Peregrine Sys Inc, et al v. , et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-00870
District Judge Roger T. Benitez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 12:05 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alan Berkowitz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Keegan & Baker, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick N. Keegan +1 760 929 9303 +1 760 929 9260 pkeegan@keeganbaker.com
No Logo Alan Hylton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Albert Caputo +1 619 338 4514 +1 619 239 0547 jimc@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Alan Marshall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Altshuler Berzon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Finberg +1 415 421 7151 +1 415 362 8064 jfinberg@altshulerberzon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com
No Logo Anthony Boarman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com
No Logo Beverlee Jolly, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Blair Alexander, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Keegan & Baker, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick N. Keegan +1 760 929 9303 +1 760 929 9260 pkeegan@keeganbaker.com
No Logo Blake Halberg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole Catherine Lavallee +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 nlavallee@bermandevalerio.com
No Logo Celeste Damron, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Chris Martin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 120

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas D Mauriello +1 949 542 3555 +1 949 606 9690 tomm@maurlaw.com
No Logo Congregation Bais Avrohom, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael M. Goldberg +1 800 977 7401 +1 800 536 0065 michael@goldberglawpc.com
No Logo Craig McCarthy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jeffrey Toll +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 stoll@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Albert Caputo +1 619 338 4514 +1 619 239 0547 jimc@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Danielle Legg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Denise Haines, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Donna Murray, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com
No Logo Eric P Daniels, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com
No Logo Felix Lecocq, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schaefer, Claus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTOPHER LOVELL +1 212 608 1900
No Logo Freda Ramey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Gabriel West, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Albert Caputo +1 619 338 4514 +1 619 239 0547 jimc@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Greg Singer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Albert Caputo +1 619 338 4514 +1 619 239 0547 jimc@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Henry Frankel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis M Gregorek +1 619 239 4599 +1 619 234 4599 gregorek@whafh.com
No Logo Heywood Waga, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abraham Fruchter and Twersky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S Abraham +1 212 279 5050 +1 212 279 3655
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Donald Levit +1 212 279 5050 +1 212 279 3655 llevit@aftlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/06/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Lawrence Godino +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 mgodino@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrice Lyn Bishop +1 310 209 2468 +1 310 209 2087 pbishop@ssbla.com
No Logo Ira Gaines, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis M Gregorek +1 619 239 4599 +1 619 234 4599 gregorek@whafh.com
No Logo Janet Kusmierski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Albert Caputo +1 619 338 4514 +1 619 239 0547 jimc@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Jeff Michon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Entwistle and Cappucci LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen David Oestreich +1 212 894 7200 +1 212 894 7272 soestreich@entwistle-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/11/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com
No Logo Joel A Gerber, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com
No Logo Jon Houg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Jonathan D Layes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schubert & Reed

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juden Justice Reed +1 415 788 4220
No Logo Katy Cox Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Albert Caputo +1 619 338 4514 +1 619 239 0547 jimc@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Kenneth Kacperski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Loran Group, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GOLD BENNETT & CERA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Solomon B. Cera +1 415 777 2230 +1 415 777 5189 scera@cerallp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrice Lyn Bishop +1 310 209 2468 +1 310 209 2087 pbishop@ssbla.com
No Logo Marijo A Clemons, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Mateo Camarillo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Mendel Spiegel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leigh Anne Parker +1 310 208 2800 +1 310 209 2348 lparker@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Michael J Farrell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com
No Logo Michele Voth, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Pamela Molennor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Patrick Pernett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Peter Ahrens, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leigh Anne Parker +1 310 208 2800 +1 310 209 2348 lparker@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Peter Chervin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Entwistle and Cappucci LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen David Oestreich +1 212 894 7200 +1 212 894 7272 soestreich@entwistle-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/11/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com
No Logo Peter J Krinsky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Albert Caputo +1 619 338 4514 +1 619 239 0547 jimc@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Philip J Turner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Randy Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Browne George Ross LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori Sambol Brody +1 310 274 7100 +1 310 275 5697 lbrody@bgrfirm.com
No Logo Richard Bowe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Albert Caputo +1 619 338 4514 +1 619 239 0547 jimc@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Richard Ruskin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leigh Anne Parker +1 310 208 2800 +1 310 209 2348 lparker@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Richard Schleicher, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jeffrey Toll +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 stoll@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Albert Caputo +1 619 338 4514 +1 619 239 0547 jimc@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Robert Renzi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Albert Caputo +1 619 338 4514 +1 619 239 0547 jimc@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo State Universities Retirement System of Illinois, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher T. Heffelfinger +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 cheffelfinger@bermandevalerio.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jameson Pucillo +1 561 835 9400 +1 561 835 0302 mpucillo@bermandevalerio.com
No Logo Stephen Anish, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Braun Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/04/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael David Braun +1 310 442 7755 +1 310 442 7756 service@braunlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrice Lyn Bishop +1 310 209 2468 +1 310 209 2087 pbishop@ssbla.com
No Logo Stoneridge Investment Partners LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Laura M Perrone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura M Perrone +1 212 949 5500 +1 212 949 0049
No Logo Susan Leahy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Theresa Marinelli, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Victoria Jibaja Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo Wendy Wallace, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguirre & Severson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jules Aguirre +1 619 876 5364 +1 619 876 5368 maguirre@amslawyers.com
No Logo William V Alesi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com
v.
No Logo Andersen LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Butz Dunn & Desantis APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas M Butz +1 619 233 4777 +1 619 231 0341 dmbutz@butzdunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vick Law Group APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Vick +1 213 784 6225 +1 213 784 6226 scott@vicklawgroup.com
No Logo AWSC Societe Cooperative, En Liquidation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Gerber +1 858 720 8900 +1 858 509 3691 rgerber@sheppardmullin.com
TERMINATED: 12/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luther Pilkinton +1 619 338 6500 +1 619 234 3815
No Logo BearingPoint, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Lynn Spaziano +1 202 371 7000 +1 202 393 5760 jen.spaziano@skadden.com
No Logo Charles E Noell, III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/16/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101

Toggle Switch Represented by David A. Hahn, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101 dhahn@lawhahn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by E H R Investors, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ayesha Najam +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 anajam@gibbsbruns.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sydney G Ballesteros +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffry J Cotner +1 713 650 8805 + 713 750 0903
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jean C Frizzell +1 713 650 8805
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Christopher Reynolds +1 713 650 8805

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aundrea K. Frieden +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 afrieden@gibbsbruns.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Pastuszenski +1 617 570 1094 +1 617 523 1231 BPastuszenski@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine A. S. Chung +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 cchung@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura M Stock +1 617 570 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1025

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/04/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Priske Adema +1 619 398 3400 +1 619 330 4907 aadema@jgrlawfirm.com
No Logo Christopher Cole, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bewley Lassleben & Miller LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leighton M Anderson +1 562 698 9771 +1 562 309 8113 leightona@bewleylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janet E Moser +1 323 965 3998 +1 323 965 3908 moserj@sec.gov
No Logo Daniel Stulac, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Anthony Attanasio +1 858 550 6020 +1 858 550 6420 mattanasio@cooley.com
No Logo David A Farley, Defendant
No Logo Douglas S Powanda, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Wong +1 562 436 2000
No Logo Frederick B Luddy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Harold McGrath +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2555 chrismcgrath@paulhastings.com
No Logo Ilse Cappel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara Howe Murray +1 619 744 2200 +1 619 744 2201 bhmurray@duanemorris.com
No Logo Jmi Equity Fund, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/16/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Pastuszenski +1 617 570 1094 +1 617 523 1231 BPastuszenski@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo JMI Services Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/16/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Pastuszenski +1 617 570 1094 +1 617 523 1231 BPastuszenski@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo John J Moores, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry A Olivar, Jr. +1 213 624 7707 +1 213 433 3100 harryolivar@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Quinn +1 213 624 7707 +1 213 624 0643 johnquinn@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janet E Moser +1 323 965 3998 +1 323 965 3908 moserj@sec.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/23/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P DeGeeter +1 713 758 1086
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED N Scott Fletcher +1 713 758 3234 +1 713 615 5168 sfletcher@velaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren J Harrison +1 713 758 3476
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S Johnston +1 713 758 2198 +1 713 615 5920 jjohnston@velaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry M Reasoner +1 713 758 2358 + 713 615 5173 hreasoner@velaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter B Stuart, IV +1 713 758 2222 +1 917 206 8100 wstuart@velaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Woodcock, Jr. +1 512 542 8549 +1 512 236 3206 dwoodcock@velaw.com
KPMG LLP KPMG LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley H. Ellis +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 bellis@sidley.com
No Logo Larry A Rodda, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilke Fleury Hoffelt Gould & Birney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Wells Powell +1 916 441 2430 +1 916 442 6664 mpowell@wilkefleury.com
No Logo Matt Glass, Defendant
No Logo Matthew C Gless, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vance & Blair

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Lloyd Vance +1 858 793 0040 +1 858 793 1655 tom@vanceblair.com
No Logo Norris Van Den Berg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/16/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101

Toggle Switch Represented by David A. Hahn, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101 dhahn@lawhahn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by E H R Investors, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ayesha Najam +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 anajam@gibbsbruns.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sydney G Ballesteros +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffry J Cotner +1 713 650 8805 + 713 750 0903
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jean C Frizzell +1 713 650 8805
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Christopher Reynolds +1 713 650 8805

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aundrea K. Frieden +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 afrieden@gibbsbruns.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Pastuszenski +1 617 570 1094 +1 617 523 1231 BPastuszenski@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1025

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/04/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Priske Adema +1 619 398 3400 +1 619 330 4907 aadema@jgrlawfirm.com
No Logo Peregrine Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kendall Brill & Klieger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura W Brill +1 310 556 2700 +1 310 556 2705 lbrill@kbkfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maureen A. Sheehy +1 415 576 0200 +1 415 576 0300 masheehy@townsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LaBella and McNamara

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles G La Bella +1 619 696 9200 +1 619 696 9269 clabella@labellamcnamara.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mazzarella Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C Mazzarella +1 619 238 4900 +1 619 238 4959 mark@mazzarellalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janet E Moser +1 323 965 3998 +1 323 965 3908 moserj@sec.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Yetter & Warden, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Autry W. Ross +1 713 632 8006 +1 713 632 8002 aross@yetterwarden.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Paul Yetter +1 713 632 8000 +1 713 632 8002 pyetter@yetterwarden.com
No Logo Richard A Hosley, II, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by David A. Hahn, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Hahn +1 619 235 2100 +1 619 235 2101 dhahn@lawhahn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by E H R Investors, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ayesha Najam +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 anajam@gibbsbruns.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/10/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter H Mason +1 213 892 9200 +1 213 892 9494 peter.mason@nortonrosefulbright.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerard G. Pecht +1 713 651 5151 +1 713 651 5246 gerard.pecht@nortonrosefulbright.com
TERMINATED: 08/10/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alan Swartzendruber +1 214 855 8000 +1 214 855 8200 michael.swartzendruber@nortonrosefulbright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sydney G Ballesteros +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffry J Cotner +1 713 650 8805 + 713 750 0903
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jean C Frizzell +1 713 650 8805
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Christopher Reynolds +1 713 650 8805

