Troch, et al v. Anschutz, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-02083-REB-PAC
District Judge Robert E. Blackburn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 6, 2017 at 11:54 PM DT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Clifford Mosher, Plaintiff
No Logo Lawrence Troch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space F. James Donnelly +1 720 493 9814 +1 720 493 9815 fjamesdonnelly@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 192

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
derivatively on behalf of Qwest Communications International, Inc.,

otherQwest Communications International, Inc. David Randell Scott +1 860 537 5537 +1 860 537 4432 drscott@scott-scott.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Joseph Dowd +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 miked@csgrr.com
derivatively on behalf of Qwest Communications International, Inc.,

otherQwest Communications International, Inc. Michael Joseph Dowd +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 miked@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott & Scott, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
derivatively on behalf of Qwest Communications International, Inc.,

otherQwest Communications International, Inc. Marc L Ackerman +1 610 668 1955

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Randell Scott +1 860 537 5537 +1 860 537 4432 drscott@scott-scott.com
No Logo Matthew B. Sellers, Plaintiff
No Logo Satpal Singh, Plaintiff
No Logo Tejinder Singh, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Afshin Mohebbi, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morvillo, Abramowitz, Grand, Iason, Anello & Bohrer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara C. Moses +1 212 856 9600 +1 212 856 9494 bmoses@maglaw.com
No Logo Arthur Andersen, Defendant
Arthur Andersen LLP Arthur Andersen LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Gross LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua David Franklin +1 949 383 2800 +1 949 383 2801 josh@pestotnik.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2002, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tim Atkeson +1 303 863 2313 +1 303 832 0428 Tim_Atkeson@aporter.com
No Logo Cannon Y. Harvey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick J. Baumann +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 fbaumann@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Lyons +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 628 9222 jlyons@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy Coles Oliver +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 coliver@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesus Manuel Vazquez, Jr. +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 jvazquez@rothgerber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terence C. Gill +1 303 297 2900 +1 303 298 0940 tgill@sah.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Summer Square

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil McGill Gorsuch +1 202 203 0548 +3267 326 326 7999 ngorsuch@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Union Pacific Railroad Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christian Hansen +1 303 964 4583 +1 303 964 4585 mchansen@up.com
No Logo Citigroup Global Capital Market Holdings, Inc., Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Citigroup, Inc., The, Defendant
No Logo Craig D. Slater, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2002, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Hofmann +1 303 861 7000 +1 303 866 0200 michael.hofmann@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2002, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesus Manuel Vazquez, Jr. +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 jvazquez@rothgerber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Summer Square

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil McGill Gorsuch +1 202 203 0548 +3267 326 326 7999 ngorsuch@hotmail.com
No Logo Craig R. Barrett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick J. Baumann +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 fbaumann@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Lyons +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 628 9222 jlyons@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy Coles Oliver +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 coliver@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesus Manuel Vazquez, Jr. +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 jvazquez@rothgerber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terence C. Gill +1 303 297 2900 +1 303 298 0940 tgill@sah.com
No Logo Drake S. Tempest, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards Spears Kibbe and Orbe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/30/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee S. Richards +1 212 530 1800 +1 212 530 1801 LRichards@rsko.com
TERMINATED: 01/30/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C. Zinman +1 212 530 1800 +5301 530 530 1801

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoemaker Ghiselli & Schwartz, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul H. Schwartz +1 303 530 3452 pschwartz@sgslitigation.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steamboat Ski & Resort Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/17/2002 Donald C. McLaughlin, Jr.

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven G Sklaver +1 310 789 3100 +1 310 789 3150 ssklaver@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walsh Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Nesland +1 720 566 4221 +1 720 566 4099 jamesnesland@comcast.net
No Logo Frank P. Popoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick J. Baumann +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 fbaumann@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Lyons +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 628 9222 jlyons@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy Coles Oliver +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 coliver@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesus Manuel Vazquez, Jr. +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 jvazquez@rothgerber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terence C. Gill +1 303 297 2900 +1 303 298 0940 tgill@sah.com
No Logo Hank Brown, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick J. Baumann +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 fbaumann@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Lyons +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 628 9222 jlyons@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy Coles Oliver +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 coliver@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesus Manuel Vazquez, Jr. +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 jvazquez@rothgerber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terence C. Gill +1 303 297 2900 +1 303 298 0940 tgill@sah.com
No Logo Jack B. Grubman, Defendant
No Logo James A Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Colorado Court Of Appeals

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004 Stephanie Erin Dunn +1 720 655 5235 +1 303 291 2400 stephanie.dunn@judicial.state.co.us

Toggle Switch Represented by LeBoeuf Lambe Greene & MacRae, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/24/2002 Eden Collins Steele +1 303 291 2600

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004 Robert Nolen Miller +1 303 291 2300 +1 303 291 2400 rmiller@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steamboat Ski & Resort Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/17/2002 Donald C. McLaughlin, Jr.
No Logo Jordan L. Haines, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick J. Baumann +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 fbaumann@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Lyons +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 628 9222 jlyons@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy Coles Oliver +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 coliver@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesus Manuel Vazquez, Jr. +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 jvazquez@rothgerber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terence C. Gill +1 303 297 2900 +1 303 298 0940 tgill@sah.com
No Logo Joseph P. Nacchio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Grudberg +1 212 223 0200 +1 212 223 1942 grudbergm@ballardspahr.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles A. Stillman +1 212 223 0200 +1 212 223 1942 stillmanc@bssfny.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/17/2002, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terence C. Gill +1 303 297 2900 +1 303 298 0940 tgill@sah.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Dennis Kilroy +1 303 634 2000 +1 303 634 2020 jkilroy@swlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steamboat Ski & Resort Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/17/2002 Donald C. McLaughlin, Jr.

Toggle Switch Represented by Stillman, Friedman & Shaw, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimo S. Peluso +1 212 223 0200 +2231 223 223 1942
No Logo Lewis O. Wilks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foster Graham Milstein & Calisher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Lozow +1 303 333 9810 +1 303 333 9786 glozow@fostergraham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Ty Cobb +1 206 637 6437 +6375 637 637 5910 tcobb@hoganlovels.com
No Logo Linda G. Alvarado, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick J. Baumann +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 fbaumann@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Lyons +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 628 9222 jlyons@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy Coles Oliver +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 coliver@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesus Manuel Vazquez, Jr. +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 jvazquez@rothgerber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terence C. Gill +1 303 297 2900 +1 303 298 0940 tgill@sah.com
No Logo Marc B. Weisberg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blain David Myhre blainmyhre@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foster Graham Milstein & Calisher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Lozow +1 303 333 9810 +1 303 333 9786 glozow@fostergraham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steamboat Ski & Resort Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/17/2002 Donald C. McLaughlin, Jr.
No Logo Marilyn Carlson Nelson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick J. Baumann +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 fbaumann@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Lyons +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 628 9222 jlyons@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy Coles Oliver +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 coliver@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesus Manuel Vazquez, Jr. +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 jvazquez@rothgerber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terence C. Gill +1 303 297 2900 +1 303 298 0940 tgill@sah.com
No Logo Peter S. Hellman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick J. Baumann +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 fbaumann@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Lyons +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 628 9222 jlyons@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy Coles Oliver +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 coliver@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesus Manuel Vazquez, Jr. +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 jvazquez@rothgerber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terence C. Gill +1 303 297 2900 +1 303 298 0940 tgill@sah.com
No Logo Philip F. Anschutz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2002, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Hofmann +1 303 861 7000 +1 303 866 0200 michael.hofmann@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2002, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesus Manuel Vazquez, Jr. +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 jvazquez@rothgerber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Summer Square

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil McGill Gorsuch +1 202 203 0548 +3267 326 326 7999 ngorsuch@hotmail.com
Qwest Comunications International, Inc. Qwest Comunications International, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Qwest Communications International, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Shapiro +1 510 874 1000 +1 510 874 1460 dshapiro37@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Robert Boyd +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 dboyd@bsfllp.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Cove, Jr. +1 510 874 1000 +1 510 874 1460 jcove@bsfllp.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirsten E. Gillibrand +1 518 434 0600 kgillibrand@bsfllp.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alfred P. Levitt +1 202 895 7566 +2376 237 237 6131 alevitt@bsfllp.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Schiller +1 202 237 2727 +1 212 446 2350 jschiller@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth F. Rossman, IV +1 303 628 9584 +1 303 623 9222 krossman@lrrc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcy Marie Heronimus +1 303 297 2900 +1 303 298 0940 mheronim@sah.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steamboat Ski & Resort Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/17/2002 Donald C. McLaughlin, Jr.
No Logo Robert S. Woodruff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, US LLP-California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004 Penelope Anne Graboys +1 415 778 4765 +7784 778 778 4701
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004 Susan Samuels Muck +1 415 778 4765 +7784 778 778 4701

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, US LLP-New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wesley Railey Powell +1 212 878 3309 +8788 878 878 8375

