Duran, et al v. Jordan, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00560-RPM-MJW
District Judge Richard P. Matsch, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Joni Duran, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinn, Carpenter, Montoya & Love, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen J. Love +1 505 843 6161 +1 505 242 8227 kathy@mcginnlaw.com
No Logo Raymond (I) Duran, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinn, Carpenter, Montoya & Love, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen J. Love +1 505 843 6161 +1 505 242 8227 kathy@mcginnlaw.com
No Logo Raymond Duran, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinn, Carpenter, Montoya & Love, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen J. Love +1 505 843 6161 +1 505 242 8227 kathy@mcginnlaw.com
v.
No Logo Four Corners Women's Specialists, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Palmeri +1 303 534 5160 +1 303 534 5161 jpalmeri@gordonrees.com
No Logo Leanne (I) E. Jordan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Palmeri +1 303 534 5160 +1 303 534 5161 jpalmeri@gordonrees.com
No Logo Leanne E. Jordan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Palmeri +1 303 534 5160 +1 303 534 5161 jpalmeri@gordonrees.com
No Logo Mercy Medical Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa B. Halstead +1 303 394 1810 lisa.halstead@gmail.com
Office Denver
Filed 3/30/2001
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 10/4/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock for Judge Matsch purs to stipulation for dismissal; that all claims of the plas raised against dfts Jordan, Four Corners Women's Specialists, and Catholic Health Initiatives Colo, dba Mercy Medical Center [24-1], are dismissed with prejudice ( dismissing case ) (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/5/01 (lam)
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/4/2001 Motion to Dismiss
    Stipulation (MOTION) by plaintiffs, defendants to dismissal w/prejudice (lam)
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 Notice of Change of Address
      NOTICE of Name Change by defendant Mercy Medical Center counsel to Lisa B. Halstead (lam)
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe a telephone conf was held on 9/19/01 [21-2] ; settlement agreement is approved and dsm papers ddl set for 10/3/01 and all future hearing set before Mag Judge Watanabe are vacated (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/24/01 (lam)
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe settlement conf held 9/19/01; parties to submit jt mtn for dismissal by 10/3/01; all further hrgings before Judge Watanabe are vacated ; entry date : 9/21/01 Court Reporter: Tape 01-68 (lam)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe; telephone conference call is set 9/19/01 8:00 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/14/01 (pap)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; telephone status conf held 8/13/01 ; status report ddl re: settlement set for 8/31/01 ; entry date : 8/14/01 Court Reporter: Tape 01-60 (lam)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; telephon status magistrate conference w/pla only set for 8:00 7/11/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/3/01 (lam)
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe regarding [15-2] minutes; ptc is set for 5/31/02 at 9:00; telephone status conf set for 8/13/01 at 9:30; that the parties shall resubmit their corrected schedulng order to Magistrate Judge Watanabe (dated nunc pro tunc 6/28/01) by 7/13/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/29/01 (lam) Modified on 06/29/2001
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; rule 16 conf held on 6/28/01 ; discovery ddl set 3/1/02 ; disp mtn ddl set 3/29/02 ; pretrial conf set for 9:00 5/31/02 ; telephone status conf set for 9:30 8/13/01 ; csl shall make the changes made of record & resubmit the scheduling order, dated nuc pro tunc 6/28/01 by 7/13/01 ; entry date : 6/29/01 Court Reporter: Tape 01-50 (lam) Modified on 06/29/2001
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Answer
                        ANSWER by Dfts Leanne (I) E. Jordan, Leanne E. Jordan, Four Cnrs Womens Sp to complaint [1-1]; jury demand (former empl)
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/4/2001 Answer
                          ANSWER by defendant, Catholic Health Inititative Colorado d/b/a Mercy Medical Center (incorrectly referred to in the caption as Mercy Medical Center) to complaint [1-1]; jury demand (lam)
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                            ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; Rule 16 conference set for 9:30 6/28/01 (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                              ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Richard P. Matsch (cc: to counsel) (lam)
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 LetterCourt Filing
                                LETTER from clerk to counsel advising of reassignment to Judge Matsch (bpm)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001 LetterCourt Filing
                                  LETTER from clerk to counsel advising of reassignment to Judge Kane re: order [8-1] (bpm)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER of Recusal by Judge Daniel B. Sparr directing reassignment to another judge (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/9/01 (bpm) Modified on 05/10/2001
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Mercy Medical Center by Lisa B. Heintz (former empl)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Leanne (I) E. Jordan, defendant Leanne E. Jordan, defendant Four Cnrs Womens Sp by John Palmeri, Esq. for counsel White & Steele, PC on 4/12/01 (former empl)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Four Cnrs Womens Sp by John Palmeri, Esq. for White & Steele on 4/12/01 (former empl)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Mercy Medical Center by counsel Lisa Heintz, Esq. of Kennedy and Christopher on 4/11/01 (former empl)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: 4/12/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE of Claims by plaintiffs for medical negligence and wrongful death against the dfts (pap)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 Certificate
                                                CERTIFICATE of Review (bpm)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued); jury demand (bpm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 Filing Fee Received
                                                    FILING FEE PAID: on 3/30/01 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 224618. (bpm)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?