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aundrea K. Frieden +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 afrieden@gibbsbruns.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine A. S. Chung +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 cchung@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura M Stock +1 617 570 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1025

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/04/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Priske Adema +1 619 398 3400 +1 619 330 4907 aadema@jgrlawfirm.com
No Logo Richard T Nelson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S Brewer, Jr. +1 858 314 1200 +1 858 314 1150 rsbrewer@jonesday.com
No Logo Rod Dammeyer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duckor Spradling Metzger & Wynne LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Duckor +1 619 209 3000 +1 619 209 3043
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Martin Shaughnessy +1 619 209 3000 +1 619 209 3043 shaughnessy@dsmwlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freeman Freeman & Salzman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard P Campbell +1 312 222 5100

Toggle Switch Represented by Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Leon Stern +1 312 269 8000 pstern@ngelaw.com
No Logo Steve Gardner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bergeson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/15/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline McIntyre +1 408 291 6200 +1 408 297 6000 cmcintyre@be-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steve Gardner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steve Gardner +1 207 323 4114
No Logo Steven S Spitzer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dan Edward Marmalefsky +1 213 892 5388 +1 213 892 5454 dmarmalefsky@mofo.com
No Logo Thomas Watrous, Sr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl L Young +1 949 451 3800 +1 949 451 4220 myoung@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodin MacBride Squeri Day & Lamprey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wayne T. Lamprey +1 415 392 7900 +1 415 398 4321 wlamprey@gmssr.com
No Logo William B Richardson, Defendant
No Logo William D. Savoy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Naatsis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Diane Horning +1 619 233 1155 +1 619 233 1158 khorning@allenmatkins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/26/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yvonne M. Dutton +1 619 233 1155 +1 619 233 1158 ydutton@allenmatkins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl L Young +1 949 451 3800 +1 949 451 4220 myoung@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kipling Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D Stewart +1 206 545 0373 stewart@kiplinglawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morvillo, Abramowitz, Grand, Iason, Anello & Bohrer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cyrus R. Vance, Jr. +1 212 880 9490 +1 212 856 9494 cvance@magislaw.com
No Logo Bikkina Group, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com
No Logo Daniel Stulac, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Anthony Attanasio +1 858 550 6020 +1 858 550 6420 mattanasio@cooley.com
No Logo Goldstein Group, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leigh Anne Parker +1 310 208 2800 +1 310 209 2348 lparker@weisslawllp.com
No Logo James M Poe, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 ehn@classlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gergosian & Gralewski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward M Gergosian +1 619 237 9500 +1 619 237 9555 ed@gergosian.com
No Logo Needham Growth Fund, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Merrick Scott Rayle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrick Scott Rayle +1 415 533 5316
No Logo Policeman and Firemen Retirement System of the City of Detroit, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ronald Stickney +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 davids@blbglaw.com
No Logo Remedy Group, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Altshuler Berzon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Finberg +1 415 421 7151 +1 415 362 8064 jfinberg@altshulerberzon.com
No Logo Remedy Securities Holders, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Altshuler Berzon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Finberg +1 415 421 7151 +1 415 362 8064 jfinberg@altshulerberzon.com
No Logo Societe Generale Asset Management International Limited, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean M. Handler +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 shandler@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo State Universities Retirement System of Illinois, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher T. Heffelfinger +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 cheffelfinger@bermandevalerio.com
No Logo Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ronald Stickney +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 davids@blbglaw.com
No Logo Robert C Ward, Trustee
Officially listed as "Robert Charles Friese"

Toggle Switch Represented by Caldarelli Hejmanowski & Page LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marisa Janine-Page +1 619 238 4900 +1 619 238 4959 mjp@chplawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mazzarella Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C Mazzarella +1 619 238 4900 +1 619 238 4959 mark@mazzarellalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shartsis Friese LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Edwin Schaberg +1 415 421 6500 +1 415 421 2922 rschaberg@sflaw.com
No Logo Trustee Richard M Kipperman, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Hulett Harper Stewart

