Colorado, State of v. Sunoco, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00001-EWN-OES
District Judge Edward W. Nottingham, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Colorado, State of, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan J. Gilbert +1 303 866 0208 +1 303 866 0200 alan.gilbert@hro.com

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Colorado

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Virginia Grace Brannon +1 303 866 5513
Space Stephen Marshall Brown +1 303 866 4434 +1 303 866 3558 steve.brown@state.co.us
Space Linda S. Comer +1 303 866 5513 +1 303 866 5671 linda.comer@state.co.us
Space Richard Earle Lotz +1 303 866 5110 +8663 866 866 3558 richard.lotz@state.co.us
Space Daniel S. Miller +1 303 866 5014 +1 303 866 3558 dan.miller@state.co.us
v.
No Logo Asarco, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Asarco Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott S. Barker +1 303 295 8513 +1 303 295 8261 sbarker@hollandhart.com
Space Sandra Ann Snodgrass +1 303 295 8326 +1 303 295 8261 ssnodgrass@hollandhart.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moye White, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Frederick Jones +1 303 292 7930 +1 303 292 4510 billy.jones@moyewhite.com

Toggle Switch Represented by RYLEY CARLOCK & APPLEWHITE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Leonard Watson +1 303 863 7500 +1 303 595 3159 jwatson@rcalaw.com
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cassandra Gay Sasso +1 303 861 0600

Toggle Switch Represented by Moye White, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Frederick Jones +1 303 292 7930 +1 303 292 4510 billy.jones@moyewhite.com

Toggle Switch Represented by RYLEY CARLOCK & APPLEWHITE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Leonard Watson +1 303 863 7500 +1 303 595 3159 jwatson@rcalaw.com
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Denver
Terminated 5/24/2005
Origin 3
Reopened 10/9/2003
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags NDISPO, REOPEN, TERMED
  Entries (241) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 227 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Docket Annotation
Docket Annotation. Pursuant to the request of Mr. Koenigs and Mr. Carroll this date, their noticing has been turned off in this case. Text only entry - no document attached. (gms, )
    LREF
    Blank 226 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Costs Taxed
    Bill of Costs Taxed in amount of $ 3,760.15 against Plaintiff (pap, )
      LREF
      Blank 225 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Stipulation
      STIPULATION to Costs (A.O. Smith's recoverable costs) by Plaintiff Colorado, State of, Defendant A.O. Smith Corporation. (pap, )
        LREF
        Blank 224 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Certificate of Compliance
        CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE with LR 54.1 re: Bill of Costs by Defendant A.O. Smith Corporation. (pap, )
          LREF
          Blank 223 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
          AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT Dft AO Smith Corporation's Motion for Sum Jgm on the Merits is Granted. The civil action and complaint are dismissed with prejudice. Dft AO Smith Corporation shall have its costs upon the proper filing of a Bill of Costs within 10 days. Judgment enters in favor of Defendant A.O. Smith Corporation against Plaintiff State of Colorado. Signed by Stephen P. Ehrlich, Chief Deputy Clerk and approved by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 5/24/05. (pap, ) (Modified on 5/24/2005 to include Clerk) (pap, ).
            LREF
            Blank 222 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Consent DecreeCourt Filing
            SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND CONSENT DECREE between the State of Colorado and ASARCO Inc. Granting [219] MOTION for Order filed by Colorado, State of. and Mooting [205] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Colorado, State of . Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 5/6/05. (pap, )
              LREF
              Blank 221 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Consent DecreeCourt Filing
              SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND CONSENT DECREE between The State of Colorado and Bechtel Corporation. Granting [218] MOTION for Order filed by Colorado, State of. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 5/6/05. (pap, )
                LREF
                Blank 220 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward W. Nottingham : Status Conference held on 5/6/2005, Court will execute the consent decrees. Final judgment will be prepared for Dft AO Smith. (Court Reporter Therese Lindblom.) (pap, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 219 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Motion for Order
                  MOTION for Entry of Consent Decree with ASACRCO, LLP by Plaintiff Colorado, State of. (pap, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 218 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Motion for Order
                    MOTION for Entry of Consent Decree with Bechtel Corporation by Plaintiff Colorado, State of. (pap, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 217 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                      ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF DECISION; denying [190] Dfts' Motion for Summary Judgment based on the Statute of Limitations. Granting [191] Dft A.O. Smith Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Merits. Final Jgm when entered will include Judgment in favor of Dft A.O. Smith Corporation. All Claims against Dft A.O. Smith Corporation are dismissed with prejudice and costs are granted as specified in the final jgm. Status Conference is set 5/6/05 at 11:00am. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 3/31/05. (pap, ) (Modified on 4/5/2005 to correct file date)(gms2, ).
