TCYK, LLC v. Screaming Eagle Bar, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Northern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-01018
District Judge Edward J McManus, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 6:30 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hamilton Ip Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Aaron Damschen +1 563 441 0207 +8234 823 823 4637 charlie@hamiltoniplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Ramon Hamilton +1 563 441 0207 +8234 823 823 4637 jay@hamiltoniplaw.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Order on UNRESISTED Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 UNRESISTED MOTION
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
            ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 7/11/2013. (Stigler, Karo) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Motion for Leave to File Document
              MOTION for Leave to File Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum In Support, # 2 Exhibit A) (Hamilton, Jay) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Aaron Damschen on behalf of TCYK, LLC (Damschen, Charles) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                  CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by TCYK, LLC (Hamilton, Jay) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 ~Notice (other)
                    CLERK'S NOTICE of Mailing AO 121 (Copyright Report) with a copy of 2 Complaint to the Copyright Office in Washington, DC. (djs) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Summons Issued
                      Summons Issued as to Does 1-13. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: # 1 New Civil Case Packet) (djs) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: 6/17/2013 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Does 1-13 (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by TCYK, LLC. Scheduling Report Deadline 10/28/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B) (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 6/18/2013 (djs). (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: 6/17/2013 Notice of New Case Filing
                          NOTICE of New Case Filing by TCYK, LLC. (skm) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 106 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?