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk B Hulett +1 619 338 1133 +1 619 338 1139 kbh@hulettharper.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (864) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Address by Lori Sambol Brody (Brody, Lori) (knh). (Entered: 10/13/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendants Steven S. Spitzer and Ilse Cappel. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/13/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh) (mam). (Entered: 09/14/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Motion Hearing held on 9/13/2010. All parties appearing telephonically. Granting 855 MOTION to Dismiss Action Against Defendants Steven S. Spitzer and Ilse Cappel Without Prejudice. Separate Order to follow. Gilardi & Co.'s request for fees and costs is granted, as modified by the Court. The Court approves fees and costs to Gilardi & Co. in the amount of $247,109.86, consisting of $172,000 in fees and costs requested at the 11/03/2009 hearing, $45,109.86 in tax compliance related costs, and $30,000 for future fees and costs to complete the final administration and distribution of settlement funds in this case. No further fees or costs will be awarded to Gilardi & Co. On Court's own motion, Final Distribution Hearing continued to 1/24/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 03 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Counsel may appear telephonically and, if doing so, must use the same conference call procedure previously employed. Prior to the hearing, a declaration must be filed that gives a status on the distribution and attests to the parties' efforts to find lost claimants. If any unclaimed funds remain, the parties must also set forth a specific recommendation for final disposition of these funds. (Court Reporter Deborah O'Connell).(Plaintiff Attorney Lawrence D. Levit, Solomon B. Cera).(Defendant Attorney Howard Longman, Rachel McCratchen, Barbara Howe Murray, Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr.). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(gxr) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DECLARATION of Peter Crudo regarding Distribution of Class Settlement Fund filed as REPLY - Other re 852 Status Conference filed by Heywood Waga. (Giblin, Gwendolyn) Modified on 9/7/2010 add filer and reflect document type; emailed attny re no certificate of service attached (lao). (Entered: 09/03/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION to Dismiss Action Against Defendants Steven S. Spitzer and Ilse Cappel Without Prejudice by Loran Group. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support, # 2 Declaration of Solomon B. Cera in Support, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Proof of Service)(Cera, Solomon) (knh). (Entered: 08/16/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 852 Minute Entry, Mail sent to Laura M. Perrone. (knh) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 852 Minute Entry, Mail sent to Christopher Lovell. Resent on 7/27/10 to 61 Broadway Rm 501, New York, NY 10006-2745. (knh) (mam). (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Status Conference held on 7/14/2010. All parties appearing telephonically. Court confirms Final Distribution Hearing date of 9/13/2010 10:30AM in Courtroom 03 before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporter Deborah O'Connell). (Plaintiff Attorney Solomon B. Cera, Lawrence D. Levit). (Defendant Attorney Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr., Molly Stephens). (gxr) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 849 Minute Entry, Mail sent to Merrick Scott Rayle. (knh) (av1). (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re 849 Minute Entry Mail sent to Christopher Lovell. (knh)(av1). (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Final Distribution Hearing held on 6/7/2010. All parties appearing telephonically. On Court's own motion, Final Distribution Hearing continued to 9/13/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 03 before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporter Deborah O'Connell). (Plaintiff Attorney Solomon B. Cera, Lawrence D. Levit, Howard Longman). (Defendant Attorney Rachael McCraken, Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr.). (gxr) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Mail sent to Laura M Perrone Returned as Undeliverable re 844 Minute Entry. (asw) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Mail sent to Laura M Perrone Returned as Undeliverable re 843 Order, 842 Order. (asw) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Mail sent to Merrick Scott Rayle Returned as Undeliverable re 843 Order, 842 Order. (asw) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Mail sent to Merrick Scott Rayle Returned as Undeliverable re 844 Minute Entry.(asw) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Telephonica Conference held on 11/3/2009. All parties appearing telephonically. Court to issue Order.(Court Reporter Deborah O'Connell). (Plaintiff Attorney Solomon B. Cera, Lawrence D. Levit, Howard Longman). (Defendant Attorney Jeffry J. Cotner, Caroline McEntire, Christian Humphries, Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr., Phillip L. Stern). (gxr) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Final ORDER and Judgment Dismissing Action Against Defendants John J. Moores, Charles A. Noell III, Norris Van Den Berg, Richard A. Hosley II, Christopher A. Cole, and Rodney F. Dammeyer, confirming releases, and barring certain claims. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/3/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(asw) (jrl). (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 842 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Final ORDER and Judgment Dismissing Action Against Defendants Stephen P. Gardner, Matthew C. Gless, Frederic B. Luddy, and Richard T. Nelson, confirming release, and barring certain claims. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/3/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(asw) (jrl). (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Mail sent to Kimbery Wong Returned as Undeliverable (no longer at this address) re 838 Minute Order. (asw) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE by Loran Group Notice of Telephonic Hearing (Cera, Solomon)(asw). (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/21/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(asw)(jrl). (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2009. Granting [834-1] Motion for Settlement Final Approval of Additional Partial Settlements - Order to follow. Submitting [835-1] Motion for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses - Counsel is directed to submit to the Court forthwith a revised form of Order as discussed in Court. Hearing re: Final Distribution set for 6/7/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 03 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (Court Reporter Deborah O'Connell.)(Plaintiff Attorney Solomon B. Cera, Lawrence D. Levit, Howard T. Longman).(Defendant Attorney Jeffry J. Cotner, Christopher Harold McGrath, Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr., Robert Martin Shaughnessy, Rachael McCracken). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(gxr) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RESPONSE in Support re 834 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Additional Partial Settlements, 835 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Heywood Waga, Loran Group. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carole K. Sylvester, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carole K. Sylvester, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Carole K. Sylvester, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Carole K. Sylvester, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Carole K. Sylvester, # 6 Declaration of Peter Crudo re Administration of Settlements and Request for Payment of Unpaid Expenses of Administration, # 7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Peter Crudo, # 8 Proposed Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, # 9 Amended Proposed Final Order and Judgment Dismissing Action Against Defendants John J. Moores, Charles A. Noell III, Norris van den Berg, Richard A. Hosley II, Christopher A. Cole, and Rodney F. Dammeyer, Confirming Releases, and Barring Certain Claims, # 10 Proof of Service)(Cera, Solomon) (ag). (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Heywood Waga, Loran Group re 834 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Additional Partial Settlements, 835 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses (Bishop, Patrice)(asw). (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Heywood Waga, Loran Group. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration Solomon B. Cera, # 3 Declaration Howard T. Longman, # 4 Declaration Lawrence D. Levit)(Bishop, Patrice)(asw). (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Additional Partial Settlements by Heywood Waga, Loran Group. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration Joint Declaration, # 3 Declaration Patrice L. Bishop)(Bishop, Patrice)(asw). (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER Preliminarily Approving Settlements, Providing for Notice, and Setting Final Approval Hearing: Settlement Fairness Hearing set for 10/16/2009 10:00 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/10/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(asw)(jrl). (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard M Kipperman re 831 Notice of Change of Address Proof of Service (Hulett, Kirk)(asw). (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Kirk B Hulett (Hulett, Kirk)(asw). (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER Directing Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel to Submit Declaration Under Seal. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/20/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(asw)(kaj). (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MANDATE of USCA affirming the decision of the USDC as to 718 Notice of Appeal. (akr) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Loran Group re 825 Response in Support of Motion, 824 Joint MOTION for Settlement for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements, 826 Notice of Settlement,, 827 Notice of Settlement(Cera, Solomon)(asw). (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Settlement Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Defendants Stephen P. Gardner, Matthew C. Gless, Frederic B. Luddy, and Richard T. Nelson by Loran Group (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Second Notice of Pendency of Class Action and Hearing on Additional Proposed Partial Settlements, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Second Summary Notice of Pendency of Class Action and Hearing on Proposed Settmements, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Final Order and Judgment Dismissing Action Against Defendants Gardner, Gless, Luddy, and Nelson, Confirming Releases, and Barring Certain Claims)(Cera, Solomon) proof of service filed; see 828 (asw). (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE of Settlement Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Defendants John J. Moores, Charles E. Noell III, Norris van den Berg, Richard A. Hosley II, Christopher A. Cole, and Rodney F. Dammeyer by Loran Group (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Second Notice of Pendency of Class Action and Hearing on Additional Proposed Partial Settlements, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Second Summary Notice of Pendency of Class Action and Hearing on Proposed Settlements, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Final Order and Judgment Dismissing Action Against Defendants Moores, Noell, van den Berg, Hosley, Cole, and Dammeyer, Confirming Releases, and Barring Certain Claims)(Cera, Solomon) Proof of service filed; see 828 (asw). (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re 824 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements - Lead Plaintiffs' Joint Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements filed by Loran Group. (Cera, Solomon) (asw). (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements by Loran Group. (Cera, Solomon)proof of service filed; see 828 (asw). (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTIFICATION OF Filing Voluntary Petition for BANKRUPTCY by Steve Gardner.(asw) (av1). (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            Notice of Document Discrepancy by Judge Roger T. Benitez Rejecting Document: Stephen P. Gardner's Notice of Filing Voluntary Petition for Bankruptcy from Steve Gardner. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: missing original signature. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is NOT to be filed, but instead REJECTED and it is ORDERED that the Clerk serve a copy of this order on all parties. Counsel is advised that any further failure to comply with the Local Rules may lead to penalties pursuant to Local Rule 83.1., Rejected document was returned to the filer. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(asw)(kaj). (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              ORDER of USCA as to 718 Notice of Appeal. The joint motion for limited remand for settlement purposes is granted as follows: As to Appellant Loran Group and the settling Appellees John J. Moores, Charles E. Noell III, Christopher A. Cole, Norris van den Berg, Richard A. Hosley II, Rodney F. Dammeyer, Richard T. Nelson, and Frederic B. Luddy, this case is remanded to the USDC for the limited purpose of seeking settlement approval pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c). In the event that the USDC does not approve the settlement or the effective date (as defined in the settlement agreements) fails to occur, the settling parties may apply to reinstate the appeal. Within 60 days from the entry of this order, and every 60 days thereafter, the parties shall file a joint status report setting forth the status of the settlement approval proceedings in the USDC. As to Appellees BearingPoint, Inc., KPMG LLP, and Larry Rodda, the stay previously entered by this court is vacated. As to those Appellees, this appeal is resubmitted for decision. (cc: Chambers). (akr) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE by Robert Charles Friese re 786 MOTION of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement Of Withdrawal of Motion for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Mazzarella, Mark) (ag). (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Aundrea K. Frieden appearing for Defendants Richard A Hosley, II, Charles E Noell, III, Norris Van Den Berg (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mkz) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2008. Submitting [786-1] Motion of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement filed by Robert Charles Friese. Court to issue Order. (Court Reporter Deborah O'Connell.) (Plaintiff Attorney Gwendolyn R. Giblin, Howard Longman, Lawrence D. Levit, Solomon B. Cera).(Defendant Attorney Christopher Harold McGrath, Harry Arthur Oliver).(Movant Trustee Robert Charles Friese). (Attorney for Movant Trustee R. Paul Yetter). (Trustee Richard Kipperman). (Attorney for Trustee Kirk Hulett). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(gxr) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE by Peregrine Systems, Inc, Robert Charles Friese re 786 MOTION of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement of Second Supplemental Memorandum (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Autry Ross, # 2 Proof of Service)(Mazzarella, Mark) (asw). (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER Granting Motion To File Exhibits Under Seal (Re Doc. 787 ): The Clerk of the Court shall seal Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 6, 7, and 8 to the Declaration of Autry W. Ross (Doc. 786 - 4). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/14/2008. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 786 MOTION of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement : Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 03 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(gxr) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Harold McGrath (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(McGrath, Christopher)(asw). (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 786 MOTION of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement Lead Plaintiffs' Response to Supplemental Memorandum by Robert Charles Friese in Support of Motion for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement filed by Loran Group. (Cera, Solomon)(asw). (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard M Kipperman re 810 Notice of Non-Opposition(Hulett, Kirk) (asw). (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Richard M Kipperman re 809 Notice (Hulett, Kirk). Certificate of Service filed in 811 (asw). (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Supplemental Memorandum by Robert Charles Friese re 786 MOTION of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Declaration of Autry W. Ross, # 3 Exhibit A through F to Declaration of Autry W. Ross)(Mazzarella, Mark)(asw). (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA as to 718 Notice of Appeal. On 9/17/2008, the USCA referred the parties' 8/8/2008 request to defer submission, and any future such requests, to the Appellate Commissioner. Within 14 days of the date of this order, the parties shall file an updated joint status report regarding settlement negotiations between the parties. The updated joint status report shall address, if possible, when the settling parties and appellees Frederic B. Luddy and Richard T. Nelson will file a motion to remand to the USDC. The parties may request a conference with the Appellate Commissioner to address the time frame for settlement negotiations, the USCA's 9/17/2008 order, and other issues affecting resolution of this appeal. (akr) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Michael J. Duckor re 803 Minute Order. Mail resent to new address (3043 4th Ave). (asw) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          ORDER of USCA as to 718 Notice of Appeal. At the settling parties' request, the USCA has continued to defer submission of this appeal pending completion of settlement negotiations. The most recent Joint Status Report (JSR) requests that the USCA continue to defer submission pending completion of settlement negotiations. According to the JSR, however, Appellees KPMG LLP; BearingPoint, Inc.; and Larry Rhoda are not part of the proposed settlement or ongoing settlement discussions and no further stay or deferral of submission is requested regarding these parties. To facilitate a prompt resolution of this matter, the pending request to continue the deferral of submission and future such requests are referred to the Appellate Commissioner. (akr) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 803 Minute Order. Mail sent to Laura M Perrone. (asw) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE by Richard A Hosley, II, Charles E Noell, III, Norris Van Den Berg of Change of Firm Name (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David)(asw). (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting [786-1] Motion of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement; submitting [787-1] Motion of Robert Charles Friese, as Successor Litigation Trustee of the Peregrine Trust, to File Under Seal. Court to issue Order. Motion Hearing date of 9/8/2008 10:30AM is hereby vacated. (gxr) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service by Robert Charles Friese re 801 Reply to Response to Motion, Proposed Order Granting Motion of Robert Charles Friese For Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement (Mazzarella, Mark) Modified on 9/2/2008, to edit text (leh). (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 786 MOTION of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement filed by Robert Charles Friese. