George Torres
Bankruptcy Case New York Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 09-17147
District Judge Robert E. Gerber, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 1, 2016 at 9:07 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo George Torres, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Daniel M. Katzner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel M. Katzner +1 718 589 3999 +1 718 893 3647 danielkatzner@yahoo.com
No Logo John S. Pereira, as chapter 7 trustee for The Alphas Company of New York, Inc., Trustee
Officially listed as "John S. Pereira"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones & Schwartz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold D Jones +1 516 873 8700 +1 516 873 8711 hjones@jonesschwartz.com
Space Jeffrey H. Schwartz +1 516 873 8700 +1 516 873 8711 jschwartz@jonesschwartz.com
No Logo Maria Torres, Joint Debtor
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "United States Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elisabetta G. Gasparini +1 803 765 2304 +1 803 765 5250 gasparini@aol.com
Space Brian Shoichi Masumoto +1 212 510 0500 +1 212 668 2255
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
Order signed on 10/15/2013 Granting Applications for Allowance of Final Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses(Related Doc #54)for John S. Pereira, fees awarded: $472.75, expense awarded: $94.46, (Related Doc #53) for Jones & Schwartz, P.C., fees awarded: $2,657.58, expense awarded: $12.41. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
    (DOCUMENT FILED INCORRECTLY) Order signed on 10/15/2013 Granting Applications for Allowance of Final Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses(Related Doc #53)for Jones & Schwartz, P.C., fees awarded: $2,657.58, expense awarded: $12.41. (Cantrell, Deirdra) Modified on 10/17/2013 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 10/16/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
      (THIS ENTRY IS A DUPLICATE OF DOCUMENT #53) Application for Final Professional Compensation for Jones & Schwartz, P.C., Trustee's Attorney, period: 5/13/2010 to 12/10/2012, fee:$34,702.00, expenses: $427.69.(related document(s)53) filed by Jones & Schwartz, P.C.. (Schwartz, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/16/2013 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 09/24/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
        Notice of Hearing / Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation and Deadline to Object filed by John S. Pereira on behalf of John S. Pereira. with hearing to be held on 10/17/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Pereira, John) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
          Application for Final Professional Compensation for John S. Pereira, Trustee Chapter 7, period: 12/7/2009 to 8/6/2013, fee:$472.75, expenses: $94.46. filed by John S. Pereira. with hearing to be held on 10/17/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Pereira, John) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
            Application for Final Professional Compensation for Jones & Schwartz, P.C., Trustee's Attorney, period: 5/13/2010 to 12/10/2012, fee:$34,702.00, expenses: $427.69. filed by Jeffrey H. Schwartz. (Schwartz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
              Statement of the United States Trustee Regarding Applications for Final Commission, Compensation and Reimbursement of Out of Pocket Expenses (related document(s)51) filed by Brian Shoichi Masumoto on behalf of United States Trustee. (Masumoto, Brian) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 51 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report, Application for Compensation and Application(s) for Compensation of Professionals filed on behalf of Trustee John S. Pereira. The United States Trustee has reviewed the Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report. filed by Brian Shoichi Masumoto on behalf of United States Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F # 2 Timesheets)(Masumoto, Brian) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/11/2013, Entered: None
                Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 49)) . Notice Date 05/11/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/12/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                  Notice to Transferor. (Related Doc #46) (Rodriguez, Willie). (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                    Statement Re: Filing Fees Due and Payable to the Court (related document(s)47) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                      Letter requesting a statement of outstanding invoices for adversary proceedings filed by John S. Pereira on behalf of John S. Pereira. (Pereira, John) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/20/2013, Entered: None
