Sanders, et al v. Meow Media, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00728-LTB
District Judge Lewis T. Babcock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Constance Adams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. DeCamp +1 402 477 3974 +4774 477 477 4487
No Logo Cynthia Thirouin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. DeCamp +1 402 477 3974 +4774 477 477 4487
No Logo Linda H. Sanders, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. DeCamp +1 402 477 3974 +4774 477 477 4487
v.
No Logo Acclaim Entertaiment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Kelley +1 303 376 2400 +1 303 376 2401 tkelley@lskslaw.com
No Logo Activision, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Kelley +1 303 376 2400 +1 303 376 2401 tkelley@lskslaw.com
No Logo Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Kelley +1 303 376 2400 +1 303 376 2401 tkelley@lskslaw.com
No Logo Id Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Don Wade Cloud, Jr. +1 972 701 7007 +7018 701 701 8765
Space James T. Drakeley +1 972 701 7007 +7018 701 701 8765

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly Garnsey Hubbell & Lass, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James W. Hubbell +1 303 296 9412 +1 303 293 8705 jhubbell@kghllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kennedy Childs & Fogg, PC-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Roger Mann +1 303 825 2700 +1 303 825 0434 jmann@kennedychilds.com
No Logo Infogrames, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Interplay Entertainment Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Interplay Entertainment Corp."
No Logo Midway Home Entertainment, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Higgins, Hopkins, McLain & Roswell, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David B. Higgins +1 303 987 9811 +1 303 987 9811 higgins@hhmrlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HINKHOUSE WILLIAMS WALSH LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Thomas Williams +1 312 443 0371 +1 312 896 6591 jwilliams@hww-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald O Sweeney +1 312 357 1313 +1 312 759 5646 sweeneyG@Howrey.com
Nintendo of America, Inc. Nintendo of America, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Nintendo of America"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Kelley +1 303 376 2400 +1 303 376 2401 tkelley@lskslaw.com
No Logo Palm Pictures, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Michael Caparelli +1 212 455 3583 +4552 455 455 2502
Space Mary Elizabeth McGarry +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter A. Cal +1 303 299 2900 +1 303 298 0940 pcal@sah.com
Space Stefan Darrell Stein +1 303 297 2900 +2980 298 298 0940
Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Sony Computer Entertainment"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Kelley +1 303 376 2400 +1 303 376 2401 tkelley@lskslaw.com
No Logo Square Soft, Inc., Defendant
Time Warner, Inc. Time Warner, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew M. Low +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 andrew.low@dgslaw.com
Office Denver
Filed 4/19/2001
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $5000000000
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Jefferson
Terminated 5/16/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 02-1159[]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (119) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 117 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER singed 5/16/03 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock based on[113-1] report, [109-1] report, [112-1] report, [111-1] report, [110-1] report, [106-1] report Ordered: all claims being resolved, the action is deemed dismissed and closed (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/19/03 (former empl)
    LREF
    Blank 116 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 USCA Mandate
    MANDATE from the Court of Appeals; CA # 02-1159; Dt issued 12/10/02; ORDER dated 12/10/02 dismissing the appeal [85-1] (msn)
      LREF
      Blank 115 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER signed 10/11/02 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock denying motion for attorney fees under Rule 11, F.R.C.P. against Attorney John DeCamp [99-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/15/02 (former empl)
        LREF
        Blank 114 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY BRIEF by defendant Network Auth Sys Inc to response to motion for attorney fees under Rule 11, F.R.C.P. against Attorney John DeCamp [99-1] (former empl)
          LREF
          Blank 113 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT by plaintiff (former empl)
            LREF
            Blank 112 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT by defendant ID Software, Inc. joining the status report of Palm Pictures and Midway Home Entertainment filed 9/10/02 (former empl)
              LREF
              Blank 111 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Status Report
              STATUS REPORT by defts Acclaim Ent Inc, Nintendo of Amer, Activision, Inc., Capcom Enter Inc, Sony Computer Enter, Eidos Interactive, Square Soft, Inc., Infogrames, Inc. (former empl)
                LREF
                Blank 110 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT by defendant Network Auth Sys Inc (former empl)
                  LREF
                  Blank 109 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 Status Report
                  STATUS REPORT by defendant Time Warner, Inc. (former empl)
                    LREF
                    Blank 108 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock regarding [99-1] motion for attorney fees under Rule 11, F.R.C.P. against Attorney John DeCamp, dft has until 9/26/02 to reply (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/13/02 (former empl)
                      LREF
                      Blank 107 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 Response to Motion
                      RESPONSE by attorney John W. DeCamp to Network Authentication's motion for attorney fees under Rule 11, F.R.C.P. against Attorney John DeCamp [99-1] (former empl)
                        LREF
                        Blank 106 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 Status Report
                        STATUS REPORT by defendant ID Software, Inc. (former empl)
                          LREF