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Charles Friese In Support of Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert Charles Friese, # 3 Proof of Service)(Mazzarella, Mark) (cap). (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard A Hosley, II, Charles E Noell, III, Norris Van Den Berg, John J Moores, Christopher Cole re 794 Response to Motion, (Olivar, Harry) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Loran Group re 798 Notice (Other), 796 Declaration,, 795 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Cera, Solomon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Loran Group re 796 Declaration,, 795 Response in Opposition to Motion, Proposed Order Denying Former Trustee's Motion for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement (Cera, Solomon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 786 MOTION of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement filed by Rod Dammeyer. (Shaughnessy, Robert) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 786 MOTION of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement, 795 Response in Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Solomon B. Cera in Opposition to the Former Trustee's Motion for Relief by Plaintiff Loran Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Cera, Solomon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 786 MOTION of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to the Former Trustee's Motion for Relief filed by Loran Group. (Cera, Solomon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 786 MOTION of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement filed by Richard A Hosley, II, Charles E Noell, III, Norris Van Den Berg, John J Moores, Christopher Cole. (Olivar, Harry) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard M Kipperman re 792 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Hulett, Kirk) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 786 MOTION of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement filed by Richard M Kipperman. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kirk B. Hulett, # 2 Exhibit A to Hulett Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Hulett Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Hulett Decl, # 5 Exhibit D to Hulett Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Hulett Decl., # 7 Declaration of Richard M. Kipperman, # 8 Exhibit A to Kipperman Decl., # 9 Exhibit B to Kipperman Decl.)(Hulett, Kirk) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by David A Hahn on behalf of Richard A Hosley, II, Charles E Noell, III, Norris Van Den Berg (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hahn, David) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard A Hosley, II, Charles E Noell, III, Norris Van Den Berg re 789 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to Withdraw Attorney for Noell, Hseley and Van Den Berg, 788 Notice of Appearance (Hahn, David) (joeh). (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to Withdraw Attorney for Noell, Hseley and Van Den Berg by Richard A Hosley, II, Charles E Noell, III, Norris Van Den Berg. (Hahn, David) (joeh). (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David A Hahn on behalf of Richard A Hosley, II, Charles E Noell, III, Norris Van Den Berg (Hahn, David)(joeh). (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MOTION of Robert Charles Friese, as Successor Litigation Trustee of the Peregrine Trust, to File Under Seal by Robert Charles Friese. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Mazzarella, Mark) (joeh). (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION of Robert Charles Friese, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Peregrine Litigation Trust, for Relief Pursuant to Amended Litigation Trust Agreement by Robert Charles Friese. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Autry W. Ross, # 3 Exhibit 1-15, # 4 Proof of Service)(Mazzarella, Mark) (joeh). (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Autry W. Ross appearing for Defendant Peregrine Systems, Inc. (leh) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: R Paul Yetter appearing for Defendant Peregrine Systems, Inc. (leh) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Robert E Schaberg on behalf of Robert Charles Friese (Schaberg, Robert) (joeh). (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER of USCA as to 718 Notice of Appeal. The motion for extension of stay and deferral of submission as to the settling parties through 7/28/08 is granted. By 7/28/08, the parties shall file either a joint status report setting forth the status of the proposed settlement or a motion for a partial remand to allow the USDC to consider the proposed settlement. (akr) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA as to 718 Notice of Appeal. The motion for extension of stay and deferral of submission as to the settling parties is granted. Within 21 days, the parties shall file a joint status report setting forth (1) the status of proceedings before the state court off appeals, (2) an approximate date which they believe they will be able to file a joint request for a limited remand to USDC, and (3) any other potential issues that would delay their anticipated request for a limited remand. (leh) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Lloyd Vance (Vance, Thomas) (joeh, ). (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.4(a) Mandatory Electronic Filing re 778 Notice of Change of Address (aje) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address of Attorneyss for Matthew C Gless (aje) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA re: 718 Notice of Appeal. Appellant's Emergency Motion for an Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief is granted. Appellants shall file their supplemental brief by 2/15/2008. (leh) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 775 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Adding Stephen P. Gardner as pro se. Attorney Caroline McIntyre terminated. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 01/11/08. (joeh)(bar ). (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Motion by Steve Gardner to substitute counsel (McIntyre, Caroline)(joeh, ). Modified on 1/15/2008 to convert to motion(joeh, ). (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Michele Voth et al. of Waiver of Oral Argument re: MDL Docket No. 1889 (Janine-Page, Marisa) (joeh, ). (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Mateo Camarillo et al. of Waiver of Oral Argument re: MDL Docket No. 1889 (Janine-Page, Marisa) (joeh, ). (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of presentation or waiver of oral argument Re: MDL 1889. (joeh)(bar ). (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE MDL No. 1889 - In Re Peregrin Systems, Inc Securities Litigation, Notice of Appearance. (joeh)(bar ). (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE MDL No. 1889 - In Re Peregrin Systems, Inc Securities Litigation, Notice of appearance. (joeh)(bar ). (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE in re Peregrine Systems, inc Sec. Litig. Joint motion for transfer of action to the Southern District of CA. under 28:USC 1407 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (joeh)(bar ). (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 767 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE before the MDL Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re joint motion for transfer of action to the Southern District of CA for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings (bar) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Andersen LLP Notice of Name Change (Vick, Timothy) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.4(a) Mandatory Electronic Filing re 764 Notice of Change of Name (joeh, ) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Name Change by Andersen LLP (joeh, ) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Lori E Sambol Brody (Sambol Brody, Lori) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Judgment dismissing action against defendants Arthur Anderson LLP, Daniel Stulac, and AWSC Societe Cooperative En Liquidation, confirming releases, and barring certain claims. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/15/06. (joeh, ) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER and rule 54(b)final judgment re dft Douglas S. Powanda Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/15/06. (joeh, ) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER and rule 54(b) final judgment re dft William D. Savoy Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/15/06. (joeh, ) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER and Rule 54(b) final judgment re dft Thomas G. Watrous. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/15/06. (joeh, ) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER awarding attorneys fees and reimbursement of expenses Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/15/06. (joeh, ) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER approving plan on allocation of settlement proceeds Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/15/06. (joeh, ) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez : Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2006 re 748 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Heywood Waga,, Loran Group,, 745 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Partial Settlements and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds filed by Heywood Waga,, Loran Group,. (Court Reporter Gayle Wakefield).(Plaintiff Attorney Solomon B. Cera, Howard Longman, Lawrence D. Levit).(Defendant Attorney Douglas M. Butz, Kathryn Diane Horning, Garrett K. Craig, Momo E. Takahashi, Anne Hayes Hartman, Samantha Everett, Caroline McIntyre (telephonically), Robert D. Stewart, Timothy Scott Vick). (gxr, ) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting 745 Motion for Settlement, submitting 748 Motion for Attorney Fees (gxr, ) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Steve Gardner of intent to appear by telephone at hearing. (joeh, ) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of USCA receipt of Clerk's Record (55 vol, 1 tran) re 718 Notice of Appeal filed by Loran Group. USCA Case Number 06-55197 (jxj) (Entered: 10/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Robinon Capital Partners. NUNC PRO TUNC 10/18/06 (agp) (Entered: 10/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Discrepancy Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez accepting document: Letter from Defendant Peregrine Systems, Inc, non-compliance with local rule 5.3. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/25/06. (agp) (Entered: 10/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Heywood Waga, Loran Group re 748 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, 749 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,, 745 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Partial Settlements and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, 746 Joint MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Final Approval of Partial Settlements and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, 747 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, (Bishop, Patrice) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support re 746 Joint MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Final Approval of Partial Settlements and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, 748 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, 745 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Partial Settlements and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds by Lawrence D. Levit, Howard T. Longman and Solomon B. Cera filed by Heywood Waga, Loran Group. (Bishop, Patrice) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Heywood Waga, Loran Group. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Joint Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses# 2 Declaration of Howard T. Longman in Support of Application for Reimbursement of Expenses Filed on Behalf of Stull, Stull & Brody# 3 Declaration Declaration of Lawrence D. Levit in Support of Application for Reimbursement of Expenses Filed on Behalf of Abraham Fruchter & Twersky LLP# 4 Declaration of Solomon B. Cera in Support of Application of Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP for Reimbursement of Expenses)(Bishop, Patrice) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 745 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Partial Settlements and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, 746 Joint MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Final Approval of Partial Settlements and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds Declaration of Christl Hansman re Mailing of the Notice of Pendency of Class Action and Hearing on Proposed Partial Settlements of Class Action and Proof of Claims and Release Form; and Publication of the Summary Notice filed by Heywood Waga, Loran Group. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4)(Bishop, Patrice) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Final Approval of Partial Settlements and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds by Heywood Waga, Loran Group. (Bishop, Patrice) Modified on 10/18/2006 (bar, ). (memorandum docketed as motion, should be attachment to motion 745 ) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Partial Settlements and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds by Heywood Waga, Loran Group. (Bishop, Patrice) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Charles E Noell, III of Change of Contact Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service # 2 Proof of Service)(Adema, Alison) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS re 727 Motion for preliminary approval of proposed settlements with dft's Arthur Andersen LLP, Douglas S Powanda, William D Savoy and Thomas G Watrous, filed by Larry A Rodda. (joeh, ) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of USCA as to 718 Notice of Appeal filed by Loran Group: The provision of the 07/03/06 order regarding the word limitations for the answering brief is vacated. Each appellee would therefore be entitled to file a brief not to exceed 14,000 words. All but one appellee did so, and those briefs have all been filed. Appellees- the "Outside Directors" submitted a brief of 19,880 words. Submission of the brief is construed in part as a motion for leave to file an oversize brief. So construed, motion is granted in part. The Outside Directors shall filed a replacement brief not to exceed 17,000 words within 28 days after date of this order. Outside Directors' 08/25/06 brief is stricken. Appellant's motion to strike appellee's answering briefs for excessive length is denied as moot. Appellant's motion for extension of time to file reply brief is granted. Briefing schedule issued. (jxj) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement of David Hildes (joeh, ) (Entered: 10/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objections re 727 Motion for preliminary approval of proposed settlements with dft's Arthur Andersen LLP, Douglas S Powanda, William D Savoy and Thomas G Watrous filed by KPMG LLP, Bearing Point, Inc.. (joeh, ) (Entered: 10/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice by plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 of entry of Order preliminarily approving settlements, providing for notice and setting final approval hearing. (joeh) (Entered: 08/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order preliminarily approving settlements, providing for notice and setting final approval hrg by Judge Roger T. Benitez; a hrg (the settlement fairness hrg) is scheduled to be held before the court on 11/8/06 at 9:00am before Judge Roger T. Benitez (axr) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes: Enter Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez granting motion for preliminary approval of proposed settlements with dft's Arthur Andersen LLP, Douglas S Powanda, William D Savoy and Thomas G Watrous [727-1]; motion hrg for final approval of proposed settlement set for 9:00 11/8/06 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; Court