TCYK v. Doe 1
Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Southern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-00074

Tags
Last Updated September 14, 2016 at 6:35 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013 Motion to Dismiss
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Motion to Compel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to File
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Status Report/Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 ERRATA
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: 6/13/2013 Report regarding Copyright.
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: 6/12/2013 Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 109 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?