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John K Carroll +1 212 735 3000 john.carroll@skadden.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Meister +1 212 735 2100 david.meister@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steamboat Ski & Resort Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/17/2002 Donald C. McLaughlin, Jr.
No Logo Robin R. Szeliga, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry W Bird +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 twb@birdmarella.com
No Logo Stephen M. Jacobsen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foster Graham Milstein & Calisher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Lozow +1 303 333 9810 +1 303 333 9786 glozow@fostergraham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Ty Cobb +1 206 637 6437 +6375 637 637 5910 tcobb@hoganlovels.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steamboat Ski & Resort Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/17/2002 Donald C. McLaughlin, Jr.
No Logo Thomas J. Donohue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick J. Baumann +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 fbaumann@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Lyons +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 628 9222 jlyons@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy Coles Oliver +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 coliver@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesus Manuel Vazquez, Jr. +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 jvazquez@rothgerber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terence C. Gill +1 303 297 2900 +1 303 298 0940 tgill@sah.com
No Logo Vinod Khosla, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick J. Baumann +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 fbaumann@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Lyons +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 628 9222 jlyons@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy Coles Oliver +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 coliver@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesus Manuel Vazquez, Jr. +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 jvazquez@rothgerber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terence C. Gill +1 303 297 2900 +1 303 298 0940 tgill@sah.com
No Logo W. Thomas Stephens, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick J. Baumann +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 fbaumann@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Lyons +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 628 9222 jlyons@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy Coles Oliver +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 coliver@lrrc.com
TERMINATED: 09/08/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesus Manuel Vazquez, Jr. +1 303 623 9000 +1 303 623 9222 jvazquez@rothgerber.com
Office Denver
Filed 10/22/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $67000
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 9/8/2004
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
101-cv-01451-REB-KLM None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, CONSOL, NDISPO, TERMED
  Entries (548) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Mail Returned
MAIL Returned minute order [516-1] addressed to David Meister, Esq. (dlb)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Order
    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer withdrawing motion to stay duplicative depositions in the parallel Qwest litigation pending in the state of CA [491-1] ; withdrawing motion for order partially lifting discovery stay [493-1] scheduling/status conf set for 10:00 12/9/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/26/04 (dlb)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 Notice of Change of Address
      NOTICE of Change of firm affiliation of Trig R. Smith, Lead Plas' counsel (dlb)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 Transcript
        TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on October 14, 2004 before Craig B. Shaffer ( pages: 1 - 16) Prepared By: Avery/Woods (certified copy) (dlb)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Notice of Dismissal of Party
          NOTICE OF DISMISSAL as to party Stephen M. Jacobsen, party Marc B. Weisberg, party Lewis O. Wilks, party Stephen M. Jacobsen party Vinod Khosla: entry date: 10/15/04 (dlb)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
            COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer withdrawing motion to stay duplicative depositions in the parallel Qwest litigation pending in the state of CA [491-1] withdrawing motion for order partially lifting discovery stay [493-1]; finding the motion for forthwith hearing on pla's mtn for an (order) injunction purs to the all writs acts and the anti-injunction act [409-1] moot ; entry date : 10/15/04 Court Reporter: FTR (dlb)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Order
              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer setting oral argument hearing on motion for order partially lifting discovery stay [493-1] and motion to stay duplicative depositions in the parallel Qwest litigation pending in the state of CA [491-1] 9:30 10/14/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/12/04 (dlb)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                REPLY by Qwest to response to motion to stay duplicative depositions in the parallel Qwest litigation pending in the state of CA [491-1] (dlb)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                  Lead Pla's REPLY to response to lead pla's motion for order partially lifting discovery stay [493-1] (dlb)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Notice of Attorney Substitution
                    ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Penelope Anne Graboys, Susan Samuels Muck, Amy M. Ross for Robert S. Woodruff and substituting attorney Wesley Railey Powell (dlb)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                      BRIEF by CalSTRS [California State Teachers' Retirement Systems] in opposition to Qwest's motion to stay duplicative depositions in the parallel Qwest litigation pending in the state of CA [491-1] (dlb)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 Order
                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion for leave to enter special appearance for limtied purpose of opposing Qwest's mtn to stay [505-1] regarding [491-1] motion to stay duplicative depositions in the parallel Qwest litigation pending in the state of CA (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/20/04 (dlb)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                          Dft Anschutz and Slater's Memorandum (BRIEF) in opposition to Lead Pla's motion for order partially lifting discovery stay [493-1] (dlb)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 Joinder
                            Dft Marc B. Weisberg's JOINDER in responses by Qwest, Anschutz and Slater to Lead Pla's motion for order partially lifting discovery stay [493-1] (dlb)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 Joinder
                              Dft James A. Smith's JOINDER in Qwest's response to Lead pla's motion for order partially lifting discovery stay [493-1] (dlb)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Response to Motion
                                Statement (RESPONSE) by Arthur Andersen to Qwest's motion to stay duplicative depositions in the parallel Qwest litigation pending in the state of CA [491-1] (dlb)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Response to Motion
                                  Lead Pla's RESPONSE to motion to stay duplicative depositions in the parallel Qwest litigation pending in the state of CA [491-1] (dlb)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Memorandum
                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for leave to enter special appearance for limtied purpose of opposing Qwest's mtn to stay [505-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                      Tendered Proof of Service re: motion for leave to enter special appearance for limtied purpose of opposing Qwest's mtn to stay [505-1] (dlb)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                        Tendered Opposition of State Action Pla re: motion for leave to enter special appearance for limtied purpose of opposing Qwest's mtn to stay [505-1] (dlb)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Motion for Leave
                                          MOTION by CA State Teachers' for leave to enter special appearance for limtied purpose of opposing Qwest's mtn to stay (dlb)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Order
                                            ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion to dismiss all claims purs to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a) [499-1] terminating case 01-RB-2083 (CBS) only Dismissing with prejudice, Philip f. Anschutz, Joseph P. Nacchio, Linda G. Alvarado, Craig R. Barrett, Hank Brown, Thomas J. Donohue, Jordan L. Haines, Cannon Y. Harvey, Peter S. Hellman, Vindo Khosla, Marilyn Carlson Nelson, Frank P. Popoff, Craig D. Slater, W. Thomas Stephens, Robin R. Szeliga, Robert S. Woodruff, Stephen M. Jacobsen, Drake S. Tempest, Marc B. Weisberg, James A. Smith, Lewis O. Wilks, Afshin Mohebbi and nominal dft Qwest Communications International, Inc. and without prejudice as to dfts Jack B. Grubman, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., dka Solomon Smith Barney Inc., Citigrroup Global Market Holdings, Inc., fka Solomon Smith Barney Holdings, Inc., and Citigroup Inc who are no parties to the settlement (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/9/04 (dlb)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Response to Motion
                                              Qwest's RESPONSE to Lead Pla's motion for order partially lifting discovery stay [493-1] (dlb)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Order
                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer re: Qwest's motion to stay duplicative depositions in the parallel Qwest litigation pending in the state of CA [491-1]; responses due by 9/9/04; reply purs to rules; an oral argument hrg st for 9:30 am 10/14/04; (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/2/04 (dlb)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                  NOTICE of Supplemental Authority related to Qwest's motion to stay duplicative depositions in the parallel Qwest litigation pending in the state of CA [491-1] (dlb)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                    Derivative pla's MOTION to dismiss all claims purs to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a) (dlb)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Memorandum
                                                      MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to stay duplicative depositions in the parallel Qwest litigation pending in the state of CA [491-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by dft James A. Smith (dlb)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004 Order
                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer re: motion for order partially lifting discovery stay response due 9/13/04; an oral argument hrg is set for [493-1] 9:30 10/14/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/26/04 (dlb)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Memorandum
                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for order partially lifting discovery stay [493-1] (dlb)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Transcript
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing on August 18, 2004 before Craig B. Shaffer ( pages: 1 - 31) Prepared By: Avery/Woods (certified copy) (dlb)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004, Terminated: 9/8/2004 Motion for Order
                                                                Lead Pla's Brief and MOTION for order partially lifting discovery stay (dlb)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 Appendix
                                                                  Qwest's APPENDIX filed to motion to stay duplicative depositions in the parallel Qwest litigation pending in the state of CA [491-1] (dlb)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004, Terminated: 9/8/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                    Qwest's MOTION to stay duplicative depositions in the parallel Qwest litigation pending in the state of CA (dlb)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 Order
                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting for reasons stated on the record motion to compel production of docs from dft Arthur Andersen LLP [476-1]; and denying motion for protective order relating to 1/24/01 audit opinion [481-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/20/04 (dlb)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                        COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting for reasons stated on the record motion to compel production of docs from dft Arthur Andersen LLP [476-1], denying for reasons stated on the record motion for protective order relating to 1/24/01 audit opinion [481-1] ; entry date : 8/20/04 Court Reporter: FTR (dlb)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                          Lead Pla's NOTICE of Change of Firm Name of Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP (dlb)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Declaration
                                                                            DECLARATION of Spencer A. Burkholz re: Lead Pla's motion to compel production of docs from dft Arthur Andersen LLP [476-1] (dlb)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                              Lead Pla's Opposition (RESPONSE) to motion for protective order relating to 1/24/01 audit opinion [481-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                Lead Pla's REPLY to response to motion to compel production of docs from dft Arthur Andersen LLP [476-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Order
                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [481-1] motion for protective order relating to 1/24/01 audit opinion, pla to respond by 8/16/04; mtn will be heard during hrg previously set for 8/18/04 at 1:34 pm (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/5/04 (dlb)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for protective order relating to 1/24/01 audit opinion [481-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (gms)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Arthur Andersen's BRIEF in opposition to lead pla's motion to compel production of docs from dft Arthur Andersen LLP [476-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                        Arthur Andersen's MOTION for protective order relating to 1/24/01 audit opinion (dlb)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004 Status Report
                                                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by the parties (dlb)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Order
                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer re: pla's motion to compel production of docs from dft Arthur Andersen LLP, Andersen's response due 7/29/04; a hrg is set for [476-1] 1:30 8/18/04 status report re: settlement of derivative action ddl set for 7/23/04 in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/20/04 (dlb)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Order
                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion requesting to seal lead pla's mtn to compel docs from dft Arthur Andersen LLP [477-1] regarding [476-1] motion to compel production of docs from dft Arthur Andersen LLP in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/16/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                Lead Pla's MOTION requesting to seal lead pla's mtn to compel docs from dft Arthur Andersen LLP (dlb)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                  Lead Pla's MOTION to compel production of docs from dft Arthur Andersen LLP *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elissa J. Preheim for dft Arthur Andersen LLP (dlb)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kwame A. Clement for dft Arthur Andersen LLP (dlb)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Response
                                                                                                        United States of America's Acknowledgement (RESPONSE) to the notice of challenge to the constitutionality of an act of congress by dft Gregory Casey [457-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by dft Philip F. Anschutz and Craig B. Slater (dlb)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by dfts Philip F. anschutz and Craig D. Slater (dlb)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for James A. Smith in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 by Stephanie E. Dunn (gms)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by dft Robin Szeliga (dlb)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Status Report
                                                                                                                  Joint STATUS REPORT (dlb)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    REPLY by Qwest to response to Qwest's motion to consolidate cases 01-RB-1451 (CBS) and 04-RB-0238 (CBS) [430-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                      MAIL Returned mailing by Clerk certificate [459-1] addressed to Marc L. Ackerman, Esq. (dlb)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by dft Robert S. Woodruff (dlb)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by co-lead counsel for plaintiffs (dlb)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Letter
