Headley v. New Era Networks Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00003-WDM-BNB
District Judge Walker D. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Richard D. Headley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill and Robbins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert F. Hill +1 303 296 8100 +1 303 296 2388 roberthill@hillandrobbins.com
v.
No Logo George F. Adam, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Featherstone Petrie DeSisto LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A DeSisto , +1 303 626 7100 +1 303 626 7101 jdesisto@featherstonelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rania Chamoun +1 650 493 9300 +5655 565 565 5100
Space Boris Feldman +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 boris.feldman@wsgr.com
Space Terry Turner Johnson +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tjohnson@wsgr.com
Space Peri Nielsen +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 pnielsen@wsgr.com
Space Gregory Lewis Watts +1 650 493 9300 +5655 565 565 5100 gwatts@wsgr.com
No Logo NEW ERA OF NETWORKS, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Featherstone Petrie DeSisto LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A DeSisto , +1 303 626 7100 +1 303 626 7101 jdesisto@featherstonelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rania Chamoun +1 650 493 9300 +5655 565 565 5100
Space Boris Feldman +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 boris.feldman@wsgr.com
Space Terry Turner Johnson +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tjohnson@wsgr.com
Space Peri Nielsen +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 pnielsen@wsgr.com
Space Gregory Lewis Watts +1 650 493 9300 +5655 565 565 5100 gwatts@wsgr.com
No Logo Patrick J. Fortune, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Featherstone Petrie DeSisto LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A DeSisto , +1 303 626 7100 +1 303 626 7101 jdesisto@featherstonelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rania Chamoun +1 650 493 9300 +5655 565 565 5100
Space Boris Feldman +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 boris.feldman@wsgr.com
Space Terry Turner Johnson +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tjohnson@wsgr.com
Space Peri Nielsen +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 pnielsen@wsgr.com
Space Gregory Lewis Watts +1 650 493 9300 +5655 565 565 5100 gwatts@wsgr.com
No Logo Stephen E. Webb, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Featherstone Petrie DeSisto LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A DeSisto , +1 303 626 7100 +1 303 626 7101 jdesisto@featherstonelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rania Chamoun +1 650 493 9300 +5655 565 565 5100
Space Boris Feldman +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 boris.feldman@wsgr.com
Space Terry Turner Johnson +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tjohnson@wsgr.com
Space Peri Nielsen +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 pnielsen@wsgr.com
Space Gregory Lewis Watts +1 650 493 9300 +5655 565 565 5100 gwatts@wsgr.com
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78 Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 7/26/2002
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
101-cv-00003-WDM-BNB None
Related Case
Other Court Case 99WM 1892 et al[USDC CO]
Def Custody Status
Flags LEAD, TERMED
  Entries (120) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 89 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Walker D. Miller granting motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [75-1] in 1:01-cv-00003granting motion for entry of order (1) permitting distribution of settlement (2) awarding atty fees, reimbursing expenses (3) granting compensatory award [84-1]; pla's counsel are awarded atty fees in the amount of $950,000; together with expenses of $181,641.87; lead pla is awarded a $25,000 fee; these amounts shall be paid to pla's lead counsel from the stlmt fund; atty fees and exp shall be paid to lead counsel and shall be allocated amount counsel by pla's lead counsel (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/24/03 (dlb)
    LREF
    Blank 88 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    COURTROOM MINUTES by Judge Walker D. Miller taking under advisement on 7/18/03 the motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [75-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 ; entry date : 7/22/03 Court Reporter: Janet Morrissey (dlb)
      LREF
      Blank 87 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Transcript
      TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Agreement Hrg on July 25, 2003 before Walker D. Miller ( pages: 1 - 19) Prepared By: Janet Morrissey (certified copy) (dlb)
        LREF
        Blank 86 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Transcript
        TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Agreement Hrg on July 7, 2003 before Walker D. Miller ( pages: 1 - 6) Prepared By: Janet Morrissey (certified copy) (dlb)
          LREF
          Blank 85 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller setting hearing on motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [75-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 2:00 7/18/03 in 1:01-cv-00003, in 1:01-cv-00030, in 1:01-cv-00033, in 1:01-cv-00045, in 1:01-cv-00057, in 1:01-cv-00070, in 1:01-cv-00085, in 1:01-cv-00099, in 1:01-cv-00112, in 1:01-cv-00137, in 1:01-cv-00157, in 1:01-cv-00184, in 1:01-cv-00189, in 1:01-cv-00190, in 1:01-cv-00246, in 1:01-cv-00265, in 1:01-cv-00283 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/9/03 (pap)
            LREF
            Blank 84 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Motion for Order
            Lead Pla's MOTION for entry of order (1) permitting distribution of settlement (2) awarding atty fees, reimbursing expenses (3) granting compensatory award (dlb)
              LREF
              Blank 83 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Notice of Change of Address
              NOTICE of Change of firm name of Holzer & Holzer Holzer Holzer & Cannon by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-00003,1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265, 1:01-cv-00283 (gms)
                LREF
                Blank 82 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Report
                Class REPORT concerning conclusion of claims administration, request for ruling on motion for award of atty fees and reimbursement of expenses and submission of supplemental authority (dlb)
                  LREF
                  Blank 81 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
                  Order and final JUDGMENT: by Judge Miller regarding [79-1] minutes; Settlement is approved in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265 dismissing case with prejudice ; without costs except as provided in the stipulationi, as against the Dfts (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/26/02 (pap)
                    LREF
                    Blank 80 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Declaration
                    Supplemental DECLARATION of Cheryl Washington re: A) Mailing of Notice of pendency of class action, hearing on proposed settlement and attorneys' fee petition and right to share in settlement fund and proof of claim and release; B) Returned undeliverable mail (pap)