                        LREF
                        Blank 216 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Settlement Agreement and Consent Decree Pending Solicitation of Public Comment by Colorado, State of (pap, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 215 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Settlement Agreement and Consent Decree pending Solicitation of Public Comment by Colorado, State of (pap, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 214 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Status Report
                            STATUS REPORT re Settlement with ASARCO Inc by Colorado, State of. (pap, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 213 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Status Report
                              STATUS REPORT re: Settlement with Bechtel Corporation by Colorado, State of. (pap, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 212 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                REPLY BRIEF in support of Motion re [205] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Colorado, State of. (pap, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 211 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [210] Pla's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [205]Pla's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Pla's Reply is due by 11/23/2004.Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/05/04. (pap, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 210 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004, Terminated: 11/5/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [205] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment up to and including 11/23/04 by Plaintiff Colorado, State of. (pap, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 209 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE by defendant Asarco Incorporated in opposition to pla's motion for partial summary judgment on ASARCO, Inc's liability as owner/operator [205-1] (pap)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 208 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting ASARCO Inc's motion for extension of time to file sum jgm opposition up to and including 10/25/04 [207-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/13/04 (pap)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 207 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004, Terminated: 10/13/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                          Unopposed MOTION by defendant Asarco Incorporated for extension of time to file sum jgm opposition up to and including 10/25/04 (pap)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 206 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Trial Exhibit
                                            EXHIBIT 15 by plaintiff Colorado, State of to motion for partial summary judgment on ASARCO, Inc's liability as owner/operator [205-1] (filed under seal and stored with sealed documents) (pap)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 205 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                              MOTION by plaintiff Colorado, State of for partial summary judgment on ASARCO, Inc's liability as owner/operator (pap)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 204 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                REPLY by defendant AO Smith Corporation in support of its motion for summary judgment on the merits [191-1] (pap)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 203 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting dft AO Smith Corp's motion for extension of time to file its Reply in support of its motion sum jgm up to and including 9/8/04 [202-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/26/04 (pap)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 202 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004, Terminated: 8/25/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                    Unopposed MOTION by defendant AO Smith Corporation for extension of time to file its Reply in support of its motion sum jgm up to and including 9/8/04 (pap)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 201 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Response to Motion
                                                      RESPONSE by plaintiff Colorado, State of to AO Smith's motion for summary judgment on the merits [191-1] (pap)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 199 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                        REPLY by defendants in support of dfts' joint motion for summary judgment on the statue of limitations [190-1] (pap)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 198 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                          MEMORANDUM by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; settlement conf held 7/29/04 (pap)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 197 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting dft AO Smith Corp's unopposed motion for leave to have insurance adjuster appear at settlement conf by telephone [196-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/28/04 (pap)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 200 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                              MEMORANDUM by Judge Edward W. Nottingham referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion for leave to have insurance adjuster appear at settlement conf by telephone [196-1] (erv)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 196 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004, Terminated: 7/27/2004 Motion for Leave
                                                                Unopposed MOTION by defendant AO Smith Corporation for leave to have insurance adjuster appear at settlement conf by telephone (pap)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 195 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                  RESPONSE by plaintiff Colorado, State of to dfts' motion for summary judgment on the statue of limitations [190-1] (pap)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 194 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting pla's unopposed motion for extension of time to file respond to AO Smith's Motion for Sum Jgm until 8/10/04 [193-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/20/04 (pap)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 193 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004, Terminated: 7/19/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Colorado, State of for extension of time to file respon to AO Smith's Motion for Sum Jgm until 8/10/04 (pap)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 192 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Appendix
                                                                        APPENDIX filed by defendant AO Smith Corporation to motion for summary judgment on the merits [191-1] (oversize document stored in exhibit area) (pap)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 191 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                          MOTION by defendant AO Smith Corporation for summary judgment on the merits (pap) (Modified on 4/5/2005 to correct date terminated)(gms2, ).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 190 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004, Terminated: 3/31/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                            Joint MOTION by AO Smith Corporation, Asarco Incorporated, Bechtel Corporation for summary judgment on the statue of limitations (pap) (Modified on 4/5/2005 to correct date terminated)(gms2, ).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 189 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Answer