                                                                                                                            LETTER to court from James L. Petersen to be removed from mailing list (dlb)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Lead plaintiffs (dlb)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE MAILING BY CLERK OF dft Gregory Casey's notice of claim of unconstitutionality [457-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; status conf VACATED 5/24/04 ; joint status report ddl set for 6/9/04 in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/26/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    REPLY by Afshin Mohebbi to response to motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [390-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Motion for Hearing/Conference
                                                                                                                                      Request (MOTION) by defendant Gregory Casey for oral argument (hearing) (dlb)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by dfts Lewis O Wilks and Stephen M. Jacobsen (dlb)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by defendant Gregory Casey of Claim of Unconstitutionality (dlb)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            Gregory Casey's REPLY to response in support of Casey's motion to dismiss pla's 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [395-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              REPLY by defendant Vinod Khosla in 1:01-cv-02083 to response to his motion to dismiss pla's fifth consolidated amended complaint [388-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by plaintiff New England Health in 1:01-cv-01451 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Scott B. Schreiber (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Shelby Hunt (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by John A. Freedman (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE Kwame A. Clement (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by J. David Oswalt (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Elissa Preheim (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Tim Atkeson (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Joshua D. Franklin (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by plaintiff Lawrence Troch (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Drake S. Tempest (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by "Derivative Pla" Lawrence Troch to response to motion for leave to file proposed fourth amended derivative complaint [401-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by dft Philip C. Anschutz (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting dft Casey's motion to extend the reply date for dft to reply to lead plas' opp to mtn to dismiss pla's 5th consol amended comp to 5/24/04 [438-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, regarding [395-1] motion to dismiss pla's 5th consolidated amended class action complaint in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:02-cv-00507 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/18/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting dft Mohebbi's motion to extend time to 5/24/04 to reply to lead plas' opp to mtn to dismiss the 5th consol amended class action comp [439-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, regarding [390-1] motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:02-cv-00507 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/18/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION by defendant Afshin Mohebbi to extend time to 5/24/04 to reply to lead plas' opp to mtn to dismiss the 5th consol amended class action comp (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION by dft Gregory Casey to extend the reply date for dft to reply to lead plas' opp to mtn to dismiss pla's 5th consol amended comp to 5/24/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by dft Marc B. Weisburg (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Qwest Communications International, Inc. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer denying motion for issuance of letters of request (rogatory) pursuant to the Hague Convention [389-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/14/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by dft James A. Smith (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                          COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer denying motion for issuance of letters of request (rogatory) pursuant to the Hague Convention [389-1] ; entry date : 5/14/04 Court Reporter: FTR - Reporter Deck - Ctrm 3 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of counsel's firm affiliation of Lerach Coughlin Stoia & Robbins LLP, counsel for plaintiffs (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in support of "Lead Pla's" to dft's response to Lead Pla's motion for issuance of letters of request (rogatory) pursuant to the Hague Convention [389-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004, Terminated: 5/26/2004 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                Qwest's MOTION to consolidate cases 01-RB-1451 (CBS) and 04-RB-0238 (CBS) (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Qwest's LETTER to court re: minute order [419-1] dated 4/27/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to clarify order [417-1] concerning dft's mtns to stay; discovery directed to dft James A. Smith shall be stayed pending a decision on the pending motions to dismiss [418-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:02-cv-00507 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/4/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing on April 12, 2004 before Craig B. Shaffer ( pages: 1 - 83) Prepared By: Avery/Woods (certified copy) (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dft's RESPONSE to Derivative Pla Troch's motion for leave to file proposed fourth amended derivative complaint [401-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Lead Pla's RESPONSE in opposition to Gregory Casey's motion to dismiss pla's 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [395-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Lead Pla's RESPONSE in opposition to Afshin Mohebbi's motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [390-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Lead Pla's RESPONSE in opposition to Vinod Khosla's motion to dismiss pla's fifth consolidated amended complaint [388-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by dft Qwest to pla's motion for issuance of letters of request (rogatory) pursuant to the Hague Convention [389-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dft Weisberg's Amended REPLY to pla's consolidated opposition (response) to dft Weisberg's motion to dismiss the 5th amended class action comp for failure to state a claim and failure to allege short and plain stmt of claim [340-1] and Jacobsen and Wilks (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MAIL Returned minute order [413-1] addressed to Marc L. Ackerman, Esq. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to clarify order [417-1] concerning dft's mtns to stay [418-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer re: pla's motion for issuance of letters of request (rogatory) pursuant to the Hague Convention [389-1]; ddl for response is 4/29/04; replies 5/10/04; telephonic status conf set for 5/12/04 at 10:00 a.m. (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/28/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dft James A. Smith's Request (MOTION) to clarify order [417-1] concerning dft's mtns to stay (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting in part and denying in part dfts Jacobsen and Wilks' motion to enforce automatic stay [327-1] and Tempest's granting motion to enforce automatic stay [351-1]; the court will stay discovery pending action directed to dfts Jacobsen, Weisber, Wilks, Mohebbi, Khosla, and Case, in advance of a decision on their pending mtns to dismiss; with specific exception, the court will STAY DISCOVERY directed to dfts Qwest, Nacchio, Anschutz, Szeliga, Woodruff, Tempest, Slater and Arthur Andersen LLP and non-parties pending resolution of the current mtn to dismiss; (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/23/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST to be added to Service List by Joe R. Whatley, Jr., Whatley Drake LLC (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MAIL Returned minute order [399-1] addressed to Marc L. Ackerman, Esq. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dft Arthur Andersen LLP's REPLY Memorandum of Law in support to their motion to strike [343-1] or in the alternative to motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [343-2] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn striking Weisburg's reply [412-1] to [340-1] Weisberg's motion to dismiss the 5th amended class action comp for failure to state a claim and failure to allege short and plain stmt of claim; dft Weisberg may refile his reply brief, in compliance, by 4/28/04; dft need not refile exhibits (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/20/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [401-1] "Derivative Plas" motion for leave to file proposed fourth amended derivative complaint, dfts response due by 5/3/04 in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/19/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dft Weisberg's REPLY to pla's response to Weisberg's motion to dismiss the 5th amended class action comp for failure to state a claim and failure to allege short and plain stmt of claim [340-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dft Jacobsen's REPLY to pla's response to Jacobsen's motion to dismiss the fifth consolidated amended class action complaint [332-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dft Wilks' REPLY to pla's response to Wilk's motion to dismiss the fifth consolidated amended class action complaint [333-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004, Terminated: 4/27/2004 Motion for Hearing/Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by derivative plaintiff Lawrence Troch in for forthwith hearing on pla's mtn for an (order) injunction purs to the all writs acts and the anti-injunction act (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Qwest's REPLY to pla's opposition (response) to dft's motion to strike [335-1] and motion to dismiss pla's fifth consolidated amended complaint [335-2] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for leave to file proposed fourth amended derivative complaint [401-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Law (BRIEF) by derivative plaintiff Lawrence Troch in support of motion for leave to file proposed fourth amended derivative complaint [401-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Derivative plaintiff Lawrence Troch for leave to file proposed fourth amended derivative complaint (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for issuance of letters of request (rogatory) pursuant to the Hague Convention [389-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Affidavit/Return of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE by derivative plaintiff Lawrence Troch of certificate of complaince [403-1] re: brief [402-1] and motion for leave to file proposed fourth amended derivative complaint [401-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Certificate of Compliance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Compliance by derivative plaintiff Lawrence Troch re: brief [402-1] re: motion for leave to file proposed fourth amended derivative complaint [401-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Gregory Casey by Walter W. Garnsey, Jr. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer taking under advisement on 4/12/04 the motion to enforce automatic stay [327-1], taking under advisement on 4/12/04 the motion to enforce automatic stay [351-1], taking under advisement on 4/12/04 the motion to stay pending determination by Den Dist Ct whether to approve pending stlmt of derivative claims [339-1], taking under advisement on 4/12/04 the motion to extend time to answer extended to: thirty days after ruling on mtn to stay [339-2] in court hrg held 4/12/04 ; entry date : 4/16/04 Court Reporter: FTR (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion to exceed page limitation :re: Oversized Brief [397-1] and the same are accepted for filing in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, granting motion to exceed page limitation :re: oversized brief [394-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/13/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Service by Mail by dft, Stephane D. Martin re: motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [390-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant Gregory Casey to exceed page limitation :re: Oversized Brief (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX filed by defendant Gregory Casey to dft's motion to dismiss pla's 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [395-1] *large document (dlb) Modified on 04/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Gregory Casey to dismiss pla's 5th consolidated amended class action complaint (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Afshin Mohebbi to exceed page limitation :re: oversized brief (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Barbara Moses by defendant Afshin Mohebbi re: dft's motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [390-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Haley B. Fabricant by defendant Afshin Mohebbi re: dft's motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [390-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, re: motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01472, re: motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01527, re: motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01616, re: motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01799, re: motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01930, re: motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-02083, re: motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00333, re: motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00374, re: motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00507, re: motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00658, re: motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00755, re: motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPENDIX OF UNREPORTED CASES CITED filed by dft Afshin Mohebbi to dft's motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [390-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant Afshin Mohebbi to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pla's MOTION for issuance of letters of request (rogatory) pursuant to the Hague Convention *very large document (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant Vinod Khosla in 1:01-cv-02083 to dismiss pla's fifth consolidated amended complaint (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pla's Submission (REPLY) re: response filed by dft's to motion to enforce automatic stay [327-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MAIL Returned minute order [373-1] addressed to Marc L. Ackerman, Esq. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MAIL Returned on 2/18/04 minute order [311-1] addressed to Cauley, Geller, Bowman & Coates (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MAIL Returned on 2/1/04 minute order [308-1] addressed to Cauley, Geeler, Bowman & Coates (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  "Derivative Plas" REPLY Brief in Support to dft's response to "Derivative Plas" motion for order of injunction under the all writs act and the anti-injunction act [322-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dft's REPLY to pla's response to dft's motion to stay pending determination by Den Dist Ct whether to approve pending stlmt of derivative claims [339-1] or to extend time to answer extended to: thirty days after ruling on mtn to stay [339-2] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 *large document (dlb) Modified on 04/07/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINDER by "Derivative plaintiff Lawrence Troch to "Securities Plas'" response [363-1] to dfts Wilks and Jacobsen's motion to enforce automatic stay [351-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER by "Derivative Pla" Lawrence Troch "Securities Plas'" response [365-1] to Drake S. Tempest's motion to enforce automatic stay [351-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in support by dfts Stephen Jacobsen and Lewis Wilks' to pla's response to dft's motion to enforce automatic stay [327-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pla's Opposition (RESPONSE) to Qwest's motion to exceed page limitation :re: Mtn to Strike/Dismiss [338-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pla's Opposition (RESPONSE) to dft Arthur Andersen LLP's motion to strike [343-1] and motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [343-2] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pla's Opposition (RESPONSE) to Qwest's "partial" motion to strike [335-1] and motion to dismiss pla's fifth consolidated amended complaint [335-2] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  "Derivative Pla's" Opposition (RESPONSE) to dfts' motion to stay pending determination by Den Dist Ct whether to approve pending stlmt of derivative claims [339-1] or alternatively to extend time to answer extended to: thirty days after ruling on mtn to stay [339-2] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by dfts, Philip F. Anschutz, Joseph P. Nacchio, Craig D. Slater, James A. Smith, Robin R. Szeliga , Marc B. Weisberg, Robert S. Woodruff to dft Tempest's motion to enforce automatic stay [351-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pla's Consolidated RESPONSE to dfts, Weisberg, Jacobsen and Wilks' motion to dismiss the 5th amended class action comp for failure to state a claim and failure to allege short and plain stmt of claim [340-1]; motion to dismiss the fifth consolidated amended class action complaint [333-1] , motion to dismiss the fifth consolidated amended class action complaint [332-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to extend time to 3/30/04 to resp to dft's mtn