TCYK, LLC v. Hixson, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Northern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-01020

Tags
Last Updated August 25, 2016 at 5:33 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hamilton Ip Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Aaron Damschen +1 563 441 0207 +8234 823 823 4637 charlie@hamiltoniplaw.com
Space Jay Ramon Hamilton +1 563 441 0207 +8234 823 823 4637 jay@hamiltoniplaw.com
Space Alexander JSW Johnson +1 563 441 0207 +8234 823 823 4637 alex@hamiltoniplaw.com
v.
No Logo Anthony Threatt, Defendant
No Logo Brady Hixson, Defendant
No Logo Chanhala Fournetho, Defendant
No Logo Does 1-13, Defendant
No Logo Jamie Jennings, Defendant
No Logo John Fox, Defendant
No Logo Joshua Davidson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Joshua Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Davidson
No Logo Mary Elder, Defendant
No Logo Phillip Reinert, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James W Redmond +1 712 255 8838 +2586 258 258 6714 jwredlaw@aol.com
No Logo Sheryl Doonan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheryl Doonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheryl Doonan
No Logo Terri Eicher, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Rexin, Defendant
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
AO 121 - Form mailed to Register of Copyrights, Washington, D.C. along with all notices of dismissals. (src) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 47 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendant Brady Hixson by TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) Modified on 5/30/2014 to update text. (src) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER re 37 Motion to Compel Compliance filed by TCYK, LLC. The hearing on the Motion to Compel Compliance previously scheduled for 5/29/2014 is cancelled. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 5/29/2014 (copy w/NEF mailed to non ecf parties). (skm) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 45 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
        STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Joshua Davidson by TCYK, LLC (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 5/29/2014 (djs). (Entered: 05/28/2014)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
          MOTION to Dismiss against Defendant Joshua Davidson by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC Responses due by 6/16/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support) (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 5/29/2014 (djs). (Entered: 05/28/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 43 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Terri Eicher by TCYK, LLC (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 5/29/2014 (djs). (Entered: 05/28/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander JSW Johnson on behalf of TCYK, LLC. (Johnson, Alexander) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 41 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER Setting Hearing 37 MOTION to Compel Compliance: Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2014 at 9:00 AM in 111 7th Avenue SE, Courtroom 3, 4th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 5/14/2014. (NEF and order mailed to non-ecf parties) (pac) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                  LREF
                  Blank 40 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                    LREF
                    Blank 39 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Stipulation of Dismissal
                      LREF
                      Blank 38 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Motion to Compel
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 36 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                          LREF
                          Blank 35 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Answer to Amended Complaint
                            LREF
                            Blank 34 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: 3/18/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 32 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Subpoena Returned executed
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 31 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: 3/6/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 29 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 27 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 26 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Amended Complaint
                                            AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against Joshua Davidson, Sheryl Doonan, Terri Eicher, Mary Elder, Chanhala Fournetho, John Fox, Brady Hixson, Jamie Jennings, Phillip Reinert, Timothy Rexin, Anthony Threatt filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A and B) (pac)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 25 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                            ORDER denying as moot [17] Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting [22] Second Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to detach and separately docket the Amended Complaint for Copyright Infringement. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 1/30/2014. (pac)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 24 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                              MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles: Motion Hearing held on 1/30/2014 re [17] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by TCYK, LLC, and [22] SECOND MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by TCYK, LLC. [17] denied as moot; [22] granted. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: FTR Gold) (pac)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM
                                                SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM [22] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by TCYK, LLC (Hamilton, Jay)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                  SECOND MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff TCYK LLC (Attachment # (1) Amended Complaint) (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 01/30/2014 (kfs)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                    WITHDRAWAL of Motion re [20] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by TCYK, LLC (Hamilton, Jay)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                      WITHDRAWN Per [21]: Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK LLC (Attachment # (1) Second Amended Complaint) (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 01/30/2014 (kfs)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Doe 5 With Prejudice filed by TCYK LLC (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 01/30/2014 (kfs)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [17] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2014 10:00 AM in 111 7th Avenue SE, Courtroom 3, 4th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 1/22/14. (Stigler, Karo)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Amended Complaint) (Hamilton, Jay)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 1/20/2014, Entered: 1/20/2014 Order on UNRESISTED MotionCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER denying [15] Second Motion for Extension of Time Limit for Service. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 1/20/14. (Stigler, Karo)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 UNRESISTED MOTION
                                                                UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time Limit to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Hamilton, Jay)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Order on UNRESISTED Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 UNRESISTED MOTION
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Summons Issued
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Complaint
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013 Complaint
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013 Notice of New Case Filing
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 184 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?