                          Blank 105 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting to and including 9/12/02, pltf's motion to extend time time to respond to NAS's motion for attorney's fees to 9/12/02 [104-1], regarding [99-1] motion for attorney fees under Rule 11, F.R.C.P. against Attorney John DeCamp (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/3/02 (former empl)
                            LREF
                            Blank 104 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002, Terminated: 8/30/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                            MOTION by plaintiff Linda H. Sanders to extend time time to respond to MAS's motion for attorney's fees to 9/12/02 (former empl)
                              LREF
                              Blank 103 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock ; status report ddl set for 9/13/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/23/02 (former empl)
                                LREF
                                Blank 102 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER signed 8/19/02 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock on the notice of dismissal [101-1] Order: dismissing all claims against: party Virgin Enter Grp Inc, New Line Cinema, Island Pictures, Polygram Film Enter, Lasersoft, Inc., Sega of America Inc, Atari Corporation, Apogee Software Ltd, Network Auth Sys Inc, Meow Media, Inc. (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/19/02 (former empl)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 101 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/19/2002, Terminated: 8/19/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE of Dismissal by pltfs of certain dfts (former empl)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 100 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock regarding [99-1] motion for attorney fees under Rule 11, F.R.C.P. against Attorney John DeCamp: pltfs have to and including 8/29/02 to respond (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/15/02 (former empl)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 99 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002, Terminated: 10/11/2002 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                      MOTION by defendant Network Auth Sys Inc for attorney fees under Rule 11, F.R.C.P. against Attorney John DeCamp (former empl)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 98 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                                        NOTICE of Change of telephone and facsimile number of Faegre & Benson by defendants Acclaim Ent Inc, Activision, Inc., Capcom Enter Inc, Infogrames, Inc., GT Interactive Sfwr, Interplay Pro Inc, Nintendo of Amer, Sony Computer Enter (former empl)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 97 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER signed 7/30/02 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion for summary judgment [pursuant to Rule 56] [93-2] as fully set forth dismissing party Network Auth Sys Inc; dft awarded costs on submission of bill of costs within 10 days of entry of order; judgment to enter (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/30/02 (former empl)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 96 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                            NOTICE by defendant Network Auth Sys Inc OF READINESS TO RULE ON motion to dismiss [pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) [93-1] (former empl)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 95 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER sgined 5/22/02 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock denying motion to amend order [81-1] with Rule 54(b) certification [94-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/24/02 (former empl)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 94 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                MOTION by plaintiff Linda H. Sanders to amend order [81-1] with Rule 54(b) certification (former empl)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION by defendant Network Auth Sys Inc to dismiss [pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) , and for summary judgment [pursuant to Rule 56] (former empl)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock denying motion for admission of counsel pro hac vice of Joel Kreizman [91-1]: counsel directed to follow D.C.COLO.LCivR 83.3 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/3/02 (former empl)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 USCA Order
                                                      Copy of ORDER from Court of Appeals [85-1] advising that w/in 30 days, the pltfs shall serve and file in the USCA a certified copy of a USDC order either granting certification under Rule 54(b) or adjudicating the remaining claims (former empl)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002, Terminated: 5/3/2002 Motion for Order
                                                        MOTION by defendant Network Auth Sys Inc for admission of counsel pro hac vice of Joel Kreizman (former empl)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 89 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Letter re Appeal
                                                          LETTER to cnsl and the USCA advising that the Record on Appeal is complete (Re: [85-1] ) (former empl)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Transcript Order Form
                                                            NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by plaintiff ; transcript not necessary for appeal [85-1] (former empl)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 87 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 USCA Case Number
                                                              NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of assignment of Case No. [85-1] 02-1159 (former empl)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Network Auth Sys Inc by Earl G. Rhodes (former empl)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Notice of Appeal