                                                                              ANSWER by defendant AO Smith Corporation to first amended complaint [4-1] (pap)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 188 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter finding the motion for status and scheduling conf (hearing [156-1] moot (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/3/04 (pap)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 187 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Answer
                                                                                  ANSWER by defendant Bechtel Corporation to 1st amended complaint [4-1] (gms)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 186 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting Dianne Kueck's motion to withdraw attorney Dianne Kueck, Esq [184-1] ; withdrawing attorney Dianne Michelle Kueck for AO Smith Corporation granting Sunoco's request [183-1] for removal from the service list; (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/1/04 (pap)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 185 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                      NOTICE by counsel for defendant AO Smith Corporation re: motion to withdraw attorney Dianne Kueck, Esq [184-1] (pap)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 184 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004, Terminated: 5/27/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                        MOTION by Counse Dianne Kueck for defendant AO Smith Corporation to withdraw attorney Dianne Kueck, Esq (pap)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 183 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Request
                                                                                          REQUEST by defendant Sunoco, Inc. for removal from the service list (pap)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 182 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter. On Oral motion of counsel ; settlement conf reset for 1:30 7/29/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/20/04 (gms)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 181 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Answer
                                                                                              ANSWER by defendant Asarco Incorporated to 1st amended complaint [4-1] (gms)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 180 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter. Settlement conf set 6/28/04 at 1:30 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/14/04 (gms)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 179 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER #2 Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter (cc: all counsel) (gms)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 178 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                    COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; rule 16 conf held on 5/13/04 ; discovery ddl set 6/25/04 ; settlement conf reset for 1:30 6/28/04 ; entry date : 5/14/04 Court Reporter: FTR (gms)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 177 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting in part stipulated motion for modification (amend) general case management order [172-1] [175-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/13/04 (gms)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 176 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto Case referred to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter (amended) and Amended General Case Management Order by Judge Edward W. Nottingham. Dispositive motion ddl is 6/30/04 (cc: to counsel) (gms)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 175 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                          Stipulated MOTION by plaintiff for modification (amend) general case management order [172-1] (gms)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                            MAIL Returned order [167-1] addressed to Michael A. Williams, Esq (pap)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                              MAIL Returned order [167-1] addressed to Christopher J. Koenigs, Esq and Michael B. Carroll, Esq (pap)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 173 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting AO Smith Corp's counsels' motion to withdraw attorneys John L. Watson and William F. Jones [169-1]; withdrawing attorney William Frederick Jones for AO Smith Corporation, attorney John L. Watson for AO Smith Corporation (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/4/04 (pap)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 172 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004, Terminated: 5/12/2004 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto referred to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter and General Case Management Order by Judge Edward W. Nottingham; disp motions ddl 6/30/04; (cc: to counsel) (pap)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 174 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    COURTROOM MINUTES by Judge Edward W. Nottingham ; status conf held 4/30/04 ; case is on remand from the Tenth Circuit ; entry date : 5/5/04 Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom (pap)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 171 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; further scheduling conference set for 9:45 5/13/04 ; settlement conf set for 3:00 6/10/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/4/04 (pap)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 170 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by counsel for defendant AO Smith Corporation re: motion to withdraw attorneys John L. Watson and William F. Jones [169-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 169 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                          Notice of (MOTION) by counsel defendant AO Smith Corporation to withdraw attorneys John L. Watson and William F. Jones (pap)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 168 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                            Notice of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant AO Smith Corporation by Leonard H. MacPhee (pap)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 167 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting Washington Parties' unopposed motion for entry of an order evidencing their prior dismissal with prejudice [166-1]; (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/27/04 (pap)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 166 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004, Terminated: 4/26/2004 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION by dfts Washington Contr Gp, WA Group Intl Inc, Dennis Washington for entry of an order evidencing their prior dismissal with prejudice (pap)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 165 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff Colorado, State of by Richard Earle Lotz (pap)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 164 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Asarco Incorporated by Scott S. Barker, Sandra Ann Snodgrass (pap)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                      MAIL Returned addressed to Michael A. Williams, Esq minute order [162-2] (pap)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 163 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Letter