to stay [368-1] ; granting motion to withdraw attorney Matthew D. Keiser for Arthur Andersen LLP [370-1] attorney Matthew D. Keiser for Arthur Andersen LLP in 1:01-cv-01451 in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/30/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to withdraw attorney Matthew D. Keiser for Arthur Andersen LLP [370-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion to extend time to reply to dfts' resp to pla's mtn for inj to 4/7/04 [371-1] regarding [322-1] motion for order of injunction under the all writs act and the anti-injunction act (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/29/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Fourth AMENDED DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT [314-1] by plaintiff Lawrence Troch in 1:01-cv-02083; jury demand; adding defendants Afshin Mohebbi, Jack B. Grubman, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004, Terminated: 3/26/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Lawrence Troch to extend time to reply to dfts' resp to pla's mtn for inj to 4/7/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by counsel for Arthur Andersen LLP to withdraw attorney Matthew D. Keiser for Arthur Andersen LLP (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to 3/30/04 to resp to dft's mtn to stay [368-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Lawrence Troch to extend time to 3/30/04 to resp to dft's mtn to stay (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer : re: discovery (cc: all counsel) (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer; accepting the Stipulated Protective Order filed 3/10/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/25/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition (RESPONSE) by plas to Drake S. Tempest's motion to enforce automatic stay [351-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Revised SCHEDULING ORDER Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; Discovery cutoff 5/31/05 ;dispositive motions due 4/29/05 (cc: all counsel) (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pla's Opposition (RESPONSE) to dfts Wilks and Jacobsen's motion to enforce automatic stay [351-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Affidavit/Return of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof of Service (RETURN OF SERVICE) by dft Woodruff of join/joinder [347-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Vinod Khosla on 2/11/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Gregory Casey (not a named defendant) on 3/3/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Afshin Mohebbi on 3/5/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Qwest's RESPONSE to dft Jacobsen and Wilks' motion to enforce automatic stay [327-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [327-1] motion to enforce automatic stay , [331-1] motion for order permitting attendance at scheduling conf for 04-RB-0238(CBS) , [339-1] motion to stay pending determination by Den Dist Ct whether to approve pending stlmt of derivative claims, [339-2] motion to extend time to answer extended to: thirty days after ruling on mtn to stay, [351-1] motion to enforce automatic stay pending motions/in court hrg set for 3:30 4/12/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/15/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pla's RESPONSE to "Derivative Pla's" motion for order of injunction under the all writs act and the anti-injunction act [322-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to enforce automatic stay [351-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submission (STATEMENT) of dft Marc B. Seisberg in connection with the revised scheduling order (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to enforce automatic stay [351-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Motion to Enforce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by dft Drake S. Tempest to enforce automatic stay (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting dfts Wilks, Jacobsen and Weisberg's unopposed motion to extend time to answer extended to: 30 days after filing of Fifth Amended Complaint [316-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798regarding [315-1] complaint in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/10/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to stay pending determination by Den Dist Ct whether to approve pending stlmt of derivative claims [339-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to answer extended to: thirty days after ruling on mtn to stay [339-2] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004, Terminated: 3/12/2004 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by dft Qwest Communication to exceed page limitation :re: Mtn to Strike/Dismiss (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Volume II of APPENDIX filed dft Qwest Communication to motion to strike [335-1] or to dismiss pla's fifth consolidated amended complaint [335-2] *large document (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Volume I of APPENDIX filed by dft, Qwest Communication to motion to strike [335-1] or to dismiss pla's fifth consolidated amended complaint [335-2] *large document (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004, Terminated: 3/12/2004 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by dft, Qwest Communications to strike or to dismiss pla's fifth consolidated amended complaint (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER by dft Robin Szelinga in Qwest's motion to strike [335-1] or in the alternative motion to dismiss pla's fifth consolidated amended complaint [335-2] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINDER by dft Robert Woodruff in Qwest's motion to strike [335-1] or in the alternative motion to dismiss pla's fifth consolidated amended complaint [335-2] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by dft Drake S. Tempest to strike or in the alternative to dismiss pla's 5th conolidated amended complaint (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by dfts Philip F. Anschutz's and Craig D. Slater to strike or in the alternative to dismiss pla's 5th consolidated amended complaint (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF in support of dft Arthur Andersen LLP's motion to strike [343-1] or in the alternative motion to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint [343-2] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by dft Arthur Andersen LLP to strike or in the alternative to dismiss the 5th consolidated amended class action complaint (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dft James A. Smith's JOINDER in Qwest's motion to strike [335-1] or in the alternative motion to dismiss pla's fifth consolidated amended complaint [335-2] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion (JOINDER) by dft Joseph P. Nacchio in Qwest's motion to strike [335-1] or in the alternative motion to dismiss pla's fifth consolidated amended complaint [335-2] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by dft Marc B Weisberg to dismiss the 5th amended class action comp for failure to state a claim and failure to allege short and plain stmt of claim (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by "Individual Dfts" Philip F. Anschutz , Joseph P. Nacchio, Craig D. Slater, Robin R. Szeliga, Robert S. Woodruff , Stephen M. Jacobsen, Drake S. Tempest, Marc B. Weisberg , James A. Smith, Lewis O. Wilks, Cannon Y. Harvey, Peter S. Hellman, Jordan L. Haines , Thomas J. Donohue, Hank Brown, Vinod Khosla, Marilyn Carlson Nelson, Frank P. Popoff , Linda G. Alvarado, Craig R. Barrett to stay pending determination by Den Dist Ct whether to approve pending stlmt of derivative claims or in the alternative to extend time to answer extended to: thirty days after ruling on mtn to stay (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for order permitting attendance at scheduling conf for 04-RB-0238(CBS) [331-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by dft Lewis O. Wilks to dismiss the fifth consolidated amended class action complaint (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by dft Stephen M. Jacobsen to dismiss the fifth consolidated amended class action complaint (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by pla's for order permitting attendance at scheduling conf for 04-RB-0238(CBS) (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to withdraw attorney Seth Aronson, David Hurwitz and Amy Long of O'Melveny & Myers LLP for Qwest Comm Intl Inc [326-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/3/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MAIL Returned order [319-2] in 1:01-cv-01451 dated 2/17/04 addressed to Marc L. Ackerman, Esq. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference on February 23, 2004 before Craig B. Shaffer ( pages: 1 - 100) Prepared By: Avery/Woods (certified copy) (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to withdraw attorney Seth Aronson, David Hurwitz and Amy Long of O'Melveny & Myers LLP for Qwest Comm Intl Inc [326-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Motion to Enforce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Stephen M. Jacobsen, Lewis O. Wilks to enforce automatic stay (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004, Terminated: 3/2/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION by dft's counsel to withdraw attorney Seth Aronson, David Hurwitz and Amy Long of O'Melveny & Myers LLP for Qwest Comm Intl Inc (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; rule 16 conf held on 2/23/04; parties to submit amended schedo by 3/10/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/27/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; discovery ddl set 3/31/05 in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 ; disp mtn ddl set 4/29/05 in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 ; pretrial conf set for 9:30 11/15/05 in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 ; pto ddl set for 11/10/05 in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 ; status conf set for 9:30 6/9/04 in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 ; entry date : 3/10/04 Court Reporter: FTR - Reporter Deck - Ctrm 3 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Certificate of Compliance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Compliance by derivative plaintiff Lawrence Troch re: motion for order of injunction under the all writs act and the anti-injunction act [322-1] and declaration [323-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of David R. Scott by derivative plaintiff Lawrence Troch re: motion for order of injunction under the all writs act and the anti-injunction act [322-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Law in Support of MOTION by Derivative plaintiff Lawrence Troch for order of injunction under the all writs act and the anti-injunction act (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of counsel's address of Kenneth F. Rossman IV atty for dft Qwest Comm Intl Inc (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to answer extended to: 30 days after filing of Fifth Amended Complaint [316-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn ; 4 week jury trial set for 10:30 4/4/05 in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 ; Trial prep conference set for 9:00 4/1/05 in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/18/04 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT by dfts, Lewis O. Wilks, Stephen M. Jacobsen, Marc B. Weisberg re: proposed scheduling order (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; rule 16 conference set for 9:30 2/23/04; ORDERED: all lead counsel to be physically present in the courtroom; (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/17/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Lewis O. Wilks, Stephen M. Jacobsen, Marc B. Weisberg to extend time to answer extended to: 30 days after filing of Fifth Amended Complaint (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MAIL Returned order [298-1] addressed to Cauley, Geiler, Bowman & Coates (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MAIL Returned order [298-1] addressed to Marc S. Henzel, Esq. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MAIL Returned order [298-1] addressed to Marc S. Henzel, Esq. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MAIL Returned order [298-1] addressed to Richards Spears Kibbe & Orbe (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Lead Pla's FIFTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933 AND THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 [89-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798; jury demand (dlb) Modified on 02/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Third AMENDED Derivative COMPLAINT filed by Lawrence Troch, Derivatively on behalf of Qwest Communications International, Inc.[167-1] 1:01-cv-02083 ; jury demand (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by counsel for dfts Anschutz and Slater to withdraw attorney Mark Christian Hansen (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of firm name of Arnold & Porter LLP for dft Arthur Andersen LLP (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to extend time to answer extended to: 30 days from filing of 5th amended consolidated complaint [304-1] regarding [89-1] pla's fourth amended complaint; dfts do not need to make any furthe response and shall have 30 days from the date plas file their 5th Amended Consolidated Complaint to answer; granting dft Tempest's motion to substitute attorney James E. Nesland, Paul H. Schwartz and Steven G. Sklaver of Cooley Godward LLP for Lee S. Richards, Daniel C. Ziman, Neil S. Binder and Seetha Ramachandran of Richards Spears Kibbe & Orbe LLP [309-1] attorney Daniel C. Zinman for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01451, attorney Lee S. Richards III for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01451, attorney Daniel C. Zinman for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01472, attorney Lee S. Richards III for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01472, attorney Daniel C. Zinman for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01527, attorney Lee S. Richards III for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01527, attorney Daniel C. Zinman for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01616, attorney Lee S. Richards III for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01616, attorney Daniel C. Zinman for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01799, attorney Lee S. Richards III for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01799, attorney Daniel C. Zinman for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01930, attorney Lee S. Richards III for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01930, attorney Daniel C. Zinman for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-02083, attorney Lee S. Richards III for Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-02083 and substituting attorney in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/2/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to substitute attorney James E. Nesland, Paul H. Schwartz and Steven G. Sklaver of Cooley Godward LLP for Lee S. Richards, Daniel C. Ziman, Neil S. Binder and Seetha Ramachandran of Richards Spears Kibbe & Orbe LLP [309-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION by dft Drake S. Tempest to substitute attorney James E. Nesland, Paul H. Schwartz and Steven G. Sklaver of Cooley Godward LLP for Lee S. Richards, Daniel C. Ziman, Neil S. Binder and Seetha Ramachandran of Richards Spears Kibbe & Orbe LLP (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [306-1] minute order, dfts have to 3/8/04 to answer or respond to pla's Third Amended Derivative Complaint (anticpated date of filing 2/6/04) in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/30/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer; minute order dated 1/26/04 filed in 02-RB-0464 is stricken from the record (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/30/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to answer extended to: 30 days from filing of 5th amended consolidated complaint [304-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting dft's motion for extension of time to respond to pla's complaint to and including 3/8/04 [302-1] [304-1] regarding [167-1] Pla's Third Amended Derivative Complaint (anticipated date of filing is 2/6/04) (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/29/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MAIL Returned order [298-1] addressed to Marc S. Henzel, Esq. (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by "Remaining Dfts" Qwest Comm Intl Inc , Robin R. Szeliga, Arthur Andersen LLP , James A. Smith, Philip F. Anschutz, Craig D. Slater, Joseph P. Nacchio, Drake S. Tempest , Robert S. Woodruff to extend time to answer extended to: 30 days from filing of 5th amended consolidated complaint (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for extension of time to respond to pla's complaint to and including 3/8/04 [302-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION by defendants in 1:01-cv-01451 , 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 for extension of time to respond to pla's complaint to and including 3/8/04 (pap) Modified on 01/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01451,1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 by Steven Gerald Sklaver (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Withdrawal of Appearance (STATEMENT) by by James Petersen for Indiana Pub Emp Rt F in 1:01-cv-01451 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Rule 16 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; Rule 16 conference set for 9:30 2/23/04 in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01451, defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01472, defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01527, defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01616, defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01799, defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01930, defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-02083 by James E. Nesland (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; status conf held 1/14/04 ; entry date : 1/22/04 Court Reporter: Terri Lindblom (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting in part and denying in part: Qwest's motion to dismiss the fourth consolidated amd cmp [153-1] "Individual Dfts" motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amd cmp [116-1]; Qwest's motion to dismiss the fourth consolidated amd cmp [153-1] dft Arthur Andersen LLP's motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp as more specified in the written order [114-1]; regarding [89-1] "Lead Plaintiffs" Fourth Amended Class Action complaint; pla's shall have to 2/6/04 to file any proposed amended complaint seeking to remedy the pleading defects addressed in this order (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/14/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Drake S. Tempest (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Federal Derivative Plaintiff's January 14, 2004 status conference REPORT (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Lead Pla's Submission (STATEMENT) regarding 1/14/04 status conference (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/9/2004 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's 1/14/04 Status Conference REPORT (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MAIL Returned Scheduling order ; status conf set for 9:00 1/14/04 IN THE JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM addressed to Steven A. Cauley, Esq., Randall K. Puliam, Esq. in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 [288-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, minute order [288-2] in 1:01-cv-01451 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MAIL Returned Scheduling order ; status conf set for 9:00 1/14/04 IN THE JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM addressed to Marc S. Henzel, Esq. in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 [288-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, minute order [288-2] in 1:01-cv-01451 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Arthur Andersen LLP by John A. Freedman (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Arthur Andersen LLP by Scott B. Schreiber (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Arthur Andersen LLP by Matthew D. Keiser (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; status conf set for 9:00 1/14/04 IN THE JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/15/03 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn regarding [285-1] order; matter is now directly assigned to Magistrate Craig B. Shaffer (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/23/03 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn (cc: to counsel) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MAIL Returned re: minute order [281-1] addressed to Robert N. Miller, Esq.; Eden C. Steele, Esq.; LeBoeuf, Lamb, Greene & MacRae, LLP (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland recusing himself from this consolidated action. Clerk to reassign by random draw to another magistrate judge. (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/16/03 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ORDER of Recusal by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan and requesting reassignment to another US Magistrate Judge regarding [282-1] order in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/15/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER from clerk to counsel advising of reassignment to Magistrate Judge Boland re: order [282-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, re: order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (bpm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan recusing herself and requesting reassignment to another magistrate judge (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/14/03 (bpm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting Qwest Comm Intl Inc's motion to strike declaration of Thomas E. Egler filed in support of plas' opps to all dfts' mtns to dismiss [124-1] [142-1] declaration [146-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, declaration [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01472, declaration [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01527, declaration [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01616, declaration [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01799, declaration [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01930, declaration [0-1] in 1:01-cv-02083, declaration [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00333, declaration [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00374, declaration [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00507, declaration [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00658, declaration [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00755, declaration [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00798 in 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/9/03 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting unopposed motion of Wendy Sellers, in her capacity as personal representative of the Estate of Matthew B. Sellers, to substitute the Estate of Matthew B. Sellers for dft Matthew B. Sellers and to w/draw the Estate of Matthew B. Sellers as lead pla [277-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 substituting plaintiff Estate Matt Sellers to case(s) 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798. , terminating party Matthew B. Sellers in 1:01-cv-01451, party Matthew B. Sellers in 1:01-cv-01472, party Matthew B. Sellers in 1:01-cv-01527, party Matthew B. Sellers in 1:01-cv-01616, party Matthew B. Sellers in 1:01-cv-01799, party Matthew B. Sellers in 1:01-cv-01930 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/3/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the motion to substitute the Estate of Matthew B. Sellers for dft Matthew B. Sellers to w/draw the Estate of Matthew B. Sellers as lead pla [277-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Suggestion of Death
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUGGESTION of Death as to lead plaintiff Matthew B. Sellers in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Motion to Substitute Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Matthew B. Sellers in her capacity as personal rep of the estate of Matthew B. Sellers in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930 to substitute the Estate of Matthew B. Sellers for dft Matthew B. Sellers to w/draw the Estate of Matthew B. Sellers as lead pla (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Submission (NOTICE) of Recent Authority by lead plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 in support of their oppositions to motions to dismiss [153-1], [116-1], [114-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by dfts Philip F. Anschutz, Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 re: motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amd cmp [116-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of address of Lasky & Rifkind, Ltd. (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by lead plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to [272-1] Qwest's 7/14/03 supplemental authority (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of SUPPLEMENTAL Authority by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 re: [153-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting motion to withdraw the law firm of Berliner Zisser Walter & McDonald as csl for dft Marc B. Weisberg [269-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798. David Zisser shall continue to represent Mr. Weisberg with firm of Isaacson, Rosenbaum Woods & Levy. (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/6/03 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the motion to withdraw the law firm of Berliner Zisser Walter & McDonald as csl for dft Marc B. Weisberg [269-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by David A. Zisser, csl for defendant Marc B. Weisberg in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 to withdraw the law firm of Berliner Zisser Walter & McDonald as csl for dft Marc B. Weisberg (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS by lead plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to Qwest Comm Intl Inc's 4/4/03 response [266-1], [263-1], [262-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of SUPPLEMENTAL Authority by dts Philip F. Anschutz, Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, re: individual dfts' motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amd cmp [116-1] and Qwest Comm Intl Inc's motion to dismiss the fourth consolidated amd cmp [153-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to 1. lead plas' suppl submission of goverment-initiated cr and cv proceedings [262-1] and 2. dft Arthur Andersen LLP's response to plas' suppl submission [263-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submission (NOTICE) by lead plaintiffs of recent authority in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 in support of their opp to dfts' motion to dismiss [116-1], [114-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting dft Arthur Anderson's req for stay of all proceedings related to plas' motion for tro [62-1], [64-1] to the extent the motion i not mooted by passage of time/occurrence of relevant events in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/2/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by defendant Arthur Andersen LLP in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930 to lead plaintiffs' supplemental submission of Government-Initiated Criminal and Civil Proceedings [262-1] in 1:01-cv-01451 and consolidated cases (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL submission of Federal Government-Initiated Criminal and Civil Proceedings related to this action by lead plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 in support of opposition [150-1], [149-1] to all defendants' motions to dismiss [116-1], [114-1], [153-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel and Change of address of that the law firm of LeBoeuf,Lamb, Greene & MacRae, LLP has withdrawn as csl for dft James A. Smith and the law firm of Perkins Coien LLP has been substituted as csl in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting motion to withdraw as csl [255-1] attorney Charles Walter Lilley for David Tanner in 1:01-cv-01930, attorney Charles Walter Lilley for Herbert S Cohen Trus in 1:02-cv-00333, attorney Charles Walter Lilley for Adele Brody in 1:02-cv-00374, attorney Charles Walter Lilley for Laila Abdelnour in 1:02-cv-00658, attorney Charles Walter Lilley for Seymour Tabacoff in 1:02-cv-00798 in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, [254-1] [253-1] [252-1] [251-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/26/03 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan Lilley's motion to withdraw as csl for pla Tabacoff in 02-RB-798 [253-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan Lilley's motion to withdraw as csl for pla Abdelnour in 02-RB-658 [254-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan Lilley's motion to withdraw as csl for pla Herbert S. Cohen Trust in 02-RB-333 [251-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan Lilley's motion to withdraw as csl fo rpla Tanner in 01-RB-1930 [255-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MAIL Returned order [243-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 addressed to Lee S. Richards csl for defendant Drake S. Tempest - not deliverable as addressed (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Charles W. Lilley csl plaintiff David Tanner in 1:01-cv-01930 to withdraw as csl and ntc of motion (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Charles W. Lilley csl for plaintiff Laila Abdelnour in 1:02-cv-00658 to withdraw as csl and ntc of motion (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Charles W. Lilley csl for plaintiff Seymour Tabacoff in 1:02-cv-00798 to withdraw as csl and ntc of motion (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Charles W. Lilley csl for plaintiff Adele Brody in 1:02-cv-00374 to withdraw as csl and ntc of motion (lam) Modified on 02/19/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Charles W. Lilley csl for plaintiff Herbert S Cohen Trus in 1:02-cv-00333 to withdraw as csl and ntc of motion (lam) Modified on 02/19/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing on 2/13/03 before Mag Judge Coan ( pages: 1-33) Prepared By: Avery/Woods Reporting Service, Inc. (certified copy) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COURTROOM MINUTES AND MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan: denying in its entirety pla's motion to amend stipulated order and lift stay re: [32-1] [190-1] as set forth on the record; denying dfts' motion for leave to file suppl brief in opp to mtn to amd stipulated order & lift stay [247-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 ; entry date : 2/18/03 Court Reporter: Tape 03-10 (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the motion for leave to file suppl brief in opp to mtn to amd stipulated order & lift stay [247-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Tendered supplemental brief submitted by defendants in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 re: motion for leave to file suppl brief in opp to mtn to amd stipulated order & lift stay [247-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendants in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 for leave to file suppl brief in opp to mtn to amd stipulated order & lift stay (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Arthur Andersen LLP in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 by Joshua D. Franklin (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER sealing exhibits and portion of transcript by Judge Robert E. Blackburn: 1. that plas' exhibits 74, 94, 131 & 137, and dft Qwest's exhibits D and Y shall be filed under seal; 2. that pages 95-126 of the official transcript of the court's prliminary injunction hering held 1/28 and 1/29 2003 shall be filed under seal re: [242-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/10/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of address of Richard Spears Kibbe & Orbe LLP by defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn that the plas' motion for preliminary injunction is denied as to the relief sought against dft Qwest Comm Intl Inc [60-2], [60-1] in 1:01-cv-01451 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/6/03 (lam) Modified on 02/06/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to effectuate the Court's 1/28/03 ruling granting Qwest's motion for limited courtroom closure during the evidentiary hearing commencing on 1/28/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINDER by defendant Robin R. Szeliga in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 in dfts' opp [202-1] to pla's motion to amend stipulated order and lift stay re: [32-1] [190-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Robin R. Szeliga in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Terry W. Bird (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of second amended derivative cmp and Entry of Appearance by defendant Robin R. Szeliga in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 signed on 1/30/03 by Terry W. Bird (lam) Modified on 02/03/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document -- Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT Pages 95-126 of Transcript Vol II of Hearing on Preliminary Injunction before Judge Blackburn held 1/28/03 ; Prepared By: Suzanne Claar (SEALED, placed with sealed documents) (lam) Modified on 01/31/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of (Vol III) Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 1/29/03 before Judge Blackburn ( pages: 204-322) Prepared By: Suzanne Claar (certified copy) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT (Vol I & II) of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 1/28/03 before Judge Blackburn ( Vol I pages: 1-79, Vol II pages: 80-203) Prepared By: Claar (certified copy) (lam) Modified on 01/31/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930 by Lee S. Richards (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE and Entry of Appearance by defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 signed on 1/29/03 ; by Lee S. Richards, Esq. (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition (RESPONSE) by defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930 to pla's motion to amend stipulated order and lift stay re: [32-1] [190-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Marc B. Weisberg in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930 by David A. Zisser (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COURTROOM MINUTES (Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Day Two) by Judge Robert E. Blackburn: taking plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction under advisement re: [60-1], [60-2] (plas and dfts' witness and exhibit lists attached) 1:01-cv-01451 ; entry date : 1/30/03 Court Reporter: Suzanne Claar (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting motion by Robert L. Connelly to withdraw as counsel of record for Marc B. Weisberg [217-1]; granting pla's motion for permission to file response to dfts' opps to pla's mtn to amd stipulated order and lift stay [212-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/29/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURTROOM MINUTES (Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Day One) by Judge Robert E. Blackburn ; in court hrg held 1/28/03 ; granting dft's motion for order for a limited courtroom closure during evidentiary hearing; pla's exhibits 94,113,131 & 137 shall remain under seal per the protective order [219-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 ; entry date : 1/30/03 Court Reporter: Suzanne Claar (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Confidentiality Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan : regarding [230-1],, [220-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) (lam) Modified on 01/28/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting unopposed