Frank Reginald Brown IV v. Snapchat Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-08569-RGK-AGR
District Judge R. Gary Klausner, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 2:33 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Frank Reginald Brown, IV, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee Tran and Liang APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa J Chin +1 213 612 3737 +1 213 612 3773 lisa.chin@ltlattorneys.com
Space James Mitchell Lee +1 213 612 8900 +1 213 612 3773 james.lee@ltlattorneys.com
Space Kinh-Luan Tran +1 213 612 3737 +1 213 612 3773 klt@ltlcounsel.com
v.
No Logo Benchmark Capital Partners VII, LP, Defendant
Officer/Director, Lasky Mitchell
Officer/Director, Gurley J William
Officer/Director, Dunlevie Bruce
Officer/Director, Harvey, Kevin
Officer/Director, Cohler Matt
Officer/Director, Elasticsearch Global BV

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alex J. Feerst +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 afeerst@durietangri.com
Space Ragesh K Tangri +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 rtangri@durietangri.com
No Logo Does, 1 through 25 inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Evan Thomas Spiegel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brett Dylan Proctor +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 dylanproctor@quinnemanuel.com
Space John B. Quinn +1 213 624 7707 +1 213 624 0643 johnquinn@quinnemanuel.com
Space Joseph Caldwell Sarles +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 josephsarles@quinnemanuel.com
Space Bruce E Van Dalsem +1 213 443 3218 +1 213 443 3100 brucevandalsem@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Gc&h Investments, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alex J. Feerst +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 afeerst@durietangri.com
Space Ragesh K Tangri +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 rtangri@durietangri.com
No Logo General Catalyst Group VI LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alex J. Feerst +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 afeerst@durietangri.com
Space Ragesh K Tangri +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 rtangri@durietangri.com
No Logo Institutional Venture Partners XIV LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alex J. Feerst +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 afeerst@durietangri.com
Space Ragesh K Tangri +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 rtangri@durietangri.com
No Logo Lightspeed Venture Partners Ix L.p., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alex J. Feerst +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 afeerst@durietangri.com
Space Ragesh K Tangri +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 rtangri@durietangri.com
No Logo Robert Cornelius Murphy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brett Dylan Proctor +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 dylanproctor@quinnemanuel.com
Space John B. Quinn +1 213 624 7707 +1 213 624 0643 johnquinn@quinnemanuel.com
Space Joseph Caldwell Sarles +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 josephsarles@quinnemanuel.com
Space Bruce E Van Dalsem +1 213 443 3218 +1 213 443 3100 brucevandalsem@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo SF Growth Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alex J. Feerst +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 afeerst@durietangri.com
Space Ragesh K Tangri +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 rtangri@durietangri.com
Snapchat, Inc. Snapchat, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brett Dylan Proctor +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 dylanproctor@quinnemanuel.com
Space John B. Quinn +1 213 624 7707 +1 213 624 0643 johnquinn@quinnemanuel.com
Space Joseph Caldwell Sarles +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 josephsarles@quinnemanuel.com
Space Bruce E Van Dalsem +1 213 443 3218 +1 213 443 3100 brucevandalsem@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo SV Angel IV LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alex J. Feerst +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 afeerst@durietangri.com
Space Ragesh K Tangri +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 rtangri@durietangri.com
No Logo THL A17 Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alex J. Feerst +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 afeerst@durietangri.com
Space Ragesh K Tangri +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 rtangri@durietangri.com
No Logo Toyopa Group LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brett Dylan Proctor +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 dylanproctor@quinnemanuel.com
Space John B. Quinn +1 213 624 7707 +1 213 624 0643 johnquinn@quinnemanuel.com
Space Joseph Caldwell Sarles +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 josephsarles@quinnemanuel.com
Space Bruce E Van Dalsem +1 213 443 3218 +1 213 443 3100 brucevandalsem@quinnemanuel.com
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER Court Smart (CS). Hearing Date: 1/21/14. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (ha) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
    Receipt of Acknowledgment of documents received at LA Superior Court, Central District, at Stanley Mosk Courthouse on 3/3/14. (lom) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
      REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 Order & Transmittal Letter) (shb) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
        Receipt of case remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court received on February 6 By A Hendrickson (shb) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
          TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Snapchat Inc Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Joseph Sarles at josephsarles@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 1/21/2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Sarles, Joseph)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 45 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 Notice of Filing Transcript
            NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/21/14 2:56 p.m. re Transcript [44] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 Transcript (CV)