                                                                                                                                        LETTER to court from counsel for defendant Dennis Washington wishing to withdraw attorneys Christopher J. Koenigs, Michael B. Carroll, and Michael A. Williams (pap)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 162 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham regarding [155-1] order appeal ; status conf set for 10:30 4/30/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/22/04 (pap)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 161 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting Jerry N. Jones' motion to withdraw attorney Jerry N. Jones, Esq [159-1] withdrawing attorney Jerry N. Jones for AO Smith Corporation; granting Steven W. Black's motion to withdraw attorney Steven W. Black [160-1]; withdrawing attorney Steven W. Black for Asarco Incorporated (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/15/04 (pap)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 160 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by counsel for defendant Asarco Incorporated to withdraw attorney Steven W. Black (pap)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 159 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004, Terminated: 3/12/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION by Counsel for defendant AO Smith Corporation to withdraw attorney Jerry N. Jones, Esq (pap)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 158 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants by John L. Watson (pap) Modified on 02/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 157 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant by William Frederick Jones (pap)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 156 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Motion for Hearing/Conference
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by plaintiff Colorado, State of for status and scheduling conf (hearing (pap)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 155 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                        MANDATE from the Court of Appeals; CA # 02-1014; Dt issued 10/8/03; ORDER filed 9/30/03 reversing and remanding for further proceedings consistent with the opinion the decision of the District Court [Appeal [128-1] (msn)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 154 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Notice of Attorney Substitution
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of entry of appearance and withdrawal of counsel for pla State of Colorado; ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Robert D. Clark for Colorado, State of, attorney Robert Reiny Marsh for Colorado, State of, attorney Jane T. Feldman for Colorado, State of and substituting attorney Daniel S. Miller (pap)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 153 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ENTRY OF CO-COUNSEL AND CHANGE OF ADDRESS for AO Smith Corporation by Richard S. Vermeire (msn)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 152 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 Letter re Appeal
                                                                                                                                                              LETTER (Re: [128-1] ) to USCA supplementing the preliminary record with a current copy of the docket sheet, Settlement Agreement and Consent Decree between the State of Colorado and Sunoco, Inc. and Minute Order of 9/10/02. (msn)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 151 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham regarding [150-1] settlement notice, denying as moot motion for review of taxation of costs [142-1], denying as moot motion (for order) to defer ruling on taxation of costs [146-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/10/02 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 150 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002, Terminated: 9/10/2002 Notice of SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT agreement and consent decree between the state of CO and Sunoco Inc by plaintiff Colorado, State of, defendant Sunoco, Inc. ordered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 149 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by plaintiff for (order) entry of consent decree with Sunoco (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 148 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Notice of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF lodging of proposed SETTLEMENT agreement and consent decree pending solicitation of public comment by plaintiff (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                        Tendered Settlement Agreement and consent decree between the state of Colorado and Sunoco Inc submitted by plaintiff Colorado, State of, defendant Sunoco, Inc. re: settlement notice [148-1] (Copy only, original sent to chambers) (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Copy of ORDER from Court of Appeals [128-1] the appeal is abated as to appellee, Sunoco, Inc., only and the case is partially remanded to the USDC for the limited purpose of considering the parties' proposed settlement agreement, allowing public comment and acting upon the request for consent decree; appellant State of Colorado shall submit a status rpt on the USDC proceedings 40 days from the date of this order and every 20 days thereafter until the USDC has issued its Order w/respect to the proposed consent decree; while this appeal con't unabated as the the remaining dfts, in the event the proposed settlement is rejected, the parties will complete briefing and the case will be submitted to the same randomly-selected panel set to hear the appeal of the remaining dfts (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Sunoco, Inc. (for order) to defer ruling on taxation of costs (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by defendant Sunoco, Inc. (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by plaintiff to Dft Sunoco Inc's motion for review of taxation of costs [142-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of intent to respond on or before 3/7/02 by plaintiff re: dft Sunoco Inc's motion for review of taxation of costs [142-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum by defendant Sunoco, Inc. in support of motion for review of taxation of costs [142-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Motion for Review
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant Sunoco, Inc. for review of taxation of costs (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT by defendant Sunoco, Inc. to bill of costs order [140-1] (original signature page to Supplemental Declaration of Justin A. Savage) (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 Costs Taxed
                                                                                                                                                                                          Bill of COSTS taxed judgment [133-2] for defendant Sunoco, Inc. in the amount of $ 3,902.83 against plaintiff Colorado, State of (cc: all counsel) (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by defendant Sunoco, Inc. to Colorado's objections to dft Sunoco Inc's Bill of Costs [137-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by defendant Sunoco, Inc. re: Certification pursuant to LR 54.1 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS by plaintiff to dft Sunoco's Bill of Costs (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address of Michael A. Williams, Christopher J. Koenigs and Michael B. Carroll attorneys for defendant Dennis Washington (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 134 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Costs Taxed
