TCYK, LLC v. Doe Defendants 1-25
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00306

Tags
Last Updated September 8, 2016 at 3:35 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Document Noted
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Affidavit of Service
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 Order to Show Cause
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: 7/3/2013 Motion for Discovery
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: 6/12/2013 Motion for Discovery
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 105 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?