Lone Star WiFi LLC v. Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00957
District Judge Michael H. Schneider, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 6:12 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Lone Star Wifi LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gartman Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas N Millikan +1 858 461 7360 tom@gartmanlawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph P Reid +1 858 461 7360 joe@gartmanlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Akilah Fayola Craig +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 akilah@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T John Ward +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 tjw@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
No Logo Aimbridge Hospitality, LP, Defendant
No Logo HAC Frisco Partners L.P. , Defendant
No Logo HAC Plano Partners L.P. , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lathrop & Gage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William D Cramer +1 312 920 3309 +1 312 920 3301 wcramer@lathropgage.com
No Logo Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by & Fernandez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L Knebel, Jr. +1 214 231 2700 +1 214 999 1279 rknebel@fernandezllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com
No Logo Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claudia Wilson Frost +1 713 425 8450 +1 713 300 6050 claudia.frost@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Lance Johnson +1 713 425 8445 +1 713 300 6045 Jeffrey.Johnson@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Averell Limbach +1 650 833 2000 +1 650 833 2001 alan.limbach@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven John Reynolds +1 312 368 3467 steven.reynolds@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Provost Umphrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andy Tindel +1 903 596 0900 +1 903 596 0909 atindel@andytindel.com
No Logo Scott Woloson, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Scott Woloson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Woloson +1 281 352 9878 +1 281 978 2172 scott@scottwolosonlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (124) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendants, Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., d/b/a Sheraton Stonebriar Hotel, HAC Plano Partners, L.P., HAC Frisco Partners, L.P. and Aimbridge Hospitality, L.P., are hereby dismissed without prejudice with respect to activities involving non-Starwood properties that they own or manage, and with prejudice with respect to activities involving Starwood properties that they own or manage. All costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/04/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/04/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
      REPORT of Mediation by James W. Knowles. Mediation result: Suspended(Knowles, James) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. Defendants' 80 Sealed Patent Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing is DENIED. The Court hereby CONSOLIDATES this cause with Civil Action 6:13cv530. Cause No. 6:13cv530 is designated as the Lead Case. The complaint filed in 6:13cv530 is the operative pleading. The Court strikes as untimely Plaintiff's indirect infringement claims subject to reconsideration upon a proper motion by the Plaintiff. Any motions pending in Cause No. 6:12cv957 are DENIED without prejudice to refiling in the lead case within 7 days of this order. Cause No. 6:12cv957 is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          AGREED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 113 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. of Designation of Co-Lead Counsel (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                Notice of Agreed Order of Claim Terms by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Millikan, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 92 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL STARWOOD TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REGARDING ADDITIONAL INFRINGING HOTELS filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                    SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 94 SEALED MOTION Motion to Compel Defendant Aimbridge Hospitality, LP to Respond to Discovery Regarding Additional Infringing Hotels filed by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cramer, William) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER REGARDING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. The Court hereby ORDERS that Mr. Scott Woloson is appointed as a technical advisor to the Court. Fees of the technical advisor shall be taxed, as they are incurred, equally against the parties as costs of court. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 09/27/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Its Response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 108 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 09/23/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 111 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                            SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 92 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL STARWOOD TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REGARDING ADDITIONAL INFRINGING HOTELS filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph P. Reid, # 2 Exhibit 30)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 110 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 94 SEALED MOTION Motion to Compel Defendant Aimbridge Hospitality, LP to Respond to Discovery Regarding Additional Infringing Hotels filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph P. Reid, # 2 Exhibit 38, # 3 Exhibit 39, # 4 Exhibit 40)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                Joint Claim Construction Chart by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Millikan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 96 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER REGARDING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. The Court is considering the appointment of Mr. Scott Woloson as a technical advisor to the Court. Parties may lodge any objections to this appointment within 5 days from the date of entry of this Order. Such objections may be filed under seal and in camera. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 09/17/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Claim Construction/Markman Hearing reset for 10/16/2013 10:00 AM before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 09/17/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 97 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 92 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL STARWOOD TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REGARDING ADDITIONAL INFRINGING HOTELS; Responses due by 9/13/2013. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 09/17/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 103 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 92 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL STARWOOD TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REGARDING ADDITIONAL INFRINGING HOTELS filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 102 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 96 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph P. Reid in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF THOMAS N. MILLIKAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF, # 2 Exhibit 12, # 3 Exhibit 13, # 4 Exhibit 14, # 5 Exhibit 15, # 6 Exhibit 16)(Millikan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 100 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 94 SEALED MOTION Motion to Compel Defendant Aimbridge Hospitality, LP to Respond to Discovery Regarding Additional Infringing Hotels filed by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1, # 2 Exhibit #2, # 3 Exhibit #3, # 4 Exhibit #4, # 5 Exhibit #5, # 6 Exhibit #6, # 7 Exhibit #7, # 8 Affidavit Declaration of William D. Cramer, # 9 Affidavit Declaration of Vincent F. Cuce)(Cramer, William) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Exhibit C, #*4) Exhibit D) (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                      DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Exhibit C, #(4) Exhibit D)(Guaragna, John) Modified on 8/30/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 92 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL STARWOOD TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REGARDING ADDITIONAL INFRINGING HOTELS by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 95 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                            SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 94 SEALED MOTION Motion to Compel Defendant Aimbridge Hospitality, LP to Respond to Discovery Regarding Additional Infringing Hotels. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 20, # 2 Exhibit 21, # 3 Exhibit 22, # 4 Exhibit 23, # 5 Exhibit 24, # 6 Exhibit 25, # 7 Exhibit 26, # 8 Exhibit 27, # 9 Exhibit 28, # 10 Exhibit 29, # 11 Exhibit 30, # 12 Exhibit 31, # 13 Exhibit 32, # 14 Exhibit 33, # 15 Exhibit 34, # 16 Exhibit 35, # 17 Exhibit 36, # 18 Exhibit 37, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 94 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                              SEALED MOTION Motion to Compel Defendant Aimbridge Hospitality, LP to Respond to Discovery Regarding Additional Infringing Hotels by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph P. Reid, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19)(Reid, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2013: # 21 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 93 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 92 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL STARWOOD TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REGARDING ADDITIONAL INFRINGING HOTELS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 15, # 15 Exhibit 16, # 16 Exhibit 17, # 17 Exhibit 18, # 18 Exhibit 19, # 19 Exhibit 20, # 20 Exhibit 21, # 21 Exhibit 22, # 22 Exhibit 23, # 23 Exhibit 24, # 24 Exhibit 25, # 25 Exhibit 26, # 26 Exhibit 27, # 27 Exhibit 28, # 28 Exhibit 29)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 92 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL STARWOOD TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REGARDING ADDITIONAL INFRINGING HOTELS by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Reid in Support of Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas N. Millikan in Support of Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Millikan, Thomas) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 80 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF JOSEPH P. REID IN SUPPORT OF LONE STAR WIFI'S SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 89 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Sealed Document. Defendants' Brief Opposing Consolidation of Cases (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 88 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 80 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - A, # 2 Exhibit - B, # 3 Exhibit - C)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE by Lone Star WiFi LLC JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Millikan, Thomas) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 86 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Sealed Document - PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF SUPPORTING CONSOLIDATION OF CASES (Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER that parties brief whether this civil action should be consolidated with cause 6:13cv530 for all or for limited purposes. Plaintiff's brief is due 7-18-2013; Defendants' response is due 7-25-2013. Briefs shall be limited to no more than five pages. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 07/11/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 84 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 80 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF JOHN GARTMAN IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS, # 2 Affidavit DECLARATION OF JOSEPH P. REID IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Text of Proposed Order ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Supplemental) by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Supplemental Protective Order)(Cramer, William) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lone Star WiFi LLC (Patent Local Rule 4-2) (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. of Compliance with Patent Local Rule 4-2 (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Guaragna Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            MODIFIED AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 06/19/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              AMENDED ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 06/19/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Joseph P Reid on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER striking 72 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall designate lead counsel within 24 hours of this order. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 06/19/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Modify the Court's Protective Order and Order Regarding E-Discovery. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 06/19/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claudia Wilson Frost on behalf of Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        ***STRIKEN PER 76 ORDER*** SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 72 SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 22A, # 2 Exhibit 22B, # 3 Exhibit 22C, # 4 Exhibit 22D, # 5 Exhibit 23, # 6 Exhibit 24, # 7 Exhibit 25, # 8 Exhibit 26, # 9 Exhibit 27, # 10 Exhibit 28, # 11 Exhibit 29, # 12 Exhibit 30, # 13 Exhibit 31, # 14 Exhibit 32, # 15 Exhibit 33, # 16 Exhibit 34, # 17 Exhibit 35, # 18 Exhibit 36, # 19 Exhibit 37, # 20 Exhibit 38, # 21 Exhibit 39, # 22 Exhibit 40, # 23 Exhibit 41, # 24 Exhibit 42, # 25 Exhibit 43, # 26 Exhibit 44, # 27 Exhibit 45, # 28 Exhibit 46)(Reid, Joseph) Modified on 6/20/2013 (mll, ). (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ***STRIKEN PER 76 ORDER*** SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF JOSEPH P. REID IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20A, # 22 Exhibit 20B, # 23 Exhibit 20C, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Reid, Joseph) Modified on 6/20/2013 (mll, ). (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. of Defendants' Identification of Terms and Claim Elements for Construction Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4-1 (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE by Lone Star WiFi LLC OF PLAINTIFF'S DISCLOSURE OF PROPOSED TERMS FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION PURSUANT TO PATENT LOCAL RULE 4-1 (Millikan, Thomas) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, (Original) by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P..(Cramer, William) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  First Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel.(Knebel, Robert) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc..(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. re 60 Emergency MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Local Rule 3-1 and to Amend the Docket Control Order (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3, 3-4(a) and 3-4(b) Disclosures (Johnson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P. (P.R. 3-4(a) Disclosures) (Cramer, William) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 60 Emergency MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Local Rule 3-1 and to Amend the Docket Control Order filed by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Tindel, Andy) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 62 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 60 Emergency MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Local Rule 3-1 and to Amend the Docket Control Order filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF REID IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3a, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3b, # 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4, # 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5, # 8 Exhibit EXHIBIT 6, # 9 Exhibit EXHIBIT 7, # 10 Exhibit EXHIBIT 8, # 11 Exhibit EXHIBIT 9, # 12 Exhibit EXHIBIT 10, # 13 Exhibit EXHIBIT 11, # 14 Exhibit EXHIBIT 12, # 15 Exhibit EXHIBIT 13, # 16 Exhibit EXHIBIT 14, # 17 Exhibit EXHIBIT 15, # 18 Exhibit EXHIBIT 16, # 19 Exhibit EXHIBIT 17, # 20 Exhibit EXHIBIT 18, # 21 Exhibit EXHIBIT 19, # 22 Exhibit EXHIBIT 20, # 23 Exhibit EXHIBIT 21, # 24 Exhibit EXHIBIT 22, # 25 Exhibit EXHIBIT 23, # 26 Exhibit EXHBIT 24, # 27 Exhibit EXHIBIT 25, # 28 Exhibit EXHIBIT 26, # 29 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING re 60 Emergency MOTION to Compel. Plaintiff is ordered to file its response by 3:00 p.m. on Thursday, May 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/20/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Emergency MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Patent Local Rule 3-1 and to Amend the Docket Control Order by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John Guaragna, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P. (Initial Disclosures) (Cramer, William) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Johnson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Lone Star WiFi LLC OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd. (Knebel, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel (Knebel, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 1/29/2014. Claim Construction/Markman Hearing set for 10/9/2013 10:00 AM before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Pretrial Conference and Trial Setting set for 6/2/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 04/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION MODIFY THE COURT'S PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER RE ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order MODIFIED AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER, # 2 Text of Proposed Order MODIFIED AGREED ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY)(Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ***DEFICIENT FILING. DISREGARD.*** MOTION JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE COURT'S PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Reid, Joseph) Modified on 4/16/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Lance Johnson on behalf of Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. (Johnson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT (Supplemental Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meetings) by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Akilah Fayola Craig on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Craig, Akilah) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Lone Star WiFi LLC OF PLAINTIFF'S DISCLOSURE OF ASSERTED CLAIMS AND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO PATENT LOCAL RULE 3-1 (Millikan, Thomas) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy Tindel on behalf of Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. (Tindel, Andy) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. Certificate of Interested Parties (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel (Knebel, Robert) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd. (Knebel, Robert) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO MEET, REPORT, AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Transfer Motions due by 3/14/2013. Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 3/14/2013. Joint report reflecting case management plan due by 3/21/2013. Disclosures of asserted claims due 3/21/2013. Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 2/27/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILELD IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Erickson, Brian) Modified on 2/28/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 2/27/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 2/27/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alan A Limbach on behalf of Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4018462. (Limbach, Alan) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Steven J Reynolds on behalf of Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4016235. (Reynolds, Steven) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc..(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Aimbridge Hotel Group LLC, Corporate Parent DW Johnson Investments LP, Corporate Parent LVB Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Argonaut (Aimbridge Hospitality) LLC for Aimbridge Hospitality L.P.. (Cramer, William) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HAC Plano Partners L.P. identifying Corporate Parent AREFIN Plano GP LLC, Corporate Parent HAC Plano Mezzanine LP for HAC Plano Partners L.P.. (Cramer, William) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HAC Frisco Partners L.P. identifying Corporate Parent AREFIN Frisco GP LLC, Corporate Parent HAC Frisco Mezzanine LP for HAC Frisco Partners L.P.. (Cramer, William) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P..(Cramer, William) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel.(Knebel, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd..( Knebel, Robert) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel.( Knebel, Robert) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Aimbridge Hospitality L.P..( Cramer, William) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re HAC Plano Partners L.P..( Cramer, William) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re HAC Frisco Partners L.P..( Cramer, William) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc..( Guaragna, John) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Michael H. Schneider per General Order 13-3. Please see Appendix D: Addendum Regarding Cases Assigned to Judge Schneider. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (tlh, ) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd..( Knebel, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel.( Knebel, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed first Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re HAC Plano Partners L.P..( Cramer, William) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re HAC Frisco Partners L.P..( Cramer, William) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Aimbridge Hospitality L.P..( Cramer, William) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel.( Knebel, Robert) Modified on 1/14/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to HAC Frisco Partners L.P. on 12/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 1/11/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to HAC Plano Partners L.P. on 12/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 1/11/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Aimbridge Hospitality L.P. on 12/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 1/11/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. on 12/21/2012, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd. on 12/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 1/11/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel on 12/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 1/11/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC (Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph P Reid on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3927259. (Reid, Joseph) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Thomas N Millikan on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3927222. (Millikan, Thomas) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Issued as to Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es), # 3 Summons(es), # 4 Summons(es), # 5 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Aimbridge Hospitality L.P., HAC Frisco Partners L.P., HAC Plano Partners L.P., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel II, Ltd., Legacy Stonebriar Hotel, Ltd., d/b/a Westin Stonebriar Hotel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3926066.), filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 7,490,348 Bl, # 2 Exhibit B - US 8,312,286 B2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?