Merican Arts Society Etal v.miesym,joe
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CSM 95 023865
Superior Court Judge John Dearman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Arts Society C/o Gustave Lele, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Miesym, Joe, Defendant
Cause of Action Small Claims Appeal
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995
Remanded To Small Claims Court
    Blank 9 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/19/1995
    Judgment-filed/microfilmed Reel/batch F: 151-33
      Blank 8 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/19/1995 Court Filing
      Assigned To Sc20, Judge Dearman, For Trial, Calendar Motion: Small Claims Appeal Hearing Set For Jul-19-1995 At 09:31 Am In Dept 20
        Blank 7 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/19/1995 Court Filing
        Scd1-tr.cal.: Assigned To Sc20, Judge Dearman, For Trial
          Blank 6 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/19/1995 Court Filing
          Defendant Refuses To Stipulate To Judge Pro Tem
            Blank 5 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/19/1995
            Trial De Novo Held; Wits S/e, Doc Evid Mrkd; Crt Takes Mattund Submission; Exhibits Returned (20)
              Blank 4 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/19/1995 Court Filing
              X-33, Deft Objects To A Judge Pro Tem. Returned To D-1
                Blank 3 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: 6/6/1995
                Mailing (ca230) From 07/19/95 Scd1 09:00 Am For 07/19/95 Scd1 09:00 Am
                  Blank 2 Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/5/1995
                  Small Claims Appeals
                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/4/1995, Entered: 4/4/1995
                    Record On Appeal Filed In Superior Court

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 31 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?