                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiffs of 3/4/02 order [81-1] (entered on the docket 3/4/02); Notice of transcript order form due 4/15/02 ; Notice mailed to all counsel on 4/8/02 (former empl)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                    $100.00 fee and $5.00 fee paid. Receipt No 233817. RE: appeal [85-1] (former empl)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 4/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER signed 3/29/02 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock denying motion for relief from order to dismiss of 3/4/02 [83-1], regarding [81-1] order (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/1/02 (former empl)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 4/1/2002, Terminated: 3/29/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                        MOTION by pltfs Linda H. Sanders, Constance Adams, Cynthia Thirouin for relief from order to dismiss of 3/4/02 (former empl)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER sgined 3/6/02 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock regarding [80-1], regarding [79-1] complaint, regarding [78-1] brief, regarding [77-1] response,: ORDERING: pltf requst for 30 day extension to serve specific dfts is denied without prejudice; pltfs' request to relate back the amended cmplaint to the oirginal complaint is denied without prejudice; pltfs' motion to dismiss dft Williams Entertainment, Inc. is denied as moot; DISCHARGE the order to show cause order [76-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/7/02 (former empl)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002, Terminated: 5/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER: signed 3/4/02 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock the Rule 12(b)(6) motions to dismiss Claim One for negligence and Claim Two for strict liability filed by dfts Time Warner and Palm Pictures are GRANTED: the Rule 23(b)(6) motions to dismiss claim one for negligence and claim two for strict liability filed by: Acclaim entertianment, Inc., Activision, Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc. EIDOS Interactive, Id Software, Inc., Inforgrames, Inc fka GT Interactive Software Corporation, Interplay Producitons, Inc. Midway Home Entertainment; Nintendo of America; Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.; and Square Soft, Inc., dba Square USA, Inc. granting motion to dismiss [Rule 12(b)(6)] [45-1], [motion to dismiss [pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] [40-1], motion to dismiss [for failure to state a claim] [15-1], motion to dismiss (pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)) [13-1], motion Rule 12(b)(6) to dismiss [9-1]]; on submission of a bill of costs within 10 days from the date judgment enters, the above named dfts are granted costs (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/4/02 (former empl)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002, Terminated: 3/6/2002 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                              Letter with SUPPLEMENT of 8 pages of the reply not filed at time of filing by plaintiff Linda H. Sanders, plaintiff Constance Adams, plaintiff Cynthia Thirouin to brief [78-1], to response [77-1] (former empl)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Linda H. Sanders, Constance Adams, Cynthia Thirouin; jury demand; (amended complaint did not list: defendant Williams Enter Inc, defendant Lasersoft, Inc., defendant Virgin Inter Media, defendant Interplay Pro Inc, defendant GT Interactive Sfwr, defendant Virtus Corporation so they were terminated; adding newly named defendant Virgin Enter Grp Inc, Interplay Enter Corp, Infogrames, Inc. (former empl)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Brief
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (BRIEF) FILED by plaintiffs to their response to OSC [77-1] (former empl)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                    Response to ORDER to show cause by pltfs Linda H. Sanders, Constance Adams, Cynthia Thirouin [76-1] (former empl)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock returnable 2/27/02 by pltfs action should not be dismissed for failure to diligently prosecute against the listed dfts (as set forth in OSC) (cc: all counsel) (former empl)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address of Kennedy & Christopher by defendant ID Software, Inc. (former empl)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                          Noice of SUPPLEMENT by dfts Acclaim Ent Inc et al of history cited in reply to motion to dismiss [67-1] & memorandum of law in support of motion to dismiss [for failure to state a claim] [15-1] (gms)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address of David B. Higgins co-counsel of record for defendant Midway Home Ent (pap)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendant Palm Pictures to response to motion to dismiss [pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] [40-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant ID Software, Inc. by Don Wade Cloud Jr. (former empl)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                  REPLY by defendant ID Software, Inc. to response to support its motion to dismiss [Rule 12(b)(6)] [45-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant ID Software, Inc. by John R. Mann (former empl)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 9/14/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by defendant Time Warner, Inc. to response to motion to dismiss (pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)) [13-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 9/14/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendants Acclaim Ent Inc, Activision, Inc., Capcom Enter Inc, GT Interactive Sfwr, Interplay Pro Inc, Nintendo of Amer, Sony Computer Enter to response to motion to dismiss [for failure to state a claim] [15-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                          RESPONSE by pltfs Linda H. Sanders, Constance Adams, Cynthia Thirouin to Palm Pictures motion to dismiss [pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] [40-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion for extension of time to reply to pla's resp to mtn to dismiss to 9/21/01 [64-1], regarding [45-1] motion to dismiss [Rule 12(b)(6)] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/7/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001, Terminated: 9/5/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION by defendant ID Software, Inc. for extension of time to reply to pla's resp to mtn to dismiss to 9/21/01 (gms)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendant Midway Home Ent to response to motion Rule 12(b)(6) to dismiss [9-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion for leave to file brief to support its motion to dismiss [61-1] and accepting the tendered reply for filing (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/28/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001, Terminated: 8/27/2001 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant Midway Home Ent for leave to file brief to support its motion to dismiss (former empl)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001 Brief