                      LREF
                      Blank 79 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      COURTROOM MINUTES (Fairness Hearing on Class Action) by Judge Walker D. Miller granting motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [73-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, taking under advisement on the motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [75-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 ; entry date : 7/26/02 Court Reporter: Janet Morrissey (pap)
                        LREF
                        Blank 78 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Declaration
                        Supplemental DECLARATION of Charles Lilley re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [75-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 *large document (dlb) Modified on 07/24/2002
                          LREF
                          Blank 77 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Appendix
                          APPENDIX of Unreported decision in support of pla's filed motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [75-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00030, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00033, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00045, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00057, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00070, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00085, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00099, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00112, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00137, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00157, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00184, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00189, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00190, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00246, to motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00265 (dlb) Modified on 07/22/2002
                            LREF
                            Blank 76 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Declaration
                            DECLARATION of Norman Berman re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [75-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00030, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00033, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00045, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00057, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00070, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00085, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00099, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00112, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00137, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00157, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00184, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00189, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00190, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00246, re: motion for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00265 (dlb)
                              LREF
                              Blank 75 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002, Terminated: 7/23/2003 Motion for Attorney Fees
                              Application (MOTION) by pla's counsel for an award of attorney fees and reimbursement of exp (dlb)
                                LREF
                                Blank 74 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Declaration
                                DECLARATION of Norman Berman re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [73-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00030, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00033, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00045, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00057, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00070, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00085, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00099, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00112, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00137, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00157, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00184, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00189, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00190, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00246, re: motion for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00265 (dlb)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 73 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Motion for Order
                                  MOTION by Pla's for order of final approval of Class Action Settlement and memo of law in support (dlb)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 72 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Statement
                                    Stipulation of Settlement (STATEMENT) re: order [69-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00030, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00033, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00045, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00057, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00070, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00085, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00099, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00112, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00137, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00157, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00184, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00189, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00190, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00246, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00265 (dlb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 71 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller regarding [68-1] minute order in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/6/02 (dlb)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 70 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller denying w/out prej as moot dft, Webb's motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [50-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/6/02 (dlb)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 69 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                          PRELIMINARY ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND ATTACHED EXHIBITS by Judge Walker D. Miller granting motion for entry of preliminary order in connection w/proposed class action settlement [66-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/1/02 (dlb)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 68 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller Caption will now read as show above on all future filings (Richard D. Headley, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, vs. New Era of Networks, Inc., George F. Adam, Jr., Patrick J. Fortune and Stephen E. Webb) (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/26/02 (gms) Modified on 04/26/2002