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Bill of COSTS taxed judgment [133-2] for defendant Asarco Incorporated in the amount of $ 2,649.86 against plaintiff Colorado, State of (cc: all counsel) (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation (STATEMENT) by plaintiff re: order [127-2], re: bill of costs order [134-1] re: Recovery of costs (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Final JUDGMENT: by Clerk James R. Manspeaker; approved by Judge Nottingham pursuant to [112-2] order, granting motion for summary judgment based on the statute of limitations [41-1], denying motion for summary judgment on the merits [43-1], granting motion to dismiss the amended complaint for lack of jurisdiction [9-1], granting motion to dismiss the first amended complaint [35-1], granting motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and supporting brief [38-1], denying motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order [112-2] [114-1], denying motion for partial summary judgment on AO Smith's liablity for the State's response costs incurred to cleanup the Summitville Site [111-1] dismissing case with prejudice ; judgment entered in favor of dfts Sunoco Inc, AO Smith Corporation, Asarco Inc, Bechtel Corporation, Washington Contractors Group Inc; Washington Group International Inc and Dennis Washington and against pla State of Colorado; dfts list above shall have their costs upon the proper filing of Bill of Costs within 10 days of this final judgment; (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/22/02 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002 Letter re Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER to USCA and cnsl advising that the Record on Appeal is complete (Re: [128-1] ) (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002 Transcript Order Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by plaintiff ; transcript already on file in USDC RE: appeal [128-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference on 9/28/01 before Judge Nottingham ( pages: 15) Prepared By: T. Lindblom (certified copy) (The transcript was filed in 96-N-1213 on October 17, 2001. The Status Conference covered issues in that case as well as this one. The transcript was docketed in this case the day it was received for this case.) (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of assignment of Case No. [128-1] 02-1014 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002, Terminated: 10/9/2003 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Colorado, State of 12/7/01 order [127-2] ; Notice of transcript order form due 1/17/02 ; Notice mailed to all counsel on 1/7/02 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    $100.00 fee and $5.00 fee paid. Receipt No 231605. RE: appeal [128-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Edward W. Nottingham denying motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order [112-2] [114-1], denying motion to strike declarations submitted by the State of CO in support of its motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order contained in (brief [115-1]) [118-1], denying motion for partial summary judgment on AO Smith's liablity for the State's response costs incurred to cleanup the Summitville Site [111-1], denying motion for stay of proceedings pending settlement negotiations [90-1], denying motion (for order) for declaration of inapplicability of bankruptcy automatic stay [71-1], denying stay motion CASE STAYED as to Washington Grp & Washington Cont Grp [69-1] [69-1] dismissing case with prejudice dfts shall have costs upon submission of a bill of costs (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/10/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by plaintiff to ASARCO and Bechtel's response to State's motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order [112-2] [114-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by plaintiff to Sunoco's response to State's motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order [112-2] [114-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter pretrial conf vacated for 11/8/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/1/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by plaintiff Colorado, State of to AO Smith's motion to strike declarations submitted by the State of CO in support of its motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order contained in (brief [115-1]) [118-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 122 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by plaintiff Colorado, State of to response to motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order [112-2] [114-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by defendant Sunoco, Inc. to State of Colorado's motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order [112-2] [114-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint RESPONSE in opposition by dfts Asarco Incorporated, Bechtel Corporation to State of Colorado's motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order [112-2] [114-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by defendant AO Smith Corporation in opposition to motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order [112-2] [114-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant AO Smith Corporation to strike declarations submitted by the State of CO in support of its motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order contained in (brief [115-1]) (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham; dfts' response are due on or before 10/22/01, any reply is due with 11 days of service of response regarding [114-1] motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order [112-2] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/3/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 113 Filed: 9/30/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001 Consent DecreeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Settlement Agreement and CONSENT DECREE by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting motion for (order) entry of consent decree with ARCO [77-1], finding the motion to extend time pending approval of settlement agreement [52-1] moot dismissing party Atlantic Rich Corp , each party hereto may validly execute this document in counterparts or by facsimile signature. (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/1/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COURTROOM MINUTES by Judge Edward W. Nottingham ; status conf held 9/28/01 ; consent decree [113-2] order executed, dfts will respond within 20 days, State may reply within 15 days after service of response regarding [114-1] motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order [112-2] ; entry date : 10/2/01 Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of Law (BRIEF) by plaintiff in support of motion to alter, amend, or reconsider order [112-2] [114-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff to alter, amend, or reconsider order [112-2] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 9/14/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER: by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting motion for summary judgment based on the statute of limitations [41-1], denying as moot the motion for summary judgment on the merits [43-1], granting motion for leave to file reply briefs in excess of 12 pages (to exceed page limitation) [74-1], granting motion to dismiss the amended complaint for lack of jurisdiction [9-1] deemed a motion for sum jgm, denying as moot motion to strike Bechtel Corp's motion to dismiss the amended complaint for lack of jurisdiction [9-1] [29-1], granting motion to dismiss the first amended complaint [35-1] deemed a mtn for sum jgm, granting motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and supporting brief [38-1] deemed a mtn for sum jgm, denying as moot motion to strike materials attached to Asarco's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and supporting brief [38-1] [55-1] ; status conf reset for 4:30 9/28/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date 9/17/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001, Terminated: 12/7/2001 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Cross-MOTION by plaintiff Colorado, State of for partial summary judgment on AO Smith's liablity for the State's response costs incurred to cleanup the Summitville Site (large