Faustino Julie Vs Tishman Speyer Properties Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CSM 94 744082

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Faustino Julie, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Spassoff John, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
Cause of Action Money
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/30/1995
Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Sent To Julie Faustino Returned No Such Number
    Blank 7 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995
    Parties Waive Service On Plaintiff's Claim. The Court Has Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Faustino Julie Is Not Owed Any Money By Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties Spassoff John Stay Of Execution 30 Days
      Blank 6 Filed: 12/6/1994, Entered: 12/6/1994
      Substituted Proof Of Service Filed On Claim Of Plaintiff Served On Defendant Spassoff John
        Blank 5 Filed: 11/28/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994
        Trial Reset To Jan-09-1995 At 08:00 Am In Dept 02
          Blank 4 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/21/1994
          Small Claims Disposition Nov-21-1994, Off Calendar
            Blank 3 Filed: 10/26/1994, Entered: 10/26/1994
            Certified Mail To John Spassoff Returned Atten.not Known.
              Blank 2 Filed: 10/17/1994, Entered: 10/17/1994
              Service Of Complaint By Certified Mail
                Blank 1 Filed: 10/17/1994, Entered: 10/17/1994
                Money Claim Of Plaintiff For $5,000.00 Filed By Faustino Julie As To Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties Spassoff John Order Setting Trial Issued For Nov-21-1994 At 08:00 Am In Dept 00

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 9 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?