McRo Inc. v. Ubisoft Entertainment S.A., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-01873

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 11:06 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Y Lee +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 ilee@raklaw.com
v.
No Logo Red Storm Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen A Morao +1 949 932 3600 +1 949 932 3601 morao.karen@dorsey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Faisal M Zubairi +1 714 800 1461 zubairi.faisal@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Erise IP, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine J Santon +1 949 396 1040 +1 949 396 1112 kate.santon@sgclegal.com
No Logo Ubisoft Entertainment S.a., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen A Morao +1 949 932 3600 +1 949 932 3601 morao.karen@dorsey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Faisal M Zubairi +1 714 800 1461 zubairi.faisal@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Erise IP, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine J Santon +1 949 396 1040 +1 949 396 1112 kate.santon@sgclegal.com
No Logo Ubi Soft, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen A Morao +1 949 932 3600 +1 949 932 3601 morao.karen@dorsey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Faisal M Zubairi +1 714 800 1461 zubairi.faisal@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Erise IP, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine J Santon +1 949 396 1040 +1 949 396 1112 kate.santon@sgclegal.com
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 Copy of Order) (pj) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge George H. Wu, re Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case 37 . (1) All claims at issue here between Planet Blue and Defendants,including all claims presented by Planet Blues Complaint, shall be dismissedwithout prejudice; and (2) Planet Blue and Defendants each shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (pj) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES AT FEBRUARY 13, 2014 STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Defendants Red Storm Entertainment Inc, Ubisoft Entertainment S.A., Ubisoft Inc. (Morao, Karen) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR MARK S. RASKIN AT THE FEBRUARY 13, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
              STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re newly transferred cases. Parties will meet and confer and within 10 daysfile a joint status report as to consolidation of remaining cases in Categories B and C. A Status Conference is set for February 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by February 11, 2014. Defendants Motion to Stay 25 will remain on calendar for March 6, 2014 at 8:30 a.m.Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 29 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric A. Buresh on behalf of Defendants, designating Faisal M. Zubairi as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 30 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michelle L. Marriott on behalf of Defendants, designating Faisal M. Zubairi as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                      APPLICATION for attorney Michelle L. Marriott to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13303662 paid.) filed by Defendants Red Storm Entertainment Inc, Ubisoft Entertainment S.A., Ubisoft Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Santon, Katherine) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                        APPLICATION for attorney Eric A. Buresh to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13303620 paid.) filed by Defendants Red Storm Entertainment Inc, Ubisoft Entertainment S.A., Ubisoft Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Katherine J Santon added to party Red Storm Entertainment Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine J Santon added to party Ubisoft Entertainment S.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine J Santon added to party Ubisoft Inc(pty:dft))(Santon, Katherine) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendants Red Storm Entertainment Inc, Ubisoft Entertainment S.A., Ubisoft Inc. (Morao, Karen) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                            DECLARATION of Karen A. Morao in support of MOTION to Stay Case pending Decision from the United States Patent & Trademark Office 25 filed by Defendants Red Storm Entertainment Inc, Ubisoft Entertainment S.A., Ubisoft Inc. (Morao, Karen) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                              REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Stay Case pending Decision from the United States Patent & Trademark Office 25 filed by Defendants Red Storm Entertainment Inc, Ubisoft Entertainment S.A., Ubisoft Inc. (Morao, Karen) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Decision from the United States Patent & Trademark Office filed by Defendants Red Storm Entertainment Inc, Ubisoft Entertainment S.A., Ubisoft Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Karen A Morao added to party Red Storm Entertainment Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Karen A Morao added to party Ubisoft Entertainment S.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Karen A Morao added to party Ubisoft Inc(pty:dft))(Morao, Karen) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                  ANSWER filed by Defendants Red Storm Entertainment Inc, Ubisoft Entertainment S.A., Ubisoft Inc.(Zubairi, Faisal) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                    Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Ubisoft Entertainment SA. (Zubairi, Faisal) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. correcting APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13186502 paid.) 18 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 18 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark S. Raskin on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13186502 paid.) 18 . The following error(s) was found: A Certification of Good Standing is not attached to Pro Hac Vice Application. Good Standing Certificates have been required since 09/08. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            STANDING ORDER Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lc) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                              APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13186502 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. Related Case(s): 13-cv-01870, 13-cv-01871, 13-cv-01872, 13-cv-01874; Lead Case 12-cv-10322, consolidated with 12-cv-10323, 12-cv-10326, 12-cv-10327, 12-cv-10329, 12-cv-10331, 12-cv-10333, 12-cv-10335, 12-cv-10336, 12-cv-10337, 12-cv-10338, 12-cv-10340, 12-cv-10341, 12-cv-10342, 12-cv-10344 and 12-cv-10345 (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                  First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendants Ubisoft Inc, Ubisoft Entertainment S.A., Red Storm Entertainment Inc.(Attorney Faisal M Zubairi added to party Red Storm Entertainment Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Faisal M Zubairi added to party Ubisoft Entertainment S.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Faisal M Zubairi added to party Ubisoft Inc(pty:dft))(Zubairi, Faisal) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff McRo Inc, upon Defendant Red Storm Entertainment Inc served on 12/10/2013, answer due 12/31/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Caroline Satnley, designated to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff McRo Inc, upon Defendant Ubisoft Inc served on 12/10/2013, answer due 12/31/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marine Gallois, designated to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU AND ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu; This action has been reassigned to the Honorable George H. Wu, U.S. District Judge and the Honorable Fredrick F. Mumm, U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court, on its own motion, sets a Status Conference for January 30, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to give notice of the status conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV12-10322 GW (FFMx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV13-01873 GW (FFMx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (dro) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Mark S. Raskin for Plaintiff McRo Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lwag) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                              21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Red Storm Entertainment Inc, Ubisoft Entertainment S.A. and Ubisoft Inc. (lwag) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. Amendment to Corporate Disclosure Statement 7 (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue, (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13048305 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit c)(Attorney Irene Y Lee added to party McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue(pty:pla))(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?