              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/21/14 2:56 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2014. (ha)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Frank Reginald Brown, IV Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Lynette Suksnguan at lynette.suksnguan@ltlattorneys.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Tran, Kinh-Luan)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Order on Motion to Dismiss CaseCourt Filing
                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order re: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [23]; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [18], [20] by Judge R. Gary Klausner. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Remand and DENIES Plaintiff's Request for Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs. The Court DENIES as moot Venture Capitalist Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Case Remanded to State Court Case, BC501483. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (mailed 2/3/14) (Attachments: # (1) CV 103) (lom)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                    MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. FURTHER TELEPHONIC HEARING RE: DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR: (1) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; (2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; (3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISCOVERY, CONTEMPT, AND SANCTIONS. The Court and counsel confer as stated on the record. The matter is taken under submission.Court Recorder: CS 1/21/2014. (mp)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 40 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                      SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The Telephone Conference previously scheduled for 1/21/14 1:30 p.m. has been rescheduled to 1/21/2014 03:00 PM. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (213) 894-0800 and using the access codes listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Codes (Please follow the prompts and enter the codes below): Meeting ID: 1112# User Password: 3236#.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jy) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                        MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: Court and counsel present, telephonic conference held. The Court sets a further Telephonic Conference for Tuesday, January 21, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. to hear argument on Defendants' Application for: (1) Temporary Restraining Order; (2) Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; (3) Order to Show Cause Re Discovery, Contempt, and Sanctions (dkt. 13). Counsel will call into the conference by calling (213) 894-0800 and using the access codes listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Codes (Please follow the prompts and enter the codes below): Meeting ID: 1112# User Password: 3236#. Court Recorder: CS 1/16/14. (jy)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 38 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                          SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The Telephone Conference previously set for 1/16/2014 at 1:30 PM is rescheduled to begin at 2:00 PM on 1/16/2014 before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (213) 894-0800 and using the access codes listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Codes (Please follow the prompts and enter the codes below): Meeting ID: 1112# User Password: 0572#.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jy) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                            LREF
                            Blank 37 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                            SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendants Benchmark Capital Partners VII LP, GC&H Investments LLC, General Catalyst Groupp VI LP, Institutional Venture Partners XIV LP, Lightspeed Venture Partners IX LP, SF Growth Fund, SV Angel IV LP, and THL A17 Limited's Motion to Dismiss Case [18]; Defendants Robert Cornelius Murphy and Evan Thomas Spiegel's Motion to Dismiss Case [20]; and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court [23], noticed for hearing on January 21, 2014, have been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Order on Ex Parte Application for LeaveCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: denying [33] Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Surreply to Motion to Remand (shb)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/12/2014, Entered: 1/12/2014 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand [33] filed by Plaintiff Frank Reginald Brown, IV. (Tran, Kinh-Luan)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Disclosure
                                  DISCLOSURE Statement filed by Defendants Robert Cornelius Murphy, Snapchat Inc, Evan Thomas Spiegel, Toyopa Group LLC (Stoddard, Jessica)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014, Terminated: 1/14/2014 Ex Parte Applicaton for Leave
                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by Defendants Robert Cornelius Murphy, Evan Thomas Spiegel. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Stoddard, Jessica)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                      MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Thursday, January 16, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (213) 894-0800 and using the access codes listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Codes (Please follow the prompts and enter the codes below): Meeting ID: 1112# User Password: 0572#. (jy)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Reply (Motion related)
                                        REPLY in Support of MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse[23] filed by Plaintiff Frank Reginald Brown, IV. (Attachments: # (1) Request for Judicial Notice ISO Reply, # (2) Declaration ISO Request for Judicial Notice)(Tran, Kinh-Luan)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Reply (Motion related)
                                          REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case [20] filed by Defendants Robert Cornelius Murphy, Evan Thomas Spiegel. (Stoddard, Jessica)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Reply (Motion related)
