl) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (re: pldgs. 1 & 26 ) Signed by Richard J. Favretto, Esq., counsel for deft. BNSF Railway Co. & on behalf of defts. Union Pacific Railroad Co.; Norfolk Southern Railway Co.; CSX Transportation, Inc. & Kansas City Southern Railway Co. (dated 6/27/07) - Quality Refractories Installation, Inc., PAE 2:07-2657 - w/cert of svc (acl) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (re: pldg 26 ) Signed by Isaac L. Diel, Esq., counsel for pltf. Sublette Cooperative, Inc., DC 1:07-1126 (dated 6/28/07) - JPML previously notified on second motion (pldg. 26 ) - w/Exhibit A & cert of svc (acl) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE (INTERESTED PARTY)) (re. pldg. 1) Filed by pltf. in Cedar Farms Co., Inc., in FLM 3:07-557 - w/Attachments, Exhibits A & 1-11, cert of serv. & disk (mst) Note: Included Motion/Brief, Notice of Related Actions and Schedule of Actions but did not add any new actions - Rule 7.2(h) (mst) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 26 ) Filed by McIntyre Group, Ltd. (tb) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 26 ) Filed by Dakota Granite Co. (tb) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 20 ) Filed by Zinifex Taylor Chemicals, Inc. (tb) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 26 ) Filed by United Cooperative Farmers, Inc. (tb) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 26 ) Filed by Strates Shows, Inc. (tb) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 23 ) Filed by Ferraro Foods of North Carolina, LLC (tb) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 19 ) Filed by GVL Pipe & Demolition, Inc. (tb) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (1 action) Signed by Joshua D. Snyder, Esq., counsel for pltf. Strates Shows, Inc. in DC 1:07-1127(dated 6/27/07) - JPML was previously noticed in pldgs. 25 & 26) - w/cert of svc (dls) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SECOND MOTION -- BRIEF, SCHEDULE OF ACTIONS - (10 actions) Filed by pltfs. Dakota Granite Co. & McIntyre Group, Ltd. - SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE DISTRICT: D. District of Columbia; SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE JUDGE: ? - w/Exhibits A-G; cert of svc & disk (dls) Supplemental cert of svc recv'd 6/28/07 (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by defts. Union Pacific Railroad Co.; Norfolk Southern Railway Co.; BNSF Railway Co.; CSX Transportation, Inc.; Kansas City Southern Railway Co. (collectively, Railroad Defendants) - w/Notice of Related Actions - Cedar Farms Co., Inc., FLM 3:07-557; West Alabama Sand & Gravel, Inc., ALN 7:07-1191; Sublette Cooperative, Inc., DC 1:07-1126; Strates Shows, Inc., DC 1:07-1127; OA Statement; cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by pltf. Dad's Products Co., Inc. - w/Exhibits A-C; cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (INTERESTED PARTY) -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by pltf. in Ferraro Foods of North Carolina, LLC, DC 1:07-1121 -w/Notice of Related Action; Exhibit A; cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (INTERESTED PARTY) -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by pltf. in United Cooperative Farmers, Inc., NJ 2:07-2832 - w/Notice of Related Action, Exhibit A; cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by pltf. in Isaac Industries, Inc. - w/Exhibits A-C; cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (INTERESTED PARTY) -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by pltf. in Zinifex Taylor Chemicals, Inc., ILN 1:07-3274 - w/Exhibit A; cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (INTERESTED PARTY) -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by pltf. in GVL Pipe & Demolition, Inc., DC 1:07-1119 - w/Exhibit A; cert of svc & disk (dls) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (1 action) Signed by Donald Perelman, Esq. counsel for pltf. GVL Pipe & Demolition, Inc. (dated 6/22/07) - GVL Pipe & Demolition, Inc., DC 1:07-1119 - w/cert of svc (dls) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (1 action) Signed by Douglas A. Millen, Esq. counsel for pltf. McIntyre Group, Ltd. (dated 6/21/07) - McIntyre Group, Ltd., DC 1:07-1101 - w/cert of svc (dls) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (1 action) Signed by Vincent J. Esades, Esq. counsel for pltf. Dakota Granite Co. (dated 6/21/07) - JPML was previously noticed in pldg. 14 - w/cert of svc (dls) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (1 action) Signed by Stephen R. Neuwirth, Esq. counsel for pltf. Dust Pro, Inc. (dated 6/20/07) - United Co-Operative Farmers, Inc., NJ 2:07-2832 - w/cert of svc (dls) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (1 action) Signed by Stephen R. Neuwirth, Esq. counsel for pltf. Dust Pro, Inc. (dated 6/19/07) - Dakota Granite Co., DC 1:07-1078 - w/cert of svc (dls) (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 9 ) Filed by Bar-Ale, Inc. (tb) (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.-w/cert of serv (tb) (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Co. (tb) (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by Dust Pro, Inc. (tb) (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (1 action) Signed by Steven O. Sidener, Esq. counsel for pltf. Bar-Ale, Inc. (dated 6/15/07) - Bar-Ale, Inc., NJ 2:07-2769 - w/cert of svc (dls) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE -- (re: pldg. 1 ) REID L. ASHINOFF, ESQ. for Kansas City Southern Railway Co.; BENJAMIN D. BROWN, ESQ. for Dad's Products Co., Inc.; RICHARD J. FAVRETTO, ESQ. for BNSF Railway Co.; KENT A. GARDINER, ESQ. for CSX Transportation, Inc.; ROBERT N. KAPLAN, ESQ. for Isaac Industries, Inc.; JOHN M. NANNES, ESQ. for Norfolk Southern Railway Co.; STEPHEN R. NEUWIRTH, ESQ. for Dust Pro, Inc.; ALAN M. WISEMAN, ESQ. for Union Pacific Railroad Co. - Notified involved counsel (dls) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by BNSF Railway Co. (tb) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by Dad's Products Co., Inc. (tb) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Co. (tb) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co. (tb) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- (re: pldg. 1 ) Filed by Isaac Industries, Inc. (tb) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- (1 action) Signed by Stephen R. Neuwirth, Esq. counsel for pltf. Dust Pro, Inc. (dated 6/13/07) - Zinifex Taylor Chemicals, Inc., ILN 1:07-3274 - w/cert of svc (dls) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION -- BRIEF, SCHEDULE OF ACTIONS - (3 actions) Filed by pltf. Dust Pro, Inc. - SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE DISTRICT: D. New Jersey; SUGGESTED TRANSFEREE JUDGE: Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh -w/Exhibits A-C; cert of svc & disk (dls) Revised Schedule of Actions recv'd 6/5/07 (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              XYZ CASES ENTERED -- 1 related action(s) originating in the transferee district. JPML notified on 8/19/16 via e-mail. -- District of Columbia District Court (1:11-cv-01049) (dn)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 71 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?