Reporter: G. Wakefield (axr) Modified on 08/01/2006 (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply by defendant Thomas Watrous Sr in 3:02-cv-00870 to opposition to motion for preliminary approval of proposed settlements with dft's Arthur Andersen LLP, Douglas S Powanda, William D Savoy and Thomas G Watrous [727-1] (joeh) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply by plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 to opposition to motion for preliminary approval of proposed settlements with dft's Arthur Andersen LLP, Douglas S Powanda, William D Savoy and Thomas G Watrous [727-1] (joeh) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER by defendant Richard T Nelson in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion for preliminary approval of proposed settlements with dft's Arthur Andersen LLP, Douglas S Powanda, William D Savoy and Thomas G Watrous [727-1]. Nunc Pro Tunc 07/14/06. (joeh) (Entered: 07/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISCREPANCY ORDER by Judge Roger T. Benitez accepting document: Joinder from defendant Richard T Nelson in 3:02-cv-00870, non-compliance with local rules, document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to the date received (joeh) (Entered: 07/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation and Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez. Hearing on motion for preliminary approval of proposed settlements with dft's Arthur Andersen LLP, Douglas S Powanda, William D Savoy and Thomas G Watrous [727-1] is cont'd to 11:00 7/31/06 before Judge Roger T. Benitez (joeh) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition by defendant Larry A Rodda in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion for preliminary approval of proposed settlements with dft's Arthur Andersen LLP, Douglas S Powanda, William D Savoy and Thomas G Watrous [727-1] (joeh) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition by defendant KPMG LLP in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Bearing Point Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion for preliminary approval of proposed settlements with dft's Arthur Andersen LLP, Douglas S Powanda, William D Savoy and Thomas G Watrous [727-1] (joeh) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion for preliminary approval of proposed settlements with dft's Arthur Andersen LLP, Douglas S Powanda, William D Savoy and Thomas G Watrous [727-1] (joeh) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of points and authorities by plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870, plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion for preliminary approval of proposed settlements with dft's Arthur Andersen LLP, Douglas S Powanda, William D Savoy and Thomas G Watrous [727-1] (joeh) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Motion and Motion by plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870, plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 for preliminary approval of proposed settlements with dft's Arthur Andersen LLP, Douglas S Powanda, William D Savoy and Thomas G Watrous ; [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ]; motion hrg set for 07/24/06 11:00AM (joeh) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice by counsel for defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 of change of address (joeh) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice by counsel for defendant William D Savoy in 3:02-cv-00870 of change of address (joeh) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 for Ayesha Najam (joeh) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Acknowledgement from USCA re receipt of certificate of record (dkt clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mailed Certificate of Record Transmitted to USCA [718-1] (cc: all counsel) (Loran Group appeal) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for dates: 03/04/05 [718-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Received Order for appeal time schedule from USCA Aplnt to notify aplee of trans ordered: 02/17/06; Aplee to notify aplnt of addtnl trans: 02/27/06; Aplnt to file trans order form w/ USDC: 03/09/06; Ct Rpt to file trans in USDC: 04/10/06; Aplnt opening brief: 05/26/06; Aplee brief: 06/26/06 (dkt clerk) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notification by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number [718-1] 06-55197 (Loran Group appeal) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of appeal by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 from Dist. Court decision entered on 01/17/06. Receipt No/Amt of Fee: #121172/$255.00 [716-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 02/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Status conf held 8:30 2/2/06 (joeh) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez granting motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) [630-1]. Case stayed pending resolution of appeal. (joeh) Modified on 01/19/2006 (Entered: 01/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice by counsel for defendant KPMG LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 of change of firm name (joeh) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Settlement conference held 8:30 12/21/05. Status conf set for 8:30 2/2/06 before Mag Judge Ruben Brooks (joeh) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Settlement conf held. Settlement conf with lead counsel for the 10(b)(5) and section 11 plaintiffs and counsel for dft watrous is set for 8:30 12/21/05 before Mag Judge Ruben Brooks (joeh) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez denying motion to dismiss section 11 claims based on new US Supreme Court authority [652-1] (joeh) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex parte Application by plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 for permission to file sur-reply in opposition to reply memorandum of dfts Noell, Hosley, Van Den Berg and Moores regarding motion to dismiss section 11 claims based on new Supreme CT authority. T/w P/A in support, Declaration of Lawrence D. Levit in support. (joeh) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. The settlement conference set for 12/05/05 at 3:00PM, is reset for a "Telephonic" settlement conference for the same date and time. (joeh) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks; telephonic Settlement Conf held; telephonic Settlement conf set for 3:00 12/14/05 before Mag Judge Ruben Brooks for lead counsel for lead 10(b)(5) and section 11 plas and counsel for dft Watrous (cag) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minutes: Enter Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez. motion hrg off calendar. No parties present. Vacating hearing re motion to dismiss section 11 claims based on new US Supreme Court authority [652-1]. Motion taken under submission. CT to prepare order. Court Reporter: N/A (joeh) (Entered: 12/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply by defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870 to opposition to motion to strike certain allegations from plas' first amended consolidated complaint for violations of the Federal Securities Laws (kaj) (Entered: 11/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply by defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 to opposition to motion to dismiss section 11 claims based on new US Supreme Court authority [652-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 11/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks Settlement conference was held 8:00 11/22/05 , Settlement conf will be held 3:00 12/5/05 before Mag Judge Ruben Brooks (dkt clerk) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition by plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion to stike certain allegations from plaintiff's first amd consolidated cmp (motion not on file) (bar) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Patrice L. Bishop in support of plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 re motion response [702-1] (bar) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition by plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion to dismiss section 11 claims based on new US Supreme Court authority [652-1] (bar) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion to strike cetain allegations from plaintiff's first amd consolidated cmp (motion not on file) (bar) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 to Court's telephonic inquiry (dkt clerk) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks: a continued E.N.E. Conference was held 1:30 10/31/05; a telephonic Settlement conf is set for 8:00 11/22/05 before Mag Judge Ruben Brooks , between counsel for lead 10(b)(5) and section 11 Plas' cnsl and cnsl for dft Watrous. (rec'd in docketing 11/2/05) (lmh) (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks: Lead 10(b)(5) and Section 11 Plas' req to be excused from participation in the 10/31/05 ENE Conf is granted; cnsl for the lead plas shall be present at the conf, but the lead Plas themselves are excused; t/w attached letter of request. (lmh) Modified on 10/28/2005 (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request by lead plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 for Entry of Rule 54(b) Judgment in light of withdrawal of all opposition thereto (lmh) (Entered: 10/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 of withdrawal of certain filings; Oppos to pending motion, doc. nos. 646 (Oppos) and 693 (Sur-Reply); Motin for a stay, doc. nos. 647 (motion) 648 (P/A) and 685 (reply); motion to dismiss cts III and V of the amd cmp, doc. nos. 644 (motion) and 645 (P/A); and Joinder in motion of other dfts to dismiss Section 11 claims, doc. no. 660 (lmh) (Entered: 10/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks: Defendant Savoy's request to appear telephonically at the 10/31/05 ENE conference is denied; Mr. Savoy shall be present at the ENE Conference on 10/31/05, beginning at 2:00 p.m. (dkt clerk) (Entered: 10/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE as to counsel John Degeeter for party John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 re: Scheduling order; atty no longer w/firm associated w/this action. dft Watrous); 2:00 (for dft Savoy); and 2:30 (for dft Dammeyer) all before Mag Judge Ruben Brooks [689-1] (lmh) (Entered: 09/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sur-Reply by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 in Oppos to Motion of Plas the Loran Group for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) [630-1] (lmh) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez granting dft Andersen's ex parte application to file Sur-Reply in oppos to motion of plas the Loran Group for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) [690-1]; Clerk shall file the Sur-Reply and is deemed submitted to the Ct. (lmh) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation and Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez continuing hearing on dfts Moores, et al.'s motion to dismiss section 11 claims based on new US Supreme Court authority, dft Andersen's motion to dismiss counts III and V of plainitiffs' consolidated first amd cmp and dfts Moores, et al.'s motion to strike certain allegations of the 1st amd cmp; motion hearing is continued to 10:30 12/5/05 before Judge Roger T. Benitez (lmh) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte Application by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 for permission to file Sur-Reply in Oppos to Motion of Plas the Loran Group for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCvP 54(b); Memo of P/A and Decl of C. Stephen Howard in support thereof (lmh) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks: a continued telephonic ENE conf was held; a further continued E.N.E. Conference for lead 10(b) and Rule 11 Plas and Dfts Watrous, Savoy and Dammeyer is set for 10/31/05 at 1:30 (for dft Watrous); 2:00 (for dft Savoy); and 2:30 (for dft Dammeyer) all before Mag Judge Ruben Brooks . (rec'd in docketing 9/13/05) (lmh) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minutes: Enter Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez, no counsel present, motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) [630-1], motion to stay as against dft Stephen P. Gardner [639-1] and motion to dismiss counts III and V of plainitiffs' consolidated first amd cmp [644-1] motions taken under submission, Ct to prepare Order, motion hrg date of 10:30 9/19/05 before Judge Benitez - vacated; Court Reporter: N/A (lmh) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of JOINDER and Joinder by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 in Arthur Andersen's Reply Memo in support of alternative motion to proceed in the balance of this action if the enters a separate final judgment on certain of plaintiffs' claims against certain dfts [647-1] (lmh) (Entered: 09/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply by Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 to opposition to motion to stay as against dft Stephen P. Gardner [639-1] (cag) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memo by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of alternative motion to stay all proceedings in the balance of this action if the court enters a separate final judgment on certain of plaintiffs' claims against certain dfts [647-1] (lmh) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix of additional Authorities by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of reply to opposition to motion to stay as against dft Stephen P. Gardner [639-1] (reply to oppos not on file) (lmh) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof of service by defendant in 3:02-cv-00870 of: Amended Pro Hac Vice Appl of John Christopher Reynolds, Pro Hac Vice Appl of Jean C. Frizzell, Pro Hac Vice Appl of Robin C. Gibbs, Pro Hac Vice Appl of Jeffrey J. Cotner and Pro Hac Vice Appl of Sydney G. Ballesteros upon cnsl on 8/19/05 by US Mail. (lmh) (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 for John Christopher Reynolds (joeh) Modified on 08/23/2005 (Entered: 08/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 for Robin C Gibbs (joeh) (Entered: 08/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 for Jean C Frizzell (joeh) (Entered: 08/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 for Jeffry J Cotner (joeh) (Entered: 08/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 for Sydney G Ballesteros (joeh) (Entered: 08/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 for John Christopher Reynolds (joeh) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition by plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 to Arthur Andersen's motion to proceed in the balance of this action if the court enters a separate final judgment on certain of plaintiffs' claims against certain dfts [647-1] and the Joinders thereto (lmh) (Entered: 08/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Memorandum by section 10(b) lead plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) [630-1] (lmh) (Entered: 08/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Memo in Opposition by lead plaintiffs Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion to stay as against dft Stephen P. Gardner [639-1], as against him only (lmh) (Entered: 08/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks; telephonic E.N.E. conf held 8/9/05; E.N.E. Conference set for 8:00 9/9/05 before Mag Judge Ruben Brooks (kaj) (Entered: 08/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice by defendant Matthew C Gless in 3:02-cv-00870 of change of firm name (atty maint) (lmh) (Entered: 08/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to court re representation of Richard A. Hosley (lmh) (Entered: 08/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 of filing Notice of Removal of Attorney Stephen D. Rockwell from service list. (lmh) (Entered: 07/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation and Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez continuing hrg on motion to stay as against dft Stephen P. Gardner [639-1]; motion hearing shall be continued to 10:30 9/19/05 before Judge Roger T. Benitez, briefing schedule shall reimain as set forth in the stipulation and order re briefing schedule and hrg dates for dft Gardner's motion to stay. (lmh) (Entered: 07/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer and Affirmative Defenses by defendant Ilse Cappel in 3:02-cv-00870 to 1st Amd Consolidated Cmp for violations of the Federal Securities Laws. [NUNC PRO TUNC 7/8/05] (lmh) (Entered: 07/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCREPANCY ORDER by Judge Roger T. Benitez accepting document: Answer to 1st Amd Cmp from defendant Ilse Cappel in 3:02-cv-00870, non-compliance with local rule - Order does not allow Ilse Cappel to file an answer, document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to the date received (lmh) (Entered: 07/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice and Order thereon by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks: telephonic E.N.E. Conference will be held 2:00 8/9/05 before Mag Judge Ruben Brooks (lmh) (Entered: 07/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to court from defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 re discrepancy order concerning joinder in motion to dismiss (bar) (Entered: 07/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to proceed in the balance of this action if the court enters a separate final judgment on certain of plaintiffs' claims against certain dfts [647-1] (kaj) (Entered: 07/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Joinder and JOINDER by defendants John J Moores, Richard A Hosley II, Charles E Noell III and Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 joining Arthur Andersen LLP's motion to proceed in the balance of this action if the court enters a separate final judgment on certain of plaintiffs' claims against certain dfts [647-1] (lmh) (Entered: 07/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Joinder and JOINDER by defendant Christopher Cole in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss section 11 claims based on