Faustino Julie Vs Tishman Speyer Properties Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CSM 94 744083

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Faustino Julie, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Spassoff John, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
Cause of Action Money
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995
Parties Waive Service On Plaintiff's Claim. The Court Has Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Faustino Julie Is Not Owed Any Money By Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties Spassoff John Stay Of Execution 30 Days
    Blank 5 Filed: 12/1/1994, Entered: 12/1/1994
    Proof Of Service Filed On Claim Of Plaintiff Served On Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties
      Blank 4 Filed: 11/28/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994
      Trial Reset To Jan-09-1995 At 08:00 Am In Dept 02
        Blank 3 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/21/1994
        Small Claims Disposition Nov-21-1994, Off Calendar
          Blank 2 Filed: 10/17/1994, Entered: 10/17/1994
          Service Of Complaint By Certified Mail
            Blank 1 Filed: 10/17/1994, Entered: 10/17/1994
            Money Claim Of Plaintiff For $2,250.00 Filed By Faustino Julie As To Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties Spassoff John Order Setting Trial Issued For Nov-21-1994 At 08:00 Am In Dept 00

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 16 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?