jt motion for protective order re: confidential information [220-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/28/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Michael J. Dowd (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the motion to withdraw attorney [217-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the motion for protective order re: confidential information [220-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by lead plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to Qwest COmm INtl Inc's motion for a limited courtroom closure during evidentiary hearing commencing 1/28/03 [219-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Amended and Corrected Witness and Exhibit Lists for hearing set 1/28/03 submitted by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of subpoena to non-party Albert Rossi by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of subpoena to non-party Bjorn I. Steinhold by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of subpoena to non-party Mitchell S. Hoffman by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed JT MOTION by plaintiffs and defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 for protective order re: confidential information (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 for order for a limited courtroom closure during evidentiary hearing commencing 1/28/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by John Frederick Cove Jr. (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by David W. Shapiro (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by defendant Marc B. Weisberg counsel Robert L. Connelly, Jr. in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 to withdraw as attorney (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Witness and Exhibit lists submitted by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Witness list and description of expert testimony submitted by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT list by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the motion for permission to file response to dfts' opps to pla's mtn to amd stipulated order and lift stay [212-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Tendered response submitted by plaintiff in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 re: motion for permission to file response to dfts' opps to pla's mtn to amd stipulated order and lift stay [212-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by derivative action plaintiff in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 for permission to file response to dfts' opps to pla's mtn to amd stipulated order and lift stay (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Joseph P. Nacchio in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Neil Peck, James D. Kilroy (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 in response to order [195-2] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 of supplemental authority and argument re: whether their section 11 claim bears a sufficient nexus to the Qwestdex assets re: order [195-2] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Alfred P. Levitt (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition (RESPONSE) by defendant James A. Smith in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 to plaintiff's motion to amend stipulated order and lift stay re: [32-1] [190-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition (RESPONSE) by dfts Stephen M. Jacobsen, Lewis O. Wilks in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, to plaintiff's motion to amend stipulated order and lift stay re: [32-1] [190-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: 12/26/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting Ms. Steele's motion for withdrawal of appearance [198-1], [196-1] as counsel for James A. Smith in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930; setting hearing on pla' s motion to amend stipulated order and lift stay re: [32-1] [190-1] 9:00 2/13/03, dfts' response to this mtn due 12/30/02; that csl are to use the correct caption when filing pleadings in these consolidated cases (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/26/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: 12/26/2002 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINDER by defendant Marc B. Weisberg in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930 in defendants' opposition [203-1] to plaintiff's motion to amend stipulated order and lift stay re: [32-1] [190-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: 12/26/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition (RESPONSE) by dfts Qwest Comm Intl Inc, Philip F. Anschutz, Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-01930, Linda G. Alvarado, Craig R. Barrett, Hank Brown, Thomas J. Donohue, Jordan L. Haines, Peter S. Hellman, Qwest Comm Intl Inc, Cannon Y. Harvey, Vinod Khosla, Marilyn Carlson Nelson, Frank P. Popoff, W. Thomas Stephens, Philip F. Anschutz, Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-02083, Qwest Comm Intl Inc , Philip F. Anschutz, Craig D. Slater in 1:03v-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, to pla's motion to amend stipulated order and lift stay re: [32-1] [190-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: 12/26/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition (RESPONSE) by defendant Joseph P. Nacchio in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to pla's motion to amend stipulated order and lift stay re: [32-1] [190-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/24/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the motion to withdraw attorney Eden C. Steele [198-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the motion to withdraw attorney Eden C. Steele [196-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/24/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Scheduling ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn regarding [195-2] order in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 ; telephone conf held 12/19/02 ; in court hrg set for 10:00 1/28/03 in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/24/02 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/24/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James L. Peterson on behalf of Indiana Public Employees' Retirement Fund (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Penelope A. Grayboys for dft, robert S. Woodruff (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:01-cv-01451, defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:01-cv-01472, defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:01-cv-01527, defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:01-cv-01616, defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:01-cv-01799, defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:01-cv-01930, defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:02-cv-00507 on 12/4/02 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by counsel for dft James A. Smith to withdraw attorney Eden C. Steele (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by counsel for dft, James A. Smith to withdraw attorney Eden C. Steele (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting lead pla's req for hearing on preliminary injunction [176-1] ; conf call set for 10:30 12/19/02 to set up hearing date in 1:01-cv-01451 and consolidated cases ; by 1/9/03, the parties may file a statement of updated and suppl authority and argument concerning issue A, as stated in this Order, that the parties' presentations at the hearing shall be limited to the issues outlined in this Order (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/17/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn that the plas' mtn for preliminary injunction is denied as to the preliminary injunction sought against dfts Nacchio and Anschutz re: [155-2] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/16/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of JOINDER by defendant Arthur Andersen LLP in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930 in Qwest's motion to strike declaration of Thomas E. Egler [142-1] and supplemental authority (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant James A. Smith in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 by Stephanie Erin Dunn (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the motion to amend stipulated order order and lift stay re: [32-1] [190-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to amend stipulated order and lift stay re: [32-1] (lam) Modified on 12/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of withdrawal of Marc L. Acker as csl for plaintiff Lawrence Troch in 1:01-cv-02083 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 in support of motion to strike declaration of Thomas E. Egler filed in support of plas' opps to all dfts' mtns to dismiss [124-1] [142-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of second amended cmp by Lewis O. Wilks and Stephen M. Jacobsen in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, signed on 11/19/02 by Ty Cobb, entering his appearance (lam) Modified on 12/06/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of second amended cmp by defendant James A. Smith in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 signed on 11/19/02 by Robert N. Miller, Esq., entering his appearance as csl (lam) Modified on 12/06/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Quest Communication to Lead Pla's motion for hearing on preliminary injunction imposing a constructive trust over the Qwestdex sales proceeds or clarification of the 11/7/02 Court Order [176-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/26/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn: that the plas' emergency motion for temporary restraining order is denied as to the tro sought against Nacchio and Anschutz [155-1]; that this order does not resolve the plas' mtn for preliminary injunction as to Nacchio and Anschutz [155-2], should the plas develop addl evidence which supports their mtn, they may submit a suppl to their mtn, limited to 15 pgs. by 12/9/02; absent such filing by plas, their mtn for preliminary injunction will be denied in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/26/02 (lam) Modified on 11/27/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by lead plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to dfts Nacchio and Anschutz's oppositions to motion freeze assets [155-2] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition (RESPONSE) by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to defendants' motion to strike declaration of Thomas E. Egler filed in support of plas' opps to all dfts' mtns to dismiss [124-1], [142-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion for leave to exceed the court's 10 page limit for reply briefs for its reply in support of mtn to dismiss [173-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, granting motion for leave to exceed the court's 10 page limit for reply briefs for their reply in support of mtn to dismiss page limitation :re: 0 [168-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, granting motion to exceed page limitation re: memorandum in opp to lead plas' emergency motion for tro [165-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, granting motion to exceed page limitation :re: brief in sup of emerg mtn TRO [157-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/19/02 (dlb) Modified on 11/27/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion for leave to file dft Qwest's surreply in opp to lead plas' emergency motion and it is accepted for filing as of 11/6/02 [169-1]; granting the unopposed motion of dft Philip F. Anschutz's for permission to file response to plas reply in support of emergency motion and it is accepted as of 11/7/02 [172-1]; granting motion to submit corrected surreply in opp to lead plas' emergency motion and it is accepted as of 11/7/02 [171-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/15/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002, Terminated: 12/16/2002 Motion for Hearing/Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Req (MOTION) by lead plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 for hearing on preliminary injunction imposing a constructive trust over the Qwestdex sales proceeds or clarification of the 11/7/02 Court Order (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Philip F. Anschutz, Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, Cannon Y. Harvey in 1:01-cv-02083, Philip F. Anschutz, Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, by Mark Christian Hansen, Neil McGill Gorsuch (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corrected SURREPLY by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 in opp to lead plas' emergency motion [155-1], [155-2] (lam) Modified on 11/15/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to plas reply in support of emergeny motion [155-1], [155-2] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn: that the plaintiffs' emergency motion for temporary restraining order, is denied as to the relief sought against defendant Qwest Communications International, Inc. [155-1], [155-2] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/7/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Tendered response to reply submitted by defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755,1:02-cv-00798 re: motion for permission to file response to plas reply in support of emergency motion [172-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002, Terminated: 11/15/2002 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 for leave to exceed the court's 10 page limit for reply briefs for its reply in support of mtn to dismiss (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002, Terminated: 11/14/2002 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION by defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 for permission to file response to plas reply in support of emergency motion (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Tendered corrected surreply submitted by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 re: motion for leave to submit corrected surreply in opp to lead plas' emergency motion [171-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002, Terminated: 11/14/2002 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc, in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 for leave to submit corrected surreply in opp to lead plas' emergency motion (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SURREPLY by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 in opp to lead plas' emergency motion [155-1], [155-2] (lam) Modified on 11/15/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 in support of emergency motion 1. for temporary restraining order and order to show cause why a prelim injunction should not be entered prohibiting the transfer of the Qwestdex assets or freezing and imposing a constructive trust over the Qwestdex sales proceeds and the insider trading proceeds of dfts Nacchio and Anschutz, 2. accounting of insider trading proceeds, and 3. limited expedited discovery re: [155-1], [155-2] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Tendered surreply submitted by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 re: motion for leave to file surreply in opp to lead plas' emergency motion [169-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 for leave to file surreply in opp to lead plas' emergency motion (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION by individual defendants Joseph P. Nacchio, Philip F. Anschutz, Robin R. Szeliga, Robert S. Woodruff, Drake S. Tempest, Craig D. Slater, Stephen M. Jacobsen, James A. Smith, and Lewis O. Wilks in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 for leave to exceed the court's 10 page limit for reply briefs for their reply in support of mtn to dismiss page limitation :re: 0 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second AMENDED Derivative COMPLAINT [1-1] in 1:01-cv-02083 by plaintiff Lawrence Troch, derivatievely on behalf of Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-02083; jury demand terminating plaintiffs Satpal Singh, Tejinder Singh, Matthew B. Sellers, Clifford Mosher, defendant Arthur Andersen, Andersen LLP; adding defendant Robin R. Szeliga (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting plas' motion to file second amended derivative complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-02083 [137-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/6/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to exceed page limitation re: memorandum in opp to lead plas' emergency motion for tro (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Tendered appendix of unpublished cases cited in tendered memorandum in opp to lead plas' emergency motion for tro [0-0] submitted by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam) Modified on 11/06/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Tendered attachments submitted by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to tendered memorandum in opp to lead plaintiffs' emergency motion for tro [0-0] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Tendered memorandum in opp to lead plaintiffs' emergency motion submitted by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to lead plaintiffs' emergency motion for tro [0-0] (lam) Modified on 11/06/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Motion for Hearing/Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc and Philip F. Anschutz in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, for a forthwith hearing on plas' mtn for a tro [155-1], [155-1], [155-2] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to plaintiffs' emergency motion for temporary [155-1], [155-2] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by defendant Joseph P. Nacchio in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to lead plas' emergency motion for 1. temporary restraining order [155-1] and an order to show cause why a prelim injunction should not be entered prohibiting the transfer of the Qwestdex assets or freezing and imposing a constructive trust over the Qwestdex sales proceeds and the insider trading proceeds of dfts Nacchio and Anschutz; 2. accounting of insider trading proceeds; and 3. limited expedited discovery [155-2] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Lead Pla's APPENDIX of unreported authorities filed in support of motion for temporary restraining order [155-1], to motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [155-2] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Lead Pla's DECLARATION of Bjorn I. Steinholt re: motion for temporary restraining order [155-1], re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [155-2] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Lead Pla's DECLARATION of Albert Rossi, CPA re: motion for temporary restraining order [155-1] re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [155-2] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Lead Pla's NOTICE of additional class representative (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Lead Pla's MOTION to exceed page limitation :re: brief in sup of emerg mtn TRO (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Tendered Information for TRO re: motion for temporary restraining order [155-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [155-2] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Request for forthwith hearing re: motion for temporary restraining order [155-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [155-2] in 1:01-cv-01451, re: motion for temporary restraining order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01472, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [0-2] in 1:01-cv-01472, re: motion for temporary restraining order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01527, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [0-2] in 1:01-cv-01527, re: motion for temporary restraining order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01616, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [0-2] in 1:01-cv-01616, re: motion for temporary restraining order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01799, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [0-2] in 1:01-cv-01799, re: motion for temporary restraining order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01930, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [0-2] in 1:01-cv-01930, re: motion for temporary restraining order [0-1] in 1:01-cv-02083, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [0-2] in 1:01-cv-02083, re: motion for temporary restraining order [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00333, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [0-2] in 1:02-cv-00333, re: motion for temporary restraining order [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00374, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [0-2] in 1:02-cv-00374, re: motion for temporary restraining order [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00507, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [0-2] in 1:02-cv-00507, re: motion for temporary restraining order [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00658, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [0-2] in 1:02-cv-00658, re: motion for temporary restraining order [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00755, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [0-2] in 1:02-cv-00755, re: motion for temporary restraining order [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00798, re: motion for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds [0-2] in 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Lead Pla's MOTION for temporary restraining order , and for order show cause why a prelim inj should not be entered re: trans of Qwestdex assets, freezing, imposing constr trust over proceeds (dlb) Modified on 11/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental DECLARATION of Terence C. Gill re: motion to dismiss the 4th consolidated amended complaint [153-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, re: motion to dismiss the 4th consolidated amended complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01472, re: motion to dismiss the 4th consolidated amended complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01527, re: motion to dismiss the 4th consolidated amended complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01616, re: motion to dismiss the 4th consolidated amended complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01799, re: motion to dismiss the 4th consolidated amended complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01930, re: motion to dismiss the 4th consolidated amended complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-02083, re: motion to dismiss the 4th consolidated amended complaint [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00333, re: motion to dismiss the 4th consolidated amended complaint [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00374, re: motion to dismiss the 4th consolidated amended complaint [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00507, re: motion to dismiss the 4th consolidated amended complaint [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00658, re: motion to dismiss the 4th consolidated amended complaint [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00755, re: motion to dismiss the 4th consolidated amended complaint [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defenant Qwest Communications International, Inc.'s MOTION to dismiss the fourth consolidated amd cmp (dlb) Modified on 04/07/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Law (BRIEF FILED) by Athur Andersen LLP motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [114-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01472, motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01527, motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01616, motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01799, motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01930, motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [0-1] in 1:01-cv-02083, motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00333, motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00374, motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00507, motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00658, motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00755, motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPENDIX filed by pla's to pla's opposition brief [150-1] ,to opposition brief [149-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01472, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01472, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01527, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01527, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01616, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01616, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01799, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01799, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01930, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-01930, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-02083, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:01-cv-02083, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00333, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00333, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00374, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00374, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00507, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00507, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00658, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00658, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00755, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00755, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00798, to opposition brief [0-1] in 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pla's BRIEF in opposition to Invididual dfts' and Qwest Communciation's motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amd cmp [116-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by pla's in opposition to Arthur Andersen's motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [114-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Certificate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended CERTIFICATE of Service for dft, Athur Andersen LLP's reply memo of law in support of its mtn to dismiss pla's 4th consolidated amended class action complaint (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion to file oversized brief re: motion to dismiss fourth consolidated cmp [113-1] , granting motion for leave to file motion exceeding page limitation re: memorandum of law in support of mtn to dismiss [115-1] granting motion for leave to file two oversized briefs in opp to dfts' three mtns to dismiss the fourth consolidated amd class action cmp [124-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/4/02 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Terence C. Gill in support of dft Qwest Intl Inc's and the individual dfts' reply briefs re: motion reply [141-1], motion reply [145-1], motion reply [143-1] (in exhibit room) in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam) Modified on 11/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by individual defendants Joseph P. Nacchio, Philip F. Anschutz, Robin R. Szeliga, Robert S. Woodruff, Drake S. Tempest, Craig D. Slater, Stephen M. Jacobsen, James A. Smith, Lewis O. Wilks in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, in support of motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amd cmp [116-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY Memorandum of law by defendant Arthur Andersen LLP in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 in support of motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp [114-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 in support of motion to dismiss the fourth consolidated amended complaint (motion tendered document) re: [113-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to strike declaration of Thomas E. Egler filed in support of plas' opps to all dfts' mtns to dismiss [124-1] (oppositions tendered) (lam) Modified on 11/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY Brief by defendant Marc B. Weisberg in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 in support of motion to dismiss fourth consolidated amd cmp [116-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant James A. Smith in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 by Eden Collins Steele (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the motion to file second amended derivative complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-02083 [137-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Submission of defendants' further Admissions (STATEMENT) by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Tendered proposed second amended derivative complaint submitted by plaintiff Lawrence Troch in 1:01-cv-02083 re: motion to file second amended derivative complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-02083 [137-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Uncontested MOTION by plaintiff Lawrence Troch in 1:01-cv-02083 to file second amended derivative complaint [0-1] in 1:01-cv-02083 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting Seth Aronson and David Hurwitz of O'Melveny & Myers LLP unopposed motion to withdraw as counsel for individual defendants Nacchio, Szeliga, Woodruff, Jacobsen, Tempest, Weisberg, Smith, Anschutz, Wilks and Slater [125-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/30/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting Donal C. McLaughlin, Jr's motion to withdraw appearance as counsel for dft Qwest Comm Intl Inc. [126-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/29/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Jonathan D. Schiller (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by David R. Boyd (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Kenneth F. Rossman IV (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Kirsten E. Gillibrand (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Marcy M. Heronimus (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting unopposed motion to withdraw Terence C. Gill and Donald C. McLaughlin Jr. as attorneys for individual dfts Nacchio, Szeliga, Woodruff, Jacobsen, Tempest, Weisberg, Smith, Anschutz, Wilks and Slater [121-1] in 1:01-cv-01451 and consolidated cases (cc: all counsel) : 10/17/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan Donal C. McLaughlin, Jr.s's motion to withdraw appearance as counsel for dft Qwest Comm Intl Inc. [126-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the unopposed motion to withdraw counsel for individual defendants [125-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Donald C. McLaughlin, Jr. in 1:01-cv-01451 and consolidated cases to withdraw appearance as counsel for dft Qwest Comm Intl Inc. (lam) Modified on 10/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Seth Aronson and David Hurwitz of O"Melveny & Myers LLP in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01451 and consolidated cases to withdraw as counsel for individual defendants (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Tendered Declaration of Thomas E. Egler in support of plas' opps to all dfts' mtns to dismiss Vol II of II submitted by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 re: motion for leave to file two oversized briefs in opp to dfts' three mtns to dismiss the fourth consolidated amd class action cmp [124-1] (placed in exhibit room) (lam) Modified on 10/16/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Tendered declaration of Thomas E. Egler in support of plas' opps to all dfts' mtns to dismiss Vol I of II submitted by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 re: motion for leave to file two oversized briefs in opp to dfts' three mtns to dismiss the fourth consolidated amd class action cmp [124-1] (placed in exhibit room) (lam) Modified on 10/16/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Tendered appendix of unreported authorites in support of plas' oppositions to all dfts' mtns to dimiss the fourth consolidated amd class action cmp submitted by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 re: motion for leave to file two oversized briefs in opp to dfts' three mtns to dismiss the fourth consolidated amd class action cmp [124-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Tendered opposition to Arthur Andersen LLP's mtn to dismiss the fourth amd class action cmp submitted by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 re: motion for leave to file two oversized briefs in opp to dfts' three mtns to dismiss the fourth consolidated amd class action cmp [124-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Tendered opposition to the individual dfts' and Qwest Comm Intl Inc's mtns to dismiss the fourth amd class action cmp submitted by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1 :01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 re: motion for leave to file two oversized briefs in opp to dfts' three mtns to dismiss the fourth consolidated amd class action cmp [124-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 for leave to file two oversized briefs in opp to dfts' three mtns to dismiss the fourth consolidated amd class action cmp (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the motion to withdraw Terence C. Gill and Donald C. McLaughlin Jr. as attorneys for individual dfts [121-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:01-cv-01451, defendant Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-01451, defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:01-cv-01472, defendant Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-01472, defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:01-cv-01527, defendant Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-01527, defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:01-cv-01616, defendant Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-01616, defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:01-cv-01799, defendant Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-01799, defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:01-cv-01930, defendant Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-01930, defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant Linda G. Alvarado in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant Craig R. Barrett in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant Hank Brown in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant Thomas J. Donohue in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant Jordan L. Haines in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant Peter S. Hellman in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant Cannon Y. Harvey in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant Vinod Khosla in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant Marilyn Carlson Nelson in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant Frank P. Popoff in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant W. Thomas Stephens in 1:01-cv-02083, defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:02-cv-00333, defendant Craig D. Slater in 1:02-cv-00333, defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:02-cv-00374, defendant Craig D. Slater in 1:02-cv-00374, defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:02-cv-00507, defendant Craig D. Slater in 1:02-cv-00507, defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:02-cv-00658, defendant Craig D. Slater in 1:02-cv-00658, defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:02-cv-00755, defendant Craig D. Slater in 1:02-cv-00755, defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:02-cv-00798, defendant Craig D. Slater in 1:02-cv-00798 by Frederick J. Baumann (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION by dfts Joseph P. Nacchio Robin R. Szeliga,Robert S. Woodruff, Stephen M. Jacobsen, Drake S. Tempest, Marc B. Weisberg, James A. Smith, Philip F. Anschutz, Lewis O. Wilks, Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798, to withdraw Terence C. Gill and Donald C. McLaughlin Jr. as attorneys for individual dfts (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Joseph