                                            REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case [18] filed by Defendants Benchmark Capital Partners VII LP, GC&H Investments LLC, General Catalyst Groupp VI LP, Institutional Venture Partners XIV LP, Lightspeed Venture Partners IX LP, SF Growth Fund, SV Angel IV LP, THL A17 Limited. (Tangri, Ragesh)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                              ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A scheduling conference has been placed on calendar for March 10, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to all parties that have appeared in this action, and is further directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Not later than 5 court days prior to the Scheduling Conference, counsel are ordered to confer and electronically file (joint) Form ADR-1 (and proposed order, Form ADR 12), selecting one of the three settlement options available. (sw)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse[23] filed by Defendants Robert Cornelius Murphy, Evan Thomas Spiegel. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jessica L. Stoddard, # (2) Exhibit A to Stoddard Decl., # (3) Request for Judicial Notice, # (4) Proposed Order Denying Remand)(Stoddard, Jessica)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                  OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Dismiss Case [20] ; Proposed Order filed by Plaintiff Frank Reginald Brown, IV. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Tran, Kinh-Luan)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse[23] Investor Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand; Request for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Defendants Benchmark Capital Partners VII LP, GC&H Investments LLC, General Catalyst Groupp VI LP, Institutional Venture Partners XIV LP, Lightspeed Venture Partners IX LP, SF Growth Fund, SV Angel IV LP, THL A17 Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Tangri, Ragesh)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                      OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Dismiss Case [18] ; Proposed Order filed by Plaintiff Frank Reginald Brown, IV. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Tran, Kinh-Luan)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013, Terminated: 2/3/2014 Motion to Remand Case to State CourtCourt Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Frank Reginald Brown, IV. Motion set for hearing on 1/21/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of K. Luan Tran, # (2) Proposed Order)(Tran, Kinh-Luan)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                          CERTIFICATE and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Frank Reginald Brown, IV, identifying Frank Reginald Brown. (Tran, Kinh-Luan)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)Court Filing
                                                            ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Notice of Motion [19], for the following reasons: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certificate of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (ir)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013, Terminated: 2/3/2014 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Robert Cornelius Murphy, Evan Thomas Spiegel. Motion set for hearing on 1/21/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jessica L. Stoddard, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Stoddard Declaration, # (3) Proposed Order)(Attorney Jessica L Stoddard added to party Robert Cornelius Murphy(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L Stoddard added to party Evan Thomas Spiegel(pty:dft))(Stoddard, Jessica)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013, Terminated: 12/17/2013 Motion to Remand Case to State CourtCourt Filing
                                                                **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 12/17/13**NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Frank Reginald Brown, IV. Motion set for hearing on 1/21/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of K. Luan Tran in support of Motion to Remand, # (2) Proposed Order)(Tran, Kinh-Luan) Modified on 12/17/2013 (ir).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013, Terminated: 2/3/2014 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Benchmark Capital Partners VII LP, GC&H Investments LLC, General Catalyst Groupp VI LP, Institutional Venture Partners XIV LP, Lightspeed Venture Partners IX LP, SF Growth Fund, SV Angel IV LP, THL A17 Limited. Motion set for hearing on 1/21/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, # (2) Declaration of Ragesh K. Tangri in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, # (3) Exhibit 1 to Tangri Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 2 to Tangri Declaration, # (5) Exhibit 3 to Tangri Declaration, # (6) Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Tangri, Ragesh)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/12/2013 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                    MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: re: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Violations of the Protective Order and Order to Show Cause Re Discovery and Sanctions Application [13]. The matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (rne)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                      REPLY in Support of APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Violations of the Protective Order and Order to Show Cause Re Discovery and Sanctions Application[13] filed by Defendants Robert Cornelius Murphy, Snapchat Inc, Evan Thomas Spiegel. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Bruce E. Van Dalsem, # (2) Declaration of Joseph C. Sarles)(Sarles, Joseph)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                        OPPOSITION re: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Violations of the Protective Order and Order to Show Cause Re Discovery and Sanctions Application[13] filed by Plaintiff Frank Reginald Brown, IV. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of K. Luan Tran, # (2) Request for Judicial Notice, # (3) Proposed Order)(Tran, Kinh-Luan)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Reassign Case upon Recusal of Magistrate Judge (CV-110)Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07 and General Order 08-05. