TCYK, LLC v. Hill
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-01346
District Judge Anne C. Conway, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fee & Jeffries, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Fee +1 813 229 8008 +1 813 229 0046 rfee@feejeffries.com
Space Catherine Fly Yant +1 813 229 8008 cyant@feejeffries.com
v.
No Logo Anthony Hill, Defendant
No Logo Doe 25, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued as to Anthony Hill. (LAK) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
    AMENDED COMPLAINT with injunctive relief sought against Anthony Hill with Jury Demand. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Registration)(Fee, Richard) Modified on 2/25/2014 to correct defendant name and edit text (LAK). (Entered: 02/20/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant on or before April 30, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 1/30/2014. (MDH) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
        MOTION to extend time to serve defendant by TCYK, LLC. (Yant, Catherine) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Non-party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/3/2013. (MDH) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
            MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 (f) Conference by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fee, Richard) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:13-cv-1346-ORL-22GJK. Magistrate Judge David A. Baker no longer assigned to the case. (RDO) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER transferring case to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 9/19/2013. (LAK) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 8 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by TCYK, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Fee, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/20/2013. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/20/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 9/6/2013. (SR)(ctp) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Case reassigned to Chief Judge Anne C. Conway. New case number: 6:13-cv-1346-Orl-22DAB. Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell no longer assigned to the case. (LAK) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER directing the Clerk to TRANSFER this case to Chief Judge Anne C. Conway for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/5/2013. (BGS) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Case Reassigned to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. New case number: 6:13-cv-1346-ORL-36DAB. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (IGC) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Charlene E. Honeywell for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(b). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 9/4/2013. (DB) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                              Copyright Report sent (mailed) to Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint with exhibits) (JET) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by TCYK, LLC. (JET) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                  COMPLAINT against Doe 25 (Injunctive Relief Sought) with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ORL27771) filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A and B)(JET) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 328 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?