documents stored with exhibits) (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 111 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT by plaintiff Colorado, State of to their response [63-1], to AO Smith's motion for summary judgment on the merits [43-1] (Oversize document stored with Exhibits) (pap) Modified on 08/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 110 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion to (amend) modification of schedule order [18-1] regarding designation of experts and request for forthwith determination [97-1], If claims remain against AO Smith after Judge Nottingham rules on its mtn for sum jgm, AO Smith will have 30 days to designate experts (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/22/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 109 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Edward W. Nottingham referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion response [108-1] (pap) Modified on 04/05/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 108 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in opposition by plaintiff to motion to (amend) modification of schedule order [18-1] regarding designation of experts and request for forthwith determination [97-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 107 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by defendant AO Smith Corporation to Colorado's notice [102-1]of intent to file a supplemental response to AO Smith's mtn for sum jgm on the merits (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 106 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter parties shall have to and including 8/17/01 to respond regarding [97-1] dft AO Smith Corporation's motion to (amend) modification of schedule order [18-1] regarding designation of experts and request for forthwith determination (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/10/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 105 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter : re: granting Joint renewed motion for entry of stipulation and protective order regarding confidentiality including the agreed upon language re: AO Smith's situation as paragraph 16 [100-1] (cc: all counsel) (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter denying dft Bechtel's motion for protective order against the State of Colorado [92-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/10/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter Motions Hearing Held denying Dft's motion for protective order against the State of Colorado [92-1]. Ordered Dft Bechtel shall expeditiously respond to Pla's requests for depositions, Counsel are to meet and confer regarding which witnesses need to be deposed ; entry date : 8/10/01 Court Reporter: OES Civil Tape 2001-40 Ct (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Intent by plaintiff to file supplemental response to AO Smith's motion for Sum Jgm on the merits (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Edward W. Nottingham referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion for entry of stipulation and protective order regarding confidentiality including the agreed upon language re: AO Smith's situation as paragraph 16 [100-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 100 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001, Terminated: 8/9/2001 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Renewed Joint MOTION by pla Colorado, State of and dft Bechtel Corporation for entry of stipulation and protective order regarding confidentiality including the agreed upon language re: AO Smith's situation as paragraph 16 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Judge Edward W. Nottingham referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to (amend) modification of schedule order [18-1] regarding designation of experts and request for forthwith determination [97-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response BRIEF by plaintiff in opposition to Bechtel Corporations motion for protective order against the State of Colorado [92-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001, Terminated: 8/21/2001 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant AO Smith Corporation to (amend) modification of schedule order [18-1] regarding designation of experts and request for forthwith determination (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 96 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter setting hearing on Dft Bechtel's motion for protective order against the State of Colorado [92-1] 1:30 8/9/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/2/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion for entry of stipulation and protective order [83-1], parties to resubmit a proposed stipulated protective order for the court's signature. Hearing to be held on Bechtel Corp's Mtn for Protective Order 8/9/01 1:30 ; entry date : 8/2/01 Court Reporter: OES Tapes 01-37Ct (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter pla has up to and including 8/3/01 to rile a response regarding [92-1] motion for protective order against the State of Colorado (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/26/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Edward W. Nottingham referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the dft's motion for protective order against the State of Colorado [92-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001, Terminated: 8/9/2001 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant Bechtel Corporation for protective order against the State of Colorado and Certificate of Compliance with LR 7.1A (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [88-1] minute order, resetting hearing on motion for entry of stipulation and protective order [83-1] 1:00 8/1/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/19/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION by pla Colorado, State of,and dfts Washington Contr Gp, WA Group Intl Inc, Dennis Washington for stay of proceedings pending settlement negotiations (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham ; motions/ in court hrg vacated 7/17/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/18/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter setting hearing on joint motion for entry of stipulation and protective order [83-1] 10:00 7/31/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/9/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion for further enlargement of time to respond to written discovery to and including 7/20/01 [84-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/6/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition RESPONSE by defendant AO Smith Corporation to joint motion for entry of stipulation and protective order regarding confidentiality [83-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Edward W. Nottingham referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the pla's motion for further enlargement of time to respond to written discovery [84-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001, Terminated: 7/5/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Stipulated MOTION by plaintiff Colorado, State of, defendant Washington Contr Gp for further enlargement of time to respond to written discovery (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION by Pla Colorado, State of and Dfts Asarco Incorporated, Bechtel Corporation for entry of stipulation and protective order regarding confidentiality of responses state has requested for production (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting joint motion to enlarge the time allowed for written discovery responses, filed by plaintiff and by defendant Dennis Washington until 6/29/01 [80-1]. Pla has until 6/29/01 to respond to any written discovery. Dft Dennis Washington shall have until 6/29/01 to respond to pending disccovery from