Thread Lounge, Inc v. Jeanette Juan
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CSM 08 824039
Superior Court Judge Ollie Marie-victoire, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thread Lounge, Inc, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Juan, Jeanette, Defendant
Cause of Action Money
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Off Calendar Order
Small Claims Hearing Of May-02-2008 Is Off Calendar - No Valid Service On Out Of State Defendant. Plaintiff Present. Defendant Not Present. Commissioner Paul Slavit. Clerk: S. Vantree. Not Reported. (506).
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 8 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
    Declaration Of Appearance On Behalf Of Corporation Pursuant To Ccp 116.540 (b)-(h) Filed By Plaintiff Thread Lounge, Inc
      Blank 7 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008
      Commissioner's Instructions Regarding Deft's Correspondence, Filed.
        Blank 6 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008
        Correspondence From Deft Janette Juan Received And Submitted To Commissioner.
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Proof Of Service Filed On Claim Of Plaintiff.
          Proof Of Service Filed On Claim Of Plaintiff Served Apr-09-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Juan, Jeanette
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 Off Calendar OrderCourt Filing
            Small Claims Hearing Of Mar-28-2008 Is Off Calendar, No Service. Judge Ollie Marie Victoire. Clerk: S. Vantree. Not Reported. (506).
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 3 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008
              Trial Reset To May-02-2008 At 08:30 Am In Dept 506
                Blank 2 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                Correspondence From Deft Janette Juan Filed Challenging Masnner Of Service And Jurisdiction.
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Claim Of Plaintiff
                  Money Claim Of Plaintiff For $4,826.37 Filed By Thread Lounge, Inc As To Defendant Juan, Jeanette Order Setting Trial Issued For Mar-28-2008 At 08:30 Am In Dept 506
                    Request RequestSpace

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 472 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?