Thaddeus T. Van Dyke v. Alyssa Arney
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CSM 10 832283
Superior Court Judge Paul Slavit, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Van Dyke, Thaddeus T., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Arney, Alyssa, Defendant
Cause of Action Money
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011
Exhibits Ordered Destroyed
    Blank 11 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010
    Exhibits Returned To Defendant Arney, Alyssa Additional Plaintiff Exhibits
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 Notice of Entry of Judgment
      Notice Of Entry Of Judgment
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 Judgment On Plaintiff's Claim
        The Court Has Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Van Dyke, Thaddeus T. Recover From Defendant Arney, Alyssa $438.50 Principal, $109.00 Costs, Total Judgment $547.50, Defendant Shall Rececive Credit For Her Previous Payment Of $295.93. Stay Of Execution 30 Days Plaintiff's And Defendant's Exhibits Received
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 8 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010
          Small Claims Hearing Of May-12-2010 - Judgment.
            Blank 7 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010
            Small Claims Calendar Of May-12-2010 - Taken Under Submission As Of May-12-2010 By Paul Slavit. Appearance By Plaintiff And Defendant. Plaintiff And Defendant Exhibits Retained. Clerk: S. Vantree. Not Reported. (506)
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Small Claims - Continue Order
              Small Claims Hearing Of Apr-15-2010 - Continued Per Stipulation Of All Parties To May-12-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 506. Appearance By Plaintiff And Defendant. Commissioner: Paul Slavit. Clerk: S. Vantree. Not Reported. (506)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Proof Of Service Filed On Claim Of Plaintiff Fee For Service:$30.00
                Proof Of Service Filed On Claim Of Plaintiff (fee For Service:$30.00) Served Feb-26-2010, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Arney, Alyssa
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 4 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010
                  Trial Reset To Apr-15-2010 At 08:30 Am In Dept 506 Trial Of Mar-03-2010 Is Taken Off Calendar
                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010
                    Declaration Of Non Service. Filed By Plaintiff Van Dyke, Thaddeus T.
                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: 1/8/2010
                      Copying Fees (8 Page) Paid By Plaintiff Van Dyke, Thaddeus T.
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: 1/8/2010 Claim Of Plaintiff
                        Money Claim Of Plaintiff For $6,514.82 Filed By Van Dyke, Thaddeus T. As To Defendant Arney, Alyssa Order Setting Trial Issued For Mar-03-2010 At 10:00 Am In Dept 506

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 378 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?