Donald John Bondarenko v. Gene Jung
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CSM 10 833356
Superior Court Judge Paul Slavit, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bondarenko, Donald John, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Jung, Gene, Defendant
Cause of Action Money
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Notice Of Entry Of Judgment
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Judgment On Plaintiff's Claim
    The Court Has Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Bondarenko, Donald John Recover From Defendant Jung, Gene $2,140.00 Principal, $674.54 Interest, $195.00 Costs, Total Judgment $3,009.54, Defendant Not Present. Stay Of Execution 30 Days No Exhibits Filed
      Blank 9 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010
      Small Claims Hearing Of Oct-07-2010 - Judgment. Appearance By Plaintiff Only. Commissioner: Paul Slavit. Clerk: S. Vantree. Not Reported. (506)
        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: 7/15/2010 Small Claims - Continue Order
        Small Claims Hearing Of Aug-04-2010 - Continued Per Request Of Plaintiff To Oct-07-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 506
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: 7/15/2010 Order
          Order "granted" On Request To Postpone Small Claims Hearing Filed By The Defendant.
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 6 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010
            Request To Postpone Small Claims Hearing (request Via Mail) Filed By Plaintiff Bondarenko, Donald John
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Small Claims - Continue Order
              Small Claims Hearing Of Jun-17-2010 - Continued Per Request Of Defendant To Aug-04-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 506, Per Commissioner Paul Slavit. Copy Mailed To Parties.
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Order On Request To Postpone Is "granted", Per Commissioner Paul
                Order On Request To Postpone Is "granted", Per Commissioner Paul Slavit.
                  Blank 3 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010
                  Request To Postpone Small Claims Hearing Filed By Defendant Jung, Gene
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Proof Of Service Filed On Claim Of Plaintiff.
                    Proof Of Service Filed On Claim Of Plaintiff Served May-03-2010, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Jung, Gene
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: 4/8/2010 Claim Of Plaintiff
                      Money Claim Of Plaintiff For $2,140.00 Filed By Bondarenko, Donald John As To Defendant Jung, Gene Order Setting Trial Issued For Jun-17-2010 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 506

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 502 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?