USA v. Linton
Criminal Case Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:01-cr-00282-EWN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Denver
Filed 7/26/2001
County Denver
Terminated 3/22/2002
Reopened
Magistrate Case
101-mj-01085
Citation
Offense Level
18871 Threats against the President [ 101-m -1085 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18871.F THREATS AGAINST PRESIDENT AND SUCCESSORS TO PRESIDENT
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag TERMED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 108 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005 CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay Court Filing
CJA 20 as to Stephen Paul Linton: Authorization to Pay Richard J. Banta. Voucher # 050701/119 (SUPPRESSED); SEE CJA SUPERVISING ATTORNEY . Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 6/29/05. (mjg, )
    LREF
    Blank 107 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Judgment Returned Executed
    Judgment Returned Executed as to Stephen Paul Linton on 6/23/05; released timed served (nmb, )
      LREF
      Blank 106 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Judgment for RevocationCourt Filing
      JUDGMENT as to defendant Stephen Paul Linton . Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 6/17/05; eod 6/23/05. (ecm, )
        LREF
        Blank 105 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Supervised Release - Final Revocation HrgCourt Filing
        Minutes of Supervised Release Hearing before Judge Edward W. Nottingham: Stephen Paul Linton present w/counsel; deft admits violation; ORDER: sup. rel. is REVOKED; deft shall be impr. for 4 mos.; no sup. rel. to follow (Court Reporter Therese Lindblom.) (ecm, )
          LREF
          Blank 104 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
          ORDER OF DETENTION as to Stephen Paul Linton Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 4/18/05. (mjg, )
            LREF
            Blank 102 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 OrderCourt Filing
            MINUTE ORDER by Judge Edward W. Nottingham; Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release set for 5/27/2005 02:15 PM as to Stephen Paul Linton before Judge Edward W. Nottingham. (nmb, )
              LREF
              Blank 101 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing
              WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing on Supervised Release by Stephen Paul Linton (nmb, )
                LREF
                Blank 100 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                Minutes of Preliminary and Detention Hearing before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer as to Stephen Paul Linton: Waiver of preliminary hearing on supervised release accepted; ORDER deft shall be DETAINED; deft remanded. (Court Reporter FTR CBS AM.) (nmb, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 103 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                  CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Richard James Banta for as to Stephen Paul Linton . Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 4/12/05. (ecm, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 99 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Preliminary Revocation HearingCourt Filing
                    Minutes of Preliminary and Detention Hearing on Supervised Release Violation before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer: deft Stephen Paul Linton present w/o counsel; ORDER: CJA counsel to be apptd. excluding Joseph Saint-Veltri and Clifford Barnard; ORDER: Preliminary Revocation & Detention Hearing reset to 4/13/2005 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer; deft remanded. (Tape #FTR CBS PM.) (ecm, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 98 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Preliminary Revocation HearingCourt Filing
                      Minutes of Preliminary and Detention Hearing before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan: deft Stephen Linton present w/o counsel; ORDER: Preliminary and Detention Hearing reset to 4/8/2005 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan. (Tape #FTR PAC AM.) (ecm, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 96 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Warrant Returned Executed
                        Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/4/05 as to Stephen Paul Linton. (mjg, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 97 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Initial Appearance - Revocation ProceedingsCourt Filing
                          Minutes of Initial Appearance on Supervised Release Violation before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan: deft Stephen Paul Linton present w/o counsel; deft will retain counsel; ORDER: Preliminary and Detention Hearing is set for 3/10/05 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan; deft remanded (Tape #FTR PAC PM.) (ecm, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 95 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                            Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Stephen Paul Linton from Dist. of Massachusetts: docket sheet, Financial Affidavit, Commitment to Another District, Waiver of Rule 32.1 Hearing (ecm, )
                              LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 94 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Sealed Document +
                              Sealed Document re Stephen Paul Linton (ecm, ); UNSEALED 3/7/05 upon arrest of deft - W/A issued to Marshal
                                LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 93 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                PROBATION ORDER as to Stephen Paul Linton (SEALED) . Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 1/5/05. (ecm, ); UNSEALED 3/7/05 upon arrest of deft - Probation Order for a warrant to issue for supervised release violation
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?