pla. (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/18/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Edward W. Nottingham referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the pla's motion to enlarge the time allowed for written discovery responses, filed by plaintiff and by defendant Dennis Washington until 6/29/01 [80-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001, Terminated: 6/18/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint and Stipulated MOTION by plaintiff Colorado, State of, defendant Dennis Washington to enlarge the time allowed for written discovery responses, filed by plaintiff and by defendant Dennis Washington until 6/29/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham regarding [78-2] minute order the motions hearing vacated on 6/4/01 ; motions hearing/in court hrg reset for 10:30 7/20/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/8/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham ; in court hrg vacated 6/4/01 parties will be notified of any future setting (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/5/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiff for (order) entry of consent decree with ARCO (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/4/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of clarification by plaintiff re: motion response [54-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting dfts' motion to extend time to respond to discovery proponded by plaintiff [56-1] until 6/5/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/30/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION by defendant AO Smith Corporation for leave to file reply briefs in excess of 12 pages (to exceed page limitation) (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Tendered Dft AO Smith Corp's reply brief in support of its mtn for sum jgm based on the statute of limitations submitted by defendant AO Smith Corporation re: motion for leave to file reply briefs in excess of 12 pages (to exceed page limitation) [74-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Tendered Reply to Colorado's response in opposition to A O Smith Corp's mtn for sum jgm on the merits submitted by defendant AO Smith Corporation re: motion for leave to file reply briefs in excess of 12 pages (to exceed page limitation) [74-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff by Robert D. Clark (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by plaintiff in support of motion (for order) for declaration of inapplicability of bankruptcy automatic stay [71-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiff (for order) for declaration of inapplicability of bankruptcy automatic stay (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by defendant Sunoco, Inc. to pla's response to dft's motion to dismiss the first amended complaint [35-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Suggestion of Bankruptcy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Suggestion (NOTICE) by dfts Washington Contr Gp, WA Group Intl Inc of filing bankruptcy CASE STAYED as to Washington Grp & Washington Cont Grp [69-1] (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER by defendant Dennis Washington in A.O. Smith's motion for summary judgment based on the statute of limitations [41-1] (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by plaintiff to Washington Group & Washington Contractors Group's motion to extend time to respond to discovery proponded by plaintiff [56-1] (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by defendant Asarco Incorporated to response to motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and supporting brief [38-1] (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by defendant Asarco Incorporated to Colorado's motion to strike materials attached to Asarco's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and supporting brief [38-1] [55-1] (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINDER by defendant Washington Contr Gp, defendant WA Group Intl Inc in Defendant A.O. Smith Corportaion's motion for summary judgment on the merits [43-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition by plaintiff Colorado, State of to A.O. Smith Corporation's motion for summary judgment based on the statute of limitations [41-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by plaintiff Colorado, State of to A.O. Smith Corporation's motion for summary judgment on the merits [43-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/10/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff Colorado, State of by Linda S. Comer (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/10/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff Colorado, State of by Virginia Grace Brannon (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting The State of Colorado's motion for leave to file brief in excess of 20 pages in opposition to A.O. Smith's Motion for Sum Jgm based on Statue of Limitations, The State's brief shall not exceed 30 pages [57-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/9/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Judge Edward W. Nottingham referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to extend time to respond to discovery proponded by plaintiff [56-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter Plaintiff shall have until 5/22/01 to file a response to [56-1] dft Washington Group International and Washington Contractors Group, Inc.'s motion to extend time to respond to discovery proponded by plaintiff (cc: all counsel); entry date : 5/8/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001, Terminated: 5/8/2001 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Colorado, State of for leave to file brief in excess of 20 pages in opposition to A.O. Smith's Motion for Sum Jgm based on Statue of Limitations (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 5/4/2001, Entered: 5/4/2001, Terminated: 5/25/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Washington Contr Gp, defendant WA Group Intl Inc to extend time to respond to discovery proponded by plaintiff (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by plaintiff to strike materials attached to Asarco's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and supporting brief [38-1] (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: 5/4/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by plaintiff Colorado, State of to ASARCO Inc.'s motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction [38-1] (former empl) Modified on 05/16/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by plaintiff Colorado, State of to Sunoco, Inc.'s motion to dismiss the first amended complaint [35-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Sunoco, Inc. by Harold Lawrence Segall, Justin Aaron Savage (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION by plaintiff Colorado, State of, defendant Atlantic Rich Corp to extend time pending approval of settlement agreement (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham ; in court hrg on pending motions set for 10:30 6/8/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/26/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Settlement Agreement and Consent Decree Pending Solicitation of Public Comment by plaintiff Colorado, State of. (Tendered attached document Settlement Agreement and Consent Decree between the State of Colorado and Atlantic Richfield Company) (former empl) Modified on 06/19/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting A.O. Smith Corporation's motion to extend time to answer the State of Colorado's First Amended Complaint [47-1] Answer shall be filed within 10 days after an adverse ruling on it's motions for sum jgm (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/25/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Tendered Settlement Agreement and Consent Decree between the State of Colorado and Atlantic Richfield Company submitted by plaintiff Colorado, State