TCYK, LLC v. Wallace
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-03197

Tags
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 11:35 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Stephenson Jr. david.thunderlaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Stephenson Jr. david.thunderlaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Theodore N Cox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Stephenson Jr. david.thunderlaw@gmail.com
v.
No Logo JOHN DOE 1, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 10, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 11, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 12, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #13, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 14, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 15, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 16, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 17, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #2, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 3, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 4, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 5, Defendant
No Logo John Doe#6, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 7, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #8, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 9, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER: 48 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case, 47 Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference is granted. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/24/2014. (cpear)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    SUMMONS issued by Clerk as to Danin Wallace. Magistrate Judge Consent form issued pursuant to Local Rule (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, ) (Modified on 5/19/2014 Duplicate entry of Document 41 )(evana, ). (Entered: 05/19/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      SUMMONS REQUEST as to Danin Wallace, previously identified as John Doe 13 re 41 Summons Request by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 05/18/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MINUTE ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/16/2014. (cpear) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          SUMMONS REQUEST as to Danin Wallace, previously identified as John Doe 13 re 39 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re 39 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marked Up Original Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Marked Up Exhibit A to Complaint)(Stephenson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe 13, filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit IP Address of Defendant, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Registration, # 3 Exhibit List of Movie Showings in Local Area)(Stephenson, David) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Party John Doe 4, John Doe 5 and John Doe 15 terminated pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 5/15/2014. Text Only Entry (evana, ) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Does 4, 5, and 15 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Party John Doe 2, John Doe 14 and John Doe 17 terminated pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 5/8/2014. Text Only Entry (evana, ) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 2, John Doe 14, and John Doe 17 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Plaintiff's second Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants. No further extensions of this deadline will be granted absent a showing of exceptional cause. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/18/2014. (cpear) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          MEMORANDUM regarding 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/18/14. Text Only Entry (rkeec) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants on or before April 21, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/24/2014.(evana, ) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                MEMORANDUM regarding [29] First MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/21/14. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  First MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proof of Service on CenturyLink, # (2) Exhibit Proof of Service on Comcast, # (3) Exhibit Response of ISP CenturyLink, # (4) Exhibit Response of ISP Comcast)(Stephenson, David)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Terminated Party
                                    Party John Doe 6 terminated pursuant to the [27] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 3/7/2014. Text Only Entry (evana, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 6 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 2, John Doe 3, and John Doe 4 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Modified on 3/10/2014 This was a docketing error and it is NOT a part of THIS case)(evana, ).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Terminated Party
                                          Party John Doe 9 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal with prejudice filed in this case on 01/23/14. Text Only Entry (jhawk, ) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 9 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Terminated Party
                                              Party John Doe 8 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal with prejudice filed in this case on 01/20/14. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/20/2014, Entered: 1/20/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 8 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 01/20/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Terminated Party
                                                  Party John Doe 10 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal with prejudice filed in this case on 01/13/14. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 10 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Terminated Party
                                                      Party John Doe 16, John Doe 1 and John Doe 12 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal without prejudice filed in this case on 01/09/14. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 1, John Doe 12, and John Doe 16 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Terminated Party
                                                          Party John Doe 7 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal with prejudice filed in this case on 01/06/14. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 7 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: 12/31/2013 Terminated Party
                                                              Party John Doe 3 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal with prejudice filed in this case on 12/29/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/29/2013, Entered: 12/29/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 3 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 12/29/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: 12/26/2013 Terminated Party
                                                                  Party John Doe 11 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal with prejudice filed in this case on 12/26/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: 12/26/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 11 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: 12/3/2013 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, the Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, the Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/3/2013. Text Only Entry (mehcd)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Order on Motion for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [8] Motion for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/25/13.(jjhsl, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                          MEMORANDUM regarding [8] MOTION for Leave to to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(b) Conference filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/22/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Motion for Leave
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(b) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion, # (2) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Stephenson, David)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/22/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
                                                                                REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (sphil, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Magistrate Judge Consent FormCourt Filing
                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. No summons issued. (sphil, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (sphil, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Notice of Case Association
                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, David)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Complaint
                                                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3631126), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Spreadsheet of Defendants' IP Addresses, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Copyright Registration, # (3) Exhibit Listings of Film Showings in Colorado, # (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, David)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 240 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?