Stafford v. Arends, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00002-EWN
District Judge Edward W. Nottingham, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Van Stafford, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Clinton Hoeffner, Defendant
No Logo Lary Porter, Defendant
No Logo Norman Lee Arends, Defendant
No Logo Tom Billings, Defendant
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Baca
Terminated 1/17/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 01-1044[], 99N 980 et al[USDC CO]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Appeal Record Returned
RECORD on appeal consisting of Volumes I; appeal [8-1] returned from the Court of Appeals. (former empl)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 USCA Mandate
    MANDATE from the Court of Appeals; CA # 01-1044; Dt issued 10/18/01 of 9/24/01 Order & Jg; affirming the decision of the District Court on appeal [8-1] (former empl)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 2/24/2001, Entered: 2/24/2001 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
      RECORD on Appeal consisting of Volumes I transmitted to the Court of Appeals(appeal [8-1] ) (gms)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
        MOTION by plaintiff for leave to appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 (gms)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Letter re Appeal
          LETTER (Re: [8-1] ) from USCA to appellant advising fee has been paid and record will be transmitted by the USDC (gms)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER to Cure Deficiency by Judge Edward W. Nottingham Pla has 30 days to either pay filing fee or file 1915 motion. regarding [8-1] appeal (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/6/01 (gms)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 USCA Appeal Fees
              $100.00 fee and $5.00 fee paid. Receipt No 223287. Court of Appeals Notified. appeal [8-1] (gms)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001 USCA Case Number
                NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of assignment of Case No. [8-1] 01-1044 Filing fees to be paid or 1915 motion to be filed w/ USDC w/in 30 days (gms)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Notice of Appeal
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff in re: 1/17/01 order [4-2] ; Notice mailed to all counsel on 1/29/01 Fee Status: $100 fee and $5 fee not paid (gms)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                    RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Tom Billings on 1/22/01 (former empl)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                      RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Clinton Hoeffner on 1/22/01 (former empl)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/27/2001 Affidavit/Return of Service
                        RETURNS OF SERVICE (2) by plaintiff Van Stafford of complaint [1-1] on 1/9/01; does not state upon who or where service was made (lam)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Edward W. Nottingham dismissing case w/ prejudice (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/19/01 (gms)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Certificate of Mailing/Service
                            CERTIFICATE OF MAILING BY pla OF amd complaint [2-1] upon acting D.A. Larry Porter (former empl)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Amended Complaint
                              AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff; adding defendant Tom Billings, Clinton Hoeffner (gms)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (former empl)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Filing Fee Received
                                  FILING FEE PAID: on 1/2/01 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 222395. (former empl)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?