                                                                                                                      Memorandum BRIEF FILED by plaintiffs in support of their motion response [59-1], motion to dismiss [Rule 12(b)(6)] [45-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by pltfs Linda H. Sanders, Constance Adams, Cynthia Thirouin to motion to dismiss [Rule 12(b)(6)] [45-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting to and inclduing 9/14/01 dft's motion to extend time to reply to pltfs' responses to 12(B)(6) motions to dismiss [57-1], regarding [15-1] motion to dismiss [for failure to state a claim] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/24/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001, Terminated: 8/24/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION by defendants Acclaim Ent Inc, GT Interactive Sfwr, Interplay Pro Inc, Nintendo of Amer, Activision, Inc., Capcom Enter Inc, Time Warner, Inc. to extend time to reply to pltfs' responses to 12(B)(6) motions to dismiss (former empl)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion to extend to 9/27/01 to reply to Pla's resp to dft's mtn to dismiss [50-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/22/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by plaintiff Linda H. Sanders to Dft's motion to dismiss [for failure to state a claim] [15-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by plaintiff Linda H. Sanders to Dft's motion to dismiss (pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)) [13-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion to extend time to 9/7/01 to resp to Dft's Mtn to Dism [52-1] to 9/7/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/22/01 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001, Terminated: 8/20/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by plaintiff Linda H. Sanders to extend time to 9/7/01 to resp to Dft's Mtn to Dism (dlb)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion for an additional extension of time in which to designate nonparties at fault to and including 8/31/01 for 21 days following resolution of the Dft's Mtns to Dism [49-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/22/01 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001, Terminated: 8/21/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Palm Pictures to extend to 9/27/01 to reply to Pla's mtn (dlb)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001, Terminated: 8/20/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION by dfts Midway Home Ent, ID Software, Inc., GT Interactive Sfwr, Interplay Pro Inc, Nintendo of Amer, Activision, Inc., Capcom Enter Inc, Sony Computer Enter, Time Warner, Inc., Palm Pictures, Acclaim Ent Inc for an additional extension of time in which to designate nonparties at fault to and including 8/31/01 (pap)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by plaintiffs Linda H. Sanders, Constance Adams, Cynthia Thirouin to Midway Home Entertainment's motion Rule 12(b)(6) to dismiss [9-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock regarding [45-1] motion to dismiss [Rule 12(b)(6)]: response due 8/27/01 and 10 days to reply (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/7/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM (BRIEF) by defendant ID Software, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss [Rule 12(b)(6)] [45-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001, Terminated: 3/4/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant ID Software, Inc. to dismiss [Rule 12(b)(6)] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Palm Pictures by Christopher Michael Caparelli (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock regarding [40-1] motion to dismiss [pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)]: pltfs response due 8/20/01, dft will have 10 days after to reply (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/31/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Palm Pictures by Stefan Darrell Stein and Peter A. Cal (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW (BRIEF) by defendant Palm Pictures in support of motion to dismiss [pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] [40-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001, Terminated: 3/4/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant Palm Pictures to dismiss [pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting Dft's motion to extend time to designate nonparties at fault to 8/31/01 [33-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/30/01 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER signed 7/27/01 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting pltfs' motion to extend time in which to file response to dft Time Warner's motion to dismiss to 8/19/01 [31-1], regarding [13-1] motion to dismiss (pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)) (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/30/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER signed 7/27/01 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting pltf's motion to extend time to respond to dfts (Acclaim Entertainment, et al.,) motion to dismiss to 8/19/01 [32-1], regarding [15-1] motion to dismiss [for failure to state a claim] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/30/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER signed 7/27/01 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion to extend time to file response to dft Midway Home Entertainment to dismiss to August 12, 2001 [30-1], regarding [9-1] motion Rule 12(b)(6) to dismiss (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/30/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001, Terminated: 7/27/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiffs Linda H. Sanders, Constance Adams, Cynthia Thirouin to extend time to respond to dfts (Acclaim Entertainment, et al.,) motion to dismiss to 8/19/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001, Terminated: 7/27/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiffs Linda H. Sanders, Constance Adams, Cynthia Thirouin to extend time in which to file response to dft Time Warner's motion to dismiss to 8/19/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001, Terminated: 7/27/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiffs Linda H. Sanders, Constance Adams, Cynthia Thirouin to extend time to file response to dft Midway Home Entertainment to dismiss to August 12, 2001 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by defendant Midway Home