Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. v. Doe 1 et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-03079
District Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 3:11 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lynn Peak Productions, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown & Kannady, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
a Canadian Corporation Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
v.
No Logo JOHN DOE 1, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 10, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 11, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 12, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #13, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 14, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 15, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 16, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 17, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 18, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 19, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #2, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 20, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 21, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 22, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 23, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #24, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #25, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 26, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 27, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 28, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 29, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 3, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 30, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 31, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 32, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 33, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 4, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 5, Defendant
No Logo John Doe#6, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 7, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #8, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 9, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
REPORT on the determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyright (evana, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Notice of Dismissal filed in this case against the Defendants John Doe # 1, 2, 3, 4, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 18, 21, 23, 24, 25, 26, 28, 29, 30, 31, and 33, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), on 4/30/2014. Text Only Entry (evana, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Terminated Party
      Party John Doe 19 terminated pursuant to the notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 4/29/2014. Text Only Entry (evana, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 4/30/2014 Response to Order to Show Cause
        RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and Notice Dismissing Case re [25] by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: 4/29/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 19 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiff to show cause why this Court should not recommend that its claims against all remaining Defendant John Does be dismissed without prejudice for failure to serve. Show Cause Response due by 4/30/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/16/2014. (cpear)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Status Report
              Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Does 22 and 27 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014 Terminated Party
                  Party John Doe 17 terminated pursuant to the Notice of Dismissal filed in this case on 3/14/2014. Text Only Entry (evana, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe #17 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                      MINUTE ORDER granting [18] Plaintiffs Request for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants on or before April 12, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/14/2014.(evana, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 MemorandumCourt Filing
                        MEMORANDUM regarding [18] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/13/14. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                            Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                              Party John Doe 20 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal with prejudice filed in this case on 02/04/14. Text Only Entry (jhawk, ) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe #20 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                  Party John Doe 32 and John Doe 5 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal with Prejudice filed in this case on 01/30/14. Text Only Entry (jhawk, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Does 5 and 32 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                      Party John Doe 16 terminated pursuant to the notice with prejudice to dismiss filed in this case on 01/17/14. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe #16 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                          Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            MINUTE ORDER: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, the Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, the Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/2/2013. Text Only Entry (mehcd) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/15/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MEMORANDUM regarding 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/15/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/15/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent 0939599 BC LTD., Corporate Parent Studio West Productions (VCC) Inc. for Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3618094), filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 exhibit A, # 2 exhibit B, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 340 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?