new US Supreme Court authority [652-1] (lmh) (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 to Lead Pla the Loran Group's motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) (lmh) (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Joinder and JOINDER by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion of dfts Noel, Can Den Berg and Hosley to dismiss section 11 claims based on new US Supreme Court authority [652-1]. [NUNC PRO TUNC 7/8/05] (lmh) (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCREPANCY ORDER by Judge Roger T. Benitez accepting document: Notice of Joinder from defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870, non-compliance with local rule - no motion has been filed, document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to the date received (lmh) (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by movant Daniel Stulac in 3:02-cv-00870 to Lead Pla the Loran Group's motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) (lmh) (Entered: 07/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER by defendant Thomas Watrous Sr in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss section 11 claims based on new US Supreme Court authority [652-1] (lmh) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER by defendant William D Savoy in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss section 11 claims based on new US Supreme Court authority [652-1] (lmh) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition by BearingPoint Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) [630-1] (bar) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendiz of unpublished authorities cited in p/a in support of motion by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 re motion to dismiss section 11 claims based on new US Supreme Court authority (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss section 11 claims based on new US Supreme Court authority [652-1] (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss section 11 claims based on new US Supreme Court authority [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ] motion hrg set for 11/4/05 at 10:30 (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer by defendant Steven S Spitzer in 3:02-cv-00870 to first amd consolidated cmp (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition by defendant Frederick B Luddy in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) [630-1] (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer by defendant Matthew C Gless in 3:02-cv-00870 to first amd consolidated cmp (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to proceed in the balance of this action if the court enters a separate final judgment on certain of plaintiffs' claims against certain dfts [647-1] (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Motion and Motion in the alternative by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 to proceed in the balance of this action if the court enters a separate final judgment on certain of plaintiffs' claims against certain dfts [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ] motion hrg set for 9/19/05 at 10:30 (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) [630-1] (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss counts III and V of plainitiffs' consolidated first amd cmp [644-1] (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss counts III and V of plainitiffs' consolidated first amd cmp [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ] motion hrg set for 11/4/05 at 10:30 (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition by defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) [630-1] (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Caroline McIntyre in support of defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 re motion to stay as against dft Stephen P. Gardner [639-1] (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix of Non-California authorities by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to stay action, as against dft Stephen P. Gardner (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to stay as against dft Stephen P. Gardner [639-1] (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 to stay as against dft Stephen P. Gardner [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ] motion hrg set for 9/9/05 at 10:30 (bar) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by defendant Richard T Nelson in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) [630-1] (kaj) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Non-opposition by defendant Larry A Rodda in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) [630-1] (kaj) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by defendant KPMG LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) [630-1] (kaj) (Entered: 07/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation and Order re date for responses to 1st Amd Consolidated Cmp by Judge Roger T. Benitez: Answer ddl to 1st Amd Consolidated Cmp is extended to 7/8/05 for Section 11 dfts (William D Savoy, for Thomas Watrous Sr, for Norris Van Den Berg, for Charles E Noell III, for Richard A Hosley II, for Andersen LLP, for Christopher Cole, for John J Moores) (lmh) (Entered: 07/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Attorney Designation: terminating attorney Marc L Godino for Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 and designating attorney Patrice Lyn Bishop (lmh) (Entered: 07/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation re briefing schedule and hrg dates and Order thereon by Judge Roger T. Benitez re Loran Group's motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) [630-1]; response/opposition to motion filed by 7/8/05, Loran Group's reply in support of motion filed by 8/12/05, the motion hearing shall be moved to 10:30 9/19/05 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; Arthur Andersen LLP shall file any motion to stay action in the event the motion is granted by 7/8/05, Lead Plas shall file response by 8/12/05, Arthur Andersen's reply shall be filed by 8/26/05 and hrg shall be set for 10:30 9/19/05 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (lmh) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation and Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez: dfts Cappel, Gless and Spitzer to file an answer to 1st amd cmp by 7/8/05 (cag) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation and Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez re briefing schedule and hrg dates for Gardner's motion to stay: Gardner's motion to stay or Answer shall be filed by 7/8/05 , response to any motion to stay shall be filed by 8/12/05, reply papers shall be filed by 8/26/05, hrg date on any motion to stay shall be set for 10:30 9/9/05. (lmh) (Entered: 06/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Notice of Motion submitted by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) , [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ]; motion hrg set for 10:30 8/19/05 (lmh) (Entered: 06/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez shortening time for hrg on motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) [616-1]; motion hearing is changed to 10:30 8/19/05 before Judge Roger T. Benitez, cnsl for section 10(b) Lead Pla the Loran Group are instructed to file and serve an amd notice of the Rule 54(b) motion reflecting new hrg date. (lmh) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Notice of Party with Financial Interest (Local Rule 40.2) by BearingPoint Inc in 3:02-cv-00870; NUNC PRO TUNC 5/23/05 (jah) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCREPANCY ORDER by Judge Roger T. Benitez accepting document: supplemental notice of party w/ financial interest from defendant BearingPoint Inc in 3:02-cv-00870, non-compliance with local rule 15.1, document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to the date received (jah) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by plaintiff the Waga plas in 3:02-cv-00870 to dft Andersen and Moores' response(s) to the Loran Group's ex parte appl for an order shortening time for hrg on a motion for entry of jgm (lmh) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Joinder and JOINDER by movant Daniel Stulac in 3:02-cv-00870 in dft Andersen's response to lead pla the Loran Group's ex parte appl for an order shortening time for hrg on motion for entry of jugm [NUNC PRO TUNC 5/18/05] (lmh) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISCREPANCY ORDER by Judge Roger T. Benitez accepting document: Notice of Joinder from movant Daniel Stulac in 3:02-cv-00870, non-compliance with local rule 5.1.j.4, document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to the date received (lmh) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 to Ex Parte Application for an Order shortening time for hrg on motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) (lmh) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 to lead pla the Loran Group's ex parte application for an order shortening time for hearing on motion for entry of jgm pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) (lmh) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection by defendant AWSC Societe in 3:02-cv-00870 to to personal jurisdiction, and partial objection to ex parte application of lead plas the Loran Group for an order shortening time for hearing on moton for entry of jgm pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) [619-1] (lmh) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Solomon B. Cera by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of ex parte application [619-1] (lmh) (Entered: 05/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte Application by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 for an order shortening time for hearing on motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) (lmh) (Entered: 05/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 of Ex Parte Application for an order shortening time for hearing on motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) (lmh) (Entered: 05/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum of points and authorities by lead plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) [616-1] (lmh) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Motion and Motion by lead plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 for entry of judgment pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) , [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ], motion hrg set for 10:30 10/7/05. (lmh) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice by lead plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 of Intention not to Amd Cmp (lmh) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez granting in part/denying in part dfts' motions to dismiss: granting in part/denying in part dft Moores' motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1], granting in part/denying in part dft Savoy's motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [452-1], granting in part/denying in part dft Cole's motion to dismiss, granting dft Luddy's motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [457-1], granting dft AWSC's motion to dismiss for failure state a claim upon which relief may be granted [468-1], granting dft Stulac's motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [472-1], granting in part/denying in part dft Andersen's motion to dismiss cnts 1,III,IV,VII and IX of the consolidated 1st amended complaint [474-1], granting in part/denying in part dfts Noell, Van Den Berg and Hosley's motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1], granting in part/denying in part dft Watrous' motion to dismiss, denying dft Gless' motion to dismiss, denying dft Gardner's motion to dismiss the 1st consolidated complaint [481-1] granting dft Nelson's motion to dismiss amended complaint [491-1] and denying Waga and Stuliff plas' motion to strike certain dft's untimely arguments to reconsider the prior ruling [536-1]; Plas are granted leave to amd their cmp w/in 60 days after this Order is stamped "filed" (lmh) Modified on 03/30/2005 (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes: Enter Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez; motion hearing held, motions to strike certain dft's untimely arguments to reconsider the prior ruling [536-1], to dismiss amended complaint [491-1], to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [481-1], to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1], to dismiss cnts 1,III,IV,VII and IX of the consolidated 1st amended complaint [474-1], to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [472-1], to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted [468-1], to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [457-1], to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [452-1], to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1] - Motions taken under submission, Ct to prepare Order; Court Reporter: Gayle Wakefield (lmh) (Entered: 03/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 of Intent to appear by telephone at hearing (lmh) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 of association of attorney David J. Noonan of Post Kirby Noonan & Sweat LLP (lmh) (Entered: 03/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation and Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez re hrg date for motion to strike certain dft's untimely arguments to reconsider prior ruling [536-1]; Officer dfts and Director dfts' oppos to motion to strike is to be field by 2/9/05, Waga plas' reply is to be filed by 2/25/05, motion hearing is set for 11:30 3/4/05 before Judge Roger T. Benitez, at the same time as the hrg o the motions to dismiss. (lmh) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply by plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 to opposition to motion to strike certain dft's untimely arguments to reconsider the prior ruling [536-1] (lmh) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant Rod Dammeyer in 3:02-cv-00870 for Phillip L Stern (dkt clerk) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant Rod Dammeyer in 3:02-cv-00870 for Richard P Campbell (dkt clerk) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 for Harry M Reasoner (dkt clerk) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 for David R Woodcock Jr (dkt clerk) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 for Lauren J Harrison (dkt clerk) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of lodgment of unpublished authority by defendant Richard A Hosley II, defendant Charles E Noell III, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 cited in Memo of P/A in oppos to Waga plas' motion to strike certain dft's untimely arguments to reconsider the prior ruling [602-1] (lmh) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memo of P/A in Opposition by defendant Richard A Hosley II, defendant Charles E Noell III, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 to Waga plas' motion to strike certain dft's untimely arguments to reconsider the prior ruling [536-1] (lmh) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice by counsel for defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 of change of address and firm (dkt clerk) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez: Ct will not consider the Latham Report in ruling on Moores' pending motion to dismiss the cmp, the Latham Report will not be stricken, but will remain under seal; Peregrine's motions to intervene [502-1], striking confidential report [502-2], and reconsideration of order denying injunctive relief [502-3] are denied as moot. (lmh) (Entered: 02/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Christopher Cole in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870, Alan Hylton in 3:02-cv-00870, John Sutliff and M Clifford Balch Jr; the Waga plaintiffs state they they are natural persons, not a nongovernment corporate party and have no disclosures to provide. (mam) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice by defendant Douglas S Powanda in 3:02-cv-00870 of withdrawal of motion to dismiss pla's 1st Amd Cmp [461-1] (lmh) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Party with Financial Interest by KPMG LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 (conformed copy received from party, original notice of financial interest not on file) (lmh) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Douglas S Powanda in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Party with Financial Interest by John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Frederick B Luddy in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez granting in part/denying in part "KMPG" dfts' motions to dismiss [441-1], [455-1], [464-1]; as to the only claim the Loran Group plas allege against dfts KPMG, BearingPoint and Rodda, the complaint against these dfts is dismissed w/prejudice; terminating party Larry A Rodda in 3:02-cv-00870, party Bearing Point Inc in 3:02-cv-00870, party KPMG LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 . (lmh) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Party with Financial Interest by William D Savoy in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Matthew C Gless in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof of service by defendant Ilse Cappel in 3:02-cv-00870 of: Notice of Party w/financial interest; served by US Mail on 1/18/05. (lmh) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Ilse Cappel in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Larry A Rodda in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Daniel Stulac in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Richard T Nelson in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Party with Financial Interest by AWSC Societe in 3:02-cv-00870 (filed pursuant to Ct Order) (lmh) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Declaration of Laura W Brill by defendant Peregrine Sys Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion re limited intervention pursuant to FRCP 24 [502-1], motion striking confidential report [502-2], motion reconsideration of order denying injunctive relief pursuant to FRCP 