P. Nacchio in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Michael J. Grudberg (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Joseph P. Nacchio in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Charles A. Stillman (gms) Modified on 10/07/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Philip F. Anschutz, Linda G. Alvarado, Craig R. Barrett, Hank Brown, Thomas J. Donohue, Jordan L. Haines, Peter S. Hellman, Cannon Y. Harvey, Vindod Khosla, Marilyn Carlson Nelson, Frank P. Popoff, Craig D. Slater and W. Thomas Stephens in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by James M. Lyons, Cindy M. Coles-Oliver, Jesus Manuel Vazquez Jr. (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 by Daniel C. Zinman (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to file oversized brief re: motion to dismiss fourth consolidated cmp (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Tendered supplmental declaration of Terence G. Gill submitted by individual dfts and dft Qwest Intl Inc's in support of motions to dismiss [114-1], [113-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam) Modified on 09/24/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by individual dfts Joseph P. Nacchio, Philip F. Anschutz, Robin R. Szeliga, Drake S. Tempest, Robert S. Woodruff, Craig D. Slater, Stephen M. Jacobsen, Marc B. Weisberg, James A. Smith , Lewis O. Wilks in 1:01-cv-01451, 01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-0283; 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-0374, 1:02-cv-0507, 1:02-cv-0658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to dismiss fourth consolidated amd cmp (lam) Modified on 09/24/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION by defendant Arthur Andersen LLP in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 for leave to file motion exceeding page limitation re: memorandum of law in support of mtn to dismiss (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Tendered memorandum of law submitted by defendant Arthur Andersen LLP in 1:01-cv-01451 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 re: motion to dismiss fourth amended class action cmp [114-1] (lam) Modified on 09/24/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant Arthur Andersen LLP in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, t 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 to dismiss fourth consolidated amended class action cmp (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Tendered motion to dismiss the fourth consolidated amd cmp re: dft Quest Comm Intl Inc's motion to file oversized brief re: motion to dismiss fourth consolidated cmp [113-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Marc B. Weisberg in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 by Gary Lozow, Robert D. Connelly Jr., Blain David Myhre (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED Entry of Appearance by Susan Samuels Muck attorney for defendant Robert S. Woodruff adding address information in in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00507 re: [97-1] (lam) Modified on 09/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED Entry of Appearance by John K. Carroll counsel for defendant Robert S. Woodruff adding address information in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00507 re: [105-1] (lam) Modified on 09/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Ross attorney for defendant Robert S. Woodruff adding address information in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00507 re: [96-1] (lam) Modified on 09/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED Entry of Appearance by Penelope A. Graboys attorney for defendant Robert S. Woodruff adding address information in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083,1:02-cv-00507 re: [98-1] (lam) Modified on 09/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED Entry of Appearance by David Meister attorney for defendant Robert S. Woodruff adding address information in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00507 re: [106-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00507 by David Meister (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00507 by John K. Carroll (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Philip F. Anschutz, Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Bruce F. Black, Michael James Hofmann (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Joseph P. Nacchio in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Kimo S. Peluso (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Joseph P. Nacchio in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Charles A. Stillman (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Drake S. Tempest in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 by Lee S. Richards III (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Robin R. Szeliga in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 by Terry W. Bird, Vincent J. Marella, Mark T. Drooks, Thomas Vincent Reichert, Jennifer Lynn Coon (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00507 by Penelope Anne Graboys (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00507 by Amy M. Ross (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00507 by Susan Samuels Muck (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Lewis O. Wilks in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 01-cv-02083 by Ty Cobb (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant James A. Smith in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 by Robert N. Miller (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Stephen M. Jacobsen in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 by Ty Cobb (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn: granting the stipulated motion to withdraw dfts' prior motion to dismiss [92-1]; that dfts' motion to dismiss [34-1] is withdrawn in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/10/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Motion to Withdraw Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulated MOTION by lead plaintiffs New England Health, Clifford Mosher, Matthew B. Sellers, Tejinder Singh and Satpal Singh and dfts Comm Intl Inc, Clifford Mosher in bin R. Szeliga, Robert S. Woodruff, Stephen M. Jacobsen, Drake S.Tempest, Marc B. Weisberg, James A. Smith and Craig D. Slater in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 to withdraw dfts' prior motion to dismiss (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by defendant Philip F. Anschutz in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 signed on 8/27/02 ; by Donald C. McLaughlin, Jr. (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE COURTROOM MINUTES AND MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan ; discovery ends 7/03; dispo mtns ddl 9/30/02; trial is tentatively set for 6/7/04 and is set for 4 weeks; class certification mtn ddl is 120 days into discovery period 1:01-cv-01451, in 1:01-cv-01472, in 1:01-cv-01527, in 1:01-cv-01616, in 1:01-cv-01799, in 1:01-cv-01930, in 1:01-cv-02083, in 1:02-cv-00333, in 1:02-cv-00374, in 1:02-cv-00507, in 1:02-cv-00658, in 1:02-cv-00755, in 1:02-cv-00798 ; dft's motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint [34-1] is moot because of filing of the 4th consolidated amd class action complaint; csl to file a stipulated pleading with the court re: the status of the mtn to dismiss; on 4/26/02 the court stayed the action pending decision from the federal court in Houston, plas' csl will look at the order from the court in Houston, and notify the court by the end of the wk the status of the mtns filed 4/17 and 4/18 2002; dfts are filing a mtn to dismiss which is believed will dismiss some if not all of the claims in the cmp, it the mtn to dismiss is denied plas' cls would move for class certification; csl advised the mtn to dismiss would provide a statutory stay of discovery in this case would like to have that stay applied to the fullest extent over the ERISA cases as well; the briefing schedule on the response to the 4th amd cmp will be mtns to dismiss as follows: Qwest's mtn to ext the response date to the 4th amd cmp is granted, all dfts' responses are due 9/20/02, plas' responses to the mtns to dismiss are due by 10/15/02, dfts replies are due 10/31/02; close of discovery is changed to 9/1/03 ; entry date : 8/30/02 Court Reporter: Tape 02-93 (cc: all counsel) (lam) Modified on 09/03/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Fourth Consolidated AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF SECURITIES ACT OF 1933 AND SECURITIES ACT OF 1934 [77-1] by lead plaintiffs re: [77-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658, 1:02-cv-00755, 1:02-cv-00798 adding defendants Philip F. Anschutz, Craig D. Slater ; jury demand (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting stipulated motion re: lead plas' filing of a fourth amended class action complaint [77-1] [83-1]; that dft's answer or other response is due no later than 9/6/02; that the motion for correction [74-1], [74-2] is granted in in 1:01-cv-01451 and consolidated cases (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/22/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the stipulated motion re: the filing of a fourth amended class action complaint [77-1] [83-1] and defendants response to same in 1:01-cv-01451 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan ; status and case management conf set for 1:30 8/27/02 in 1:01-cv-01451 and consolidated cases (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/31/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn consolidating as a member case, 02-RB-798 with lead case 01-RB-1451; that the defendants' response ddl shall be controlled by orders entered in 01-RB-1451; the consolidated cases shall be captioned as set forth in this Order (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/3/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/27/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Consolidating Cases by Judge Robert E. Blackburn: that the pla's stipulated motion to hold in abeyance dft's response to complaint (filed in 02-RB-755) is granted in part as follows: consolidating 02-RB-755 as a Member Case with Lead Case 01-RB-1451; that dfts' response ddl shall be controlled by orders entered in 01-RB-1451; that pla's req that the ddl for dfts' response be held in abeyance is denied as moot; and the consolidated actions shall be captioned as set forth in this Order (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/27/02 (lam) Modified on 06/27/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Tendered proposed fourth consolidated amended class action complaint for violation of the Securities Act of 1933 and the Securities Action of 1934 submitted by lead plaintiffs New England Health, Mosher, Sellers, Tejinder Singh and Satpal Singh in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, re: motion to the filing of a fourth amended class action complaint [77-1] [83-1] 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527; 1:01-cv-01616; 1:01-cv-01799; 1:01-cv-01930; 1:01-cv-02083; 1:02-cv00333; 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulated MOTION by lead plaintiffs New England Health Care Employees Pension Fund, Mosher, Sellers, Tejinder Singh and Satpal Singh and defendants Qwest Comm Intl Inc, Nacchio, Szeliga, Woodruff, Jacobsen, Tempest, Weisberg, Smith, Wilks, Slater and Arthur Andersen LLP in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00333, 1:02-cv-00374, 1:02-cv-00507, 1:02-cv-00658 to the filing of a fourth amended class action complaint [77-1] and defendants' response to same (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff Lawrence Troch in 1:01-cv-02083 by Mark L. Ackerman (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO HOLD IN ABEYANCE DFTS' RESP TO COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan regarding [77-1] complaint in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083; upon stip mtn pla and dfts, Qwest Comm, Nacchio and Szeliga, that dfts' resp to pla's comp is held in abeyance until further order of court (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/14/02 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:02-cv-00507, defendant Joseph P. Nacchio in 1:02-cv-00507, defendant Afshin Mohebbi in 1:02-cv-00507, defendant Robin R. Szeliga in 1:02-cv-00507, defendant Robert S. Woodruff in 1:02-cv-00507 by attorneys for the dfts Donald C. McLaughlin on 5/9/02 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/9/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan that the lead plaintiffs' third consolidated amended class action complaint for violation of the Securtities Exchange Act of 1934 [77-1] tendered 5/1/02, shall be date stamped and filed with the court nunc pro tunc 5/1/02 in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/9/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Consolidating Cases by Judge Robert E. Blackburn: that the portion of the court's order [9-1] that consolidated 02-RB-464 with 01-RB-1451 is rescinded; that 02-D-333, 02-D-274, 02-D-507 and 02-RB-658 are consolidated into In Re Qwest Communications International, Inc. Securities Litigation, 01-RB-1451 and any such case not assigned to Judge Blackburn shall be reassigned; granting lead plas' motion to consolidate all related actions is granted as set forth above; that any later filed cases the court deems to be sufficiently related to these cases shall be consolidated with these cases; that the lead plas' req for an order prohibiting the filing of any other related actions unless those actions formally are related to this action, as stated in their motion to consolidate related actions is denied; that lead plas' req for an injunction prohibiting attempts to communicate with potential class members, as stated in their motion to consolidate all related action is denied [44-1]; that lead pla's motion to expedite hearing is denied as moot [51-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/7/02 (lam) Modified on 05/07/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002, Terminated: 8/1/2002 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00464 for consolidation of related cases 02-RB-470 and 02-RB-714 and for appointment of co-chair counsel (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Third Consolidated AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 [57-1] by lead plaintiffs (filed nunc pro tunc 5/1/02) in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00464 ; jury demand (lam) Modified on 05/09/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00464 to correct typographical error in motion for consolidation of related cases [74-1] and motion for appointment of co-chair counsel [74-2] 1:01-cv-01451 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Certificate of Compliance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Compliance by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, :01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00464 re: motion for consolidation of related cases 02-RB-470 and 02-RB-714 [74-1] and motion for appointment of co-chair counsel [74-2] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting lead plas' motion to filing of third amend class action complaint [57-1] by 5/1/02 and dfts shall respond by 6/14/02 [68-1], in lieu of filing responses to plas' second amended complaint in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00464 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/3/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Tendered [proposed] third consolidated amended class action complaint for violation of the Securites Exchange Act of 1934 submitted by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00464 re: re: submission [72-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submission (NOTICE) by lead plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00464 of [proposed] third consolidated amd class action complaint for violation of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Motion for Hearing/Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Partially unopposed request (MOTION) by defendant Qwest Comm Intl Inc in 1:02-cv-00464 for case management conf re: the reorganization & management of related cases 02-RB-470 & 02-RB-714 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Qwest Comm Intl Inc, Joseph P. Nacchio, Robin R. Szeliga, Robert S. Woodruff, Stephen M. Jacobsen, Drake S. Tempest, Marc B. Weisberg, James A. Smith, and Lewis O. Wilks in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00464 signed on 4/29/02 by Donald C. McLaughlin, Jr., Esq (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the stipulated motion re: lead plas' filing of third amend class action complaint [57-1] and dfts' response to same [68-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00464 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002, Terminated: 5/2/2002 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulated MOTION by lead plaintiffs and dfts Arthur Andersen LLP in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00464, to filing of third amend class action complaint [57-1] by 5/1/02 and dfts shall respond by 6/14/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting dft Andersen's unopposed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to second amd class action cmp by 5/31/02 [61-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00464 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/26/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting req for stay of all proceedings related to plas' motion for tro [64-1] as follows: all proceedings related to the TRO motion, including a response from Andersen are stayed pending a decision from the federal court in Houston and either a notice from this court that the matter is reopened, or a ntc from lead plas that they intend to proceed on the TRO motion in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00464 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/26/02 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the req for stay of all proceedings related to lead plas' motion for tro [64-1] in 1:01-cv-01451, 1:01-cv-01472, 1:01-cv-01527, 1:01-cv-01616, 1:01-cv-01799, 1:01-cv-01930, 1:01-cv-02083, 1:02-cv-00464 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?