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 67 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller finding the motion to stay pending effectuation of settlement [64-1] moot in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/29/02 (dlb)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 66 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002, Terminated: 5/1/2002 Motion for Order
                                                Pla's Unopposed MOTION for entry of preliminary order in connection w/proposed class action settlement (dlb)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                  Stipulation of Settlement (NOTICE) by all parties re: motion to stay pending effectuation of settlement [64-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265 (dlb)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/30/2002 Motion to Stay
                                                    Joint MOTION to stay pending effectuation of settlement (dlb)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Affidavit
                                                      Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Gregory L. Watts re: dft's motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [50-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 (dlb)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                        REPLY Brief in Support of dft's motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [50-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265 (dlb)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 Affidavit
                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Charles W. Lilley re: opposition brief [60-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [50-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00030, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00030, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00033, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00045, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00045, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00057, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00057, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00070, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00070, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00085, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00085, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00099, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00099, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00112, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00112, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00137, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00137, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00157, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00157, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00184, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00184, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00189, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00189, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00190, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00190, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00246, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00246, re: opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00265, re: motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00265 (dlb)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                            BRIEF by Pla's in opposition to Dft's motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [50-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265 (dlb)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller regarding [50-1] Dft's motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265i, pla to respond by 12/6/01 and dft shall reply by 1/7/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/4/01 (dlb)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address of Bader & Associates (dlb)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address of Donovan Searles, LLC (dlb)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland granting motion to vacate scheduling planning order [42-1] [45-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265 ; rule 16 conf vacated on 10/26/01 ; in court hrg set 7/12/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/29/01 (dlb)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller regarding dft's [50-1] motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265, pla has to 11/28/01 to respond and dft has to 12/20/01 to reply (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/24/01 (dlb) Modified on 10/24/2001
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Certificate
                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service by Dfts of Appendix, (Proposed) Order, Dft's Mtn to Dism the amd consolidated class action complaint, Request for Judicial Ntc and Affdt (dlb)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Appendix
                                                                          APPENDIX filed by Dft's to Dft's request [52-1] affidavit [51-1] to dft's motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [50-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00030, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00030, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00033, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00033, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00045, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00045, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00057, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00070, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00085, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00099, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00112, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00137, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00157, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00184, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00189, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00190, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00246, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00265 (dlb)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Request
                                                                            REQUEST for Judicial Notice in support of Dfts, New Era of Networks, Inc. George F. Adam, Jr. Patrick J. Fortune and Stephen E. Webb's Mtn to Dism the Amd Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Oral Argument Requested) (dlb)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Affidavit
