Lone Star WiFi LLC v. Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00530
District Judge Michael H. Schneider, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 5:16 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lone Star Wifi LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gartman Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas N Millikan +1 858 461 7360 tom@gartmanlawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph P Reid +1 858 461 7360 joe@gartmanlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 bbumgardner@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Hart Rastegar +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 jrastegar@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Akilah Fayola Craig +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 akilah@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T John Ward +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 tjw@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
No Logo Aimbridge Hospitality, LP, Defendant
No Logo HAC Frisco Partners L.P. , Defendant
No Logo HAC Plano Partners L.P. , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lathrop & Gage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William D Cramer +1 312 920 3309 +1 312 920 3301 wcramer@lathropgage.com
No Logo Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by & Fernandez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L Knebel, Jr. +1 214 231 2700 +1 214 999 1279 rknebel@fernandezllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com
No Logo Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claudia Wilson Frost +1 713 425 8450 +1 713 300 6050 claudia.frost@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Lance Johnson +1 713 425 8445 +1 713 300 6045 Jeffrey.Johnson@dlapiper.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Averell Limbach +1 650 833 2000 +1 650 833 2001 alan.limbach@dlapiper.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven John Reynolds +1 312 368 3467 steven.reynolds@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Provost Umphrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andy Tindel +1 903 596 0900 +1 903 596 0909 atindel@andytindel.com
No Logo Scott Woloson, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Scott Woloson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Woloson +1 281 352 9878 +1 281 978 2172 scott@scottwolosonlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/04/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 57 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendants, Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., d/b/a Sheraton Stonebriar Hotel, HAC Plano Partners, L.P., HAC Frisco Partners, L.P. and Aimbridge Hospitality, L.P., are hereby dismissed without prejudice with respect to activities involving non-Starwood properties that they own or manage, and with prejudice with respect to activities involving Starwood properties that they own or manage. All costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/04/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 56 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/04/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES OF TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/03/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
          MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without and With Prejudice by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
            MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Lone Star WiFi LLC, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 41 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AIMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY RE ADDITIONAL INFRINGING HOTELS filed by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Affidavit Cramer Declaration, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Cramer, William) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 42 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness (Renewed) filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 43 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Local Rule 3-1 (Renewed) filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph P. Reid, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Change of Address by William D Cramer (Cramer, William) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 50 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 40 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL STARWOOD TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY RE ADDITIONAL INFRINGING HOTELS filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER to pay Technical Advisor. Payment should be made by December 2, 2013. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/4/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Local Rule 3-1 (Renewed) by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Johnson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness (Renewed) by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                          SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AIMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY RE ADDITIONAL INFRINGING HOTELS by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph P. Reid, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                            SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL STARWOOD TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY RE ADDITIONAL INFRINGING HOTELS by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph P. Reid, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P. (Cramer, William) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE by Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd. Notice of Defendant's Compliance With Damages Disclosure (Knebel, Robert) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lone Star WiFi LLC Notice of Plaintiff's Damages Disclosure (Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. of Compliance with Damages Disclosures (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                      COURT EXHIBIT NO. 1 admitted at Markman hearing. (lgp, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Schneider: Markman Hearing held on 10/16/2013. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (lgp, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:12cv957. This cause is designated as the Lead Case, and the complaint filed in this cause shall be the operative pleading. The Court strikes as untimely Plaintiff's indirect infringement claims subject to reconsideration upon a proper motion by the Plaintiff. Any motions pending in Cause No. 6:12cv957 are DENIED without prejudice to refiling in the lead case within 7 days of this order. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy Tindel on behalf of Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. (Tindel, Andy) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P. . (Cramer, William) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd.. (Knebel, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss, 19 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 18 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph P. Reid in Support of Lone Star WiFi's Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knebel, Robert) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***MOTION to Dismiss by Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd.. (Knebel, Robert) Modified on 8/2/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to HAC Frisco Partners L.P. on 7/15/2013, by personal service; answer due: 8/5/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to HAC Plano Partners L.P. on 7/15/2013, by personal service; answer due: 8/5/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Aimbridge Hotel Group LLC, Corporate Parent DW Johnson Investments LP, Corporate Parent Argonaut (Aimbridge Hospitality) LLC for Aimbridge Hospitality L.P.. (Cramer, William) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HAC Plano Partners L.P. identifying Corporate Parent AREFIN Plano GP LLC, Corporate Parent HAC Plano Mezzanine LP for HAC Plano Partners L.P.. (Cramer, William) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HAC Frisco Partners L.P. identifying Corporate Parent AREFIN Frisco GP LLC, Corporate Parent HAC Frisco Mezzanine LP for HAC Frisco Partners L.P.. (Cramer, William) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cramer, William) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd. served on 7/12/2013, answer due 8/2/2013. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. served on 7/12/2013, answer due 8/2/2013. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd. served on 7/12/2013, answer due 8/2/2013. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. Aimbridge Hospitality L.P. served on 7/12/2013, answer due 8/2/2013. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Sealed Document. Defendants' Brief Opposing Consolidation of Cases (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Sealed Document -- PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF SUPPORTING CONSOLIDATION OF CASES (Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Joseph P Reid on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER that parties brief whether this civil action should be consolidated with cause 6:12cv957 for all or for limited purposes. Plaintiff's brief is due 7-18-2013; Defendants' response is due 7-25-2013. Briefs shall be limited to no more than five pages. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 07/11/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SUMMONS Issued as to Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Thomas N Millikan on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4215224. (Millikan, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph P Reid on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4215200. (Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4214938.), filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No.7,490,348, # 3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 8,312,286)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 177 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?