John David Fitzgerald
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 13-25292
District Judge Michael S. McManus, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 19, 2016 at 3:21 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Alan S. Fukushima, Trustee
No Logo John David Fitzgerald, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of C. Anthony Hughes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hughes, C. Anthony +1 916 485 1111
No Logo Lori Ellen Fitzgerald, Joint Debtor
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U.S. Trustee"
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
Amended Reaffirmation Agreement with Capital One, N.A. (cjim) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
    Report of Sale [ASF-1] Filed by Trustee Alan S. Fukushima (Fukushima, Alan) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
      Certificate of Mailing of Discharge of Debtor as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
        Order Granting 12 Motion/Application To Sell [ASF-1] (msam) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
          Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 12 Motion/Application to Sell [ASF-1] GRANTED (shes) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
            Discharge of Debtor as Transmitted to BNC for Service (msam) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
              Reaffirmation Agreement with Capital One, N.A. - Best Buy Co., Inc. (msam) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                Financial Management Course Certificate(s) as to Debtor (jgis) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                  Financial Management Course Certificate(s) as to Joint Debtor (jgis) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 12 Motion/Application to Sell [ASF-1], 13 Notice of Hearing, 14 Declaration, 15 Exhibit(s) (msam) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                      Exhibit(s) to 14 Declaration [ASF-1] (msam) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                        Declaration in support of 12 Motion/Application to Sell [ASF-1] (msam) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                          Notice of Hearing Re: 12 Motion/Application to Sell [ASF-1] to be held on 7/29/2013 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (msam) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                            Motion/Application to Sell [ASF-1] Filed by Trustee Alan S. Fukushima (msam) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                              Certificate of Mailing of Notice to File Claims as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 05/26/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                Notice to Creditors to File Proof of Claim as Transmitted to BNC for Service Proofs of Claim due by 8/23/2013. (dpas) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                  Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One, N.A. (dpas) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                    Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 04/21/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                      Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Requirement to File a Statement of Completion of Course in Personal Financial Management as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 04/21/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management Course Certificate as Transmitted to BNC for Service. (Admin) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                          BNC 341 Notice Requested (CMX) (auto) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                            Statement of Social Security Number(s) (dpas) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                              Master Address List (auto) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Alan S. Fukushima (auto) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. All Schedules and Statements filed. (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?