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Gregory L. Watts in support re: dft's motion to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint [50-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00030, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00033, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00045, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00057, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00070, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00085, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00099, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00112, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00137, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00157, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00184, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00189, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00190, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00246, [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00265 (dlb)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001, Terminated: 5/3/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION by Dfts, New Era of Networks, Inc., George F. (Rick) Adam, Jr., Patrick J. Fortune, and Stephen E. Webb to dismiss pla's amended consolidated class action complaint (Oral Argument Requested) (dlb)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                  Opposition (RESPONSE) by Lead Pla's to dfft's motion to vacate scheduling planning order [42-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 [45-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265 (dlb)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland regarding dft's [45-1] motion to vacate scheduling planning order [42-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265, plas have to 10/22/01 to respond (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/15/01 (dlb)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 Certificate of Compliance
                                                                                      Certificate of Compliance pursuant to LR 7.1 by Gregory L. Watts associate with Law Firm for the dfts in 1:01-cv-00003 re: motion to vacate scheduling planning order [42-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 [45-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 (pap)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland the motion to vacate scheduling planning order [42-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 [45-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265 (pap)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                          MOTION by defendants in 1:01-cv-00003 to vacate scheduling planning order [42-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 (pap)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                                            AMENDED Consolidated Class Action COMPLAINT [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00030, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00033, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00045, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00057, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00070, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00085, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00099, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00112, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00137, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00157, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00184, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00189, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00190, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00246, [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00265 by Lead plaintiff Richard D. Headley in 1:01-cv-00003; jury demand (dlb)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland granting Norman Lead's motion for order appointing Keith Norman as lead plaintiff and to appoint his counsel, Berman, DeValerio & Pease LLP as lead counsel and Lilley & Garcia LLP as liaison counsel [25-1] in denying Arvanitis Group's motion for order appointing Christie Arvanitis, Sami Abed and Don Archambault as lead plaintiffs and for approval of their selection of lead and liaison counsel [0-1] denying as withdrawn Headley and Bignac's motions for order appointing Richard D. Headley as lead plaintiff and approval of his selection of counsel [0-1] and motion for order appointing Henry Brignac lead plaintiff pursuant to 21D(a)(B) of the Securities and Exchange Act of 1934 and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel [0-1], granting Dft's motion to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to pla's complaint. Pla's shall file a consolidated comp by 9/7/01; the Dft's shall ans or otherwise respond by 10/22/01; Pla shall rep, if necess, to the Dft's responsive pleading by 12/6/01 and Dft's shall reply by 1/12/02 [0-1] ; rule 16 conference set for 10:00 11/13/01 in 1:01-cv-00003, in 1:01-cv-00030, in 1:01-cv-00033, in 1:01-cv-00045, in 1:01-cv-00057, in 1:01-cv-00070, in 1:01-cv-00085, in 1:01-cv-00099, in 1:01-cv-00112, in 1:01-cv-00137, in 1:01-cv-00157, in 1:01-cv-00184, in 1:01-cv-00189, in 1:01-cv-00190, in 1:01-cv-00246, in 1:01-cv-00265 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/13/01 (dlb)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001, Terminated: 10/26/2001 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland ; Rule 16 conference set for 10:00 11/13/01 in 1:01-cv-00003, in 1:01-cv-00030, in 1:01-cv-00033, in 1:01-cv-00045, in 1:01-cv-00057, in 1:01-cv-00070, in 1:01-cv-00085, in 1:01-cv-00099, in 1:01-cv-00112, in 1:01-cv-00137, in 1:01-cv-00157, in 1:01-cv-00184, in 1:01-cv-00189, in 1:01-cv-00190, in 1:01-cv-00246, in 1:01-cv-00265 (cc: all counsel) (dlb)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Firm Name of Berman DeValerio & Pease, LLP to Berman, DeValerio Pease, Tabacco Burt & Pucillo (proposed liaison counsel) (dlb)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendants (DATE SENT NOT PROVIDED IN THE WAIVER) (former empl)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendants (DATE SENT WAS NOT PROVIDED IN THE WAIVER) (former empl)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of Law of Keith Norman in Opposition to [28-1] motion for order appointing Christie Arvanitis, Sami Abed and Don Archambault as lead plaintiffs and for approval of their selection of lead and liaison counsel in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157, 1:01-cv-00184, 1:01-cv-00189, 1:01-cv-00190, 1:01-cv-00246, 1:01-cv-00265 (former empl)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                          RESPONSE by defendants in 1:01-cv-00003 to plas' motions for order appointing Christie Arvanitis, Sami Abed and Don Archambault as lead plaintiffs and for approval of their selection of lead and liaison counsel motion for order appointing Keith Norman as lead plaintiff and to appoint his counsel, Berman, DeValerio & Pease LLP as lead counsel and Lilley & Garcia LLP as liaison counsel re: motion for order appointing Richard D. Headley as lead plaintiff and approval of his selection of counsel re: motion for order appointing Henry Brignac lead plaintiff pursuant to 21D(a)(B) of the Securities and Exchange Act of 1934 and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel (former empl)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 Certificate
