Edward Masao Kurata
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 13-30496
District Judge Robert S. Bardwil, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 12:31 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Edward Masao Kurata, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
No Logo John R. Roberts, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Roberts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Roberts +1 530 626 6441
No Logo Lorraine Alai Kurata, Joint Debtor
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U.S. Trustee"
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 67 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
Report of Sale Filed by Trustee John R. Roberts (Roberts, John) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
    Certificate of Service of 59 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with EMK Investments Inc. [JRR-2] Filed by Trustee John R. Roberts (Roberts, John) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
      Certificate/Proof of Service of 64 Change of Address (tsef) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
        Change of Address for Edward Masao Kurata and Lorraine Alai Kurata (tsef) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
          Certificate/Proof of Service of 59 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with EMK Investments Inc. [JRR-2], 60 Notice of Hearing, 61 Declaration, 62 Exhibit(s) (tsef) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
            Exhibit(s) to 59 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with EMK Investments Inc. [JRR-2] (tsef) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
              Declaration of John R. Roberts in support of 59 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with EMK Investments Inc. [JRR-2] (tsef) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                Notice of Hearing Re: 59 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with EMK Investments Inc. [JRR-2] to be held on 2/5/2014 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D. (tsef) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 59 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                  Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with EMK Investments Inc. [JRR-2] Filed by Trustee John R. Roberts (tsef) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 57 Notice of Proposed Use, Sale or Lease of Property (jbrm) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 57 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                      Notice of Proposed Use, Sale or Lease of Property (jbrm) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                        Certificate of Mailing of Discharge of Debtor as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 54 Request for Special Notice (jflf) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                            Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Placer County Treasurer-Tax Collector's Office (jflf) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                              Order Discharging Debtor as Transmitted to BNC for Service (Admin.) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                Order Granting 43 Motion/Application To Sell [JRR-1] (jbrm) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                  Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 43 Motion/Application to Sell [JRR-1] GRANTED (nwis) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                    Civil Minute Order Granting 26 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [TRM-46] (jbrm) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                      Civil Minutes -- Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument Re: 26 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [TRM-46], 26 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [TRM-46] GRANTED (nwis) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 43 Motion/Application to Sell [JRR-1], 44 Notice of Hearing, 45 Declaration, 46 Exhibit(s) (jbrm) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                          Exhibit(s) to 43 Motion/Application to Sell [JRR-1] (jbrm) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                            Declaration of John R. Roberts in support of 43 Motion/Application to Sell [JRR-1] (jbrm) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                              Notice of Hearing Re: 43 Motion/Application to Sell [JRR-1] to be held on 11/13/2013 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D. (jbrm) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 43 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                Motion/Application to Sell [JRR-1] Filed by Trustee John R. Roberts (jbrm) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Order Granting 39 Motion/Application to Employ (jbrm) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 39 Motion/Application to Employ Gonzales & Sisto, LLP as Accountant(s), 40 Declaration (jbrm) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Declaration of Gene A. Gonzales in support of 39 Motion/Application to Employ Gonzales & Sisto, LLP as Accountant(s) (jbrm) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Motion/Application to Employ Gonzales & Sisto, LLP as Accountant(s) Filed by Trustee John R. Roberts (jbrm) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Stipulation for Carve Out of Penalty Portion of Statutory Lien of Franchise Tax Board (jbrm) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                            Stipulation for Carve Out of Penalty Portion of Statutory Lien of Internal Revenue Service (jbrm) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Order Granting 33 Motion/Application to Employ (jbrm) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 33 Motion/Application to Employ Lyon Real Estate as Realtor(s), 34 Declaration (jbrm) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Declaration of Ann S. Bryant Re: 33 Motion/Application to Employ Lyon Real Estate as Realtor(s) (jbrm) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Motion/Application to Employ Lyon Real Estate as Realtor(s) Filed by Trustee John R. Roberts (jbrm) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 26 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [TRM-46], 26 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [TRM-46], 27 Notice of Hearing, 28 Declaration, 29 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362), 30 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 31 Exhibit(s) (lars) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Exhibit(s) in support of 26 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [TRM-46], 26 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [TRM-46] (lars) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of 26 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [TRM-46], 26 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [TRM-46] (lars) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 26 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [TRM-46] (lars) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Declaration of Leanett Poling in support of 26 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [TRM-46], 26 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [TRM-46] (lars) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice of Hearing Re: 26 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [TRM-46], 26 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [TRM-46] to be held on 10/30/2013 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D. (lars) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [TRM-46] Filed by Creditor Hilton Resorts Corporation (lars) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing of Notice to File Claims as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Notice to Creditors to File Proof of Claim as Transmitted to BNC for Service Proofs of Claim due by 12/12/2013. (jbrm) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Order Granting 18 Motion/Application to Employ John R. Roberts (jbrm) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Financial Management Course Certificate(s) as to Joint Debtor (jbrm) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Financial Management Course Certificate(s) as to Debtor (jbrm) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?