59(E) [502-3] (lmh) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Memo by defendant Peregrine Sys Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion re limited intervention pursuant to FRCP 24 [502-1], motion striking confidential report [502-2], motion reconsideration of order denying injunctive relief pursuant to FRCP 59(E) [502-3] (lmh) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Peregrine Sys Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Bearing Point Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 (lmh) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez requiring each party pursuant to Local Rule 40.2 to file a Notice of Party w/ Financial Interest by 1/12/05 (jah) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Christian D. Humphreys by defendant Richard T Nelson in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss amended complaint [491-1] (lmh) (Entered: 01/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply by defendant Richard T Nelson in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss amended complaint [491-1] (lmh) (Entered: 01/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation and Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez re extended page limits for briefing of dft Arthur Andersen LLP's reply in support of motion to dismiss 1st Amd consolidated Cmp; reply memorandum shall not exceed 15 pages. (lmh) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINDER by defendant Daniel Stulac in 3:02-cv-00870 joining dft Arthur Andersen's opposition to req for judicial notice of lead pla the Loran Group [548-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion limited intervention pursuant to FRCP 24 [502-1], motion striking confidential report [502-2], motion reconsideration of order denying injunctive relief pursuant to FRCP 59(E) [502-3] (lmh) (Entered: 12/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Judicial Notice by defendants Richard A Hosley, Charles E Noell III, Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of reply memoranda [567-1], [568-1]. [NUNC PRO TUNC 12/17/04] (lmh) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Brian E. Pastuszenski by defendants Richard A Hosley II, Charles E Noell III, Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of reply memoranda [567-1], [568-1]. [NUNC PRO TUNC 12/17/04] (lmh) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply Memo by defendants Richard A Hosley II, Charles E Noell III, Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1] (as to Waga plas) [NUNC PRO TUNC 12/17/04] (lmh) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Memo by defendants Richard A Hosley II, Charles E Noell III, Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1] (as to Loran plas). [NUNC PRO TUNC 12/17/04] (lmh) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCREPANCY ORDER by Judge Roger T. Benitez accepting document: Reply Memos from defendants Richard A Hosley II, Charles E Noell III, Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870, non-compliance with local rule - replies exceed 30 page limit, document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to the date received. (lmh) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINDER by defendant Ilse Cappel in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [481-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1], motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [457-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [452-1] by dfts Stephen P. Gardner, William D. Savoy, Charles E. Noell, Norris Van Den Berg, Richard Hosley and Frederic Luddy. (lmh) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINDER by defendant Larry A Rodda in 3:02-cv-00870 in dft Bearingpoint's reply [552-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply by defendant Rod Dammeyer in 3:02-cv-00870 to lead pla the Loran Group's Memo in response to the joinder of dfts Thomas J. Watrous, Christopher A. Cole, and Rod Dammeyer [530-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 to lead pla the Loran Group's cross-motion to strike decl of Gerald E. Hawxhurst (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Brief by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply by defendant Daniel Stulac in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [472-1] (directed to the Waga plas' opposition brief) (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply by defendant Daniel Stulac in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [472-1] (directed to the Loran Group's opposition brief) (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Memo by defendant KPMG LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim [464-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memo of P/A by defendant Frederick B Luddy in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [457-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Memo by defendant AWSC Societe in 3:02-cv-00870 to the Waga plas' Memo of P/A in opposition to motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted [468-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply by defendant AWSC Societe in 3:02-cv-00870 to lead pla the Loran Group's opposition to request for judicial notice [532-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Memo by defendant AWSC Societe in 3:02-cv-00870 to lead pla the Loran Group's opposition to motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted [468-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof of service by defendant Bearing Point Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 of Reply Memo in support of motion to dismiss 1st Amd consolidated complaint (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply Memo by defendant Bearing Point Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [455-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Brief by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [481-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Memo by defendant Thomas Watrous Sr in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of Joinder to dft Moores' motions to dismiss [489-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memo by defendant William D Savoy in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [452-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 to request for judicial notice of lead pla the Loran Group [531-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for Judicial Notice by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss cnts 1,III,IV,VII and IX of the consolidated 1st amended complaint [474-1] (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Memo by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss cnts 1,III,IV,VII and IX of the consolidated 1st amended complaint [474-1]. (Ok per Dist Ct) (lmh) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice by counsel for plaintiff Michele Voth in 3:02-cv-00870 of change of firm name (dkt clerk) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation and Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez re motion limited intervention pursuant to FRCP 24 [502-1], re motion striking confidential report [502-2], re motion reconsideration of order denying injunctive relief pursuant to FRCP 59(E) [502-3]; motion hearing date shall be continued to 11:30 3/4/05 before Judge Roger T. Benitez, Mr. Moores' response/opposition to motions shall be due by 12/21/04, Peregrine's reply shall be due by 1/7/05. (lmh) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870 for Christine S Chung (joeh) (Entered: 11/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870 for Laura M Stock (joeh) (Entered: 11/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation and Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez: The Waga Plaintiffs may file a consolidated opposition memorandum to the Officer and Director Defendants' motions to dismiss and joinders therein not to exceed (50) pages, and the Officer and Director Defendants may have, in addition to those pages afforded them to reply to the opposition(s) filed by the Loran Group, a collective thirty (30) pages among them to reply to the Waga Plaintiffs' opposition. (dkt clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memo in Opposition by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 to dft Moores' motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1]. [NUNC PRO TUNC 10/29/04] (lmh) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition by Waga plaintiffs in 3:02-cv-00870 to Director dfts' motions to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [491-1], [481-1], [476-1], [472-1], [461-1], [457-1], [455-1], [452-1], [443-1] and joinders thereto. [NUNC PRO TUNC 10/29/04] (lmh) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation and Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez re briefing by the Waga plas in response to the Officer and Director dfts' motions to dismiss and joinder therein; the Waga plas may file a consolidated oppos memo to the Officer and Director dfts' motions to dismiss and joinders therein not to exceed (50) pages, and the dfts may have, in addition to those pages afforded them to reply to the oppo(s) filed by the Loran Grp, a collective (30) pages among them to reply to the Waga plas' oppos. (lmh) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum of points and authorities by plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to strike certain dft's untimely arguments to reconsider the prior ruling [536-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 11/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Motion and Motion by plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 to strike certain dft's untimely arguments to reconsider the prior ruling [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ]; motion hrg set for 4/15/05 at 11:00 (dkt clerk) (Entered: 11/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition by plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion to dismiss cnts 1,III,IV,VII and IX of the consolidated 1st amended complaint [474-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 11/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCREPANCY ORDER by Judge Roger T. Benitez rejecting document: opposition to the Director dft's motions to dismiss from lead plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870, discrepancy: memo of p/a's exceeds 25 page limit; leave of court is required to file document (47 pages) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of John K. Mayer in support of plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 opposition to dfts' motions to dismiss claims arising under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (bar) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 to dft AWSC Societe Cooperative, En Liquidation's Request for Judicial Notice (bar) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for Judicial Notice in opposition to dfts' motions to dismiss by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 (bar) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 to the joinders of dfts Thomas J. Watrous, Christoper A. Cole, and Rodney T. Dammeyer (bar) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion to dismiss cnts 1,III,IV,VII and IX of the consolidated 1st amended complaint [474-1] (bar) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim [464-1] (bar) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted [468-1] (bar) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion to dismiss amended complaint [491-1] (bar) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [461-1] (bar) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [457-1] (bar) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition by plaintiff Loran Group in 3:02-cv-00870 to motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1] (bar) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice by defendant William D Savoy in 3:02-cv-00870 of association of attorney Cyrus R. Vance Jr., of Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Silberberg PC. [atty maint] (lmh) Modified on 10/19/2004 (Entered: 10/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation and Order by Judge Roger T. Benitez: hearing on dfts' motions to dismiss the 1st Amd Consolidated Cmp and all related matters [491-1], [481-1], [476-1], [474-1], [472-1], [468-1], [464-1], [461-1], [457-1], [455-1], [452-1], [443-1], [441-1] shall be continued to 11:30 3/4/05 before Judge Roger T. Benitez (lmh) (Entered: 10/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE as to Matt Glass in 3:02-cv-00870 re: stipulation [519-1] (lmh) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation re schedule for briefing on dfts' motions to dismiss 1st Amd consolidated Cmp and related matters and Order thereon by Judge Roger T. Benitez: plas' to respond to dfts' motions to dismiss the 1st Amd consolidated Cmp and all related matters shall be extended to 10/29/04; dfts' shall reply in support of motions on or before 12/17/04. (lmh) Modified on 09/09/2004 (Entered: 09/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of hearing (In-House) before Judge Roger T. Benitez: On Ct's own motion, hearing set for 10:30 11/22/04, for Motion Hearing re motion limited intervention pursuant to FRCP 24 [502-1], motion striking confidential report [502-2], motion reconsideration of order denying injunctive relief pursuant to FRCP 59(E) [502-3], motion to dismiss amended complaint [491-1], motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [481-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1], motion to dismiss cnts 1,III,IV,VII and IX of the consolidated 1st amended complaint [474-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [472-1], motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted [468-1], motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim [464-1], motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [461-1], motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [457-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [455-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [452-1], motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1], and motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [441-1] is vacated and reset for 10:30 2/25/05 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (lmh) (Entered: 09/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE as to Matt Glass in 3:02-cv-00870 re: Scheduling order Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez [514-1] (lmh) (Entered: 08/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE as to Matt Glass in 3:02-cv-00870 re: order [437-1] (kaj) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice by counsel for plaintiff Heywood Waga in 3:02-cv-00870 of change of firm name (dkt clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order of Transfer by Judge Napoleon A. Jones Jr.; Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez ; re motion limited intervention pursuant to FRCP 24 [502-1]: motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion striking confidential report [502-2]: motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion reconsideration of order denying injunctive relief pursuant to FRCP 59(E) [502-3]: motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez,; re motion to dismiss amended complaint [491-1]: opposition to motion due 9/24/04, reply to opposition to motion due 10/22/04, motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [481-1]: opposition to motion due 9/24/04, reply to opposition to motion due 10/22/04, motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1]: opposition to motion due 9/24/04, reply to opposition to motion due 10/22/04, motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion to dismiss cnts 1,III,IV,VII and IX of the consolidated 1st amended complaint [474-1]: opposition to motion due 9/24/04, reply to opposition to motion due 10/22/04, motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [472-1]: opposition to motion due 9/24/04, reply to opposition to motion due 10/22/04, motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted [468-1]: opposition to motion due 9/24/04, reply to opposition to motion due 10/22/04, motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim [464-1]: opposition to motion due 9/24/04, reply to opposition to motion due 10/22/04, motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [461-1]: opposition to motion due 9/24/04, reply to opposition to motion due 10/22/04, motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [457-1], opposition to motion due 9/24/04, reply to opposition to motion due 10/22/04, motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [455-1] opposition to motion due 9/24/04, reply to opposition to motion due 10/22/04, motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [452-1]: opposition to motion due 9/24/04, reply to opposition to motion due 10/22/04, motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1]: opposition to motion due 9/24/04, reply to opposition to motion due 10/22/04, motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez; re motion to dismiss 1st amended consoldated complaint [441-1]: opposition to motion due 9/24/04, reply to opposition to motion due 10/22/04, motion hearing reset for 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Roger T. Benitez (kaj) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE as to Matt Glass in 3:02-cv-00870 re: stipulation [506-1] (kaj) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Napoleon A. Jones Jr. granting ex parte application of Peregrine Systems Inc and Peregrine Remedy Inc to maintain confidential report under seal pending a ruling on motion to intervene, to strike, and for reconsideration [504-1]; motion limited intervention pursuant to FRCP 24 [502-1], motion striking confidential report [502-2], and motion reconsideration of order denying injunctive relief pursuant to FRCP 59(E) [502-3] are cont to 10:30 11/22/04 before Judge Napoleon A. Jones Jr.; Lead plaintiffs shall file any papers in opposition to any motions directed at the FACC on or before 09/24/04, while defendants have until 10/22/04 to file any papers in reply to Lead Plaintiffs' opposition briefs 431 (kaj) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of