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Serviceby plaintiff Henry Brignac in 1:01-cv-00112 re: Memorandum Withdrawing Motion for Lead Plaintiff (doc. #37) (former empl)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                              NOTICE by plaintiff Henry Brignac in 1:01-cv-00112 of withdrawal of motion for lead plaintiff (former empl)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                NOTICE by plaintiff Richard D. Headley in 1:01-cv-00003 of withdrawal of motion for order appointing Richard D. Headley as lead plaintiff and approval of his selection of counsel [23-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 (former empl)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, the parties may file responses, not to exceed 6 pgs, on the various motions concerning lead plaintiffs and lead counsel by 4/16/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/27/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00265 on 2/15/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd Boland granting unopposed motion by dfts to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to pla's complaint [31-1], Granted insofar as it seeks an extension of 45 days after a single consolidated or designated Complaint is filed in this matter. This order applies only to cases which have been consolidated under Civil Action 1:01-cv-00003, (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/19/01 (former empl) Modified on 03/23/2001
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland ; in court hrg set for 8:30 7/12/01 on the various motions concerning lead counsel and the designation of a consolidated complaint or a single operative complaint in 1:01-cv-00003, in 1:01-cv-00030, in 1:01-cv-00033, in 1:01-cv-00045, in 1:01-cv-00057, in 1:01-cv-00070, in 1:01-cv-00085, in 1:01-cv-00099, in 1:01-cv-00112, in 1:01-cv-00137, in 1:01-cv-00157, in 1:01-cv-00184, in 1:01-cv-00189, in 1:01-cv-00190, in 1:01-cv-00246, in 1:01-cv-00265 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/19/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL Affidavit in further support of appointment of lead plaintiff and to appoint lead counsel re: Keith Norman re: affidavit [26-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, re: motion for order appointing Keith Norman as lead plaintiff and to appoint his counsel, Berman, DeValerio & Pease LLP as lead counsel and Lilley & Garcia LLP as liaison counsel [25-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 (former empl)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland the motion for order appointing Christie Arvanitis, Sami Abed and Don Archambault as lead plaintiffs and for approval of their selection of lead and liaison counsel [28-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, referring to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland the motion for order appointing Keith Norman as lead plaintiff and to appoint his counsel, Berman, DeValerio & Pease LLP as lead counsel and Lilley & Garcia LLP as liaison counsel [25-1] referring to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland the motion for order appointing Richard D. Headley as lead plaintiff and approval of his selection of counsel [23-1] referring to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland the motion for order appointing Henry Brignac lead plaintiff pursuant to 21D(a)(B) of the Securities and Exchange Act of 1934 and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel [20-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00246 on 2/16/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Declaration
                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Kip B. Shuman, Esquire in support of motion for order appointing Christie Arvanitis, Sami Abed and Don Archambault as lead plaintiffs and for approval of their selection of lead and liaison counsel [28-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Class Members Christe Arvanitis, Sami Abed and Don Archambault for order appointing Christie Arvanitis, Sami Abed and Don Archambault as lead plaintiffs and for approval of their selection of lead and liaison counsel (former empl) Modified on 03/06/2001
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Declaration
                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Robert F. Hill re: motion by Pla Richard D. Headley for order appointing Richard D. Headley as lead plaintiff and approval of his selection of counsel [23-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Charles W. Lilley in support of motion for order appointing Keith Norman as lead plaintiff and to appoint his counsel, Berman, DeValerio & Pease LLP as lead counsel and Lilley & Garcia LLP as liaison counsel [25-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001, Terminated: 7/13/2001 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                        MOTION and Memorandum of Law by Keith Norman for order appointing Keith Norman as lead plaintiff and to appoint his counsel, Berman, DeValerio & Pease LLP as lead counsel and Lilley & Garcia LLP as liaison counsel (former empl)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                          Memorandum (BRIEF) by plaintiff Richard D. Headley in 1:01-cv-00003 in support of pla Richard D. Headley's motion for order appointing Richard D. Headley as lead plaintiff and approval of his selection of counsel [23-1] in 1:01-cv-00003 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiff Richard D. Headley in 1:01-cv-00003 for order appointing Richard D. Headley as lead plaintiff and approval of his selection of counsel (former empl)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of [20-1] dft Henry Brignac's motion for order appointing Henry Brignac lead plaintiff pursuant to 21D(a)(B) of the Securities and Exchange Act of 1934 and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel in 1:01-cv-3 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Certificate
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service by plaintiff Henry Brignac in 1:01-cv-00112 re: Motion to Appoint Henry Brignac Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Lead Pla's Selection of Counsel (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff Henry Brignac in 1:01-cv-00112 for order appointing Henry Brignac lead plaintiff pursuant to 21D(a)(B) of the Securities and Exchange Act of 1934 and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00003 on 1/24/01, signature is not an original (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Patrick J. Fortune in 1:01-cv-00003 on 2/2/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Stephen E. Webb in 1:01-cv-00003 on 2/2/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant George F. Adam Jr. in 1:01-cv-00003 on 2/2/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00189 on 2/7/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant George F. Adam Jr. in 1:01-cv-00189 on 2/2/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Stephen E. Webb in 1:01-cv-00189 on 2/2/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Patrick J. Fortune in 1:01-cv-00189 on 2/2/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00137 on 1/25/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00184 on 2/7/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                        ACCEPTANCE/ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE, (Titled Waiver, Consent and Acceptance of Service) by New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00112, George F. Adam Jr. in 1:01-cv-00112, Patrick