                        Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) Joint Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Capital One, N.A. (Claim No. 11) To eCAST Settlement Corporation. To eCAST Settlement Corporationc/o Bass & Associates, P.C.3936 E Ft. Lowell, Suite 200Tucson, AZ 85712. filed by eCAST Settlement Corporation.(Watkins, Jaime) (Entered: 04/20/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                          Notice to Transferor GE Money Bank (related document(s)44) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court.(Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                            Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: GE Money Bank (Claim No. 12) To Midland Funding LLC. To Midland Funding LLCBy its authorized agent Recoser, LLC25 SE 2nd Ave, Suite 1120Miami, FL 33131-1605. filed by Recovery Management Systems Corporation.(Singh, Ramesh) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                              Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A. (Claim No. 11) To Capital One, N.A.. To Capital One, N.A.Bass & Associates, P.C.3936 E. Ft. Lowell Road, Suite #200Tucson, AZ 85712. filed by Capital One, N.A..(Bass, Patti) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A. (Claim No. 16) To Capital One, N.A.. To Capital One, N.A.Bass & Associates, P.C.3936 E. Ft. Lowell Road, Suite #200Tucson, AZ 85712. filed by Capital One, N.A..(Bass, Patti) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Request for Case Reassignment Notice. Judge Arthur J. Gonzalez Terminated from the case. Judge Robert E. Gerber added to the case. (Suarez, Aurea). (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                    Order signed on 2/15/2012 Authorizing an Interim Distribution. (Related Doc # 33) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                      Order signed on 2/16/2012 Granting Applications for Allowance of Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (Related Doc # 34)for John S. Pereira, fees awarded: $3,350.12, expense awarded: $0, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensation (Related Doc # 35)for Jones & Schwartz, P.C., fees awarded: $17,700.55, expense awarded: $238.50. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                        Statement of No Objection by the United States Trustee Regarding (1) Trustee's Application for an Interim Distribution to Creditors and (2) Applications for an Interim Award of Compensation and Reimbursement of Out of Pocket Expenses (related document(s)35, 34, 33, 36) filed by Elisabetta Gasparini on behalf of United States Trustee. (Gasparini, Elisabetta) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
                                          Letter of No Opposition (related document(s)35, 34, 33, 36) filed by Daniel M. Katzner on behalf of George Torres, Maria Torres. (Katzner, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Hearing to Consider Applications for Allowance on Interim Compensation filed by Jeffrey H. Schwartz on behalf of John S. Pereira. with hearing to be held on 2/15/2012 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 523 (AJG) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Schwartz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                              First Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Jones & Schwartz, P.C., Trustee's Attorney, period: 5/13/2010 to 10/31/2011, fee:$25,286.50, expenses: $238.50. filed by Jeffrey H. Schwartz. with hearing to be held on 2/15/2012 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 523 (AJG) (Schwartz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                First Application for Interim Professional Compensation for John S. Pereira, Trustee Chapter 7, period: 12/6/2009 to 1/10/2012, fee:$3,350.12, expenses: $0. filed by Jeffrey H. Schwartz. with hearing to be held on 2/15/2012 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 523 (AJG) (Schwartz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Motion to Authorize /Chaptyer 7 Trustee's Motion for an Order Authorizing an Interim Distribution filed by Jeffrey H. Schwartz on behalf of John S. Pereira. with hearing to be held on 2/15/2012 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 523 (AJG) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Proposed Order# 3 Affidavit of Service) (Schwartz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Order of Discharge with Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 31)) . Notice Date 12/07/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Request for Discharge of Debtor. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                        (This document should have been filed in adversary case no. 10-3330) Motion to Approve Compromise between the Trustee and Jason Torres filed by Jeffrey H. Schwartz on behalf of John S. Pereira. with hearing to be held on 5/4/2011 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 523 (AJG) (Attachments: 1 Notice of Motion2 Stipulation and Order of Settlement3 Affidavit of Service) (Schwartz, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/12/2011 (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Reply to Motion (related document(s)27) filed by Daniel M. Katzner on behalf of George Torres, Maria Torres. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Katzner, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Objection to Motion /Chapter 7 Trustee's Objection to Debtors' Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 13 (related document(s)27) filed by Jeffrey H. Schwartz on behalf of John S. Pereira. with hearing to be held on 2/2/2011 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 523 (AJG) (Attachments: 1 Affidavit of Service) (Schwartz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Motion to Convert Chapter 7 Case to Chapter 13 filed by Daniel M. Katzner on behalf of George Torres, Maria Torres. with hearing to be held on 2/2/2011 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 523 (AJG) (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order2 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Katzner, Daniel) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Notice of Possible Dividend with Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 25)) . Service Date 09/24/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/25/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Request for Notice of Possible Dividends. Proof of Claims due by 12/20/2010. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Letter Advising of Assets and Requesting BarDate filed by John S. Pereira on behalf of John S. Pereira. (Pereira, John) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Letter Advising of Assets and Requesting BarDate filed by John S. Pereira on behalf of John S. Pereira. (Pereira, John) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Adversary case 10-03330. Complaint against Jason Torres . Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by John S. Pereira. (Schwartz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          So Ordered Stipulation signed on 6/9/2010 extending time to object to discharge to August 15, 2010. (DePierola, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Order signed on 5/26/2010 authorizing the chapter 7 trustee to retain and employ Jones & Schwartz, PC as counsel (Related Doc # 19). (DePierola, Jacqueline) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Application to Employ Jones & Schwartz, P.C. as Counsel to the Trustee filed by Harold D. Jones on behalf of John S. Pereira. (Attachments: 1 Harold D. Jones Affidavit2 Proposed Order) (Jones, Harold) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                So Ordered Stipulaton signed on 4/12/2010 extending time to object to discharge to June 15, 2010 (related document(s)17). (DePierola, Jacqueline) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Proposed Order extending time to file motion pursuant to section 707 or section 727 of the Bankruptcy code filed by John S. Pereira on behalf of John S. Pereira. (Pereira, John) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    Financial Management Course Certification (Official Form 23) for Joint Debtor only filed by Daniel M. Katzner on behalf of Maria Torres. (Katzner, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      Financial Management Course Certification (Official Form 23) for Debtor only filed by Daniel M. Katzner on behalf of George Torres. (Katzner, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        So Ordered Stipulation and Order signed on 2/9/2010 extending Trustee's time to object to discharge to April 15, 2010 (related document(s)12). (DePierola, Jacqueline) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          (This Entry is a Duplicate of Document #12) Notice of Proposed Order extending time to file motion pursuant to section 707 or section 727 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by John S. Pereira on behalf of John S. Pereira. (Pereira, John) Modified on 2/9/2010 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Notice of Proposed Order extending time to file motion pursuant to section 707 or section 727 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by John S. Pereira on behalf of John S. Pereira. (Pereira, John) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (related document(s) (Related Doc # 10)) . Service Date 02/05/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/06/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Request for Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 6)) . Service Date 12/09/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Certificate of Credit Counseling for Joint Debtor only, Certificate Number: 02645-NYS-CC-009086596 filed by Daniel M. Katzner on behalf of Maria Torres. (Katzner, Daniel) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor only, Certificate Number: 02645-NYS-CC-009086587 filed by Daniel M. Katzner on behalf of George Torres. (Katzner, Daniel) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Request for 341(a) Notice with 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/6/2010 at 9:30 AM at 80 Broad St., 4th Floor, USTM. Financial Management Course Due: 2/22/2010. Financial Management Course for Joint Debtor Due: 2/22/2010. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 3/8/2010. (Harris, Kendra). (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Matrix filed by Daniel M. Katzner on behalf of George Torres, Maria Torres. (Katzner, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation - Form 22A filed by Daniel M. Katzner on behalf of George Torres, Maria Torres. (Katzner, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Exhibit D Re: Credit Counseling Requirement for Joint Debtor, Stating Credit Counseling Certificate to be filed within 14 days filed by Daniel M. Katzner on behalf of Maria Torres. Credit Counseling Certificate for Joint Debtor due: 12/21/2009. (Katzner, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Exhibit D Re: Credit Counseling Requirement for Debtor, Stating Credit Counseling Certificate to be filed within 14 days filed by Daniel M. Katzner on behalf of George Torres, Maria Torres. Credit Counseling Certificate due: 12/21/2009. (Katzner, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7). Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Daniel M. Katzner on behalf of George Torres, Maria Torres. (Katzner, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?