Cellular Communications Equipment LLC v. Dell Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00569
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 9:38 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 bbumgardner@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Christopher Cecil +1 817 806 3812 +1 817 377 3485 tcecil@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Fagan, Jr. +1 817 806 3817 +1 817 377 3485 mfagan@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
Dell, Inc. Dell, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Perot Systems Corp
Unknown Role, Quest Software, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Joseph Fulghum +1 713 229 1707 +1 713 229 2707 roger.fulghum@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammy M Pennington +1 713 229 1972 +1 713 229 7772 tammy.pennington@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deron R Dacus +1 903 705 1117 +1 903 705 1117 ddacus@dacusfirm.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Order of Reference (Title 28 U.S.C. 636(c))
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/30/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap for all further proceedings. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/28/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER denying as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION consolidating cases 6:13cv507, 6:13cv508, 6:13cv509, 6:13cv510, 6:13cv511, 6:13cv568, 6:13cv569, 6:13cv584 and 6:13cv738 for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. Lead case is 6:13cv507. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. Individual cases remain active for venue motions and trial, and all pending motions will be considered as filed. All future motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control Order by 3/15/2014, and a single Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order by 3/21/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/27/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Dell Inc. (Dacus, Shannon) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael James Fagan, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/20/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC REGARDING SPECIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 2/26/2014 02:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC Of Readiness For Scheduling Conference (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State A Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State A Claim filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State A Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State A Claim by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tammy M Pennington Rhodes on behalf of Dell Inc. (Pennington Rhodes, Tammy) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Dell Inc. on 8/9/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Dell Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dells deadline to answer or respond to Cellular Communications Equipment LLCs Complaint is 10-14-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/30/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Joseph Fulghum on behalf of Dell Inc. (Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Christopher Cecil on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Cecil, Thomas) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Fagan on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Brannon Latimer on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Latimer, Steven) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        SUMMONS Issued as to Dell Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Dell Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4250444.), filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - US 6,819,923, # 3 Exhibit B - US 7,215,962, # 4 Exhibit C - US 7,941,174, # 5 Exhibit D - US 8,055,820)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?