J. Fortune in 1:01-cv-00112, Stephen E. Webb in 1:01-cv-00112 signed on 1/31/01 ; by John A. DeSisto, Esquire (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00157 on 1/30/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiff's Certification which was referenced in pla's complaint but inadvertently not attached to it as intended filed by plaintiff Henry Brignac in 1:01-cv-00112 re: complaint [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00112 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00003 on 1/24/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157 by Peri B. Erlanger (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland the motion to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to pla's complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto Case referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland referring to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland the motion to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to pla's complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, referring to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland the motion to Rescind (vacate) Consolidation order [133-1] as to Case 00-WM-0003 in 1:99-cv-01274 [0-1] in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099 by Judge Walker D. Miller (cc: to counsel) (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157 by Gregory L. Watts (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157 by Terry Turner Johnson (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157 by Rania Chamoun (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants in 1:01-cv-00003, 1:01-cv-00030, 1:01-cv-00033, 1:01-cv-00045, 1:01-cv-00057, 1:01-cv-00070, 1:01-cv-00085, 1:01-cv-00099, 1:01-cv-00112, 1:01-cv-00137, 1:01-cv-00157 by Boris Feldman (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER originally entered on 10/19/99 by Judge Donald E. Abram consolidating case 01-WM-0157 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/26/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Donald E. Abram originally entered on 10/19/99 regarding consolidation, consolidating case 01-WM-0137 with lead case (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/26/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Donald E. Abram previously entered on 10/19/99, consolidating case 01-WM-0112 with lead case (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/26/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001, Terminated: 3/15/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00003, George F. Adam Jr. in 1:01-cv-00003, Patrick J. Fortune in 1:01-cv-00003, Stephen E. Webb in 1:01-cv-00003 to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to pla's complaint (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00003, defendant George F. Adam Jr. in 1:01-cv-00003, defendant Patrick J. Fortune in 1:01-cv-00003 to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to pla's complaint (former empl) Modified on 05/08/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Stephen E. Webb in 1:01-cv-00030 on 1/9/01 by leaving with Margaret Williamson, assistant/secretary (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant George F. Adam Jr. in 1:01-cv-00030 on 1/9/01 by leaving with Cynthia Cerney assistant/secretary (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Patrick J. Fortune in 1:01-cv-00030 on 1/9/01 by leaving with Cynthia Cerny, assistant/secretary (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00030 on 1/9/01 by leaving with John Long of Corp Service Co., agent for dft (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff Richard D. Headley in 1:01-cv-00003 to Rescind (vacate) Consolidation order [133-1] as to Case 00-WM-0003 in 1:99-cv-01274 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00085 on 1/19/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00099 on 1/19/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: by Judge Walker D. Miller; Pursuant to LR 40.1C, cases are sufficiently related to each other in that these actions involve common questions of law or fact. In addition, these two rounds of cases should not be consolidated with each oterh because they invole different time periods with respect to their factual allegations. However; because the 2nd round of cases involve common question of law and fact, the 2nd set of cases starting with 01-cv-03 will be consolidated. The Clerk is directed (until further order of the court) to consolidate subsequently filed cases which are related to Civil Action 01-WM-003 with that action. (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/30/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller; Pursuant to LR 40.1C, Judge finds that cases 01-03, 01-30, 01-33, 01-45, 01-57, 01-70, 00-85 and 00-99 are sufficiently related to each other in that these actions involve common questions of law or fact, Clerk is directed (until further order of the court) to consolidate subsequently filed cases which are related to Civil Action no. 01-3 with this action (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/23/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00057 on 1/11/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER originally entered on 10/19/99 by Judge Donald E. Abram concerning consolidation, re: consolidation of case no. 01-0085 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/19/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Donald E. Abram entered on 10/19/99 re: consolidation of related case no. 01-99 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/19/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff Samuel Zaks in 1:01-cv-00030 for relief from consolidation of this case with case no. 99-WM-1274 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:99-cv-01274 on 1/11/01, by leaving in the presence of John Long, as process clerk to the Prentice-Hall Corp. Systems, Inc. as Registered Agent (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of 10/19/99 by Donald E. Abram regarding [44-1] order in 1:99-cv-01274, Case No. 01-WM-0070 is consolidated with lead case effective 1/12/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/12/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Donald Abram regarding consolidation [44-1] order in 1:99-cv-01274, Case 01-WM-57 is consolidated with lead case effective 1/12/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/12/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of 10/19/99 by Judge Donald Abram regarding consolidation [44-1] order in 1:99-cv-01274, Case No. 01-WM-45 is consolidated with lead case effective 1/12/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/12/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon John Long, process clerk to Prentice Hall Corp. Systems, Inc., Reg Agent for defendant New Era Networks Inc in 1:01-cv-00033 on 1/9/01 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER (copy of order dated 10/19/99) consolidating cases 1:99-cv-1274 with member cases 1:01-cv-3 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/9/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued); jury demand (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING FEE PAID: on 1/2/01 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 222403. (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?