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 13-08569 RGK(AGRx). (rn)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013, Terminated: 2/3/2014 Application for Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                            APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Violations of the Protective Order and Order to Show Cause Re Discovery and Sanctions Application filed by Defendants Robert Cornelius Murphy, Snapchat Inc, Evan Thomas Spiegel. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Bruce Van Dalsem, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits A-M to the Declaration of Bruce Van Dalsem, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Proposed Order)(Sarles, Joseph)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: 12/3/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alex Feerst on behalf of Defendants Benchmark Capital Partners VII LP, GC&H Investments LLC, General Catalyst Groupp VI LP, Institutional Venture Partners XIV LP, Lightspeed Venture Partners IX LP, SF Growth Fund, SV Angel IV LP, THL A17 Limited (Attorney Alex Feerst added to party Benchmark Capital Partners VII LP(pty:dft), Attorney Alex Feerst added to party GC&H Investments LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alex Feerst added to party General Catalyst Groupp VI LP(pty:dft), Attorney Alex Feerst added to party Institutional Venture Partners XIV LP(pty:dft), Attorney Alex Feerst added to party Lightspeed Venture Partners IX LP(pty:dft), Attorney Alex Feerst added to party SF Growth Fund(pty:dft), Attorney Alex Feerst added to party SV Angel IV LP(pty:dft), Attorney Alex Feerst added to party THL A17 Limited(pty:dft))(Feerst, Alex)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULING by Judge R. Gary Klausner. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stipulation is GRANTED [9]. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss - Moving Paper Due Date December 16, 2013; Opposition Due Date December 30, 2013; Reply Due Date January 7, 2014; Hearing Date January 21, 2014. (lom)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification)
                                                                                REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Robert Cornelius Murphy, Snapchat Inc, Evan Thomas Spiegel, Toyopa Group LLC. (Stoddard, Jessica)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Stipulation for Order
                                                                                  STIPULATION for Order re: Briefing Scheduling filed by Plaintiff Frank Reginald Brown, IV. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order re: Briefing Schedule)(Tran, Kinh-Luan)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Judge R. Gary Klausner is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at RGK_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                      NOTICE of Standing Order filed by Defendants Robert Cornelius Murphy, Evan Thomas Spiegel. Notice and Service of Standing Order (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1: Standing Order)(Stoddard, Jessica)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Benchmark Capital Partners VII LP, GC&H Investments LLC, General Catalyst Groupp VI LP, Institutional Venture Partners XIV LP, Lightspeed Venture Partners IX LP, Robert Cornelius Murphy, SF Growth Fund, SV Angel IV LP, Evan Thomas Spiegel, THL A17 Limited, Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal to Federal Court served on November 20, 2013. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Notice to Clerk of State Court, # (2) Exhibit B: Notice to Adverse Party)(Stoddard, Jessica)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Notice To Counsel Re: Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31)
                                                                                          NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Benchmark Capital Partners VII LP, GC&H Investments LLC, General Catalyst Groupp VI LP, Institutional Venture Partners XIV LP, Lightspeed Venture Partners IX LP, Robert Cornelius Murphy, SF Growth Fund, SV Angel IV LP, Snapchat Inc, Evan Thomas Spiegel, THL A17 Limited, Toyopa Group LLC, re Notice of Removal Part 2 of 2 [2], Notice of Removal Part 1 of 2, [1], Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, [5] and civil cover sheet served on 11/20/2013. (et) (mg).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                              NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Benchmark Capital Partners VII LP, GC&H Investments LLC, General Catalyst Groupp VI LP, Institutional Venture Partners XIV LP, Lightspeed Venture Partners IX LP, Robert Cornelius Murphy, SF Growth Fund, SV Angel IV LP, Snapchat Inc, Evan Thomas Spiegel, THL A17 Limited, Toyopa Group LLC, identifying Corporate Parent Tencent Holdings Limited for THL A17 Limited; Corporate Parent St. Francis High School for SF Growth Fund. (et) (mg).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Exhibit
                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT [PART 2 of 2] as to Notice of Removal [1] filed by Defendants Benchmark Capital Partners VII LP, GC&H Investments LLC, General Catalyst Groupp VI LP, Institutional Venture Partners XIV LP, Lightspeed Venture Partners IX LP, Robert Cornelius Murphy, SF Growth Fund, SV Angel IV LP, Snapchat Inc, Evan Thomas Spiegel, THL A17 Limited, Toyopa Group LLC. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2013: # (1) Part 2, # (2) Part 3) (mg).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Notice of RemovalCourt Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number BC501483 with CONFORMED FILED COPY OF copy of summons and complaint.Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H Segal. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID. ), filed by Defendants Snapchat Inc, Toyopa Group LLC, General Catalyst Groupp VI LP, Robert Cornelius Murphy, Benchmark Capital Partners VII LP, SF Growth Fund, GC&H Investments LLC, Lightspeed Venture Partners IX LP, THL A17 Limited, SV Angel IV LP, Institutional Venture Partners XIV LP, Evan Thomas Spiegel.(et) [PART 1 of 2] (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2013: # (1) Part 2, # (2) Part 3) (mg).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 1,638 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?