Ent to Pla's motion to extend time to file response to dft Midway Home Entertainment to dismiss to August 12, 2001 [30-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion to extend tme to designate nonparties at fault [29-1]to 8/31/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/27/01 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001, Terminated: 7/27/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Dft's Acclaim Ent Inc, Activision, Inc., New Line Cinema, GT Interactive Sfwr, Interplay Pro Inc, Nintendo of Amer, Palm Pictures, Sony Computer Enter, Time Warner, Inc. to extend time to designate nonparties at fault (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001, Terminated: 7/26/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant Midway Home Ent to extend tme to designate nonparties at fault (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER signed 7/23/01 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock denying for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LR 7.1A pltfs' motion to extend time (to 8/12/01) to respond to dft Midway Home Entertainment's Motion to Dismiss [27-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/25/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001, Terminated: 7/23/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiffs Linda H. Sanders, Constance Adams, Cynthia Thirouin to extend time (to 8/12/01) to respond to dft Midway Home Entertainment's Motion to Dismiss (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER signed 7/19/01 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock on the notice [25-1] dismissing without prejudice party Eidos Interactive (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/23/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting to and including 8/31/01, Id Software's motion to extend time to designate nonparties at fault [23-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/23/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Dismissal by plaintiffs pursuant to Rule 41 to dismiss without prejudice as to dft Eidos Interactive (former empl) Modified on 07/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001, Terminated: 7/20/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by defendant ID Software, Inc. to extend time to designate nonparties at fault (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER signed 7/16/01 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting notice [21-1] dismissing party Square Soft, Inc. without prejudice (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/17/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001, Terminated: 7/16/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Dismissal by plaintiffs of dft Square Soft Inc. (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion to extend time to 7/30/01 to answer to 7/30/01 [12-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/13/01 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion to extend time to answer to 8/1/01 [11-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/13/01 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock regarding Dft's [15-1] motion to dismiss [for failure to state a claim]. Pla's have to 7/30/01 to respond. Dft shall reply within 10 days (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/13/01 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion to extend time to 7/30/01 to answer [12-1] (cc: all counsel) entry date : 7/10/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock pltfs' response due 7/30/01 and dft reply 10 days after regarding [13-1] motion to dismiss (pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)) (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/10/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION and MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by defendant Acclaim Ent Inc, defendant GT Interactive Sfwr, defendant Interplay Pro Inc, defendant Nintendo of Amer, defendant Activision, Inc., defendant Capcom Enter Inc, defendant Sony Computer Enter, defendant Eidos Interactive, defendant Square Soft, Inc. to dismiss [for failure to state a claim] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING VIDEOTAPE EXHIBIT by defendant Time Warner, Inc. re: motion to dismiss (pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)) [13-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant Time Warner, Inc. to dismiss (pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)) (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001, Terminated: 7/10/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant Palm Pictures to extend time to 7/30 /01 to answer (former empl) Modified on 07/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001, Terminated: 7/11/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant ID Software, Inc. to extend time to answer to 8/1/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock regarding [9-1] motion Rule 12(b)(6) to dismiss: pltfs' response due 7/23/01, dft has 10 days to reply (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/6/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001, Terminated: 3/4/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Midway Home Ent Rule 12(b)(6) to dismiss (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Midway Home Ent by Gerald Owen Sweeney Jr., John Thomas Williams (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER signed 6/18/01 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting notice [6-1] dismissing party Virtus Corporation without prejudice (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/19/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001, Terminated: 6/19/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Dismissal by plaintiff pursuant to Rule 41 without prejudice as to dft Virtus Corporation (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Midway Home Ent by David B. Higgins (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/4/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant ID Software, Inc. by James T. Drakeley of Hiersche, Hayward, Drakeley & Urbach, PC (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant ID Software, Inc. by James W. Hubbell (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock. As this case is related to litigation pending before Judge Babcock, Case reassigned to Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/25/01 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (bpm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING FEE PAID: on 4/19/01 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 225154. (bpm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?