Bergman William Et Al Vs O'neill John Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CSM 95 747355

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bergman Srdjana, Plaintiff
No Logo Bergman William, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo O'Neill, John, Defendant
No Logo O'neill Maureen, Defendant
Cause of Action Money
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 4/27/1995
Certified Mail To John Oneill Returned, Unclaimed.
    Blank 8 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995
    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Claim Of Plaintiff As To Defendant O'neill Maureen Claim Hearing Of Mar-29-1995 Off Calendar, Dismissal Filed
      Blank 7 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995
      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Claim Of Plaintiff As To Defendant O'neill John
        Blank 6 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: 3/9/1995
        Cert Mail To Maureen O'neill Returned Signed.
          Blank 5 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995
          Service Of Complaint By Certified Mail
            Blank 4 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995
            Service Of Complaint By Certified Mail
              Blank 3 Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 2/28/1995
              Service Of Complaint By Certified Mail
                Blank 2 Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 2/28/1995
                Service Of Complaint By Certified Mail
                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 2/28/1995
                  Money Claim Of Plaintiff For $870.00 Filed By Bergman William Bergman Srdjana As To Defendant O'neill John O'neill Maureen Order Setting Trial Issued For Mar-29-1995 At 08:30 Am In Dept C

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 10 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?