of, defendant Atlantic Rich Corp re: notice [50-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham regarding [38-1] ASARCO's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and supporting brief, Plaintiff's response due by 4/17/01, Dft may reply within 11 days of service of response (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/19/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001, Terminated: 4/23/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant AO Smith Corporation to extend time to answer the State of Colorado's First Amended Complaint (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by defendant Washington Contr Gp to first amended complaint [4-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by defendant WA Group Intl Inc to first amended complaint [4-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum BRIEF by defendant AO Smith Corporation in support of motion for summary judgment on the merits [43-1] (placed in Exhibit Room) (lam) Modified on 04/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant AO Smith Corporation for summary judgment on the merits (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum BRIEF by defendant AO Smith Corporation in support of motion for summary judgment based on the statute of limitations [41-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001, Terminated: 9/14/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant AO Smith Corporation for summary judgment based on the statute of limitations (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by defendant Dennis Washington to first amended complaint [4-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham regarding [35-1] dft's motion to dismiss the first amended complaint Plaintiff to respond by 5/2/01, dft may file a reply within 11 days of service of the response (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/18/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant Asarco Incorporated to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and supporting brief (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Atlantic Rich Corp on 4/12/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum (BRIEF) by defendant Sunoco, Inc. in support of it's motion to dismiss the first amended complaint [35-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Sunoco, Inc. to dismiss the first amended complaint (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY Brief in support by defendant Bechtel Corporation to pla's response to dft Bechtel Corporation's motion to dismiss the amended complaint for lack of jurisdiction [9-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham denying pla's motion to extend time to respond to Bechtel's Motion to Dismiss filed 3/2/01 [13-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/10/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference on 3/20/01 before Magistrate Judge O. Edward Sch ( pages: 1-34) Prepared By: Debra Phelps (certified copy) (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER by defendant Asarco Incorporated in Dft Bechtel Corporation's motion to dismiss the amended complaint for lack of jurisdiction [9-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant AO Smith Corporation by Richard S. Vermeire, Jerry N. Jones, John L. Watson, Dianne Michelle Kueck (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by plaintiff to Bechtel's motion to dismiss the amended complaint for lack of jurisdiction [9-1] (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff Colorado, State of to strike Bechtel Corp's motion to dismiss the amended complaint for lack of jurisdiction [9-1] (former empl) Modified on 05/15/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Dennis Washington by Michael A. Williams, Christopher J. Koenigs, Michael Brian Carroll (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Dennis Washington on 3/2/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant WA Group Intl Inc on 3/9/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Washington Contr Gp on 3/9/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Bechtel Corporation on 2/28/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Asarco Incorporated on 2/20/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant AO Smith Corporation on 2/20/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Sunoco, Inc. on 2/22/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by plaintiff Colorado, State of, of Receipt of Dft's Waivers of Service of Summons (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter, the Court will conduct a preliminary pretrial conf on 11/8/01 at 9:00 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/23/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001, Terminated: 8/21/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; Discovery cutoff 11/26/01 ;dispositive motions due 12/2/01, preliminary pretrial conf 11/8/01 at 9:00 (cc: all counsel) (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; rule 16 conf held on 3/20/01 ; discovery ddl set 11/15/01 ; disp mtn ddl set 12/3/01; preliminary pretrial/status conf set for 9:00 11/8/01 ; entry date : 3/23/01 Court Reporter: Tape OES 01-8 CT (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT by defendant Bechtel Corporation to motion response [15-1] Re: correct certificate of service (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by defendant Bechtel Corporation to State of Colorado's motion to extend time to respond to Bechtel's Motion to Dismiss filed 3/2/01 [13-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by plaintiff Colorado, State of to withdraw attorney Laura M. Maresca (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001, Terminated: 4/9/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff Colorado, State of to extend time to respond to Bechtel's Motion to Dismiss filed 3/2/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham regarding [9-1] dft's motion to dismiss the amended complaint for lack of jurisdiction, pla to respond by 3/27/01, dft may file reply within 11 days from the date on which the response is served (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/14/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Washington Contr Gp on 2/16/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant WA Group Intl Inc on 2/16/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by defendant Bechtel Corporation to dismiss the amended complaint for lack of jurisdiction and brief in support (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; rule 16 conference reset for 10:00 3/20/01 upon oral request of the parties (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/26/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff Colorado, State of by Jane T. Feldman, Stephen Marshall Brown, Laura Marie Maresca and Robert R. Marsh, and specifying Ms. Feldman as lead counsel (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; Rule 16 conference set for 9:00 3/22/01 (cc: all counsel) (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto Case referred to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter & General Case Management Order by Judge Edward W. Nottingham. Dispositive motions deadline is 12/2/01 (cc: to counsel) (gms) Modified on 10/17/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          1st AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff; adding defendant Washington Contr Gp, WA Group Intl Inc, Dennis - Washington (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by plaintiff of filing first amd cmp (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 StatementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT by plaintiff of compliance w/ Judge Nottingham's case assignment memorandum (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING FEE PAID: on 1/2/01 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 222384. (former empl) Modified on 01/05/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?