TCYK, LLC v. Doe 1
Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Southern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-00077

Tags
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 12:18 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Aaron Damschen +1 563 441 0207 +8234 823 823 4637 charlie@hamiltoniplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Ramon Hamilton +1 563 441 0207 +8234 823 823 4637 jay@hamiltoniplaw.com
v.
No Logo Doe 1, Defendant
No Logo Does, Defendant
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: The Court grants in part plaintiff's [Second] Motion for Extension of Time Limit for Service of Defendants 22 . Plaintiff shall have until February 8, 2014, to complete service on Doe 1, the only defendant remaining in this case. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 1/10/2014.(nsr) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
    MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by TCYK, LLC.Motions referred to Thomas J. Shields. Responses due by 1/27/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint)(Hamilton, Jay) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
      Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Service on Defendants by TCYK, LLC.Motions referred to Thomas J. Shields. Responses due by 1/24/2014 (Hamilton, Jay) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
        DECLARATION of Jay R. Hamilton on Compliance with Court Order by TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER severing defendants and taking other action. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 12/20/2013. (mmw) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Motion to Dismiss
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: 11/19/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: 10/14/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Motion to Compel
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Status Report/Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 ERRATA
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: 6/17/2013 Report regarding Copyright.
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: 6/13/2013 Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 148 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?