lodgment of Third Amended Complaint in Allocco action incorporating substantial portions of the Latham Report in further support of opposition to Peregrine ex parte appls; request for judicial notice by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 (kaj) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request by defendant William Richardson in 3:02-cv-00870 to remove atty Harvey Fruman from the mailing list (dkt clerk) (Entered: 07/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply by defendant Peregrine Sys Inc and Peregrine Remedy, Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 re ex parte appl [504-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Document Sealed (pursuant to Court Order) Opposition to ex parte appl (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/08/2004 (Entered: 06/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corrected Declaration of Kevin N Courtois in support of ex parte appl by defendant Peregrine Sys Inc and Peregrine Remedy, Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 (dkt clerk) Modified on 06/29/2004 (Entered: 06/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation and Order by Judge Napoleon A. Jones Jr.: Striking the original decl of Kevin N Courtois 435 from the ct record and filing of corrected Courtois decl. (decl returned to counsel) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice by defendant Peregrine Sys Inc and Peregrine Remedy, Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 of filing ex parte appl to maintain confidential report under seal pending the ruling on motions to intervene, to strike and for reconsideration. (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex parte Application to maintain confidential report under seal pending the ruling on motions to intervene, to strike and for reconsideration by defendant Peregrine Sys Inc and Peregrine Remedy, Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Peregrine Sys Inc and Peregrin Remedy, Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion limited intervention pursuant to FRCP 24 [502-1], in support of motion striking confidential report [502-2], in support of motion reconsideration of order denying injunctive relief pursuant to FRCP 59(E) [502-3] (dkt clerk) Modified on 06/28/2004 (Entered: 06/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant Peregrine Sys Inc and Peregrine Remedy, Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 limited intervention pursuant to FRCP 24 , striking confidential report ,and reconsideration of order denying injunctive relief pursuant to FRCP 59(E) [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez], motion hrg set for 9/13/04 at 10:30 (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/2004 (Entered: 06/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINDER by Daniel Stulac in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss cnts 1,III,IV,VII and IX of the consolidated 1st amended complaint [474-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Notice of JOINDER by defendant Christopher Cole in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [452-1], motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER by defendant Matthew C Gless in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1], motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [457-1], motion to dismiss amended complaint [491-1], motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [481-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Laura W Brill by defendant Peregrine Sys Inc Peregrine Remedy, Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 re reply [497-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply by defendant Peregrine Sys Inc and Peregrine Remedy, Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 re ex parte appl [434-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER by defendant Ilse Cappel in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss amended complaint [491-1], motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [481-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [452-1], motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [457-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINDER by defendant Richard T Nelson in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [481-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1], motion to dismiss cnts 1,III,IV,VII and IX of the consolidated 1st amended complaint [474-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [472-1], motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted [468-1], motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim [464-1], motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [461-1], motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [457-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [455-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [452-1], motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consoldated complaint [441-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice by defendant Richard T Nelson in 3:02-cv-00870 motion to dismiss amended complaint [491-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Christian D Humphreys by defendant Richard T Nelson in 3:02-cv-00870 re motion to dismiss amended complaint [491-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Richard T Nelson in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss amended complaint [491-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant Richard T Nelson in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss amended complaint [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez] motion hrg set for 11/22/04 at 10:30 am (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/2004 (Entered: 06/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof of service by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 of: motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint and opposition to ex parte appl for order enjoining Mr Moores from publucly submitting Latham Report on 6/2/21 (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER by defendant Thomas Watrous Sr in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER by defendant Christopher Cole in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINDER by defendant Ilse Cappel in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER by defendant Steven S Spitzer in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [481-1], motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINDER by defendant Rod Dammeyer in 3:02-cv-00870 joining motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [452-1], motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1] and the Memorandums of P/A's in Support of the motions. (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for Judicial Notice by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [481-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appebdiz if additional authorities by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [481-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [481-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant Steve Gardner in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ] motion hrg set for 11/22/04 at 10:30 am (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Brian E Pastuszenski by defendant Charles E Noell III, Norris Van Den Berg, Richard A Hosley in 3:02-cv-00870 re motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1] (dkt clerk) Modified on 06/22/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix of unpublished cited in Memorandum of P/A'S by defendant Charles E Noell III, Norris Van Den Berg, Richard A. Hosley in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1] (dkt clerk) Modified on 06/22/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice by defendant Charles E Noell III Norris Van Den Berg, Richard A Hosley in 3:02-cv-00870 motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1] (dkt clerk) Modified on 06/22/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Charles E Noell III, Norris Van Den Berg, Richard A Hosley in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [476-1] (dkt clerk) Modified on 06/22/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant Charles E Noell III Norris Van Den Berg, Richard A Hosley in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint with prejudice [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez] motion hrg set for 11/22/04 at 10:30 am (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss cnts 1,III,IV,VII and IX of the consolidated 1st amended complaint [474-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss cnts 1,III,IV,VII and IX of the consolidated 1st amended complaint [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez] motion hrg set for 11/22/04 at 10:30 am (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Daniel Stulac in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [472-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant Daniel Stulac in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez] motion hrg set for 11/22/04 at 10:30 am (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Robert S Gerber by defendant AWSC Societe in 3:02-cv-00870 re motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted [468-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice by defendant AWSC Societe in 3:02-cv-00870 motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted [468-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant AWSC Societe in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted [468-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Motion and Motion and reservation of objections to personal jurisdiction by defendant AWSC Societe in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez] motion hrg set for 11/22/04 at 10:30 am OK per ct (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice by defendant KPMG LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 of related case(s) (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Judicial Notice by defendant KPMG LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim [464-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant KPMG LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim [464-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER by defendant KPMG LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 Bearingpoint, Inc's Memo of P/A's in support of motion to dismiss (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Judicial Notice by defendant Douglas S Powanda in 3:02-cv-00870 motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [461-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Douglas S Powanda in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [461-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant Douglas S Powanda in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ] motion hrg set for 11/22/04 at 10:30 am (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix of Unpublished Authorities defendant Frederick B Luddy in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss the 1st amended complaint [457-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for Judicial Notice by defendant Frederick B Luddy in 3:02-cv-00870 motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [457-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Frederick B Luddy in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [457-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant Frederick B Luddy in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss the 1st amended consolidated complaint [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ] motion hrg set for 11/22/04 at 10:30 am (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Bearing Point Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [455-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant Bearing Point Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ] motion hrg set for 11/22/04 at 10:30 am (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice by defendant William D Savoy in 3:02-cv-00870 motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [452-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant William D Savoy in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [452-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant William D Savoy in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss 1st amended consolidated complaint [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ] motion hrg set for 11/22/04 at 10:30 am. (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Document Sealed (pursuant to Court Order) Decl re motion response [449-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Document Sealed (pursuant to Court Order) Decl re motion response [449-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 to Peregrine Systems, Inc ex parte appl for order enjoining Mr Moores from publicly submitting the Latham Report (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Volume #3 of 3 - Declaration of Jeffrey S Johnston by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 re motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Volume # 2 of 3 - Declaration of Jeffrey S Johnston by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 re motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Volume #1 0f 3 - Declaration of Jeffrey S. Johnston by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 re motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1] (dkt clerk) Modified on 06/22/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [443-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant John J Moores in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss pla's 1st amended consolidated complaint [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez ] motion hrg set for 11/22/04 at 10:30 am. (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/2004 (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Larry A Rodda in 3:02-cv-00870 in support of motion to dismiss 1st amended complaint [441-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Motion and Motion by defendant Larry A Rodda in 3:02-cv-00870 to dismiss 1st amended consoldated complaint [ motion(s) referred to Judge Roger T. Benitez] motion hrg set for 11/22/04 at 10:30 am (atty main) (dkt clerk) Modified on 07/26/2004 (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objections (opposition) by plaintiff Heywood Waga and the Loren Group to ex parte application for order permitting a memorandum f P/A'S in excess of 25 pages [438-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Judge Napoleon A. Jones Jr. granting application permitting John J Moores to file memorandum of p/a's in excess of 25 pages and not to exceed 40 pages in length [438-1]. (dkt clerk) Modified on 06/18/2004 (Entered: 06/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte Application for an order permitting defendant John J Moores to file a memorandum of P/A'S in excess of 25 pages (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Denying appls for Injunctive Relief and Setting Briefing Schedule for Ex Parte Appl re sealing of report by Judge Napoleon A. Jones Jr.; Dft Moores shall file the version of the Latham Reorpt that he intends to submit with his motion to dismiss under temporary seal on/before 5:00 pm on 6/21/04 and he shall personally serve movants' counsel with the Reort on/before 5:00 pm on 6/21/04. Dft Moores shall file and personally serve movants' counsel on opposition brief on/before 5:00 pm on 6/21/04. Any reply brief must be filed and personally served on opposing counsel on/before 5:00 pm on 6/23/04. (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Evan C Borges by defendant Peregrine Sys Inc and Peregrine Remedy, Inc re ex parte application [434-1] (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Kevin N Courtois *** Order STRIKING DECL FROM THE RECORD AND RETURNING IT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD 506 [434-1] (dkt clerk) Modified on 06/29/2004 (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte Application by defendant Peregrine Sys Inc and Peregrine Remedy, Inc re sealing of confidential report (dkt clerk) (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney Designation : terminating attorney Yvonne M Dutton for Stewart for William D Savoy in 3:02-cv-00870 and designating Kathryn D Horning attorney Kathryn Diane Horning (dkt clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice by defendant Andersen LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 of related cases in State and Federal Court (dkt clerk) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation and Order re schedule for responses to 1st amended consolidated complaint and briefing by Judge Napoleon A. Jones Jr.: Dfts' time in which to answer or otherwise respond to the 1st amended consolidated complaint shall be extended to 6/21/04. Lead plas shall file papers in opposition to any motions directed at the 1st amended consolidated complaint by 9/24/04; dfts shall file reply papers by 10/22/04. Lead plas The Loren Co and Heywood Waga may each file separate briefs in opposition to dfts motions to dismiss, the 10/18/04 hrg date is vacated. Ct calendared all motions directed at the first amended consolidated complaint for 11/22/04 at 10:30 am. (dkt clerk) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant Richard A Hosley II in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Charles E Noell III in 3:02-cv-00870, defendant Norris Van Den Berg in 3:02-cv-00870 for Meghan M Hart (dkt clerk) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Waiver of service of summons by defendant KPMG LLP in 3:02-cv-00870 on 4/8/04 (dkt clerk) (Entered: 05/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Waiver of service of summons by defendant Rod Dammeyer in 3:02-cv-00870 on 4/6/04 (dkt clerk) (Entered: 05/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Waiver of service of summons by defendant Bearing Point Inc in 3:02-cv-00870 on 4/9/04 (dkt clerk) (Entered: 05/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Waiver of service of summons by defendant Larry A Rodda in 3:02-cv-00870 on 4/8/04 (dkt clerk) (Entered: 05/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace